Firestone v. CitiMortgage Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Magda P Firestone
Defendant: Kirkland Financial LLC, Country Home Mortgage, First NLC Financial Services LLC and CitiMortgage Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01539
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
July 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
July 8, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Compensatory Damages, Equitable Relief, Injunctive Relied, and Punitive Damages with jury demand against all Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9401385, filed by Magda P. Firestone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Judgement Entry, #5 Exhibit Notice of Lost/Destroyed Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit Correspondence Re: Truth in Lending Right to Rescind Documents) (Lombardi, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firestone v. CitiMortgage Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkland Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First NLC Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magda P Firestone
Represented By: Marcus McKean Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?