ASK Chemicals LLC v. Novis Works, LLC
Plaintiff: ASK Chemicals LLC
Defendant: Novis Works, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01585
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by ASK Chemicals LLC. Novis Works, LLC waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 filed on behalf of ASK Chemicals LLC (Speed, F.)
July 12, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Novis Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je)
July 12, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (T,Je)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by ASK Chemicals LLC. (Standley, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Novis Works, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9410801.. Filed by ASK Chemicals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshot, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,686,402, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Standley, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASK Chemicals LLC v. Novis Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASK Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Standley
Represented By: F. Michael Speed, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa A. Rogers McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novis Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?