Nester v. Circle K Co.
Plaintiff: Darlene Nester
Defendant: Circle K Co.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01597
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Darlene Nester. (Goodman, Alan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Darlene Nester. Circle K Co. waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019 filed on behalf of Darlene Nester (Goodman, Alan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of the Service of Summons, filed by Darlene Nester. Related document(s) #1 . (Goodman, Alan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Darlene Nester. Related document(s) #1 . (Goodman, Alan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Circle K Co. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9413766. Filed by Darlene Nester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit: Dismissal and Notice of Rights) (Goodman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nester v. Circle K Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Nester
Represented By: Alan I. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?