Pritchard v. New River Electrical Corp.
Plaintiff: Jerry Pritchard
Defendant: New River Electrical Corp.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01630
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,N)
September 1, 2019 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on October 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by September 26, 2019. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by October 3, 2019. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N)
August 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/11/2109. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Witness List)(D,N)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by New River Electrical Corp.. (Pryatel, Keith)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
July 17, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
July 17, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by New River Electrical Corp. (Pryatel, Keith)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Carroll County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CVH29340 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9421640, filed by New River Electrical Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Copies of Pleadings and Process Received by Defendant, #3 Exhibit B Collective Bargaining Agreement, #4 Exhibit C Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pryatel, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. New River Electrical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Pritchard
Represented By: John Tarkowsky
Represented By: Gregory J. Tarkowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New River Electrical Corp.
Represented By: Travis N. Teare
Represented By: Keith L. Pryatel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?