Ridenour v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tawnia Ridenour
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv01743
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Personal service executed upon Assistant U.S. Attorney on 8/16/2019, by FedEx upon the U.S. Attorney General on 8/19/2019, by FedEx upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed on behalf of Tawnia Ridenour Related document(s) #6 . (Lebron, Michael)
August 3, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Service filed by Tawnia Ridenour. (Alfera, Vincent)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/2/2019. (G,CA)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/2/2019.(G,CA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Service filed by Tawnia Ridenour. (Alfera, Vincent)
August 1, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/1/2019. (P,G)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (P,G)
August 1, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (P,G)
August 1, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (P,G)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement - Complaint Corrected, filed by Tawnia Ridenour. (Alfera, Vincent)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Tawnia Ridenour. (Alfera, Vincent)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Tawnia Ridenour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Total of 3, #3 USM-285 Total of 3) (Alfera, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridenour v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawnia Ridenour
Represented By: Vincent J. Alfera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?