United States of America et al v. $22,838.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $22,838.00 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: John W. Greven
Claimant: Marc Moorer
Case Number: 5:2019cv01862
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated Settlement Agreement dismissing the complaint. The $22,838.00 shall be returned to Marc Moorer through his attorney John Greven. Judge John R. Adams on 9/6/19. (K,C)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Settlement Notice Stipulated Settlement Agreement and Order filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Marc Moorer on 8/21/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (S,SR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 US Marshals Return - $22,838.00 USC was taken into custody on 3/5/2019. Related document(s) #2 .(S,SR)
August 15, 2019 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Marc Moorer placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70140150000158886729. (B,R)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for 22,838.00 in U.S. Currency issued to U.S. Marshal on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (P,G)
August 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (P,G)
August 15, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (P,G)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $22,838.00 in U.S. Currency.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Process & Return, #5 Notice) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. $22,838.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,838.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John W. Greven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marc Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?