Life Changing Events et al v. Heitkoetter et al
Plaintiff: SpeakingEmpire.Com, LLC and Life Changing Events, LLC
Defendant: Debbie Montis and Markus Heitkoetter
Case Number: 5:2019cv02057
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Murphy, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant Heitkoetter's Motion to Dismiss on or before November 20, 2019. (Related Doc #7 ) Judge John R. Adams on 10/22/19.(K,C)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for leave to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Life Changing Events, LLC, SpeakingEmpire.Com, LLC. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John A. Murphy)(Murphy, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 10/07/2019 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #5 . (T,Je)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019cv01547. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Stark County Common Pleas Court) (O,K)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Markus Heitkoetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Business and Asset Purchase Agreement)(Ristau, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal filed by Markus Heitkoetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit State Court Praecipe)(Ristau, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
September 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
September 9, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Common Pleas, case number 2019CV01547 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9510018.. Filed by Markus Heitkoetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stark County Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ristau, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Changing Events et al v. Heitkoetter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SpeakingEmpire.Com, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Richard W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Changing Events, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Richard W. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Montis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markus Heitkoetter
Represented By: Justin W. Ristau
Represented By: Matthew W. Warnock
Represented By: Christopher J. Bondra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?