Simmons v. TimkenSteel Corporation
Plaintiff: Arnette Simmons
Defendant: TimkenSteel Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv02364
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Trisha M. Breedlove and adding attorney Daniel S. Dubow filed by on behalf of Arnette Simmons. (Dubow, Daniel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Timken Steel Corporation's answer due 12/11/2019. Judge John R. Adams on 11/6/19.(K,C)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 11, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant TimkenSteel Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Frantz, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon TimkenSteel Corporation on 10/21/2019, filed on behalf of Arnette Simmons Related document(s) #2 . (W,CM)
October 18, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to TimkenSteel Corporation placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 1130 0001 9212 0741. (S,AN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon TimkenSteel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
October 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
October 10, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9568963, filed by Arnette Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons TimkenSteel) (Breedlove, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. TimkenSteel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TimkenSteel Corporation
Represented By: David P. Frantz
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Wedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnette Simmons
Represented By: Frederick M. Bean
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?