Jordan v. Consumers Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Audrey Jordan
Defendant: Consumers Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv02368
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by J. Daniel Scharville filed by on behalf of Audrey Jordan. (Scharville, J.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/16/2020 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams.. Judge John R. Adams on December 3, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1, #3 Consent to Magistrate, #4 Preliminary Budget, #5 Policies and Procedures Manual)(T,MK)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Consumers Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clemente, Salvatore)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Consumers Life Insurance Company on 11/12/2019, filed on behalf of Audrey Jordan Related document(s) #5 . (P,G)
November 8, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Consumers Life Insurance Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7015 0640 0000 9008 8972. (O,K)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail unexecuted upon Consumers Life Insurance Company filed on behalf of Audrey Jordan Related document(s) #5 . (P,G) Modified to note service unexecuted as no signature on green card on 10/30/2019 (M,TL).
October 22, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Consumers Life Insurance Company placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7015 0640 0002 9008 7500. (P,G)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Consumers Life Insurance Company. (O,K)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Audrey Jordan. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Scharville, J.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided or issued. (T,Je)
October 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je)
October 10, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Audrey Jordan. Related document(s) #1 . (Scharville, J.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Consumers Life Insurance Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9569892. Filed by Audrey Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Letter , #2 Civil Cover Sheet Page One) (Scharville, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Consumers Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Jordan
Represented By: J. Daniel Scharville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Salvatore A. Clemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?