Ackerman v. Given et al
Plaintiff: William R. Ackerman
Defendant: John T. Given, John T. Given MD Inc. and Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02433
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given MD Inc.. (Klutinoty, Maria)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given, John T. Given MD Inc.. (Mack, Edmond)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendants' #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/2/2019. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/6/2019.(D,N)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/2/19 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given, and John T. Given MD Inc. (Klutinoty, Maria)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Maria C. Klutinoty filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Klutinoty, Maria)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc. on 10/22/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of William R. Ackerman. Related document(s) #3 . (O,K)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon John T. Given on 10/21/2019, filed on behalf of William R. Ackerman. Related document(s) #3 . (T,Je)
October 18, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc. (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 3587 6616), John T. Given (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 3587 6623), John T. Given MD Inc. (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 3587 6630) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (T,Je)
October 18, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (O,K)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Witness List, #2 Appendix B Exhibit List) (O,K)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given, John T. Given MD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
October 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
October 18, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for contract breach, an accounting, fraud in the inducement, and patent infringement against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9581779.. Filed by William R. Ackerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 9,949,989, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,962,397, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ackerman-Given Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Weber, Ray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerman v. Given et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Given
Represented By: Gary A. Corroto
Represented By: Maria C. Klutinoty
Represented By: Edmond J. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Given MD Inc.
Represented By: Gary A. Corroto
Represented By: Maria C. Klutinoty
Represented By: Edmond J. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc.
Represented By: Gary A. Corroto
Represented By: Maria C. Klutinoty
Represented By: Edmond J. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Ackerman
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Represented By: Laura J. Gentilcore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?