Roll v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Stewart D Roll
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 5:2019cv02825
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before February 27, 2020. Judge John R. Adams on 1/24/20.(K,C)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 27, 2020 within which to file its answer or other responsive pleading in this case filed by Defendant United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bennett, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by David M. DeVito filed by on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (DeVito, David)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bennett, James)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs on 12/31/2019, filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o U.S. Attorney General on 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #4 . (J,G)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs on 12/16/2019, filed on behalf of Stewart D Roll Related document(s) #4 . (W,CM)
December 11, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o Attorney General, receipt # 70161970000105084070, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, c/o US Attorney, receipt #70161970000105084087, and United States Department of Veterans Affairs VBA Central Office, receipt #70161970000105084254 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70161970000105084070. (Y,A)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs c/o U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (T,Je)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Stewart D Roll. (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons for U.S. Attorney N.D. Ohio)(Simpkins, Scott)
December 5, 2019 Remark by Clerk re Service Upon U.S. Government Defendant. If a U.S. Government agency or officer is sued, you must provide summons for that defendant, for the U.S. Attorney General (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. 20530) and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio (801 West Superior Avenue, Suite 400, Cleveland, OH 44113-1852). (T,Je)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
December 5, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (T,Je)
December 5, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9662232.. Filed by Stewart D Roll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FOIA request, #2 Exhibit B - USDVA acknowledgment of receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Simpkins, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roll v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart D Roll
Represented By: Scott D. Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: David M. DeVito
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?