Summit Tool Company v. Xinkong USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Summit Tool Company and Summit Tool Company doing business as Ken-Tool
Defendant: Xinkong USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01182
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service by Service upon California Secretary of State executed upon Xinkong USA, Inc. on 8/21/2020, filed on behalf of Summit Tool Company (Moser, Christina)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth within, plaintiff's #7 Motion for leave to issue subpoena duces tecum to eBay granted. Plaintiff may seek information from eBay regarding the five requests listed on Exhibit A to the instant motion (see Doc. No. 7-1), but eBay is permitted twenty (20) business days as opposed to the ten business days that Ken-Tool suggests to produce the requested documents. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/18/2020. (E,CK)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting plaintiff's motion for substitute service (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/14/2020. (E,CK)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Motion Leave to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum to eBay filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents Requested)(Moser, Christina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Substitute Service filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - California Secretary of State Online Record, #2 Declaration of Reasonable Diligence, #3 Proposed Order)(Moser, Christina)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 05/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Xinkong USA, Inc. (to Pamona, CA & Chino, CA). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
May 29, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
May 29, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Summit Tool Company. (Moser, Christina)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Summit Tool Company . (Moser, Christina)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Xinkong USA, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10008072, filed by Summit Tool Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KEN-TOOL Word Mark Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Product Design Registration Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3 - T45A Photos, #4 Exhibit 4 - BBB Complaints re XK USA, #5 Exhibit 5 - autorepairequipments eBay listing, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2016tonyyu1224 eBay listing, #7 Exhibit 7 - funwebsurfer eBay listing, #8 Exhibit 8 - XK Amazon Listing, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons) (Moser, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Tool Company v. Xinkong USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinkong USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Tool Company
Represented By: Christina J. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Tool Company doing business as Ken-Tool
Represented By: Christina J. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?