McDonald v. Varga
Interested Party: Esq. Marc P. Gertz and Christopher J. Niekamp
Appellant: Steven P. McDonald
Appellee: Andrew R. Vara
Case Number: 5:2020cv01209
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 22, 2020 to File Appellee Brief filed by Appellee Andrew R. Vara. (Good, Amy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix to Brief of Appellant #5 filed by Steven P. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Pages 1-111 of Appendix, #2 Pages 112-173 of Appendix, #3 Pages 174-266 of Appendix, #4 Pages 267-374 of Appendix, #5 Pages 375-483 of Appendix)(Abens, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Appellant Brief filed by Steven P. McDonald . (Attachments: #1 Copy of 11 U.S.C. 727) (Abens, Matthew) Modified filer on 7/23/2020 (M,TL).
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Order Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/10/2020. (E,CK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (M,TL)
June 2, 2020 Copy of #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and docket sheet mailed to Marc P. Gertz, Goldman & Rosen, 11 South Forge Street, Akron, OH 44304 on 06/02/2020. (M,TL)
June 2, 2020 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Alan M. Koschik, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 16ap5039, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (B,R)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
June 2, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
June 2, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (B,R)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Transferred from the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Sixth Circuit) of Order dated April 17, 2020. Filed by Steven P. McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order, #2 USBC Order on Appeal, #3 USBC Memorandum Decision, #4 Statement of Election of U.S. Trustee, #5 Order Granting Extension of Time, #6 Bankruptcy Appellate Docket Sheet, #7 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet) (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Esq. Marc P. Gertz
Represented By: Marc P. Gertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christopher J. Niekamp
Represented By: Scott J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steven P. McDonald
Represented By: Matthew B. Abens
Represented By: David L. Harvey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andrew R. Vara
Represented By: Amy Leizman Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?