Brantley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ashton Marie Brantley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2020cv01229
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon Commissioner of Social Security by FedEx on 6/17/2020 (signed C19), U.S. Attorney by personal service on 6/15/2020, and Attorney General by FedEx on 6/15/2020, filed on behalf of Ashton Marie Brantley. Related document(s) #7 . (S,AN)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (D,Ky)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 6/11/20. (D,Ky)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 6/11/20.(D,Ky)
June 5, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 06/05/2020. (M,TL)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
June 5, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,TL)
June 5, 2020 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (M,TL)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Social Security Number filed by Ashton Marie Brantley. (Osterhout, Karl)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Ashton Marie Brantley. Related document(s) #1 . (Osterhout, Karl)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Ashton Marie Brantley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285) (Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Marie Brantley
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?