Singleton et al v. N and D Restaurants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jared Singleton and Samantha Singleton
Defendant: N and D Restaurants, LLC and Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01283
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated Substitution of Parties by Interlineation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 Stipulated Substitution of Parties by Interlineation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (E,CK)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order:Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 8/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 7/31/2020. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 8/7/2020. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (E,CK)
June 16, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Darden Restaurants, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (O,K)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 06/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
June 11, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
June 11, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-2020-05-1464 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10035561, filed by N and D Restaurants, LLC and Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Docket, #4 Exhibit C - Answer) (Guice, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton et al v. N and D Restaurants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Singleton
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Friedman
Represented By: Marco G. Bocciarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Singleton
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Friedman
Represented By: Marco G. Bocciarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N and D Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Gregory G. Guice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G. Guice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?