Tratnik v. Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Tratnik
Defendant: Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron and Harun Rashid
Case Number: 5:2020cv01295
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (E,CK)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 9/11/2020 at 1:00 p.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record by the Court no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 8/28/2020. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 9/4/2020. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (E,CK)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron. (Bickis, Julie)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron, Harun Rashid. (Bickis, Julie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 06/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron, Harun Rashid. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
June 12, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
June 12, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10039100.. Filed by Pamela Tratnik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron, #3 Summons Harun Rashid) (Linnen, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tratnik v. Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Hospital Medical Center of Akron
Represented By: John P. Susany
Represented By: Julie A. Bickis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harun Rashid
Represented By: John P. Susany
Represented By: Julie A. Bickis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Tratnik
Represented By: Jerome T. Linnen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?