Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Edwin E Allen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv01575
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration through the U.S. Attorney on 7/27/2020; Office of Regional Chief Counsel (signed c-19), Commissioner of Social Security Administration (signed c-19) and the U.S. Attorney General on 7/29/2020 by FedEX, filed on behalf of Edwin E Allen. Related document(s) #5 . (L,Br)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration (c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA)
July 17, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/17/2020. (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance with L.R. 9.1 filed by Edwin E Allen. (Kasunic, Carl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Edwin E Allen. (Kasunic, Carl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Edwin E Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Summons, #3 USM-285 (Kasunic, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin E Allen
Represented By: David F. Neilsen
Represented By: Carl P. Kasunic, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?