Freeman v. Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trista L. Freeman
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, Carrefour Associates LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC, Perry Farmer and Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01579
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Stipulation Regarding Inadvertent Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege, Work Product Protection Or Other Applicable Privilege filed by Trista L. Freeman. (Baishnab, Robi)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Pursuant to General Order 2020-08-2 regarding COVID-19 and the related guidance provided to minimize risk of infection, the Court is, when possible, conducting matters telephonically or postponing them. To ensure that all parties are able to take part, the Telephonic Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. will be conducted using the Court's AT&T Teleconference Service. Lead counsel must be telephonically present. See Order for conference call details. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/11/2020. Related document(s) #9 . (JLG)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Trista L. Freeman. (Baishnab, Robi)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint,, filed by Carrefour Associates LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, Perry Farmer. (Montgomery, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Trista L. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Forms)(Baishnab, Robi)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Trista L. Freeman. (Baishnab, Robi)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by All Defendants. (Montgomery, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 9/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 9/8/2020 to Answer. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/21/2020. (JLG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC on 7/31/2020, filed on behalf of Trista L. Freeman. Related document(s) #2 . (P,G)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 9/8/2020 to answer filed by Carrefour Associates LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, Perry Farmer. Related document(s) #1 . (Montgomery, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance of David K. Montgomery and Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson by David K. Montgomery filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Montgomery, David)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Carrefour Associates LLC on 7/28/2020, filed on behalf of Trista L. Freeman. Related document(s) #2 . (T,Je)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC on 7/27/2020; Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC on 7/27/2020; Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC on 7/27/2020, filed on behalf of Trista L. Freeman. Related document(s) #2 . (T,Je)
July 24, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 0340 0000 5721 3472. (P,G)
July 22, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to, Perry Farmer placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 0340 0000 5721 3502. Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, placed in U.S. Mail. Type of Service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 0340 0000 5721 3489 and Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, Receipt # 7019 1640 0001 1123 3430. (P,G)
July 22, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Carrefour Associates LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 0340 0000 5721 3496. (P,G)
July 22, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7016 0340 0000 5721 3465. (P,G)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Trista L. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent of Donna Comeaux)(Baishnab, Robi)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Carrefour Associates LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, Perry Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
July 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
July 17, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Carrefour Associates LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, Perry Farmer. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10113088.. Filed by Trista L. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons RE Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC, #3 Summons RE Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC, #4 Summons RE Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC, #5 Summons RE Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC, #6 Summons RE Carrefour Associates LLC, #7 Summons RE Perry Farmer, #8 Exhibit A-Consent of Trista L. Freeman) (Baishnab, Robi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Dayton LLC
Represented By: David K. Montgomery
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrefour Associates LLC
Represented By: David K. Montgomery
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Northeast Ohio LLC
Represented By: David K. Montgomery
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Cleveland LLC
Represented By: David K. Montgomery
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Farmer
Represented By: David K. Montgomery
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Cincinnati LLC
Represented By: David K. Montgomery
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trista L. Freeman
Represented By: Robi J. Baishnab
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?