Miller v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Miller
Defendant: Christopher D. Pappas, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, James F. O'Neil III, Sandra Pianalto, First Energy Corporation, Steven E. Strah, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, Robert Reffner, Michael J. Anderson, Leslie M. Turner, Luis A. Reyes, Thomas N. Mitchell, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, Julia L. Johnson, James F. Pearson, Dennis M. Chack and K. Jon Taylor
Petitioner: Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund
Intervenor: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Leslie Katz and Todd Augenbaum
Case Number: 5:2020cv01743
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Filing 413 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
March 23, 2023 Filing 412 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
March 23, 2023 Filing 411 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
March 23, 2023 Filing 410 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
March 23, 2023 Filing 409 Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
March 23, 2023 Filing 408 Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
March 23, 2023 Filing 407 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). (Fairweather, John)
March 23, 2023 Filing 406 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. Related document(s) #160 .(Favret, John)
March 23, 2023 Filing 405 Status Report The D&O Defendants' Eleventh Status Report filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #160 , #166 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
February 6, 2023 Filing 404 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
February 6, 2023 Filing 403 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
February 6, 2023 Filing 402 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
February 6, 2023 Filing 401 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
February 6, 2023 Filing 400 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
February 6, 2023 Filing 399 Tenth Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
February 6, 2023 Filing 398 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
February 6, 2023 Filing 397 Tenth Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
February 6, 2023 Filing 396 Tenth Status Report by the D&O Defendants' filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #160 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
January 27, 2023 Filing 395 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant Jones' Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Jason J. Mendro; William S. Scherman; Robert K. Hur and Jason R. Meltzer removed from case. (Related Doc #384 ). Judge John R. Adams on 1/27/2023.(L,J)
January 17, 2023 Filing 394 Address Change Notice / Notice of Change of Address by Susan Reagan Gittes filed by on behalf of First Energy Corporation. (Gittes, Susan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 393 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
December 22, 2022 Filing 392 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
December 22, 2022 Filing 391 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
December 22, 2022 Filing 390 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
December 22, 2022 Filing 389 Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
December 22, 2022 Filing 388 Ninth Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
December 22, 2022 Filing 387 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). (Fairweather, John)
December 22, 2022 Filing 386 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
December 22, 2022 Filing 385 Ninth Status Report of the D&O Defendants filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
December 21, 2022 Filing 384 Unopposed Motion by Robert K. Hur, Jason R. Meltzer, Jason J. Mendro, and William S. Scherman to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Mendro, Jason)
November 8, 2022 Filing 383 Letter filed by Randall Carletti. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (B,DL)
November 7, 2022 Filing 382 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
November 7, 2022 Filing 381 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
November 7, 2022 Filing 380 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 379 Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
November 7, 2022 Filing 378 Eighth Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
November 7, 2022 Filing 377 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
November 7, 2022 Filing 376 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 375 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). (Fairweather, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 374 Eighth Status Report The D&O Defendants' filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 22, 2022 Filing 373 Eighth Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
September 22, 2022 Filing 372 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
September 22, 2022 Filing 371 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). Related document(s) #160 .(Fairweather, John)
September 22, 2022 Filing 370 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
September 22, 2022 Filing 369 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
September 22, 2022 Filing 368 Seventh Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
September 22, 2022 Filing 367 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
September 22, 2022 Filing 366 Seventh Status Report The D&O Defendants' filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 22, 2022 Filing 365 Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
September 22, 2022 Filing 364 Reply in support of #354 Motion to intervene as a party , Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Todd Augenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of W.B. Markovits)(Markovits, W.)
September 13, 2022 Filing 363 Marginal Entry Order granting #362 proposed intervenor's Motion for Extension of Time until 09/22/2022 to file his reply in support of the motion to intervene. Judge John R. Adams on 9/13/2022.(L,J)
September 13, 2022 Filing 362 Motion for extension of time until 09/22/2022 to move for reconsideration filed by Intervenor Todd Augenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Todd Augenbaums unopposed motion for an extension of time to move for reconsideration, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in support of Todd Augenbaums unopposed motion for an extension of time to move for reconsideration, #3 Proposed Order Granting Todd Augenbaums Request for an extension)(Markovits, W.)
September 8, 2022 Filing 361 Opposition to #354 Motion to intervene as a party , Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Camillus, John)
September 8, 2022 Filing 360 Opposition to #354 Motion to intervene as a party , Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Michael J. Anderson, Dennis M. Chack, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner(dft), Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 8, 2022 Filing 359 Opposition to #354 Motion to intervene as a party , Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Walker, #2 Exhibit A - Recoupment Policy)(Gittes, Susan)
September 2, 2022 Filing 358 Response to the Parties' Objections to the Appointment of MSD and AFT to Serve as Lead Counsel filed by Todd Augenbaum. Related document(s) #356 , #357 , #355 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement) (Markovits, W.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 357 Objection to Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Michael J. Anderson, Dennis M. Chack, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner(dft), Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #352 . (Duffy, Marjorie)
August 26, 2022 Filing 356 Objection of the Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. to the Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #352 . (Gittes, Susan)
August 26, 2022 Filing 355 Objection to the appointment of MSD and AFT to serve as lead counsel filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer L. Miller. Related document(s) #352 . (Camillus, John) Modified text on 9/8/2022 (M,TL).
August 25, 2022 Filing 354 Motion to intervene as a party , Appoint Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Intervenor Todd Augenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Complaint In Intervention (Clean), #4 Complaint In Intervention (Tracked))(Markovits, W.)
August 24, 2022 Filing 353 Joint Motion to dismiss with prejudice filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Approval Order, #2 Appendix B - Final Judgment, #3 Proposed Order)(Gleeson, John)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Order that consistent with the Court's teleconference, any party seeking to object to the Court's appointment of Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC (MSD) and Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky LLP (AFT) as lead counsel in this matter shall do so by no later than August 26, 2022. MSD/AFT may respond to any objections by no later than September 2, 2022. No reply shall be permitted.Moreover, attached to this Order is correspondence the Court received from Edward Orr. Accompanying the correspondence appears to be the objection and documentation that Orr filed in the Southern District of Ohio. The Court will maintain the accompanying documentation in chambers for review by any interested person or entity. Judge John R. Adams on 8/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Orr Correspondence)(L,J)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Order granting in part and denying in part #346 Defendants' Motion for Disclosure. The submissions regarding lead counsel are attached for review by the existing parties. In all other aspects, the motion is denied for the reasons stated herein. Judge John R. Adams on 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Dworken Discovery, #2 Wollmuth Discovery, #3 Dann Discovery, #4 Boies Withdrawal)(L,J)
August 22, 2022 Filing 350 Notice of Joinder in Motion for Disclosure of Ex Parte Communications and Independent Research by the Court filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jeffrey S. Abraham and attorney Michael J. Klein for Todd Augenbaum. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #348 ); (Related Doc #349 ). Judge John R. Adams on 8/22/22.(K,C)
August 22, 2022 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams.Telephone Status Conference held on 8/22/22. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke.)Time: 7 Mins. (K,C)
August 21, 2022 Filing 349 Motion for attorney Michael J. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11577213, filed by Intervenor Todd Augenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Klein, #2 Proposed Order)(Coates, Terence)
August 21, 2022 Filing 348 Motion for attorney Jeffrey S. Abraham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11577212, filed by Intervenor Todd Augenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Abraham, #2 Proposed Order)(Coates, Terence)
August 21, 2022 Filing 347 Attorney Appearance by Terence Coates filed by on behalf of Todd Augenbaum. (Coates, Terence)
August 20, 2022 Filing 346 Motion for disclosure of Ex Parte Communications and Independent Research by the Court filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Duffy, Marjorie)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Order announcing the Court's intent to appoint Markovits, Stock & Demarco, LLC (MSD) and Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLC (AFT) as lead counsel in this matter. A telephone Conference is set for 8/22/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge John R. Adams to further discuss the matter. See order for additional details and obligations of counsel. Judge John R. Adams on 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan)(L,J)
August 8, 2022 Filing 344 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
August 8, 2022 Filing 343 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). (Fairweather, John)
August 8, 2022 Filing 342 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
August 8, 2022 Filing 341 Sixth Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
August 8, 2022 Filing 340 Sixth Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
August 8, 2022 Filing 339 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
August 8, 2022 Filing 338 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
August 8, 2022 Filing 337 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
August 8, 2022 Filing 336 Sixth Status Report by the D&O Defendants' filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Order that as previously noted, the Court has received letters of interest from five law firms seeking appointment as lead counsel in this matter. In an effort to assist the Court, these applicants are instructed to provide filings that include a description of what they believe will be the subjects on which discovery is to be sought, the nature and extent of discovery, any potential problems that may arise with discovery, the possible use of experts to aid in discovery or litigation, and the dates by which they believe discovery could be completed. As the applicants have not yet been added to the docket, they may submit their statements to the Courts staff via email, and the Court will thereafter docket them for review by the existing counsel in the matter. The Court orders that these statements be received by no later than August 5, 2022. Judge John R. Adams on 7/29/2022. (L,J)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Order that pursuant to the Court's prior notice, the Court received letters of interest from five different law firms. The Court has attached those letters to this Order. A separate notice of hearing will issue for the Court to proceed further in this matter. Judge John R. Adams on 7/26/22. (Attachments: #1 Boies Application, #2 Dann Application, #3 Dworken Application, #4 Markovits Application, #5 Wollmuth Application)(K,C)
July 20, 2022 Filing 333 Joint Notice Pursuant to July 13, 2022 Order filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Related document(s) #332 .(Camillus, John)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Order providing notice that the Court intends to appoint counsel in this matter. Any counsel interested in such an appointment shall contact the Court. See order for specific details, deadlines, and obligations of the parties. Judge John R. Adams on 7/13/2022. (L,J)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Order denying the parties' joint Motion to dismiss without prejudice (Related Doc #320 ). Judge John R. Adams on 7/5/2022.(L,J)
June 23, 2022 Filing 330 Amended Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
June 23, 2022 Filing 329 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
June 23, 2022 Filing 328 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
June 23, 2022 Filing 327 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
June 23, 2022 Filing 326 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
June 23, 2022 Filing 325 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
June 23, 2022 Filing 324 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). (Fairweather, John)
June 23, 2022 Filing 323 Fifth Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
June 23, 2022 Filing 322 Status Report The D&O Defendants' Fifth Status Report filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
June 23, 2022 Filing 321 Fifth Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. Related document(s) #160 .(Mansfield, Douglas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 320 Motion to dismiss without prejudice filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support /Memorandum of Law)(Gleeson, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 319 Response to Show Cause Order filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #316 . (Duffy, Marjorie)
June 10, 2022 Filing 318 Response to Show Cause Order filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Related document(s) #316 . (Camillus, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 317 Response of the Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. to the Court's Order of June 2, 2022 filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #316 . (Gittes, Susan)
June 10, 2022 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $120 refunded on 5/23/22. (W,L)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Order to Show Cause why the Court should not appoint counsel that will fully and fairly litigate this matter. Please review the full order for the Court's reasoning. Responses due by June 10, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. Judge John R. Adams on 6/2/2022. Judge John R. Adams on 6/2/2022. (L,J)
May 9, 2022 Filing 315 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
May 9, 2022 Filing 314 Fourth Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
May 9, 2022 Filing 313 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 312 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 311 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
May 9, 2022 Filing 310 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
May 9, 2022 Filing 309 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). Related document(s) #160 .(Fairweather, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 308 Fourth Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
May 9, 2022 Filing 307 Status Report The D&O Defendants' Fourth Status Report filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
May 6, 2022 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate Charges. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10348809, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #29 . (Rosca, Alan)
May 6, 2022 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Duplicate Charges. Receipt #: BOHNDC-11075603, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #128 . (Rosca, Alan)
April 19, 2022 Filing 306 Marginal Entry Order granting Attorney Rosenbloom's Motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney David S. Rosenbloom removed from case. (Related Doc #305 ) Judge John R. Adams on 4/19/22.(K,C)
April 11, 2022 Filing 305 Motion by David S. Rosenbloom to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Order placing the redacted correspondence on the docket.. Judge John R. Adams on 3/31/22. (Attachments: #1 Redacted correspondence)(K,C)
March 25, 2022 Filing 303 Marginal Entry Order granting Attorney F. Joseph Warin's Motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Francis Joseph Warin removed from case. (Related Doc #275 ) Judge John R. Adams on 3/25/22.(K,C)
March 25, 2022 Filing 302 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant Charles E. Jones' notice of withdrawal of attorney Christopher W.H. Sullivan, Jr. Attorney is withdrawn from the case. (Related Doc #200 ) Judge John R. Adams on 3/25/22.(K,C)
March 24, 2022 Filing 301 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
March 24, 2022 Filing 300 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
March 24, 2022 Filing 299 Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. (Teaberry, Jeremy)
March 24, 2022 Filing 298 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
March 24, 2022 Filing 297 Fourth Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
March 24, 2022 Filing 296 Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
March 24, 2022 Filing 295 Third Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
March 24, 2022 Filing 294 Status Report The D&O Defendants' Third Status Report filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
March 24, 2022 Filing 293 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Order denying Plaintiffs' renewed motion to stay this matter. The parties shall apprise the Court in advance of any days and times that they seek to use the courthouse facilities to conduct depositions. Judge John R. Adams on 3/24/2022. (L,J)
March 23, 2022 Filing 291 Response to Court Order of 3-22-2022 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund and Jennifer L. Miller. Related document(s) #290 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Camillus, John) Modified text on 3/24/2022 (O,K). Modified text on 3/24/2022 (O,K).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Order detailing the need for transparency in these proceedings and rejecting the parties' assertion that a privilege prevents them from answering the Court's factual questions. Plaintiffs shall answer the Court's question by naming under oath, via affidavit, the individuals that paid the bribes by no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 23, 2022. Judge John R. Adams on 3/22/2022. (L,J)
March 16, 2022 Filing 289 Response of the Special Litigation Committee to the Courts Order of March 11, 2022 filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #286 . (Gittes, Susan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 288 Response to Court's March 11, 2022 Order filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund and and Jennifer L. Miller. Related document(s) #286 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email correspondence) (Camillus, John) Modified text on 3/24/2022 (O,K).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Order that during its March 9, 2022 conference, the Court noted that it had received correspondence from a member of the public raising concerns related to this litigation. The correspondence is attached to this order with personal information redacted. Judge John R. Adams on 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence)(L,J)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Order that Plaintiffs or any other interested party shall brief the applicability of the mediation privilege as asserted in the March 9, 2022 hearing. Any brief shall be filed by no later than March 16, 2022 at 12:00 pm. Judge John R. Adams on 3/11/2022. (L,J)
March 10, 2022 Filing 285 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/09/2022 before Judge John R. Adams, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 03/10/2022. (M,TL)
March 10, 2022 Filing 284 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/09/2022 before Judge John R. Adams, re #280 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter,,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 03/10/2022 filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #280 . (Gittes, Susan)
March 10, 2022 Filing 283 Hourly Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 3/9/22 before Judge Adams, re #280 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter,,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 3/10/22 filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #280 . (Duffy, Marjorie)
March 10, 2022 Filing 282 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on March 9, 2022 before Judge John R. Adams, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: March 10, 2022 filed by Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
March 10, 2022 Filing 281 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/09/2022 before Judge Adams, re #280 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter,,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 03/10/2022 filed by Dennis M. Chack. Related document(s) #280 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
March 9, 2022 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams.Status Conference held on 3/9/22 in courtroom #575. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke.)Time: 34 Mins. (K,C)
March 9, 2022 Filing 280 Transcript of Status Conference held on March 9, 2022 before Judge John R. Adams. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [39 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 3/16/2022. Redaction Request due 3/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2022. Related document(s) #279 . (M,Ca)
March 9, 2022 Filing 279 hourly Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/09/2022 before Judge Adams, re Utility Event - Set Deadlines and Hearings. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 03/09/2022 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
February 22, 2022 Filing 278 Status Report in Response to Court's Order filed by Michael J. Anderson, Dennis M. Chack, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner(dft), Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #274 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
February 22, 2022 Filing 277 Response of the Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Directors of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. to the Court's Order of February 11, 2022 filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #274 . (Gittes, Susan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 276 Status Report in response to Court's Order filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mediator)Related document(s) #274 .(Camillus, John)
February 18, 2022 Filing 275 Motion by F. Joseph Warin to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Order denying without prejudice the parties' joint Motion to stay (Related Doc #273 ). The parties have reached a proposed settlement agreement despite the following:incomplete written discovery, no testimony under oath from any Defendant or other witness, incomplete privilege logs detailing withheld documentation, an incomplete forensic examination to identify possible missing communications contained on Defendant Charles Jones' personal electronic devices, and an inadequate period to review and analyze the documents that were provided.Accordingly, the parties are ordered to provide the following information via a public filing with this Court:1)The total amount of the available insurance funds at the time settlement was reached;2)The allocation of damages amongst the Defendants and the factual basis used to establish such allocation;3)The names of the Directors chosen to not run for re-election and the factual basis used to choose those persons;4)The extent of information withheld from discovery based upon claims of privilege and whether full privilege logs have been provided; 5)The precise nature and extent of the governance reforms, including who will oversee and monitor the implementation of the reforms;6)Whether prior to the mediation, Plaintiffs were able to identify any individuals that gave and/or received bribes and/or the payments detailed in the Deferred Prosecution Agreement; 7)Whether the parties' agreement includes any provisions to claw back profits from alleged wrongdoers identified through discovery, and if not, why not;8)Whether the forensic examination of Defendant Charles Jones' personal electronic devices has been completed, and if so, what it revealed;9)The extent and details of any conclusions reached by the Special Litigation Committee pursuant to its independent review of the facts surrounding this litigation; 10)The legal basis for seeking approval of the proposed settlement in a later-filed action rather than this first-filed action; and11)Any and all contacts with the Southern District, formal or informal, in which the parties discussed their chosen methodology for seeking settlement approval.The parties shall submit the above information by no later than February 22, 2022. An in-person hearing for all counsel is hereby scheduled for March 9, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Judge John R. Adams on 2/11/2022.(L,J)
February 11, 2022 Set Deadlines and Hearings Status Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. All lead counsel to attend in person.Related document(s) #274 . (L,J)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robert K. Hur for Charles E. Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #272 ). Judge John R. Adams on 02/11/2022.(M,TL)
February 10, 2022 Filing 273 Joint Motion to stay this action pending settlement proceedings filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Term Sheet, #2 Exhibit Community Health, #3 Exhibit Big Lots, #4 Exhibit Wendy's, #5 Proposed Order)(Camillus, John)
February 10, 2022 Filing 272 Motion for attorney Robert K. Hur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11264360, filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Order approving the parties' #246 privilege log supplement. Judge John R. Adams on 2/8/2022. (L,J)
February 7, 2022 Filing 270 Status Report filed by Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
February 7, 2022 Filing 269 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 268 Second Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
February 7, 2022 Filing 267 Status Report filed by James F. Pearson. Related document(s) #160 , #166 .(Katsiff, Timothy)
February 7, 2022 Filing 266 Status Report filed by Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
February 7, 2022 Filing 265 Status Report The D&O Defendants' filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #160 , #166 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
February 7, 2022 Filing 264 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner(dft). (Fairweather, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 263 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
February 7, 2022 Filing 262 Status Report filed by Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order cancelling the status conference set for 2/7/2022. The matter will be reset by future order of the Court. The parties' motion to excuse appearance are therefore denied as moot (Related Docs #247 ; #249 ; #252 ; #256 ; #257 ; #258 ; #259 ). Judge John R. Adams on 2/3/2022.(L,J)
February 2, 2022 Filing 260 Supplement to Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance of the D&O Defendants at the February 7, 2022 Status Conference filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #247 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Anderson Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demetriou Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Johnson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Misheff Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mitchell Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - O'Neil Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pappas Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pianalto Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 - Reyes Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 - Turner Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 - Strah Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 - Taylor Declaration)(Duffy, Marjorie)
January 31, 2022 Filing 259 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance at the February 7, 2022 Status Conference filed by Defendant James F. Pearson. (Katsiff, Timothy)
January 31, 2022 Filing 258 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance at the February 7, 2022, Status Conference filed by Defendant Dennis M. Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 257 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance at February 7, 2022 Status Conference filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 256 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance at the February 7, 2022 Status Conference filed by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
January 28, 2022 Filing 255 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 28, 2022 before Judge John R. Adams. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [37 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 2/4/2022. Redaction Request due 2/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2022. Related document(s) #251 , #254 , #250 , #253 . (M,Ca)
January 28, 2022 Filing 254 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 1/28/2022 before Judge John R. Adams, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 2/1/2022 filed by First Energy Corporation. (Gittes, Susan)
January 28, 2022 Filing 253 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 01/28/2022 before Judge Adams, re #245 Order on Motion to clarify,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 01/28/2022 filed by Dennis M. Chack. Related document(s) #245 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 252 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance at the February 7, 2022 Status Conference filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #243 . (Fairweather, John)
January 28, 2022 Filing 251 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 1/28/22 before Judge Adams, re #245 Order on Motion to clarify,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 1/28/22 filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. Related document(s) #245 . (Duffy, Marjorie)
January 28, 2022 Filing 250 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 01/28/2022 before Judge Adams, re #245 Order on Motion to clarify,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 01/28/2022 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Related document(s) #245 . (Camillus, John) Modified on 1/28/2022 to correct the court reporter selection to be Caroline Mahnke. (N,SE).
January 28, 2022 Filing 249 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance filed by Jennifer L. Miller, Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John) Modified filers on 1/28/2022 (O,K).
January 27, 2022 Filing 248 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
January 27, 2022 Filing 247 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance of the D&O Defendants at the February 7, 2022 Status Conference filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
January 27, 2022 Filing 246 Proposed Order Privilege Log Supplement to Joint Protocol for Production filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
January 27, 2022 Filing 245 Marginal Entry Order granting the parties' joint Motion to clarify (Related Doc #244 ). At this time, the Court intends to conduct both hearings currently on the Court's calendar. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide a call-in number as soon as possible to opposing counsel and the Court for tomorrow's telephone conference. Judge John R. Adams on 1/27/2022.(L,J)
January 26, 2022 Filing 244 Joint Motion for Clarification Regarding Status Conference filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1/10/22 Docket Entry)(Duffy, Marjorie)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Order granting #240 FirstEnergy's Motion for Extension of Time re #240 Motion to extend deadline to confirm completion of its document production and address recent discovery. Status Conference rescheduled for 2/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams with all counsel and parties to attend. Judge John R. Adams on 1/25/2022.(L,J)
January 24, 2022 Filing 242 Attorney Appearance by Albert G. Lin filed by on behalf of Charles E. Jones. (Lin, Albert)
January 21, 2022 Filing 241 Attorney Appearance by Hannah Marie Smith filed by on behalf of Michael J. Dowling. (Smith, Hannah)
January 18, 2022 Filing 240 Status Report and Motion to extend deadline to confirm completion of its document production and address recent discovery, filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann) Modified event on 1/20/2022 (L,MI).
January 12, 2022 Filing 239 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on January 10, 2022 before Judge John R. Adams, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: January 13, 2022 filed by Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
January 11, 2022 Filing 238 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 1/10/2022 before Judge John R. Adams, re #235 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter,,. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 1/11/2022 filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #235 . (Gittes, Susan)
January 11, 2022 Filing 237 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 01/10/2022 before Judge Adams, re #235 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter,, #234 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form, #233 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form,. Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 01/11/2022 filed by Dennis M. Chack. Related document(s) #235 , #234 , #233 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Order adopting the parties' jointly proposed ESI protocol. Judge John R. Adams on 1/11/2022. (L,J)
January 10, 2022 Filing 235 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 10, 2022 before Judge John R. Adams. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [37 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/17/2022. Redaction Request due 1/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2022. Related document(s) #234 , #233 . (M,Ca)
January 10, 2022 Filing 234 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 01/10/2022 before Judge Adams, re #233 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form,. Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 01/10/2022 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Related document(s) #233 . (Camillus, John)
January 10, 2022 Filing 233 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 1/10/2022 before Judge Adams, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 1/10/2022 filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
January 10, 2022 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams.Telephone Conference held on 1/10/22. A continued Telephone Conference is scheduled for 1/28/2022 at 01:30 PM with counsel only before Judge John R. Adams. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke.) Time: 52 Mins. (K,C)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Order adopting and approving the parties' #231 proposed privilege log supplement. Judge John R. Adams on 1/7/2022. (L,J)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney George A. Stamboulidis for Charles E. Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #229 ). Judge John R. Adams on 01/06/2022.(M,TL)
January 5, 2022 Filing 231 Proposed Stipulation filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
January 3, 2022 Filing 230 Notice of Telephone Conference set for 1/10/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge John R. Adams. Counsel only need attend. Plaintiff to provide a call-in number to the Court and all counsel. (L,J)
December 31, 2021 Filing 229 Motion for attorney George A. Stamboulidis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11201729, filed by Defendant Charles Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
December 23, 2021 Filing 228 Status Report filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer Miller. (Camillus, John)
December 23, 2021 Filing 227 Status Report filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
December 23, 2021 Filing 226 Status Report filed by James Pearson. Related document(s) #160 , #166 .(Katsiff, Timothy)
December 23, 2021 Filing 225 Status Report filed by Charles Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
December 23, 2021 Filing 224 Status Report filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #160 .(Lape, Marcella)
December 23, 2021 Filing 223 Status Report filed by Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #160 .(Favret, John)
December 23, 2021 Filing 222 Status Report filed by Dennis Chack. Related document(s) #160 , #166 .(Mansfield, Douglas)
December 23, 2021 Filing 221 Status Report D & O Defendants' filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #160 , #166 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
December 23, 2021 Filing 220 Status Report filed by Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #160 .(Fairweather, John)
December 17, 2021 Filing 219 SEALED Document: filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer Miller. Related document(s) #197 . (Camillus, John)
December 17, 2021 Filing 218 SEALED Document: Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #197 , #217 . (Lape, Marcella)
December 17, 2021 Filing 217 Notice of Filing Under Seal Pursuant to Document #197 filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #197 .(Lape, Marcella)
December 17, 2021 Filing 216 True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting the motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction re #119 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 21-3854), the petition for a writ of mandamus is Denied #161 (USCA# 21-4037), and the motions to expedite, consolidate, and stay pending appeal are Denied as Moot. Circuit Judges: Siler, Clay, and McKeague. Date issued by USCA 12/16/21 (H,SP)
December 17, 2021 Filing 215 SEALED Document: Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #197 , #214 . (Fairweather, John)
December 17, 2021 Filing 214 Filing Under Seal Pursuant to Doc. 197 filed by Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #197 .(Fairweather, John)
December 16, 2021 Filing 213 SEALED Document:Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by Charles Jones. Related document(s) #197 , #212 . (Shively, Douglas)
December 16, 2021 Filing 212 Defendant Charles E. Jones Filing Under Seal Pursuant to Doc. #197 filed by Charles Jones. Related document(s) #197 .(Shively, Douglas)
December 16, 2021 Filing 211 SEALED Document:Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by Dennis Chack. Related document(s) #197 , #210 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
December 16, 2021 Filing 210 Filing under Seal Pursuant to Doc. No. 197 filed by Dennis Chack. Related document(s) #197 .(Mansfield, Douglas)
December 16, 2021 Filing 209 SEALED Document:Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #197 , #208 . (Favret, John)
December 16, 2021 Filing 208 Defendant Michael J. Dowling's Filing Under Seal Pursuant to this Court's Order (DOC. #197) filed by Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #197 .(Favret, John)
December 15, 2021 Filing 207 SEALED Document:Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by James Pearson. Related document(s) #197 , #206 . (Katsiff, Timothy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 206 Defendant James F. Pearson's Filing Under Seal Pursuant to Doc. #197 filed by James Pearson. Related document(s) #197 .(Katsiff, Timothy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 205 SEALED Document:Exhibit A to Settlement Response filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #197 , #204 . (Baumann, Jordan)
December 15, 2021 Filing 204 The D&O Defendants' Filing Under Seal Pursuant to Doc. #197 filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #197 .(Baumann, Jordan)
December 15, 2021 Filing 203 Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Jeff Longstreth by serving Jeff Longstreth on 12/14/2021 at 6:45 p.m. filed on behalf of Michael Dowling Related document(s) #199 . (McCaffrey, John)
December 15, 2021 Filing 202 Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Partners for Progress by delivering copy to Maria Santana, Security for Fritz Berckmueller at 1405 E. 6th Street, Cleveland, OH 44114 on 12/13/2021 at 2:28 p.m. filed on behalf of Michael Dowling Related document(s) #198 . (McCaffrey, John)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jason R. Meltzer for Charles E. Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #201 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/13/21.(K,C)
December 10, 2021 Filing 201 Motion for attorney Jason R. Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11176024, filed by Defendant Charles Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
December 10, 2021 Filing 200 Motion by Christopher W.H. Sullivan to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Charles Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
December 9, 2021 Filing 199 Notice of Subpoena to Generation Now filed by Michael Dowling. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Generation Now)(McCaffrey, John)
December 9, 2021 Filing 198 Notice of Subpoena to Partners for Progress filed by Michael Dowling. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena Duces Tecum To Partners for Progress)(McCaffrey, John)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order that all parties are able to file their written settlement demands and responses under-seal. Judge John R. Adams on 12/8/21. (K,C)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Order denying Defendants' Motions for protective order with an attorneys' eyes only provision (Related Doc #184 , #185 ); granting Defendants motions for joinder in those motions #187 , #188 , #189 . However, the Court will not foreclose the possibility that such a designation may be appropriate as discovery progresses. Accordingly, in the event that a party believes that discoverable information should be designated as attorneys' eyes only, the party may submit such material to the Court for an in camera review to determine whether such a designation iswarranted. Judge John R. Adams on 12/7/2021.(L,J)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for protective order (Related Doc #179 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/7/2021.(L,J)
December 6, 2021 Filing 194 Opposition to #184 Motion for protective order Containing an Attorneys' Eyes Only Provision, #185 Motion for protective order filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
December 6, 2021 Filing 193 Opposition to #179 Motion for protective order filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
December 3, 2021 Filing 192 Deposition Schedule filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer Miller. (Camillus, John)
November 23, 2021 Filing 191 Notice of Joinder to the D&O Defendants' Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Charles Jones. Related document(s) #185 .(Shively, Douglas)
November 23, 2021 Filing 190 Notice of Joinder to the D&O Defendants' Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #185 .(Lape, Marcella)
November 23, 2021 Filing 189 Motion for joinder in the D&O Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #185 . (Favret, John)
November 23, 2021 Filing 188 Motion for joinder in the D&O Defendants' Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Defendant Dennis Chack. Related document(s) #185 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
November 23, 2021 Filing 187 Motion for joinder in the Motion for Entry of Protective Order Filed by the D&O Defendants filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #185 . (Fairweather, John)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order that in the parties' most recent status report, they informed the Court that they were unable to comply with the Court's deadline for reaching an agreement on a deposition schedule. In their report, the parties requested an extension until December 3, 2021 to reach such an agreement. The request for an extension is granted.In the event that the parties are unable to reach an agreement by December 3, 2021, the Court will conduct an in-person status conference on December 14, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. with all counsel and all parties in attendance to set dates as specifically ordered. Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2021. (L,J)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Barry S. Hyman for First Energy Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #158 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2021. (O,K)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Intervenor's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Dianne M. Pitre for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #181 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2021. (O,K)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lawrence H. Heftman for First Energy Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #159 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2021. (O,K)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Intervenor's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lester R. Hooker for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #182 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2021. (O,K)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Intervenor's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Maya Saxena for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #183 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2021. (O,K)
November 22, 2021 Filing 185 Motion for protective order D&O Defendants' filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Duffy, Marjorie)
November 22, 2021 Filing 184 Motion for protective order Containing an Attorneys' Eyes Only Provision filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
November 22, 2021 Filing 183 Motion for attorney Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11147937, filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 182 Motion for attorney Lester R. Hooker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11147935, filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 181 Motion for attorney Dianne M. Pitre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11147934, filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 180 Status Report Concerning Deposition Schedule filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 179 Motion for protective order filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 178 Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Charles Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 177 Proposed Order related to coordination of discovery filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer Miller. (Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 176 Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer Miller. (Camillus, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 175 Amended Initial Disclosures filed by First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
November 22, 2021 Filing 174 Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Dennis Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 173 Amended Initial Disclosures filed by James Pearson. (Teaberry, Jeremy)
November 22, 2021 Filing 172 Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Michael Dowling. (Favret, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 171 Initial Disclosures filed by Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #160 .(Fairweather, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 170 Amended Initial Disclosures Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
November 22, 2021 Filing 169 Amended Initial Disclosures The D&O Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 168 Opposition to #152 Motion to stay Pending Outcome of Appellate Proceedings filed by First Energy Corporation. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
November 12, 2021 Filing 167 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 11/08/2021 before Judge Adams, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 11/15/2021 filed by Charles Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
November 11, 2021 Filing 166 Transcript of Case Management Conference held on 11/8/21 before Judge John R. Adams. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Lori Callahan at 330-252-6022. [53 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 11/18/2021. Redaction Request due 12/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2022. Related document(s) #164 , #162 , #165 . (C,L)
November 10, 2021 Filing 165 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 11/08/21 before Judge John R. Adams, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: Daily 11/11 and Full by 11/12 filed by First Energy Corporation. (Gittes, Susan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 164 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 11/08/2021 before Judge Adams, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 11/11/2021 filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 9, 2021 Filing 163 Response to #152 Motion to stay Pending Outcome of Appellate Proceedings filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
November 9, 2021 Filing 162 unedited and 3-day Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 11/08/2021 before Judge Adams, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 11/11/21 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Camillus, John)
November 9, 2021 Filing 161 Appeal Remark from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: A petition for writ of mandamus filed by First Energy Corporation (USCA# 21-4037) (H,SP)
November 9, 2021 Filing 160 Case Management Conference Plan/Order.Case is assigned to the complex track. Status Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. All lead counsel shall attend. Parties are excused. Please review the order for discovery deadlines and additional obligations of counsel. Judge John R. Adams on 11/9/2021. (L,J)
November 8, 2021 Filing 159 Motion for attorney Larry H. Heftman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11123739, filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(MacDonald, Ann)
November 8, 2021 Filing 158 Motion for attorney Barry S. Hyman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11123727, filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(MacDonald, Ann)
November 8, 2021 Filing 157 Attorney Appearance by Ann H. MacDonald filed by on behalf of First Energy Corporation. (MacDonald, Ann)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Changing the Time of the In-Person case management conference. The conference is rescheduled from 11/8/21 at 11:00 a.m. to 11/8/21 at 12:00 p.m in Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. The time change is necessary due to unforeseen circumstances.. Judge John R. Adams on 11/5/21. (K,C)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Tayler D. Bolton for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #156 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/5/21.(K,C)
November 4, 2021 Filing 156 Motion for attorney Tayler D. Bolton to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing attached. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11119425, filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Camillus, John) Modified on 11/5/2021 (W,Jo).
November 3, 2021 Filing 155 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ESI Protocol)(Camillus, John)
November 3, 2021 Filing 154 Notice of Developments Related to the SLC's Motion for a Stay Pending its Appeal of the Denial of a Stay filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Motion, #3 Exhibit Order)(Camillus, John)
November 1, 2021 Filing 153 Marginal Entry Order granting the parties' joint Motion to excuse (Related Doc #137 ) the appearance of the parties and insurance representatives at the upcoming case management conference. Judge John R. Adams on 11/1/2021.(L,J)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Sara M. DiLeo for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #151 ) Judge John R. Adams on 11/1/2021. (O,K)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Alla Zayenchik for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #150 ) Judge John R. Adams on 11/1/2021. (O,K)
October 29, 2021 Filing 152 Motion to stay Pending Outcome of Appellate Proceedings filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 151 Motion for attorney Sara DiLeo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11108561, filed by Intervenor Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Camillus, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 150 Motion for attorney Alla Zayenchik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11108554, filed by Intervenor Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Camillus, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 149 Initial Disclosures filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #140 .(Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 148 Initial Disclosures Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
October 29, 2021 Filing 147 Initial Disclosures filed by Charles Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
October 29, 2021 Filing 146 Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Court Order (Doc. No.140) filed by Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Reffner's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures)Related document(s) #140 .(Fairweather, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 145 Initial Disclosures (Rule 26) filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Jennifer Miller. (Camillus, John)
October 28, 2021 Filing 144 Initial Disclosures (Rule 26) filed by Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #118 .(Favret, John)
October 28, 2021 Filing 143 Initial Disclosures Defendant Pearson's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by James Pearson. (Teaberry, Jeremy)
October 28, 2021 Filing 142 Initial Disclosures Defendant Chack's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Dennis Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
October 28, 2021 Filing 141 Initial Disclosures The D&O Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order that this matter is scheduled for a case management conference on 11/8/2021 at 11:00 a.m. In order to assist the Court in preparing for the hearing, the parties are instructed to file their initial disclosures by no later than October 29, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Judge John R. Adams on 10/28/2021. (L,J)
October 28, 2021 Notice to Attorney Jordan M. Baumann. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
October 21, 2021 Filing 139 Answer to Plaintiffs' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by James Pearson. Related document(s) #75 . (Teaberry, Jeremy)
October 21, 2021 Filing 138 Answer to #75 Intervenor's complaint, Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 137 Joint Motion to excuse Attendance at the November 8, 2021 Case Management Conference by All Parties filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 21, 2021 Filing 136 Answer to Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #75 , #124 . (Kaminski, Kerin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 135 Answer to Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #75 . (Lape, Marcella)
October 21, 2021 Filing 134 Answer to Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Charles Jones. (Warren, Daniel)
October 21, 2021 Filing 133 Answer to Intervenors' Verified Derivative Complaint filed by Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #75 . (McCaffrey, John)
October 21, 2021 Filing 132 Answer to Plaintiffs' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #75 . (Ritts, Geoffrey)
October 21, 2021 Filing 131 Answer to Intervenors Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Dennis Chack. Related document(s) #75 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
October 13, 2021 Filing 130 Attorney Appearance by Eric Lechtzin filed by on behalf of Jennifer Miller. (Lechtzin, Eric)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric Lechtzin for Jennifer L. Miller. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #128 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/12/21.(K,C)
October 8, 2021 Filing 129 Exhibit(s) filed by Jennifer Miller. Related document(s) #128 . (Rosca, Alan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 128 Motion for attorney Eric Lechtzin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11075603, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosca, Alan)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant First Energy's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Susan Reagan Gittes, John Gleeson, and Maeve O'Connor for First Energy Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #125 ); (Related Doc #126 ); (Related Doc #127 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/5/21.(K,C)
October 4, 2021 Filing 127 Motion for attorney Maeve O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11065813, filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 126 Motion for attorney John Gleeson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11065799, filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Nitschke, Kathleen)
October 4, 2021 Filing 125 Motion for attorney Susan Reagan Gittes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11065794, filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Nitschke, Kathleen)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order granting in part and holding in abeyance in part the institutional investors' motion to name their complaint the operative complaint and be appointed lead counselr (Related Doc #121 ); granting #122 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 10/21/2021 to answer; granting the institutional investors' Motion to continue (Related Doc #123 ) with case management conference to be held on 11/8/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. See order for further details. Judge John R. Adams on 9/30/2021.(L,J)
September 29, 2021 Notice to Attorney Eric Lechtzin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
September 27, 2021 Filing 123 Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference until 11/8/2021 or 11/18/2021 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. (Camillus, John)
September 27, 2021 Filing 122 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 10/21/2021 to answer the Operative Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, K. Taylor, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #75 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Marjorie)
September 27, 2021 Filing 121 Unopposed Motion Order Designating Operative Complaint and Appointing Lead Plaintiffs and Class Counsel filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund, Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Camillus, John)
September 24, 2021 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #119 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 21-3854). Date filed in USCA 9/23/21. (H,SP)
September 17, 2021 Filing 120 Response to the Special Litigation Committee's Notice of Appeal filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Related document(s) #119 .(Camillus, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #117 Opinion and Decision of 9/16/21, filed by First Energy Corporation. (Filing fee $505, receipt number AOHNDC-11039007) (Nitschke, Kathleen)
September 16, 2021 Filing 118 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/20/2021 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 9/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order and Decision denying Intervenor's motion to intervene (Doc. #22 ); Denying Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. #83 ); Denying Defendants' motion to stay (Doc. #96 ). Denying Defendant's motion for order #44 . Further, Defendants' multiple motions are granted: #85 , #86 , #87 , #88 , #104 , #105 , #107 , and #109 . A Case Management Conference will be scheduled in the immediate future by separate order. Judge John R. Adams on 9/16/21. (K,C)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order. Two separate motions to substitute counsel (Docs. #59 and #62 ) were filed in December of 2020. The motions are GRANTED. A third motion to substitute counsel was filed on July 19, 2021 (Doc. #94 ). The motion is GRANTED. Judge John R. Adams on 9/15/21.(S,HR)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Molly Bowen for Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #115 ). Judge John R. Adams on 9/10/21.(K,C)
September 9, 2021 Filing 115 Motion for attorney Molly J. Bowen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11026933, filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (expired))(Camillus, John)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Timothy D. Katsiff,David L. Axelrod, and Emilia McKee Vassallo for James F. Pearson. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Docs #80 , #81 , #82 ). Judge John R. Adams on 8/26/21.(K,C)
August 24, 2021 Filing 114 Reply in support of #96 Motion to stay filed by First Energy Corporation. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 113 Marginal Entry Order granting #112 Defendant First Energy's Motion for Extension of Time to File its reply in support of its motion to stay. Reply now due 8/24/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 8/12/2021.(L,J)
August 12, 2021 Filing 112 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 24, 2021 to file response/reply to #96 Motion to stay filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #96 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nitschke, Kathleen)
August 10, 2021 Filing 111 Opposition to #96 Motion to stay filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Camillus, John)
August 9, 2021 Filing 110 Response to Derivative Complaint and Intervenor Complaint filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #75 , #31 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
August 3, 2021 Filing 109 Notice for joinder In the Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by the D&O Defendants' filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #103 . (Fairweather, John) c
August 2, 2021 Filing 108 Notice of Withdrawal of Motions to Dismiss filed by First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #83 , #44 .(Nitschke, Kathleen)
August 2, 2021 Filing 107 Motion for joinder in the D&O's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Complaint filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #103 . (McCaffrey, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 106 Motion for joinder in the D&O Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #103 . (Lape, Marcella)
August 2, 2021 Filing 105 Motion for joinder in the D&O Defendants' Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant Charles Jones. Related document(s) #103 . (Warren, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 104 Motion for joinder In the Reply in Support of the D&O Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant James Pearson. Related document(s) #103 . (Teaberry, Jeremy)
August 2, 2021 Filing 103 Reply in support of #83 Motion to dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner. (Duffy, Marjorie)
August 2, 2021 Filing 102 Marginal Entry Order denying #100 the individual defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in support of the motion to dismiss. Judge John R. Adams on 8/2/2021.(L,J)
August 2, 2021 Filing 101 Marginal Entry Order denying #99 Defendant First Energy's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in support of its motion to dismiss. Judge John R. Adams on 8/2/2021.(L,J)
July 30, 2021 Filing 100 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to #83 Motion to dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #83 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duffy, Marjorie)
July 30, 2021 Filing 99 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to #83 Motion to dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #83 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
July 29, 2021 Filing 98 Marginal Entry Order granting #97 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to oppose the motion to stay. Opposition now due 8/10/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 7/29/2021.(L,J)
July 28, 2021 Filing 97 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 8/10/21 to file response/reply to #96 Motion to stay filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Related document(s) #96 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Camillus, John)
July 20, 2021 Filing 96 Motion to stay filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Stay)(Nitschke, Kathleen)
July 19, 2021 Filing 95 Opposition to #83 Motion to dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Camillus, John)
July 19, 2021 Filing 94 Motion to substitute attorney Kerin L. Kaminski, Karen L. Giffen, Kathleen Nitschke, John Gleeson, Maeve O'Connor and Susan Reagan Gittes in place of attorney Geoffrey J. Ritts, Robert S. Faxon and Marjorie P. Duffy filed by Defendant First Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ritts, Geoffrey)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Laura Hughes McNally for Dennis M. Chack. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #93 ). Judge John R. Adams on 07/02/2021.(M,TL)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael L. Kichline for Dennis M. Chack. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #92 ). Judge John R. Adams on 07/02/2021.(M,TL)
June 29, 2021 Filing 93 Motion for attorney Laura McNally to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10907484, filed by Defendant Dennis Chack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mansfield, Douglas)
June 29, 2021 Filing 92 Motion for attorney Michael Kichline to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10907448, filed by Defendant Dennis Chack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mansfield, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 91 Transcript of Telephone Pretrial Hearing held on 5/20/21 before Judge John R. Adams. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Lori Callahan at 330-252-6022. [11 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 7/2/2021. Redaction Request due 7/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2021. Related document(s) #90 . (C,L)
June 25, 2021 Filing 90 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 5/20/21 before Judge Adams, Court Reporter: Lori Callahan. Requested completion date: 6/25/21 filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Camillus, John)
June 17, 2021 Filing 89 Motion for joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #83 . (Lape, Marcella)
June 17, 2021 Filing 88 Motion for joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant Charles Jones. Related document(s) #83 . (Warren, Daniel)
June 17, 2021 Filing 87 Motion for joinder in the Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant Michael Dowling. Related document(s) #83 . (McCaffrey, John)
June 17, 2021 Filing 86 Motion for joinder to Dismiss the Intervenors Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint Filed by the Director Defendants filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. Related document(s) #83 . (Fairweather, John)
June 17, 2021 Filing 85 Motion for joinder in Support of FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Defendant James Pearson. Related document(s) #83 . (Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 84 Brief re MOTION TO DISMISS and Notice of Joinder in the FirstEnergy Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Dennis Chack. Related document(s) #83 . (Mansfield, Douglas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 83 Motion to dismiss the Intervenors' Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner. Related document(s) #75 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defts Motion to Dismiss Intervenors' Complaint, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts in Support of Defts Motion to Dismiss the Intervenors' Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Ritts Decl: 2016 Q4 Earnings, #4 Exhibit B to Ritts Decl: 2020 Proxy, #5 Exhibit C to Ritts Decl: 2019 Proxy, #6 Exhibit D to Ritts Decl: 2018 Proxy, #7 Exhibit E to Ritts Decl: 2017 Proxy, #8 Exhibit F to Ritts Decl: article, #9 Exhibit G to Ritts Decl: article)(Duffy, Marjorie)
June 16, 2021 Filing 82 Motion for attorney Emilia McKee Vassallo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10885940, filed by Defendant James Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 16, 2021 Filing 81 Motion for attorney David L. Axelrod to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10885912, filed by Defendant James Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 16, 2021 Filing 80 Motion for attorney Timothy D. Katsiff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10885889, filed by Defendant James Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 16, 2021 Filing 79 Attorney Appearance by Douglas M. Mansfield, Jr filed by on behalf of Dennis Chack. (Mansfield, Douglas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 78 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #77 ). All dispositive motion briefing shall be governed by the limitations set forth for Complex track cases. Judge John R. Adams on 6/15/2021.(L,J)
June 10, 2021 Filing 77 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations Motion to Apply the Complex Track Page Limits Under L.R. 7.1(f) to All Briefing Relating to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Intervenors' Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Charles Jones, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Leslie Turner, Steven Strah, Robert Reffner, Michael Dowling, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, First Energy Corporation, Dennis Chack, James Pearson, K. Taylor. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 76 Attorney Appearance by Jeremy R. Teaberry filed by on behalf of James Pearson. (Teaberry, Jeremy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 75 Intervenor's complaint. Filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Exhibit Verification, #3 Exhibit Verification) (Camillus, John)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jason J. Mendro for Charles E. Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #74 ). Judge John R. Adams on 5/21/20.(K,C)
May 20, 2021 Filing 74 Motion for attorney Jason J. Mendro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10844466, filed by Defendant Charles Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mendro Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
May 20, 2021 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge John R. Adams. Telephone Status Conference held on 5/20/21. (Court Reporter: Lori Callahan.)Time: 12 Mins. (K,C)
May 18, 2021 Filing 73 Notice of Further Developments in the Institutional Investors' Derivative Action filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Camillus, John)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order and Decision that Intervenors' motions are granted as to intervention and denied as to transfer to the Southern District of Ohio (Docs. #17 ,#30 , #36 ). A Telephonic Status Conference for lead counsel of all parties is set for 5/20/2021 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide the court with a conference call-in number no later than 12:00 p.m. on 5/19/21. Judge John R. Adams on 5/13/21. (K,C)
March 25, 2021 Filing 71 Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority In Support Of The Defendants' Opposition to Leslie Katz's Motion for Permissive Intervention filed by Leslie Katz. Related document(s) #70 .(Markovits, W.)
March 23, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of the Defendants' Opposition to Leslie Katz's Motion for Permissive Intervention filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order)Related document(s) #37 .(Ritts, Geoffrey)
January 7, 2021 Filing 69 Response to #17 Motion of the Institutional Investors to intervene and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio to Proposed Intervenors' Notice filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner. (Related document #61 ) (Ritts, Geoffrey)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Paul M.G. Helms for Robert Reffner. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #68 ). Judge John R. Adams on 1/6/21.(K,C)
January 5, 2021 Filing 68 Motion for attorney Paul M.G. Helms to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10541969, filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Helms Declaration)(Fairweather, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 67 Motion for attorney David S. Rosenbloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10540012, filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rosenbloom Declaration)(Fairweather, John)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Gail E. Lee for Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #66 ). Judge John R. Adams on 1/4/21.(K,C)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David S. Rosenbloom for Robert Reffner. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #67 ). Judge John R. Adams on 1/4/21.(K,C)
December 31, 2020 Filing 66 Motion for attorney Gail E. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10534912, filed by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gail Lee Certificate of Good Standing)(Lape, Marcella)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven S. Scholes for Robert Reffner. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #65 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/31/2020.(M,TL)
December 29, 2020 Filing 65 Motion for attorney Steven S. Scholes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10529140, filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scholes Declaration)(Fairweather, John)
December 23, 2020 Filing 64 Attorney Appearance by Lisa S. DelGrosso filed by on behalf of Robert Reffner. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
December 23, 2020 Filing 63 Attorney Appearance by John C. Fairweather filed by on behalf of Robert Reffner. (Fairweather, John)
December 23, 2020 Filing 62 Motion to substitute attorney John C. Fairweather, Lisa S. DelGrosso, Steven S. Scholes, David S. Rosenbloom and Paul Helms in place of attorney Geoffrey J. Ritts, Robert S. Faxon and Marjorie P. Duffy filed by Defendant Robert Reffner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 22, 2020 Filing 61 Notice of Further Developments related to Motion to Intervene and Transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Camillus, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 60 Attorney Appearance by Marcella L. Lape filed by on behalf of Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Lape, Marcella)
December 18, 2020 Filing 59 Motion to substitute attorneyMarcella L. Lape and Gail Lee in place of attorney Geoffrey J. Ritts, Robert S. Faxon and Marjorie P. Duffy filed by Defendant Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ritts, Geoffrey)
December 8, 2020 Filing 58 Notice of Further Developments related to Motion to Intervene and Transfer filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Camillus, John)
December 8, 2020 Filing 57 Notice of Further Developments related to Motion to Intervene and Transfer filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Camillus, John) Modified to note unsigned, filer refiled see ECF #58 on 12/16/2020 (O,K).
December 7, 2020 Filing 56 Attorney Appearance by Zachary C. Schaengold filed by on behalf of Leslie Katz. (Schaengold, Zachary)
November 27, 2020 Filing 55 Reply in support of #44 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Charles Jones. (Warren, Daniel)
November 27, 2020 Filing 54 Reply in support of #44 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Michael Dowling. (Favret, John)
November 27, 2020 Filing 53 Reply in support of #44 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Duffy, Marjorie)
November 19, 2020 Filing 52 Notice of Further Developments and Response to Proposed Intervenors' Notice filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Motion to Stay (S.D. Ohio))Related document(s) #51 .(Ritts, Geoffrey)
November 16, 2020 Filing 51 Notice of Further Developments related to Motion to Intervene and Transfer filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion and Order)(Camillus, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 50 Response to #44 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Rosca, Alan)
November 11, 2020 Filing 49 Notice of Further Developments related to Motion to Intervene and Transfer filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. (Camillus, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 48 Notice of a Case Related to Leslie Katz's Motion for Permissive Intervention filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lawsuit) Related document(s) #22 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
November 6, 2020 Filing 47 Marginal Entry Order granting #46 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to file her response to the motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Response due 11/13/2020. Judge John R. Adams on 11/6/2020.(L,J)
November 5, 2020 Filing 46 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until November 13, 2020 to file response/reply to #44 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. Related document(s) #44 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rosca, Alan)
November 3, 2020 Filing 45 Reply in support of #22 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Leslie Katz. (Markovits, W.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 44 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, Julia Johnson, Charles Jones, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Luis Reyes, Leslie Turner, Steven Strah, Robert Reffner, Michael Dowling, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah, First Energy Corporation. Related document(s) #31 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts in Support of Defts Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2020 Form 10-K, #4 Exhibit B to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2020 Form DEF 14A, #5 Exhibit C to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2018 Form DEF 14A, #6 Exhibit D to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2019 Form DEF 14A)(Duffy, Marjorie)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Movant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven J. Toll,Daniel S. Sommers,Richard A. Speirs,Christopher Lometti,and Amy R. Miller for Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #39 ); (Related Doc #40 ); (Related Doc #41 ); (Related Doc #42 ); (Related Doc #43 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/30/20.(K,C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 43 Motion for attorney Amy Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10383364, filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Donald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 42 Motion for attorney Christopher Lometti to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10383343, filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Donald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 41 Motion for attorney Richard A. Speirs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10383311, filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Donald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 40 Motion for attorney Daniel S. Sommers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10383267, filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Donald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 39 Motion for attorney Steven J. Toll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10383230, filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, Donald)
October 27, 2020 Filing 38 Response to #22 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Jennifer Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosca, Alan)
October 27, 2020 Filing 37 Opposition to #22 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Michael Anderson, Steven Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia Johnson, Donald Misheff, Thomas Mitchell, James O'Neil III, Christopher Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis Reyes, Steven Strah, Leslie Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 20, 2020 Filing 36 Motion for joinder (Refiled) in Support of #17 Motion of the Institutional Investors to intervene and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Davis, Donald)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jeroen van Kwawegen for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #34 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/20/2020.(M,TL)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Thomas J. Curry for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #33 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/20/2020.(M,TL)
October 20, 2020 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams. Telephone Case Management Conference held on 10/20/20. (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke.)Time: 31 Mins. (K,C)
October 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Steven J. Toll. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Richard A. Speirs. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Amy R. Miller. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Daniel S. Sommers. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Christopher Lometti. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 19, 2020 Filing 35 Supplemental Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #27 .(Rosca, Alan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 34 Motion for attorney Jeroen van Kwawegen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10354178, filed by Intervenor Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joroen van Kwawegen)(Camillus, John)
October 19, 2020 Filing 33 Motion for attorney Thomas J. Curry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10354147, filed by Intervenor Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Camillus, John)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Marc H. Edelson for Jennifer L. Miller. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #29 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/19/20.(K,C)
October 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AS OF RIGHT filed by Jennifer L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Related document(s) #31 .(Rosca, Alan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 31 First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Jennifer L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Verification, #2 Certificate of Service) (Rosca, Alan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 30 Motion for joinder of Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund in Support of Motion of the Institutional Investors to Intervene and Transfer this Action To The United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund. (Davis, Donald)
October 16, 2020 Filing 29 Motion for attorney Marc H. Edelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10348809, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosca, Alan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 28 Reply in support of #17 Motion to intervene and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Camillus)(Camillus, John)
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Defendants' Planning Report - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #16 , #13 .(Duffy, Marjorie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Filing Supplement to the Declaration of Jeffrey S. Abraham In Support of Leslie Katz's Motion for Permissive Intervention filed by Leslie Katz. Related document(s) #22 , #24 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey S. Abraham)(Markovits, W.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' Motion to excuse (Related Doc #18 ) the appearance of the 15 individual defendants and its excess insurance carrier representative at the case management conference. Judge John R. Adams on 10/15/2020.(L,J)
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 Affidavit/Declaration of Jeffrey S. Abraham In Support of Leslie Katz's Motion for Permissive Intervention filed by Leslie Katz. Related document(s) #23 , #22 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Affidavit of Blane J. Wetzel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of FirstEnergy Fourth Quarter 2016 Earnings Conference Call, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Form 12b-25 SEC Filing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Acknowledged Receipt of Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - State ex rel. Yost v. FirstEnergy Corp., et al., #7 Exhibit 7 - FirstEnergy's Response to Demand, #8 Exhibit 8 - October 8, 2020 Letter)(Markovits, W.) Modified Affidavits to be refiled with original signatures on 10/15/2020 (O,K).
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 Memorandum of Law in support of #22 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Leslie Katz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint In Intervention)(Markovits, W.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Intervenor Leslie Katz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Markovits, W.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 Motion to dismiss Complaint filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, Michael J. Dowling, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Charles E. Jones, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defts Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey J. Ritts in Support of Defts Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2020 Form 10-K, #4 Exhibit B to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2020 Form DEF 14A, #5 Exhibit C to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2018 Form DEF 14A, #6 Exhibit D to Ritts Decl: Excerpt 2019 Form DEF 14A)(Duffy, Marjorie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 Opposition to #17 Motion to intervene and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by All Defendants. (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Non-Opposition to Institutional Investors Motion To Intervene and Transfer filed by Jennifer L. Miller. (Rosca, Alan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to excuse the attendance of the fifteen individual defendants and the excess insurance carrier at the Case Management Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #16 . (Duffy, Marjorie)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to intervene and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio filed by Intervenor Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Motion to Consolidate, #6 Exhibit D - Google Map Printout, #7 Proposed Order)(Camillus, John)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order that on October 1, 2020, the Court denied the parties joint motion to continue the case management conference in this matter which was premised upon the future filing of a motion to dismiss. Upon further consideration, the Court hereby orders as follows. Any motion to dismiss filed by the Defendants shall be filed no later than October 9, 2020. Plaintiff shall oppose any such motion to dismiss by no later than October 16, 2020. The telephonic case management conference is hereby rescheduled to October 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Judge John R. Adams on 10/1/2020. (L,J)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 Marginal Entry Order denying the parties' joint Motion to continue (Related Doc #14 ) the case management conference. Judge John R. Adams on 10/1/2020.(L,J)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Motion to continue October 15, 2020 Case Management Conference filed by Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. Related document(s) #13 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Duffy, Marjorie)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christopher W.H. Sullivan,William S. Scherman,and Francis Joseph Warin for Charles E. Jones. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ),(Related Doc #12 ), (Related Doc #10 ). Judge John R. Adams on 9/25/20.(K,C)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/15/2020 at 02:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for attorney F. Joseph Warin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10280323, filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for attorney William S. Scherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10280051, filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scherman Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Christopher W.H. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10279988, filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sullivan Certificate of Good Standing)(Rendon, Carole)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by John A. Favret, III and John F. McCaffrey filed by on behalf of Michael J. Dowling. (Favret, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Douglas Shively and Jeremy Dunnaback filed by on behalf of Charles E. Jones. (Shively, Douglas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Carole S. Rendon and Daniel R. Warren filed by on behalf of Charles E. Jones. (Rendon, Carole)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Marjorie P. Duffy filed by on behalf of Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Duffy, Marjorie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Robert S. Faxon filed by on behalf of Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Faxon, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by First Energy Corporation. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts filed by on behalf of Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, First Energy Corporation, Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil III, Christopher D. Pappas, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, Leslie M. Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah. (Ritts, Geoffrey)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10166198. Filed by Jennifer L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rosca, Alan)
August 7, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
August 7, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (T,Je)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Miller
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Represented By: Eric Lechtzin
Represented By: John C. Camillus
Represented By: Paul J. Scarlato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Pappas
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Jones
Represented By: William S. Scherman
Represented By: Jeremy S. Dunnaback
Represented By: Francis Joseph Warin
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Represented By: Douglas L. Shively
Represented By: Christopher W.H. Sullivan, Jr
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Jason R. Meltzer
Represented By: Albert G. Lin
Represented By: George A. Stamboulidis
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Misheff
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. O'Neil III
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Pianalto
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Energy Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Kathleen A. Nitschke
Represented By: Karen L. Giffen
Represented By: Kerin L. Kaminski
Represented By: Maeve O'Connor
Represented By: Susan Reagan Gittes
Represented By: John Gleeson
Represented By: Ann H. MacDonald
Represented By: Barry S. Hyman
Represented By: Lawrence H. Heftman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Strah
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Demetriou
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Dowling
Represented By: John A. Favret, III
Represented By: John F. McCaffrey
Represented By: Hannah Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reffner
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: John C. Fairweather
Represented By: Paul M.G. Helms
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Represented By: David S. Rosenbloom
Represented By: Steven S. Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Anderson
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Turner
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Reyes
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Mitchell
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Gail E. Lee
Represented By: Marcella L. Lape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia L. Johnson
Represented By: Robert S. Faxon
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Pearson
Represented By: Jeremy R. Teaberry
Represented By: David L. Axelrod
Represented By: Emilia McKee Vassallo
Represented By: Timothy D. Katsiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Chack
Represented By: Douglas M. Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Hughes McNally
Represented By: Michael L. Kichline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Jon Taylor
Represented By: Marjorie P. Duffy
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: John C. Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: John C. Camillus
Represented By: Jeroen Van Kwawegen
Represented By: Alla Zayenchik
Represented By: Sara M. DiLeo
Represented By: Dianne M. Pitre
Represented By: Lester R. Hooker
Represented By: Maya Saxena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis
Represented By: John C. Camillus
Represented By: Thomas J. Curry
Represented By: Alla Zayenchik
Represented By: Sara M. DiLeo
Represented By: Tayler D. Bolton
Represented By: Dianne M. Pitre
Represented By: Lester R. Hooker
Represented By: Maya Saxena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Leslie Katz
Represented By: W. Benjamin Markovits
Represented By: Zachary C. Schaengold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Todd Augenbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Abraham
Represented By: Michael J. Klein
Represented By: Terence Coates
Represented By: W. Benjamin Markovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel S. Sommers
Represented By: Richard A. Speirs
Represented By: Steven J. Toll
Represented By: Christopher Lometti
Represented By: Amy R. Miller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Camillus
Represented By: Molly J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?