Norris v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Norris
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C.R. Bard, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01841
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven Scott Schulte for Darrell Norris. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #34 & (Related Doc #35 ). Judge John R. Adams on 9/23/20.(K,C)
September 22, 2020 Filing 37 Motion for leave for Eric Martin Przybysz to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Darrell Norris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw)(Schulte, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Filing 36 Motion for leave for Darren McDowell to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Darrell Norris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw)(Schulte, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Filing 35 Motion for attorney Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10284655, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Norris. Related document(s) #34 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven S. Schulte in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Northern District of Texas, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of Texas)(Schulte, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Filing 34 Motion for attorney Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10284655, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Norris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven S. Schulte in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Northern District of Texas, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of Texas)(Schulte, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Notice to Attorney Darren McDowell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
September 18, 2020 Notice to Attorney Eric Martin Przybysz. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
September 18, 2020 Notice to Attorney Steven Scott Schulte. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
September 17, 2020 Filing 33 Motion to dismiss party McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Heis, Jennifer)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company, Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Heis, Jennifer)
August 28, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. for C.R. Bard, Inc. filed by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Heis, Jennifer)
August 28, 2020 Filing 30 Motion by Jordan E. Jarreau to withdraw as attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heis, Jennifer)
August 28, 2020 Filing 29 Motion by Melissa Dorman Matthews to withdraw as attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heis, Jennifer)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer S. Heis filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Heis, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (K,AR)
August 19, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and McKesson Corporation are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (K,AR)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (K,AR)
August 19, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (K,AR)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern. Case number 3:20-cv-02287. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Leonard Clark's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2284-S opened); b. Plaintiff Carolyn Eddlemon's case be severed and transferred to the Lexington Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2285-S opened); c. Plaintiff Sandra Fry's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2286-S opened); d. Plaintiff Daniel Norris's case be severed and transferred to the Akron Division of the Northern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2287-S opened); e. Plaintiff Paula Orr's case be severed and transferred to the Honolulu Division of the District of Hawaii (Civil case 3:20-cv-2288-S opened); f. Plaintiff Josh Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2289-S opened); g. Plaintiff Mary Stoke's case be severed and transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2290-S opened); h. Plaintiff Kathlene Toft's case be severed and transferred to the Denver Division of the District of Colorado (Civil case 3:20-cv-2291-S opened); i. Plaintiff George Watts's case be severed and transferred to the Wilmington Division of the Eastern District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2292-S opened). Plaintiff Magdelena Macias is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 Appendix in Support filed by Leonard Clark, Carolyn Eddlemon, Sandra Fry, Magdalena Macias, Darrel Norris, Paula Orr, Josh Smith, Mary Stoke, Kathlene Toft, George Watts re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Leonard Clark, Carolyn Eddlemon, Sandra Fry, Magdalena Macias, Darrel Norris, Paula Orr, Josh Smith, Mary Stoke, Kathlene Toft, George Watts re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Leonard Clark, Carolyn Eddlemon, Sandra Fry, Magdalena Macias, Darrel Norris, Paula Orr, Josh Smith, Mary Stoke, Kathlene Toft, George Watts (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Leonard Clark, Carolyn Eddlemon, Sandra Fry, Magdalena Macias, Darrel Norris, Paula Orr, Josh Smith, Mary Stoke, Kathlene Toft, George Watts re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Leonard Clark, Carolyn Eddlemon, Sandra Fry, Magdalena Macias, Darrel Norris, Paula Orr, Josh Smith, Mary Stoke, Kathlene Toft, George Watts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Leonard Clark, Carolyn Eddlemon, Sandra Fry, Magdalena Macias, Darrel Norris, Paula Orr, Josh Smith, Mary Stoke, Kathlene Toft, George Watts (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 14 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01491-S. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (aaa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. Amendment to #6 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by C R Bard Inc. Amendment to #5 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, C. R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10899971) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Norris
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?