Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Megan Claire Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2020cv01843
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: William H Baughman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service through the U.S. Attorney executed upon Commissioner of Social Security on 8/21/2020; U.S. Attorney General on 8/24/2020 by FedEx; Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 8/25/2020 (signed c-19) by FedEx; filed on behalf of Megan Claire Wilson. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Br)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (D,Ky)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/20/20. (D,Ky)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/20/20.(D,Ky)
August 19, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 08/19/2020. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Certification that Social Security Number Sent to Defendant filed by Megan Claire Wilson. Related document(s) #1 .(Shifrin, Debra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Megan Claire Wilson. Related document(s) #1 . (Shifrin, Debra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Megan Claire Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285) (Shifrin, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Claire Wilson
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?