Skyworks, Ltd., et al v Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
Plaintiff: Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC, National Association of Homebuilders and Skyworks, Ltd.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex Azar, Nina B. Witkofsky, Robert R. Redfield, William P. Barr and Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Petitioner: Julia Raifman, Sabriya A Linton, Community Legal Aid Services, Inc., Michael Z Levy, National Association of Residential Property Managers, New Civil Liberties Alliance, American Academy of Pediatrics, Childrens Healthwatch, Danya A Keene, Peter Hepburn, Craig E Pollack, David Vlahov, Emily A Benfer, National Apartment Association, Matthew Desmond, Public Health Law Watch, Kathryn M Leifheit, American Medical Association, George Consortium, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Gabriel L Schwartz, Gregg Gonsalves, National Housing Law Project, National Medical Association, Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics and Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio
Case Number: 5:2020cv02407
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] The Court schedules a telephone status conference in this matter for Tuesday, December 22, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. to discuss: the timing and logistics for a hearing and/or argument on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, including (1) any evidentiary issues and stipulations; (2) the conduct of the hearing consistent with social distancing protocols, public access, and Amended General Order 2020-08-04; and (3) scheduling the hearing/argument based on these considerations, as well as any intervening congressional or executive action. The telephone status conference will be transcribed on the record unless the parties jointly request otherwise. Before the telephone conference, the Court requests that counsel confer regarding these issues to identify areas of agreement and disagreement to make the most efficient use of everyone's time. The Court will email dial-in information to counsel who signed Plaintiffs and Defendants briefs, who shall forward it to the appropriate attorneys who need to participate in this telephone conference. Amici will not join the call. If trial counsel for Plaintiffs or Defendants are not available at this time, they are directed to confer and advise the Court of three times when they are both available. (Y,A)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) of case reassignment to Judge J. Philip Calabrese pursuant to General Order 2020-27. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on December 7, 2020. Related document(s) #12 . (L,MI)
December 8, 2020 Filing 39 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #23 .(Vigen, Leslie)
December 7, 2020 Filing 38 Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants filed by American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Childrens Healthwatch, Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya Keene, Kathryn Leifheit, Michael Levy, Sabriya Linton, National Medical Association, Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel Schwartz, The American Academy of Pediatrics, The George Consortium, David Vlahov. Related document(s) #28 , #27 . (Currie, Matthew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 37 Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants filed by Community Legal Aid Services, Inc., National Housing Law Project. Related document(s) #12 , #23 . (Neuhauser, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 36 Declaration of Eric Dunn in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed by Community Legal Aid Services, Inc., National Housing Law Project. Related document(s) #32 . (Neuhauser, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Filing 35 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Apartment Association, National Association of Residential Property Managers, New Civil Liberties Alliance. Related document(s) #12 . (Kruckenberg, Caleb)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting New Civil Liberties Alliance's Motion for leave to file amici brief (Related Doc #20 ); denying as moot the CDC's Motion for leave to file amici brief (Related Doc #27 ); granting the CDC's Motion for leave to file a corrected amici brief (Related Doc #28 ); granting the National Housing Law Project's Motion for leave to file an amici brief (Related Doc #31 ). See order for further details regarding such briefing. Judge John R. Adams on 12/2/2020.(L,J)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney John L. Pottenger, Jr for American Medical Association,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Emily A Benfer,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Childrens Healthwatch,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Matthew Desmond,John L. Pottenger, Jr for GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Gregg Gonsalves,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Peter Hepburn,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Danya A Keene,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Kathryn M Leifheit,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Michael Z Levy,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Sabriya A Linton,John L. Pottenger, Jr for National Medical Association,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Craig E Pollack,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Public Health Law Watch,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Julia Raifman,John L. Pottenger, Jr for Gabriel L Schwartz,John L. Pottenger, Jr for The American Academy of Pediatrics,John L. Pottenger, Jr for The George Consortium,John L. Pottenger, Jr for David Vlahov. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #30 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/2/2020.(M,TL)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Emily A. Benfer for American Medical Association,Emily A. Benfer for Emily A Benfer,Emily A. Benfer for Childrens Healthwatch,Emily A. Benfer for Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio,Emily A. Benfer for Matthew Desmond,Emily A. Benfer for GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality,Emily A. Benfer for Gregg Gonsalves,Emily A. Benfer for Peter Hepburn,Emily A. Benfer for Danya A Keene,Emily A. Benfer for Kathryn M Leifheit,Emily A. Benfer for Michael Z Levy,Emily A. Benfer for Sabriya A Linton,Emily A. Benfer for National Medical Association,Emily A. Benfer for Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics,Emily A. Benfer for Craig E Pollack,Emily A. Benfer for Public Health Law Watch,Emily A. Benfer for Julia Raifman,Emily A. Benfer for Gabriel L Schwartz,Emily A. Benfer for The American Academy of Pediatrics,Emily A. Benfer for The George Consortium,Emily A. Benfer for David Vlahov. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #29 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/2/2020.(M,TL)
December 1, 2020 Filing 33 Reply in support of #12 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lance Swank, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kenneth Lawler)(Simpson, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric G. Dunn for National Housing Law Project and Community Legal Aid Services, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #32 ). Judge John R. Adams on 12/1/20.(K,C)
November 30, 2020 Filing 32 Motion for attorney Eric G. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10455712, filed by Community Legal Aid Services, Inc., National Housing Law Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Dunn in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice - document does not contain an original signature)(Neuhauser, Andrew) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (M,TL).
November 30, 2020 Filing 31 Motion for leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants filed by Community Legal Aid Services, Inc., National Housing Law Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants)(Neuhauser, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 30 Motion for attorney John L. Pottenger, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10450502, filed by American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Childrens Healthwatch, Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya Keene, Kathryn Leifheit, Michael Levy, Sabriya Linton, National Medical Association, Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel Schwartz, The American Academy of Pediatrics, The George Consortium, David Vlahov. Related document(s) #27 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Professor John L. Pottenger, Jr.)(Currie, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice OF Emily A. Benfer. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10450422, filed by American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Childrens Healthwatch, Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya Keene, Kathryn Leifheit, Michael Levy, Sabriya Linton, National Medical Association, Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel Schwartz, The American Academy of Pediatrics, The George Consortium, David Vlahov. Related document(s) #27 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Professor Emily A. Benfer)(Currie, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 28 Motion to file Corrected brief of Amici Curiae in support of Defendants filed by American Medical Association, Emily Benfer, Childrens Healthwatch, Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio, Matthew Desmond, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya Keene, Kathryn Leifheit, Michael Levy, Sabriya Linton, National Medical Association, Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Craig Pollack, Public Health Law Watch, Julia Raifman, Gabriel Schwartz, The American Academy of Pediatrics, The George Consortium, David Vlahov. Related document(s) #27 . (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae in support of Defendants) (Currie, Matthew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 27 Motion for leave to file brief of Amici Curiae in support of Defendants and for extension of page limit filed by The American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, Childrens Healthwatch, Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio, The George Consortium, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality, National Medical Association, Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, Public Health Law Watch, Emily A Benfer, Matthew Desmond, Gregg Gonsalves, Peter Hepburn, Danya A Keene, Kathryn M Leifheit, Michael Z Levy, Sabriya A Linton, Craig E Pollack, Julia Raifman, Gabriel L Schwartz, David Vlahov. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae) (Currie, Matthew)
November 23, 2020 Filing 26 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to exceed page limitations and extend the time to file their reply (Related Doc #24 ). Reply may extend to 20 pages and shall be filed no later than 12/1/2020. Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2020.(L,J)
November 23, 2020 Filing 25 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #22 ). Defendants' opposition is deemed properly filed. Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2020.(L,J)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Caleb Kruckenberg for National Apartment Association,Caleb Kruckenberg for National Association of Residential Property Managers,Caleb Kruckenberg for New Civil Liberties Alliance. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #21 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/23/2020.(M,TL)
November 20, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations and to extend time until December 1, 2020 for filing their forthcoming reply brief in support of their #12 motion for preliminary injunction filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Wake, Luke)
November 19, 2020 Filing 23 Opposition to #12 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order in Tiger Lily v. U.S. Dep't of Housing & Urban Dev., No. 20-2692 (W.D. Tenn. Nov. 6, 2020), #2 Exhibit Order in KBW Investment Props. v. Azar, No. 20-4852 (S.D. Ohio Sept. 25, 2020))(Vigen, Leslie)
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Alex Azar, William P. Barr, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vigen, Leslie)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 Motion for attorney Caleb Kruckenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10429971, filed by National Apartment Association, National Association of Residential Property Managers, New Civil Liberties Alliance. (Martinson, Cory)
November 17, 2020 Filing 20 Motion for leave to File Amicus Brief filed by New Civil Liberties Alliance, National Association of Residential Property Managers, National Apartment Association. (Martinson, Cory)
November 12, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Service by certified mail with delivery confirmation executed upon All Defendants, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Related document(s) #3 ). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of mailing for each defendant) (Marcley, Hannah)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Steven A Myers filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Myers, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Hannah S. Marcley for Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC,Hannah S. Marcley for Monarch Investment and Management Group,Hannah S. Marcley for National Association of Homebuilders,Hannah S. Marcley for Skyworks, Ltd.,Hannah S. Marcley for Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #16 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/9/2020.(M,TL)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Luke A. Wake for Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC,Luke A. Wake for Monarch Investment and Management Group,Luke A. Wake for National Association of Homebuilders,Luke A. Wake for Skyworks, Ltd.,Luke A. Wake for Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/9/2020.(M,TL)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ethan W. Blevins for Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC,Ethan W. Blevins for Monarch Investment and Management Group,Ethan W. Blevins for National Association of Homebuilders,Ethan W. Blevins for Skyworks, Ltd.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #17 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/9/2020.(M,TL)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Steven M. Simpson for Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC,Steven M. Simpson for Monarch Investment and Management Group,Steven M. Simpson for National Association of Homebuilders,Steven M. Simpson for Skyworks, Ltd.,Steven M. Simpson for Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #9 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/9/2020.(M,TL)
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 Motion for attorney Ethan W. Blevins to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Statement in Support. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10402624, filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing)(Thompson, Maurice)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Hannah S. Marcley to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Statement in Support. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number BOHNDC-10402571, filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Thompson, Maurice)
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Leslie Cooper Vigen filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Vigen, Leslie)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Alex Azar. Related Document: #13 . (T,Je)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons to Defendant Alex Azar filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Thompson, Maurice)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declarations of Neal Cusick, Richard DiBianca, Lila Wholwend, and Dean Schwanke)(Thompson, Maurice)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 Supplement to Statement of Steven M. Simpson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit updated certificate of good standing of Steven Simpson)Related document(s) #9 .(Thompson, Maurice)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #7 ). Plaintiffs' motion and Defendants' opposition may both extend to 30 pages. Absent leave of Court, any reply shall not exceed 15 pages. Judge John R. Adams on 10/29/2020.(L,J)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Steven M. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Statement of Steven M. Simpson and Certificate of Good Standing (outdated). Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10380160, filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Thompson, Maurice) Modified text on 10/29/2020 (M,TL).
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Luke Wake to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Statement of Luke A. Wake and Certificate of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10380149, filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Thompson, Maurice) Modified text on 10/29/2020 (M,TL).
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC, Monarch Investment and Management Group, National Association of Homebuilders, Skyworks, Ltd., Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave)(Thompson, Maurice)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - Document Corrupt - Attorney to refile - Amended Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Azar)(Thompson, Maurice) Modified to note filing error on 10/28/2020 (T,Je).
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - Document corrupt - Attorney to refile- Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons to Defendant Alex Azar filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons to Defendant Azar)(Thompson, Maurice) Modified to note filing error on 10/28/2020 (T,Je).
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Defendant Alex Azar filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 .(Thompson, Maurice)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon William P. Barr, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Robert R. Redfield, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Nina B. Witkofsky. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil cover sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 .(Thompson, Maurice)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10366612.. Filed by Skyworks, ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Thompson, Maurice)
October 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
October 23, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skyworks, Ltd., et al v Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina B. Witkofsky
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Redfield
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Steven A Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedarwood Village Apartments I & II Owner B, LLC
Represented By: Maurice A. Thompson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Ethan W. Blevins
Represented By: Hannah S. Marcley
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monarch Investment and Management Group
Represented By: Maurice A. Thompson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Ethan W. Blevins
Represented By: Hannah S. Marcley
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toledo Properties Owner B, LLC
Represented By: Maurice A. Thompson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Ethan W. Blevins
Represented By: Hannah S. Marcley
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Homebuilders
Represented By: Maurice A. Thompson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Ethan W. Blevins
Represented By: Hannah S. Marcley
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyworks, Ltd.
Represented By: Maurice A. Thompson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Ethan W. Blevins
Represented By: Hannah S. Marcley
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julia Raifman
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sabriya A Linton
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Legal Aid Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan W. Maxwell
Represented By: Eric G. Dunn
Represented By: Andrew D. Neuhauser
Represented By: James W. Yskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Z Levy
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Association of Residential Property Managers
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Represented By: Michael R. Rasor
Represented By: Cory J. Martinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Represented By: Michael R. Rasor
Represented By: Cory J. Martinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Childrens Healthwatch
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danya A Keene
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Hepburn
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig E Pollack
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Vlahov
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emily A Benfer
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Apartment Association
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Represented By: Michael R. Rasor
Represented By: Cory J. Martinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Desmond
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathryn M Leifheit
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Medical Association
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Consortium
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel L Schwartz
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregg Gonsalves
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Housing Law Project
Represented By: Ryan W. Maxwell
Represented By: Eric G. Dunn
Represented By: Andrew D. Neuhauser
Represented By: James W. Yskamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Medical Association
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ohio Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coalition on Homelessness and Housing in Ohio
Represented By: Emily A. Benfer
Represented By: John L. Pottenger, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew N. Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?