Gonzalez v. Gojo Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Magdiela Gonzalez and Rita Bongiovi
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02448
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.'s #57 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations regarding it's memorandum in support of it's motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 12/17/2020.(Y,A)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) of case reassignment to Judge J. Philip Calabrese pursuant to General Order 2020-27. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on December 7, 2020. (M,MT)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kelly G. Laudon for Gojo Industries, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #58 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 12/10/2020. (E,CK)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order: For the reasons set forth herein, the parties' joint motion to consolidate is GRANTED. (Doc. No. #55 .) The dates and deadlines for filing a joint amended complaint and response thereto will be established by separate order. The joint case management conference scheduled in both cases for December 21, 2020 is continued until further order of the Court. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/9/2020. (E,CK)
December 9, 2020 Filing 58 Motion for attorney Kelly G. Laudon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10482475, filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kelly Laudon)(Bell, Brett)
December 8, 2020 Filing 57 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations in support of it's motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc. (Bell, Brett)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiffs' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Spencer Sheehan for Rita Bongiovi and Magdiela Gonzalez. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #50 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 12/3/2020. (E,CK)
November 23, 2020 Filing 56 Returned Mail addressed to Attorney Spencer Sheehan. Return to Sender. Re-mailing documents to updated address of 60 Cuttermill Road Suite 409, Great Neck, NY 11021. Related document(s) #41 . (S,DM)
November 20, 2020 Filing 55 Amended Superseding Joint Motion to consolidate cases and Set a Schedule for Filing and Responsive Briefing on a Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. Related document(s) #54 , #53 . (Attachments: #1 Amended Superseding Memorandum in Support, #2 Amended Superseding Proposed Order)(Bell, Brett)
November 19, 2020 Filing 54 Memorandum in Support of Motion to consolidate cases and Set a Schedule For Filing and Responsive Briefing on the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. Related document(s) #53 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order With Corrected Dates)(Bell, Brett)
November 19, 2020 Filing 53 Joint Motion to consolidate cases and Set a Schedule For Filing and Responsive Briefing on the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bell, Brett)
November 19, 2020 Filing 52 Declaration of Spencer Sheehan In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #50 . (Coates, Terence)
November 13, 2020 Filing 51 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 12/21/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 11/30/2020. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 12/7/2020. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (E,CK)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time until December 11, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' #27 amended complaint. (Doc. No. #46 ) Judge Sara Lioi on 11/13/2020. (E,CK)
November 12, 2020 Filing 50 Motion for attorney Spencer Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10416306, filed by Rita Bongiovi, Magdiela Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Sheehan (Document does not contain an original signature.))(Coates, Terence) Modified text on 11/13/2020 (M,TL).
November 12, 2020 Filing 49 Attorney Appearance by Terence Coates filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Coates, Terence)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Sara Lioi for all further proceedings. (Doc. #47 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/12/20. (K,C)
November 12, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, Judge John R. Adams terminated. (M,TL)
November 11, 2020 Filing 47 Joint Notice of Related Case and Request for Reassignment filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Bell, Brett)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Sharyl A. Reisman for Gojo Industries, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #45 ). Judge John R. Adams on 11/9/20.(K,C)
November 7, 2020 Filing 46 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 11, 2020 to answer First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Bell, Brett)
November 2, 2020 Filing 45 Motion for attorney Sharyl A. Reisman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10389464, filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sharyl A. Reisman in Support)(Pike, Bryon)
November 2, 2020 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Bryon A. Pike filed by on behalf of Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Pike, Bryon)
November 2, 2020 Notice to Attorney Spencer Sheehan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
November 2, 2020 Notice to Attorney Christopher Patalano. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
November 2, 2020 FILING ERROR Notice to Attorney Michael Mahar Klotz. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K) Modified to note error, substitution of attorney filed on 11/2/2020 (O,K).
November 2, 2020 Notice to Attorney Sharyl A. Reisman. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
November 2, 2020 Notice to Attorney Michael R. Reese. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
November 2, 2020 Notice to Attorney George V. Granade, II. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 30, 2020 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Bell, Brett)
October 30, 2020 Filing 42 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Michael M. Klotz and adding attorney Brett W. Bell filed by on behalf of Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Bell, Brett)
October 30, 2020 Filing 41 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
October 30, 2020 Copy of #41 Magistrate Consent Form Issued and public docket sheet mailed to Attorneys Christopher Patalano, Spencer Sheehan and Michael Mahar Klotz on 10/30/2020. Related document(s) #41 . (M,L)
October 30, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Gojo Industries, Inc. is reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (M,L)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/29/20. (S,HR)
October 29, 2020 Filing 39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern. Case number 1:20-cv-00888. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 29, 2020 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Related document(s) #40 . (M,L) Modified text on 10/29/2020 (M,L).
October 29, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,L)
October 29, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,L)
October 21, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Ohio.(yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. filed by Gojo Industries, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 29, to transfer this case to the Northern District of Ohio, and to close the case in this District. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/21/20) (yv) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. . Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. . Document filed by Rita Bongiovi, Magdiela Gonzalez..(Patalano, Christopher) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Patalano on behalf of Rita Bongiovi, Magdiela Gonzalez..(Patalano, Christopher) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER ESTABLISHING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND SETTING A DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. Plaintiffs' opposition papers to the Second Motion to Transfer Venue will be submitted by August 14, 2020; 2. Defendant's reply papers in support of the Second Motion to Transfer Venue will be submitted by September 14, 2020; 3. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint will be extended until three weeks after a decision from the Court on the Second Motion to Transfer Venue; 4. Nothing in this stipulation and [proposed] order waives any right that either party has under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Given the generous briefing schedule, the parties should not expect any further extensions. The original motion to transfer is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 23. SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. :( Responses due by 8/14/2020, Replies due by 9/14/2020.), Motions terminated: #23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. filed by Gojo Industries, Inc. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/20/20) (yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Volney Granade on behalf of Rita Bongiovi, Magdiela Gonzalez..(Granade, George) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sharyl A. Reisman dated July 17, 2020 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Forth Briefing Schedule).(Reisman, Sharyl) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of David Macinga in Support re: #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio.. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. . Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, By July 17, 2020, Defendant shall: (1) file a new motion to transfer venue; (2) file a letter on ECF stating that it relies on the previously filed motion to transfer; or (3) withdraw the pending motion to transfer, in which case it shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint within three weeks of the date on which the motion to transfer is withdrawn. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 7/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/7/20) (yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Robert Reese. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rita Bongiovi. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Gojo Industries, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Magdiela Gonzalez, Rita Bongiovi. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Reese, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER with respect to #23 Motion to Transfer Case. On June 18, 2020, the Court extended Defendant's deadline to answer or respond to the Complaint to July 23, 2020. ECF No. 22. On June 22, 2020, Defendant filed a motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of Ohio. ECF No. 23. Upon reflection, the Court will address the motion to transfer before Defendant answers or moves to dismiss. Accordingly, Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to three weeks after the Court resolves the pending motion to transfer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/26/2020) (kv) Modified on 7/2/2020 (kv). [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of David Macinga in Support re: #23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio.. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. . Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file its answer or motion to dismiss by July 23, 2020; any opposition shall be filed by August 21, 2020; any reply shall be filed September 11, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED.( Motions due by 7/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/17/20) (yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gojo Industries, Inc. answer due 7/23/2020. Responses due by 8/21/2020. Replies due by 9/11/2020. (yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sharyl A. Reisman dated June 16, 2020. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Reisman, Sharyl) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Michael Oliss on behalf of Gojo Industries, Inc...(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Philip M. Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Philip M. Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Oliss in support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Ohio, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Oliss, Philip) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Philip M. Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Motion. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly G Laudon on behalf of Gojo Industries, Inc...(Laudon, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Philip M. Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19746426. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Oliss in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Ohio, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Oliss, Philip) Modified on 5/7/2020 (ad). [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Kelly G. Laudon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #16 MOTION for Philip M. Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19746426. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The certificate was not issued by the Clerk of Supreme Court Supreme Court Building 200 E. Capitol Springfield, IL 62701 217-782-2035;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Kelly G. Laudon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19729693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly G. Laudon in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Minnesota, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Laudon, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S ANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. The initial pretrial conference scheduled by the Court for May 14, 2020, is hereby adjourned to be reset for a date, at the Court's convenience, following the conclusion of briefing on Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. 2. The deadline to submit a Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order is hereby adjourned to be reset by the Court. 3. Defendant will file its motion to dismiss by June 23, 2020. Except as provided below, Plaintiff will file her opposition to any such motion to dismiss no later than July 23, 2020; and Defendant will file its reply to Plaintiff's opposition no later than August 12, 2020. 4. In the event that Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss, she shall provide Defendant with notice of same prior to June 9, 2020, and the parties shall meet and confer in good faith with regard to a new schedule in this action, with each side preserving all rights to apply to this Court or any other Court of competent jurisdiction for appropriate relief. 5. Nothing in this stipulation and order waives any right that either party has under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 10. So Ordered. ( Motions due by 6/23/2020., Responses due by 7/23/2020, Replies due by 8/12/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/6/20) (yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Kelly G. Laudon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19729693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc...(Klotz, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Mahar Klotz on behalf of Gojo Industries, Inc...(Klotz, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sharyl A. Reisman dated May 5, 2020. Document filed by Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulation).(Reisman, Sharyl) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharyl Anne Reisman on behalf of Gojo Industries, Inc...(Reisman, Sharyl) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will not hold the upcoming conference in this case in person. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter by the Thursday prior to the conference, as directed in the Court's earlier Scheduling Order. In their joint letter, the parties should also indicate whether they can do without a conference altogether. If so, the Court may enter a case management plan and scheduling order and the parties need not appear. If not, the Court will hold the initial conference by telephone, albeit perhaps at a different time. To that end, counsel should indicate in their joint letter dates and times during the week of the conference that they would be available for a telephone conference. In either case, counsel should review and comply with the Courts Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/4/2020) (ks) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gojo Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. Document filed by Magdiela Gonzalez..(Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert Reese on behalf of Magdiela Gonzalez..(Reese, Michael) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 14, 2020, at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/4/20) (yv) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gojo Industries, Inc...(dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gojo Industries, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Magdiela Gonzalez..(Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18658018)Document filed by Magdiela Gonzalez..(Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from nysd on 10/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Gojo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M. Oliss
Represented By: Sharyl A. Reisman
Represented By: Michael Mahar Klotz
Represented By: Kelly G. Laudon
Represented By: Brett W. Bell
Represented By: Bryon A. Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdiela Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael R. Reese
Represented By: George V. Granade, II
Represented By: Christopher Patalano
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: Terence Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bongiovi
Represented By: Michael R. Reese
Represented By: George V. Granade, II
Represented By: Christopher Patalano
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: Terence Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?