Thomas v. May
Petitioner: Randy A. Thomas
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Case Number: 5:2020cv02628
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
2 Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 22, 2021 to answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Harold May. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) of case reassignment to Judge J. Philip Calabrese pursuant to General Order 2020-27. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on December 7, 2020. (M,MT)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Hilda Rosenberg filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Rosenberg, Hilda)
November 24, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/24/2020. (Y,A)
November 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
November 24, 2020 Copy of #6 Order of Recusal mailed to Harold May Warden, Toledo Correctional Inst., 2001 East Central Avenue, Toledo, OH 43608 on 11/24/2020. (D,JJ)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another magistrate judge. This order renders the Motion to disqualify (ECF Doc. #5 ) moot. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/24/2020. (D,JJ)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Reassign the Case to a Different Magistrate or to Recuse Magistrate Judge Parker filed by Petitioner Randy A. Thomas. (Parker, John)
November 24, 2020 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) mailed to Ohio Attorney General, 30 E. Broad St., 14th Floor, Columbus, OH 43215; and copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), and #4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order, mailed to Harold May, Warden, Toledo Correctional Inst., 2001 East Central Avenue, Toledo, OH 43608 on 11/24/2020. (D,JJ)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Respondent shall file an Answer (Return of Writ) to the petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order; Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of Respondent's Return of Writ to file a Reply (Traverse); Respondent shall have fifteen (15) days from the filing of Petitioner's Traverse to respond thereto. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/24/2020. (D,JJ)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order that this matter is referred for a report and recommendation decision to United States Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker, which referral shall include the issuance by the Magistrate Judge for any order requiring the respondent to answer, service of the petition or any appropriate order directed to the matter pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure governing Habeas Corpus cases. LR 71.1(f). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/24/2020. (R,Sh)
November 24, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/24/2020. (R,Sh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,L)
November 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,L)
November 23, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (M,L)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid $ 5, receipt number AOHNDC-10443238.. Filed by Randy A Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Represented By: Hilda Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy A. Thomas
Represented By: John P. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?