U.S. Small Business Administration v. Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.
Petitioner: U.S. Small Business Administration
Respondent: Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02711
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 Reply in support of #5 Motion to Complete the Administrative RecordsMotion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.. (Heimberger, Steven)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Opposition to #5 Motion to Complete the Administrative RecordsMotion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Sacks, Marcus)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.. (Heimberger, Steven)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order adopting the parties' proposed briefing schedule #6 . Judge John R. Adams on 12/21/2020. (L,J)
December 18, 2020 Notice by Clerk that Weather King Heating & Air, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (O,K)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Notice of Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. Related document(s) #4 .(Sacks, Marcus)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Complete the Administrative Records or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery, filed by Respondent Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Mazzola)(Heimberger, Steven).
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Consolidation that this Case No. 5:20CV2711, the underlying adversary action, shall be the LEAD case. All future filings shall occur solely in 5:20CV2711. Case No. 5:20CV1241 is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Judge John R. Adams on 12/13/20. (K,C)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Marginal Entry Order granting Movant's #1 Motion for withdrawal of reference (Bankruptcy). The reference to the bankruptcy court regarding Adversary Proceeding No. 20-5023 is hereby withdrawn. Judge John R. Adams on 12/4/2020.(M,TL)
December 4, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
December 4, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Weather King Heating & Air, Inc. Related document(s) #1 .(M,TL)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 Motion for withdrawal of reference (Bankruptcy) filed by Movant U.S. Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 USDC Docket Sheet - 5:20mc62)(M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Small Business Administration v. Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Weather King Heating & Air, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Heimberger
Represented By: Todd A. Mazzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Small Business Administration
Represented By: Suzana Krstevski Koch
Represented By: Ruth A. Harvey
Represented By: Marcus S. Sacks
Represented By: Margaret M. Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?