State of Ohio et al v. Beasley et al
Plaintiff: State of Ohio, John D. Ferrero and Board of Health of the Stark County Combined General Health District
Defendant: Colleen Beasley and Joe Beasley
Case Number: 5:2021cv00102
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 Acknowledgment of receipt of order of remand by Start County Court of Common Pleas on 02/12/21. Related document(s) #9 . (M,TL)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 Marginal Entry Order denying Defendants' #10 motion to set aside or vacate Order remanding to state court. Attorney Lynch entered his appearance for defendants on 1/22/2021. Thereafter, electronic notice was permitted and appropriate. Judge John R. Adams on 02/12/2021.(M,TL)
February 12, 2021 Copy of #13 Order on Motion to vacate mailed to Joe & Colleen Beasley, 13367 Cleveland Avenue, N.W., Uniontown, OH 44685 on 02/12/2021. (M,TL)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 Reply and Affidavit to Plaintiffs' #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Joe Beasley. (M,TL)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Stark County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed.Related document(s) #9 . (M,TL)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to set aside or vacate Order remanding to state court filed by Joe Beasley, Colleen Beasley. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 Contact Information)(M,TL)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Plaintiff' motion to remand (Doc. #4 ). This matter is remanded to the Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Judge John R. Adams on 2/4/21. (K,C)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 Reply to response to #4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Lynch, Robert)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Colleen Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (S,He)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Joe Beasley. (See Remark by Clerk dated 1/14/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (S,He). Modified on 2/1/2021 to add envelope as attachment (S,He).
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Joe Beasley. (Second page not completed.) Related document #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (S,He)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Board of Health of the Stark County Combined General Health District, John D. Ferrero, State of Ohio. (Dawson, Deborah)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Robert T. Lynch filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Lynch, Robert)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Joe Beasley. Related document(s) #1 . (T,Je)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020CV1621 Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Colleen Beasley, Joe Beasley. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (T,Je)
January 14, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
January 14, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (T,Je)
January 14, 2021 Copy of #1 Notice of Removal, and docket sheet mailed to Joe and Colleen Beasley at 13367 Cleveland Avenue N.W, Uniontown, OH 44685 on 1/14/2021. Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a complete Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Additionally, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis was filed using an outdated form. Please complete the #AO 239 form dated April 2013 which can be found on the court's website on the #Forms page and electronically file within five days from the date of this notice. A courtesy copy of said forms are included in mailing. Related document(s) #1 #2 . (T,Je)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Ohio et al v. Beasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Deborah A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Ferrero
Represented By: Deborah A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Health of the Stark County Combined General Health District
Represented By: Deborah A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Beasley
Represented By: Robert T. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Beasley
Represented By: Robert T. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?