Poulos v. Cure Medical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: George Poulos
Defendant: Timothy Palmer, Cure Medical, LLC, Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky, Loren McFarland, Sunnie Kenowsky, Robert Yant and John Anderson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00149
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Rule41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Parties to bear its own costs. Related Document #14 . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/12/2021. (D,TM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by John Anderson, Cure Medical, LLC, Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky, Sunnie Kenowsky, Loren McFarland, Timothy Palmer, Robert Yant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Order dated March 4, 2021))(Fodeman, Morris)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 4/5/2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky on 1/30/2021 (sign C19TF), filed on behalf of George Poulos. (T,Je)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #10 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Morris J. Fodeman for all Defendants. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/19/2021. (JLG)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting in part Defendants' #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, allowing a 30-day extension, not the 6 weeks requested. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/19/2021. (JLG)
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Morris J. Fodeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10656107, filed by John Anderson, Cure Medical, LLC, Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky, Sunnie Kenowsky, Loren McFarland, Timothy Palmer, Robert Yant. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morris Fodeman ISO Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Ridings, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John Anderson, Cure Medical, LLC, Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky, Sunnie Kenowsky, Loren McFarland, Timothy Palmer, Robert Yant. (Ridings, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Stipulation and Motion for Extension of time until 4/2/2021 to Answer filed by John Anderson, Cure Medical, LLC, Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky, Sunnie Kenowsky, Loren McFarland, Timothy Palmer, Robert Yant. (Ridings, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Robert Yant on 1/29/2021, filed on behalf of George Poulos. (T,Je)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Cure Medical, LLC on 1/29/2021; Sunnie Kenowsky on 1/29/2021; Loren McFarland on 1/29/2021; Timothy Palmer on 1/29/2021, filed on behalf of George Poulos. Related document(s) #3 . (T,Je)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon John Anderson on 1/29/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of John Anderson Related document(s) #3 . (T,Je)
January 22, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Cure Medical, LLC (Receipt # 7019 0160 0000 7611 0083), Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky (#0090), John Anderson (#0106), Sunnie Kenowsky (#0113), Loren McFarland (#0120), Timothy Palmer(#0137), Robert Yant(#0144) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (T,Je)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge John R. Adams on 1/21/21. (K,C)
January 21, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, Judge John R. Adams terminated. (M,TL)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon John Anderson, Cure Medical, LLC, Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky, Sunnie Kenowsky, Loren McFarland, Timothy Palmer, Robert Yant. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons for Cure Medical, LLC to #1 Complaint filed by George Poulos. (Ward, Barry)
January 20, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
January 20, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10580081, filed by George Poulos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Letters of Guardianship, #4 Exhibit Statement of Expert Evaluation, #5 Exhibit Fee Agreement to Hire Counsel, #6 Exhibit Fee Agreement to Hire Counsel, #7 Exhibit Cure Medical, LLC, Articles of Organization, #8 Exhibit April 1, 2008, Equity/Option Contract, #9 Exhibit 04/18/2019, Letter from Counsel Re: Ownership Interest, #10 Exhibit Email 08/06/2008; Confirmation of Ownership Interest, #11 Exhibit Email 08/27/2008; Acknowledgement of Ownership Interest, #12 Exhibit Email 01/28/2009; Acknowledgement of Ownership Interest, #13 Exhibit Email 02/11/2009; Ownership Interest Purchase Negotiations, #14 Exhibit Email 02/26/2009; Acknowledgement of 8.8% Ownership Interest, #15 Exhibit Email 02/27/2009; Further Confirmation of Ownership Interest, #16 Exhibit Email 03/23/2009; Termination of Consulting Agreement, #17 Exhibit Email 04/06/2009; No Equitable Interest in Cure Medical, LLC, #18 Exhibit Email 04/16/2010; We are willing to look at this in six (6) months) (Ward, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulos v. Cure Medical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Palmer
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cure Medical, LLC
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Elizabeth Kenowsky
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren McFarland
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnie Kenowsky
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Yant
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anderson
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Matthew D. Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Poulos
Represented By: Barry M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?