dlhBOWLES, Inc. v. Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: dlhBOWLES, Inc.
Defendant: Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00170
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Lidia C. Mowad filed by on behalf of dlhBOWLES, Inc.. (Mowad, Lidia)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's #8 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/31/2021 to answer #1 Complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/12/2021. (E,CK)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 3/31/2021 to answer Complaint filed by Plaintiff dlhBOWLES, Inc.. (Masterson, Mark)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service upon Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd., filed on behalf of dlhBOWLES, Inc. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Accepted Service)(Masterson, Mark) Modified text on 2/18/2021 (M,TL).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - INCORRECT SUMMONS UPLOADED - REFILED AS #7 - Return of Service upon Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd. on 2/8/2021, filed on behalf of dlhBOWLES, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Accepted Service)(Masterson, Mark) Modified to note filing error on 2/18/2021 (M,TL).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Form AO120 Notice of Patent Report Form filed by dlhBOWLES, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Service Receipt by USPTO Director)(Masterson, Mark)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 2/5/2021. (W,Na)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (L,MI)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by dlhBOWLES, Inc.. (Masterson, Mark)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10586595.. Filed by dlhBOWLES, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (US Patent 8,662,421), #2 Exhibit B (claim chart), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Cupar, David)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (L,MI)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (L,MI)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: dlhBOWLES, Inc. v. Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Riying Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: dlhBOWLES, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Cupar
Represented By: Matthew J. Cavanagh
Represented By: Mark J. Masterson
Represented By: Lidia C. Mowad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?