Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Carol Smith
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2021cv00457
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of Case Dismissal without prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/8/2021. (S,AL)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Carol Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Russell)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Basil E. Adham and adding attorney Russell W. Lewis, IV filed by Carol Smith. (document does not contain original signature) (O,K)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Pending Admission to the Bar of this Court filed by Carol Smith. (document does not contain original signature)(O,K)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Basil E. Adham and adding attorney Russell W. Lewis, IV filed by on behalf of Carol Smith. (Lewis, Russell)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Russell W. Lewis, IV filed by on behalf of Carol Smith. (Lewis, Russell)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting attorney Richard North, Jr's motion to withdraw as attorney for the defendants. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/12/2021.(S,AL)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 Motion by Richard B. North, Jr. to withdraw as attorney filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heis, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Heis, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. for C R Bard Incorporated filed by C R Bard Incorporated. (Heis, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer S. Heis filed by on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Heis, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Notice to Attorney Richard B. North, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 8, 2021 Notice to Attorney Basil E. Adham. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:19-cv-00904. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 1, 2021 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case pursuant to General Order 2019-17-1. (W,CM)
March 1, 2021 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (W,CM)
March 1, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was transferred from the District of Arizona. All documents were docketed on Arizona's MDL master docket. See # Arizona docket 2:15md2641 for documents. Your PACER login will be required to access the docket/documents. (W,CM)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2021: #1 Certified Docket) (W,CM).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21002 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00904-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16523131 filed by Carol Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Heis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Smith
Represented By: Basil E. Adham
Represented By: Clint Reed
Represented By: Russell W. Lewis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?