Williamson v. Fatheree et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Williamson
Defendant: Det. Jerome Patrick McMillan, City of Akron, Det. Jason Kline, Sheriff Kandy Fatheree, Fmr. Sheriff Steve Barry, Lt. Gerald E. Forney, Ins. Chris Rhoades, Sr. and Officer Jason Kline
Case Number: 5:2021cv00565
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by City of Akron, Gerald E. Forney, Jerome Patrick McMillan. (Defibaugh, Michael)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand of Defendants Jason Kline, Steve Barry and Chris Rhoades, Sr. filed by Steve Barry, Jason Kline, Chris Rhoades, Sr. (Climer, James)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 6/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Brian D. Bremer filed by on behalf of City of Akron, Gerald E. Forney, Jerome Patrick McMillan. (Bremer, Brian)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Defendant Fatheree's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kandy Fatheree answer due 5/12/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 4/8/2021.(L,J)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 12, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Kandy Fatheree. (Bernard, Aretta)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Aretta K. Bernard and Stephanie Olivera Mittica filed by on behalf of Kandy Fatheree. (Bernard, Aretta)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting #6 Defendants City of Akron, Forney, and McMillan's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 5/4/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 4/7/2021.(L,J)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until May 4, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant City of Akron. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Defibaugh)(Defibaugh, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Marginal Entry Order granting #4 Defendant Barry, Kline, and Rhodes' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 5/3/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 4/6/2021.(L,J)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until May 3, 2021 to answer Complaint filed by Steve Barry, Jason Kline, Chris Rhoades, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John D. Pinzone)(Pinzone, John)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Steve Barry on 3/22/2021 (marked Covid19); City of Akron on 3/22/2021; Kandy Fatheree on 3/22/2021 (marked Covid19); Gerald E. Forney on 3/22/2021; Jason Kline on 3/22/2021 (marked Covid19); Jerome Patrick McMillan on 3/22/2021; Chris Rhoades, Sr on 3/22/2021 (marked Covid19), no delivery date on some green cards, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Related document #2 ). (O,K)
March 19, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons, magistrate consent form and complaint addressed to Steve Barry Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2705; City of Akron Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2651; Kandy Fatheree Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2668; Gerald E. Forney Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2682; Jason Kline Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2699; Jerome Patrick McMillan Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2675; Chris Rhoades, Sr. Receipt # 7014 1820 0002 3723 2712 all placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (O,K)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (O,K)
March 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (O,K)
March 10, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (O,K)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10711836.. Filed by Antonio Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Defendant Sheriff Kandy Fatheree, in her official capacity as Summit County Sheriff, #3 Summons to Defendant City of Akron, #4 Summons to Defendant Det. Jerome Patrick McMillan, #5 Summons to Defendant Lt. Gerald E. Forney, #6 Summons to Defendant Det. Jason Kline, #7 Summons to Defendant Fmr. Sheriff Steve Barry, #8 Summons to Defendant Ins. Chris Rhoades, Sr.) (DiCello, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Fatheree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Jerome Patrick McMillan
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Represented By: Brian D. Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Akron
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Represented By: Brian D. Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Jason Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Kandy Fatheree
Represented By: Stephanie Y. Olivera Mittica
Represented By: Aretta K. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fmr. Sheriff Steve Barry
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gerald E. Forney
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Represented By: John C. Reece
Represented By: Brian D. Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ins. Chris Rhoades, Sr.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jason Kline
Represented By: Kathleen M. Minahan
Represented By: James A. Climer
Represented By: John D. Pinzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Williamson
Represented By: Ian N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tor
Represented By: Nicholas A. DiCello
Represented By: Brad S. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?