Hupp v. CSX Transportation Inc.
Plaintiff: Rodney Hupp
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00968
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held telephonically on 8/3/2021 at 01:30 PM. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Standard). (P,K)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued by Courtroom Deputy. (P,K)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CSX Transportation Inc.. (Norman, Forrest)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation Inc. filed by CSX Transportation Inc. (Norman, Forrest)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for attorney P. Matthew Darby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10855554, filed by Plaintiff Rodney Hupp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of P. Matthew Darby, Esq., #3 Proposed Order )(Thompson, Andrew)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney P. Matthew Darby for Rodney Hupp. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ) Judge Pamela A. Barker on 5/27/2021.(P,K)
May 23, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rodney Hupp. CSX Transportation Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2021, answer due 7/9/2021 filed on behalf of Rodney Hupp (Thompson, Andrew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon CSX Transportation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
May 11, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 11, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,TL)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against CSX Transportation Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10825310.. Filed by Rodney Hupp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Thompson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hupp v. CSX Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Forrest A. Norman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Hupp
Represented By: Andrew J. Thompson
Represented By: P. Matthew Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?