TR Construction, Inc. v. Summit County, Ohio
Plaintiff: TR Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Summit County, Ohio
Case Number: 5:2021cv01109
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) with memorandum in support and exhibits filed by Defendant Summit County, Ohio. (Hartsough, Raymond)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Raymond J. Hartsough as co-counsel filed by on behalf of Summit County, Ohio. (Hartsough, Raymond)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until July 23, 2021 to answer filed by Defendant Summit County, Ohio. (Evans, Marvin)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Marvin D. Evans filed by on behalf of Summit County, Ohio. (Evans, Marvin)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Summit County, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by TR Construction, Inc. (Mendenhall, Warner)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mendenhall, Warner)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against all Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10861418, filed by TR Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Resolution, #2 Exhibit 2, Foreclosure Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3, Foreclosure Entry, #4 Exhibit 4, Order to Transfer, #5 Exhibit 5, Land Bank Deed, #6 Exhibit 6, Appraisal Emig, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Mendenhall, Warner)
June 1, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
June 1, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TR Construction, Inc. v. Summit County, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TR Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Represented By: Brian C. Unger
Represented By: John T. Pfleiderer
Represented By: Thomas W. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit County, Ohio
Represented By: Marvin D. Evans
Represented By: Raymond J. Hartsough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?