Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company v. R-Tek Insulation Inc
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: R-Tek Insulation Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv02186
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to R-Tek Insulation Inc placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7018 0680 0001 3336 7450. (O,K)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon R-Tek Insulation Inc. (O,K)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons)(May, Douglas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (May, Douglas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against R-Tek Insulation Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11137839.. Filed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (May, Douglas)
November 17, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
November 17, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company v. R-Tek Insulation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas J. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R-Tek Insulation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?