Rover Pipeline LLC v. Williams Companies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rover Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Williams Companies Inc., Utica East Ohio Midstream LLC and Cardinal Gas Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00913
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Amanda M Knapp
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717 Natural Gas Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. The parties report that they continue to work with one another to finalize the remaining terms and conditions of their agreement. All proceedings in this matter, including but not limited to any answer deadline and any rulings on the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Stay Proceedings, are hereby stayed for 30 days to allow the parties time to memorialize their agreement and formally dismiss the matter with prejudice. If the parties have not filed a Motion for Dismissal within 30 days, they shall submit a joint status report to Knapp_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. August 24, 2022. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 7/26/2022. (S,S)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The parties report that they have reached a settlement in principle. All proceedings in this matter, including but not limited to any answer deadline and any rulings on the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Stay Proceedings, are hereby stayed for 30 days to allow the parties time to memorialize their agreement and formally dismiss the matter with prejudice. If the parties have not filed a Motion for Dismissal within 30 days, they shall submit a joint status report to Knapp_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. July 25, 2022. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/24/2022. (S,S)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The parties have advised that settlement negotiations are ongoing and request leave to submit a joint status report by June 24, 2022. The parties shall submit a joint status report to Knapp_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. June 24, 2022. At the parties' request, the Court will delay any ruling on the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Stay Proceedings in advance of that joint status report. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/24/2022. (Related documents #5 , #6 ) (S,S)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The parties have advised that settlement negotiations are ongoing and request leave to submit a joint status report by June 23, 2022. The parties shall submit a joint status report to Knapp_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. June 23, 2022. At the parties' request, the Court will delay any ruling on the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Stay Proceedings in advance of that joint status report. Further, at the joint request of the parties, the Defendants are granted an extension of time until June 27, 2022 to file their Answer should the parties be unable to report a settlement in the June 23, 2022 status report. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/23/2022. (Related documents #5 , #6 ) (S,S)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. The parties have advised that settlement negotiations are ongoing and request leave to submit a joint status report by June 22, 2022. The parties shall submit a joint status report to Knapp_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. June 22, 2022. At the parties' request, the Court will delay any ruling on the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Stay Proceedings in advance of that joint status report. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/17/2022. (Related documents #5 , #6 ) (S,S)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 Joint Motion to vacate telephone status conference and to submit joint status report on June 16, 2022 filed by Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Utica East Ohio Midstream LLC, Williams Companies Inc.. Related document(s) #12 . (Fusonie, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #13 Joint Motion to vacate telephone status conference and to submit joint status report on June 16, 2022. The Court will delay any ruling on the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Stay Proceedings in advance of the joint report to be emailed by 5:00 p.m. on June 16, 2022. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/10/2022. (S,S)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 6/8/2022. The parties discussed the status of the case and next steps, including the potential for a temporary agreement pending further action in the matter. The parties shall meet, confer, and email a Joint Status Report to Knapp_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov no later than noon on Thursday, June 9, 2022, advising the Court as to the status of discussions regarding a temporary agreement. A telephonic status conference will be held on Friday, June 10, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall use the call-in information previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/8/2022. (Time: 1 hr., 20 min.) (S,S)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Opposition to #6 Motion to stay proceedings Rover Pipeline Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Carroll County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - FERC Alignment Sheets, #3 Exhibit C - Exclusive Pipeline Easement, #4 Exhibit D - Exclusive Pipeline Easement, #5 Exhibit E - Exclusive Pipeline Easement, #6 Exhibit F - Exclusive Pipeline Easement, #7 Exhibit G - Exclusive Pipeline Easement)(Brunton, Gregory)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 Opposition to #5 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority for Necessary Property Rights and Awarding Immediate Possession and TRO filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 5/20/2022 Findings of Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 Encroachment Agreement)(Fusonie, Thomas) Modified text on 6/23/2022 (O,K).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order. A telephone conference with counsel regarding #5 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and #6 Motion to Stay Proceedings is set for June 8, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Call in information will be emailed to counsel. Defendants shall file a response to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by June 7, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. With respect to the Motion to Stay Proceedings, Plaintiff shall file a response by June 7, 2022 at 5:00 p.m., which shall specifically address whether this Court has jurisdiction to grant relief at this time in light of the concurrent state court litigation. Neither brief shall exceed 10 pages, double-spaced. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 6/6/2022. (S,S) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 6/6/2022 (S,S).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order: This matter is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Knapp, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (b)(1)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a), and LR 72.1 to address the motions filed at Doc. Nos. #5 and #6 (and any motions that may be filed related thereto), including conducting a hearing, issuing a report and recommendation and/or disposition, and taking any other action as appropriate to address the motions referred herein. This order supersedes Doc. No. #7 . Judge Sara Lioi on 6/6/2022. (E,CK)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order referring the following motions to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority for Necessary Property Rights and Awarding Immediate Possession filed by Rover Pipeline LLC (Doc. No. #5 ) and Motion to stay proceedings filed by Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Williams Companies Inc., and Utica East Ohio Midstream LLC (Doc. No. #6 ) referred to Magistrate Judge Knapp. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/6/2022. (E,CK)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to stay proceedings filed by Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Utica East Ohio Midstream LLC, Williams Companies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 5/20/2022 Findings of Facts, #3 Exhibit 2 Encroachment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Exhibit 4 Motion to Stay)(Fusonie, Thomas) Modified text on 6/23/2022 (O,K).
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 Motion for Order Confirming Condemnation Authority for Necessary Property Rights and Awarding Immediate Possession filed by Plaintiff Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark Vedral, #2 Supplement Marshal Form - Williams, #3 Supplement Marshal Form - Utica, #4 Supplement Marshal Form - Cardinal Gas)(Brunton, Gregory)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Brunton, Gregory)
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Commencement of Condemnation Action filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rover Pipeline CS1 Plat Signed)(Brunton, Gregory)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 Verified Complaint for Condemnation against Cardinal Gas Services, LLC, Utica East Ohio Midstream LLC, Williams Companies Inc. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number BOHNDC-11448053.. Filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Signed Verification of Mark Vedral, #2 Exhibit A - 2013 Utica Easement, #3 Exhibit B - FERC Certificate, #4 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Brunton, Gregory)
June 1, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (M,TL)
June 1, 2022 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rover Pipeline LLC v. Williams Companies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rover Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Moore
Represented By: Daniel J. Hyzak
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Companies Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. LaRocco
Represented By: Mitchell A. Tobias
Represented By: Thomas H. Fusonie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica East Ohio Midstream LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. LaRocco
Represented By: Mitchell A. Tobias
Represented By: Thomas H. Fusonie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Gas Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. LaRocco
Represented By: Mitchell A. Tobias
Represented By: Thomas H. Fusonie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?