Grandis et al v. Exactech, US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laura Grandis and Gregg Grandis
Defendant: Exactech US Inc., Dr. Ian Gradisar, Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC, Crystal Clinic Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. and Crystal Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv00274
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:23-cv-04310, filed 06/12/2023. (S,HR)
June 12, 2023 Filing 39 Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 3044 Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the Eastern District New York and assigned to the Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis. (P,R)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff Laura Grandis' #36 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/7/2023 to File Affidavit of Merit. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/2/2023. (JLG)
May 31, 2023 Filing 38 Notice of Filing Affidavit of Merit filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
May 1, 2023 Filing 37 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Exactech, US, Inc. (Edwards, Ryan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 36 Motion for Extension of Time until June 7, 2023 to File Affidavit of Merit, filed by Plaintiff Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
April 24, 2023 Filing 35 Reply in support of #14 Amended Motion to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, Oral Argument Requested filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
April 24, 2023 Filing 34 Reply in support of #16 Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas).
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order For the reasons set forth herein and for good cause shown, Defendant Exactech's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond (ECF No. #29 ) is granted. On or before 5/1/2023, Exactech shall answer, plead, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -2). ECF Nos. #21 and #24 are denied as moot. Further, for good cause shown, Defendant Exactech's Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery until 4/3/2023 (ECF No. #25 ) is granted without opposition. Exactech's memorandum in opposition (ECF No. #27 ) was filed on 4/3/2023. The Court hereby approves and adopts the Stipulation of the Parties Granting Plaintiffs an Extension to File Replies in Support (ECF No. #28 ). On or before 4/24/2023, Plaintiffs shall serve and file reply memoranda in support of their Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery (ECF No. #16 ) and Amended Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs (ECF No. #14 ). All future requests for extension of time shall be made by motion. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/12/2023. (JLG)
April 10, 2023 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crystal Clinic, Inc. (Bernstein, David)
April 10, 2023 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC. (Bernstein, David)
April 10, 2023 Filing 30 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC, Crystal Clinic, Inc., Ian Gradisar. (Voudouris, S.)
April 10, 2023 Filing 29 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 5/1/2023 to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Defendant Exactech, US, Inc.. (Edwards, Ryan)
April 6, 2023 Filing 28 Proposed Stipulation for extension of time to file Replies in Support to Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and Reply in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
April 3, 2023 Filing 27 Opposition to #16 Motion for leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Exactech, US, Inc. (Edwards, Ryan)
April 3, 2023 Filing 26 Opposition to #14 Amended Motion to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs, Oral Argument Requested. filed by Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Action Complaint for Economic Loss)(Edwards, Ryan)
March 17, 2023 Filing 25 Motion for extension of time until April 3, 2023 to file response/reply to #16 Motion For Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Defendant Exactech, US, Inc. Related document(s) #16 . (Edwards, Ryan)
March 16, 2023 Filing 24 Amended Motion for extension of time until 4/10/2023 to file response/reply to #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of time until March 17, 2023 to answer or Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Exactech, US, Inc. Related document(s) #21 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Exactech's Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond)(Edwards, Ryan)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge John R. Adams on 3/16/23. (K,C)
March 16, 2023 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. Judge John R. Adams terminated. (S,T)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/14/2023. (V,A)
March 14, 2023 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. Judge Sara Lioi terminated. (B,DL)
March 13, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 17, 2023 to answer or Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Exactech, US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Exactech's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Respond)(Edwards, Ryan)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For good cause shown, defendants Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC, Crystal Clinic Inc., and Ian Gradisar, M.D.'s motion for an extension of time until April 10, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint is granted. (Doc. No. #19 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 3/13/2023. (V,A)
March 10, 2023 Filing 20 Reply in support of #6 Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Exactech, US, Inc.. (Edwards, Ryan)
March 10, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 10, 2023 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC, Crystal Clinic, Inc., Ian Gradisar. (Bernstein, David)
March 10, 2023 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by David A. Bernstein filed by on behalf of Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC, Crystal Clinic, Inc., Ian Gradisar. (Bernstein, David)
March 10, 2023 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by S. Peter Voudouris filed by on behalf of Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC, Crystal Clinic, Inc., Ian Gradisar. (Voudouris, S.)
March 3, 2023 Filing 16 Motion for leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6/7/22 Letter to Plaintiff)(Connick, Thomas)
March 3, 2023 Filing 15 Opposition to #6 Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 Amended Motion to remand to State Court and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Oral Argument Requested, filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. Related document #7 . (Connick, Thomas) Modified text on 3/3/2023 (B,DL).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For good cause shown, plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time until March 3, 2023 to respond to defendants' motion to stay and to file an amended motion to remand is granted. (Doc. No. #13 .) Given plaintiffs' representation that they intend to file an amended motion to remand, the pending motion to remand is denied without prejudice. (Doc. No. #7 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 2/27/2023. (V,A)
February 23, 2023 Filing 13 Motion for extension of time until March 3, 2023 to file response/reply to #6 Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and to file Amended Motion to Remand in Response to Defendants' Amended Notice of Removal filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. Related document(s) #6 . (Connick, Thomas)
February 22, 2023 Filing 12 Amended Notice of Filing Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order 19 with Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
February 21, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-19) with Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
February 16, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Notice of Removal , related dcocument #1 filed by Exactech, US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Edwards, Ryan)
February 16, 2023 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition to #7 Motion to remand and Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order)(Edwards, Ryan) Modified text on 2/17/2023 (B,DL).
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Connick, Thomas)
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 Motion to remand case filed by Gregg Grandis, Laura Grandis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Thomas J. Connick, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proof of Service)(Connick, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Defendant Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order). (Edwards, Ryan)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Witness List, #2 Exhibit B: Exhibit List) (S,T)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,T)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Exactech, US, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Edwards, Ryan)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Exactech, Inc. for Exactech, US, Inc. and identifying TPG, Inc. as an Affiliate to Exactech, Inc. filed by Exactech, US, Inc. (Edwards, Ryan) Modified/added affiliate corporation on 2/10/2023 (B,DL).
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County, case number CV-2023-02-0416 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11836350. Filed by Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings). (Edwards, Ryan) .
February 10, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (S,T)
February 10, 2023 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case (S,T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandis et al v. Exactech, US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Grandis
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Grandis
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ian Gradisar
Represented By: David A. Bernstein
Represented By: S. Peter Voudouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Clinic Orthopaedic Center LLC
Represented By: David A. Bernstein
Represented By: S. Peter Voudouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Clinic Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, US, Inc.
Represented By: Mira Aftim
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Represented By: Ryan C. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bernstein
Represented By: S. Peter Voudouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?