Dinger v. Forshey
Petitioner: Christopher Dinger
Respondent: Warden Jay Forshey
Case Number: 5:2023cv00275
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2023 Filing 16 Motion for extension of time until 5/16/2023 to answer filed by Respondent Jay Forshey. (Browning, Lisa)
April 4, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to Grant Evidentiary Hearing filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher Dinger, #2 Envelope). (B,DL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 14 Motion to compel Stark County Common Pleas Court and Prosecutor's Office for the entire record and discovery for case 2020CR1128 filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (E,CK)
March 10, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of the Adjudicative Facts and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Page 13, #2 Exhibit B - Pretrial Transcript from 10/30/2020, Page 7, #3 Exhibit C - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Pages 27-29, #4 Exhibit D - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Pages 39-40, 48, #5 Exhibit E - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Pages 4-5, #6 Exhibit F - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Pages 55-61, #7 Exhibit G - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Page 107, #8 Exhibit H - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Pages 109-111, #9 Exhibit I - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Pages 111-119, #10 Exhibit J - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Page 16, #11 Exhibit K - Ohio Supreme Court of Ohio Disciplinary Counsel Letter, #12 Exhibit L - Trial Transcript, Volume 2, Page 180, #13 Affidavit of Mr. Dinger, #14 Envelope) (B,DL)
March 10, 2023 Filing 12 Affidavit of Indigency filed by Christopher Dinger. (B,DL)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 45 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 30 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 3/2/23. (Issued by ordinary mail to Petitioner and Respondent, with copy of petition for writ of habeas corpus to Respondent and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General, on 3/2/23)(D,Ky)
March 2, 2023 Copy of #11 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Christopher Dinger A774-515, Noble Correctional Institution, 15708 McConnelsville Road, Caldwell, OH 43724 on 3/2/23. Related document(s) #11 . (D,Ky)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg for report and recommended decision. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2023. (V,A)
March 1, 2023 Copy of #10 Order of Referral mailed to Christopher Dinger A774-515 at Noble Correctional Institution 15708 McConnelsville Road Caldwell, OH 43724 on 3/1/2023. (V,A)
February 28, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to order the record corrected of the official transcripts and audio recordings filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (E,CK)
February 28, 2023 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE of ECF No. #6 Motion for leave to file a legal memorandum or brief filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. Related document #1 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (E,CK) Modified to term and note filing error on 2/28/2023 (E,CK).
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 Motion to order the Grand Jury Transcripts filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (E,CK)
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to file a Legal Memorandum or Brief filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(E,CK) Modified text on 2/28/2023 (E,CK).
February 23, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to order the record corrected of the official trial transcript and audio recordings filed by Petitioner Christopher Dinger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (B,DL)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/10/2023. (H,JL)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:23-cv-00558. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division at Akron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/10/2023. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/10/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division at Akron. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/10/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number 200001998 (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/10/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,JL)
February 10, 2023 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case (H,JL)
February 10, 2023 Copy of docket sheet and #4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order mailed to Christopher Dinger A774-515 at Noble Correctional Institution 15708 McConnelsville Road Caldwell, OH 43724 on 2/10/2023. Related document(s) #4 . (H,JL)
February 8, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Christopher Dinger (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 2/10/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinger v. Forshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Dinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Jay Forshey
Represented By: Lisa K. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?