Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Brakefire, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Brakefire Incorporated dba Silco Fire & Security and Ohio Security Insurance Company as subrogee of other Skyways Petroleum LLC doing business as Comfort Inn & Suites
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company and Brakefire, Incorporated doing business as Silco Fire & Security
Case Number: 5:2024cv00267
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: The case management conference, currently scheduled for April 18, 2024, at 12:00 PM is hereby CANCELLED. If necessary, the conference will be rescheduled after the Court rules on defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings. (See Doc. No. #11 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 4/10/2024. (V,A)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kinsey, Kesha)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kinsey, Kesha)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Reply in support of #11 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Brakefire, Incorporated. (Connick, Thomas)
March 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Initial Disclosures filed by Brakefire, Incorporated. (Connick, Thomas)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum Contra to #11 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kinsey, Kesha) Modified text on 3/25/2024 (E,CK).
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendant Brakefire, Incorporated. Related document(s) #10 . (Connick, Thomas)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Brakefire, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Silco Fire and Security Documents, #2 Exhibit B Notice Letter to Silco) (Connick, Thomas)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 2/29/2024 from Portage County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #8 . (E,CK)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certified copies of state court documents received from Portage County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CV00026. Original record returned to Portage County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Portage County Acknowledgement, #2 Envelope, #3 Letter of Acknowledgement) (B,DL)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. The telephonic case management conference is rescheduled for 4/18/2024 at 12:00 p.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/22/2024. (V,A)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Disclosures filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kinsey, Kesha)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Kinsey, Kesha)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 4/5/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/22/2024. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 3/29/2024. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/14/2024. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (V,A)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: For good cause shown, defendant's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is granted. Defendant shall have until 3/14/2024 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/14/2024. (V,A)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until March 14, 2024 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Brakefire, Incorporated. (Connick, Thomas)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brakefire, Incorporated. (Connick, Thomas)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Brakefire, Incorporated. Related document(s) #1 . (Connick, Thomas)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (H,Ch)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice by Clerk that Brakefire, Incorporated failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (H,Ch)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (H,Ch)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Portage County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CV00026 (state court documents attached to removal papers as exhibits A & B) Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number AOHNDC-12404130. Filed by Brakefire Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Connick, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Brakefire, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brakefire Incorporated dba Silco Fire & Security
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company as subrogee of other Skyways Petroleum LLC doing business as Comfort Inn & Suites
Represented By: Kesha D. Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brakefire, Incorporated doing business as Silco Fire & Security
Represented By: Thomas J. Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?