Dwight's Piano Company
Debtor: Dwight's Piano Company
Not Yet Classified: Asst US Trustee (Cin) and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 1:2001bk13951
Filed: May 31, 2001
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Beth A Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 BANKRUPTCY CASE CLOSED: It appearing that the bankruptcy estate has been fully administered, the trustee is therefore discharged, and the case is closed by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of Ohio (1vy)
November 20, 2017 First adjourned telephonic hearing scheduled for November 8, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. with Judge Buchanan was held (see Docs. 839 and 845 above). Timothy J. Hurley, Esq. appeared as attorney for Dwight's Piano Company and its wholly-owned subsidiaries; Douglas N. Hawkins, Esq. appeared as attorney for the United States Trustee. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orally granted the Debtors' motion for order reopening cases on a limited basis for limited relief (see Doc. 847 now entered above) (1gb)
November 16, 2017 Filing 848 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#847 Order on Motion to Reopen Case) Notice Date 11/16/2017. (Admin.)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 847 Order Granting Motion For Order Reopening Cases on a Limited Basis for Limited Relief (Related Doc #839) (1nb)
October 22, 2017 Filing 846 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#845 Order to Set Hearing) Notice Date 10/22/2017. (Admin.)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 845 Order Adjourning Hearing (RE: related document(s)#839 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). Hearing to be held on 11/8/2017 at 02:00 PM Cincinnati Telephone for #839, (1nb)
September 29, 2017 Filing 844 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#843 Order to Set Hearing) Notice Date 09/29/2017. (Admin.)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 843 Order Setting Hearing (RE: related document(s)#839 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). Hearing to be held on 10/5/2017 at 03:30 PM Judge Buchanan Courtroom 1 for #839, (1nb)
August 13, 2017 Filing 842 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#841 Reassignment of Judge) Notice Date 08/13/2017. (Admin.)
August 11, 2017 Filing 841 Notice of Reassignment of Judge. Involvement of Judge J. Vincent Aug, Jr. Terminated and Judge Beth A. Buchanan Added to Case (1nb)
August 10, 2017 Filing 840 Notice of Motion for Order Reopening Cases on a Limited Basis for Limited Relief Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#839 Motion to Reopen Case on a Limited Basis for Limited Relief Fee Amount $1167 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). (Hurley, Timothy)
August 10, 2017 Filing 839 Motion to Reopen Case on a Limited Basis for Limited Relief Fee Amount $1167 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Hurley, Timothy)
August 10, 2017 Receipt of Motion to Reopen Case(1:01-bk-13951) [motion,mreop] (1167.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 32965652, amount $1167.00. (Re: Doc#839) (U.S. Treasury)
March 14, 2013 Filing 837 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#836 Notification of Deficiency) Notice Date 03/14/2013. (Admin.)
March 12, 2013 Filing 836 To: Louisiana Department of Revenue - Notification of Deficiency: Pleading Filed in a Closed Case. Case Must be Reopened. NO Further Action will be Taken by the Court. (RE: related document(s)#835 Notice filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue) (1gl)
March 11, 2013 Filing 835 Notice Of Proposed Tax Due For Filing Period 12/31/2011 Filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition missing documents: Schedules A thru J Statement of Financial Affairs Due on 6/15/01; Proof of Claim). (1gl)
January 20, 2013 Filing 834 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#833 Notification of Deficiency) Notice Date 01/20/2013. (Admin.)
January 18, 2013 Filing 833 To: State of Louisiana, Department of Revenue - Notification of Deficiency: Pleading Filed in a Closed Case. Case Must be Reopened. NO Further Action will be Taken by the Court. (RE: related document(s)#831 Notice filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue, #832 Notice filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue) (1gl)
January 17, 2013 Filing 832 Notice Of Proposed Tax Due For Period Ending 12/31/2010 Filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition missing documents: Schedules A thru J Statement of Financial Affairs Due on 6/15/01;Proof of Claim). (1gl)
January 17, 2013 Filing 831 Notice Of Proposed Tax Due For Filing Period 12/31/2009 Filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition missing documents: Schedules A thru J Statement of Financial Affairs Due on 6/15/01;Proof of Claim). (1gl)
December 5, 2012 Filing 830 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#829 Notification of Deficiency) Notice Date 12/05/2012. (Admin.)
December 3, 2012 Filing 829 To: Louisiana Department of Revenue - Notification of Deficiency: Pleading Filed in a Closed Case. Case Must be Reopened. NO Further Action will be Taken by the Court. (RE: related document(s)#828 Notice filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue) (1gl)
November 27, 2012 Filing 828 Notice Of Proposed Tax Due Filed by Creditor Louisiana Department of Revenue (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition missing documents: Schedules A thru J Statement of Financial Affairs Due on 6/15/01 ;Proof of Claim). (1gl)
September 20, 2010 Adversary Case 1:02-ap-1158 Closed. (1gl)
September 20, 2010 Disposition of Adversary 1:03-ap-1477 - Case Settled. (1gl)
September 20, 2010 Disposition of Adversary 1:02-ap-1158 - Case transferred to U.S. District Court. (1gl)
September 20, 2010 Adversary Case 1:03-ap-1477 Closed. (1gl)
September 4, 2010 Filing 827 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#826 Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/04/2010. (Admin.)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 826 Order Re: Documents Under Seal (RE: related document(s) 612 Response filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 620 Response filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation). (1gl)
August 11, 2010 BANKRUPTCY CASE CLOSED: It appearing that the bankruptcy estate has been fully administered, the trustee is therefore discharged, and the case is closed by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of Ohio. (1gl)
July 22, 2010 Filing 825 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#823 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) Service Date 07/22/2010. (Admin.)
July 21, 2010 Filing 824 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#822 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 07/21/2010. (Admin.)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 823 Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney For Deputy Attorney General, LeGrand L. Clark, For The State of Indiana. (Related Doc #821) (1gl)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 822 Order Granting Motion For Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Cases. (Related Doc #809) (1gl)
July 19, 2010 To: LeGrand Clark - Notification of Deficiency: The format of the motion appears that it should be docketed to an adversary proceeding and not the related case. If this is to be docketed accordingly, please withdraw and refile in the correct case. (RE: related document(s)#821 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Creditor Department of Revenue) (1gl)
July 16, 2010 Filing 821 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Creditor Department of Revenue (Clark, LeGrand)
July 9, 2010 Filing 820 Proposed Notice of Assessment Filed by Creditor State of South Carolina (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition). (1gl)
July 4, 2010 Filing 819 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#818 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 07/04/2010. (Admin.)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 818 Order Granting Debtors And Debtors-In-Possession Motion For Order Approving Settlement Agreement And Dismissing Cases. (Related Doc #809) (1gl)
June 24, 2010 Filing 817 Response to (related document(s): #811 Objection filed by Other Professional Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, #812 Objection filed by Other Professional Herbert A Denton) Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (1gl)
June 23, 2010 Filing 816 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2010 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
June 21, 2010 Filing 815 Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#814 Response). (Shanley, Sharon)
June 21, 2010 To: Sharon Shanley - Notification of Deficiency: Copy not Served Upon US Trustee. (RE: related document(s)#814 Response filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) (1rc)
June 18, 2010 Filing 814 Response to (related document(s): #809 Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Cases filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, #811 Objection filed by Other Professional Franklin Advisory Services, LLC, #812 Objection filed by Other Professional Herbert A Denton, #813 Objection filed by Creditor Curtis Rex Carter, Creditor Mission Bay Investments, Inc.) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Shanley, Sharon)
June 14, 2010 Filing 813 Joinder in the Franklin Funds' Objection to (related document(s): #809 Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Cases filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) Filed by Creditors Mission Bay Investments, Inc. and Curtis Rex Carter Jr. (1gl)
June 9, 2010 Filing 812 Objection to (related document(s): #809 Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Cases filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) Filed by Other Professional Herbert A Denton. (1gl)
June 9, 2010 Filing 811 Objection to (related document(s): #809 Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Cases filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) Filed by Other Professional Franklin Advisory Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Sharing Agreement#2 Exhibit #2 - Memo To Former Baldwin Shareholders From Kenneth W. Pavia Dated January 9, 2002#3 Exhibit #3 - Priority Of Payment Distribution). (1gl)
June 4, 2010 Filing 810 Notice of Filing Motion Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#809 Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Cases Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). (Shanley, Sharon)
June 4, 2010 Filing 809 Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Cases Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Shanley, Sharon)
May 25, 2010 Filing 808 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2010 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
April 16, 2010 Filing 807 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2010 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 29, 2010 Filing 806 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2010 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 24, 2010 Filing 805 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2010 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 2, 2010 Filing 804 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
January 5, 2010 Filing 803 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
December 9, 2009 Filing 802 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
October 21, 2009 Filing 801 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
September 16, 2009 Filing 799 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
August 24, 2009 Filing 796 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 29, 2009 Filing 795 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
June 26, 2009 Filing 794 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
May 20, 2009 Filing 793 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
April 17, 2009 Filing 792 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 31, 2009 Filing 791 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 19, 2009 Filing 790 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2009 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
January 8, 2009 Filing 789 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
December 2, 2008 Filing 788 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
October 23, 2008 Filing 787 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
October 14, 2008 Filing 786 Notice of Change of Creditor's Address For Proof of Claim Filed by Creditor Willie Lee Johnson . (1tw)
September 19, 2008 Filing 785 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
August 15, 2008 Filing 784 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 24, 2008 Filing 783 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
June 27, 2008 Filing 782 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
May 13, 2008 Filing 781 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
April 15, 2008 Filing 780 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 25, 2008 Filing 779 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 25, 2008 Filing 778 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2008 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 7, 2008 Filing 777 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 7, 2008 Filing 776 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
November 14, 2007 Filing 775 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
October 26, 2007 Filing 774 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
September 25, 2007 Filing 773 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
August 15, 2007 Filing 772 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 18, 2007 Filing 771 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
June 27, 2007 Filing 770 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
May 23, 2007 Filing 769 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
April 24, 2007 Filing 768 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 28, 2007 Filing 767 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 21, 2007 Filing 766 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2007 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
January 22, 2007 Filing 765 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
January 3, 2007 Filing 764 Request for Notice and Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by Creditor State of Michigan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Reardon, Victoria)
December 21, 2006 Filing 763 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
December 15, 2006 Filing 762 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#761 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 12/15/2006. (Admin.)
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 761 Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #758) for Financial Resource Associates Inc, fees awarded: $6237.50, expenses awarded: $3.00 (1vy, )
November 30, 2006 Filing 760 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
November 1, 2006 Filing 759 Notice Filed by Consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc (RE: related document(s)#758 Third Application for Compensation (Interim) for Financial Resource Associates Inc, Consultant, Fee: $6237.50, Expenses: $3.00. Filed by Consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
November 1, 2006 Filing 758 Third Application for Compensation (Interim) for Financial Resource Associates Inc, Consultant, Fee: $6237.50, Expenses: $3.00. Filed by Consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Shanley, Sharon)
October 19, 2006 Filing 757 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
September 21, 2006 Filing 756 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
September 3, 2006 Filing 755 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#753 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 09/03/2006. (Admin.)
September 2, 2006 Filing 754 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#752 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 09/02/2006. (Admin.)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #744) for Baker & Hostetler LLP, fees awarded: $108535.50, expenses awarded: $15693.22 (1ma, )
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #745) for Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, fees awarded: $257107.00, expenses awarded: $7518.22 (1ma, )
August 17, 2006 Filing 751 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 30, 2006 Filing 750 Notice of Hearing w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s) Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, Hearing (Bk Motion) Set) Service Date 07/30/2006. (Admin.)
July 28, 2006 Filing 749 Notice of Hearing w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s) Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, Hearing (Bk Motion) Set) Service Date 07/28/2006. (Admin.)
July 28, 2006 Filing 748 Notice of Third Interim Application of Baker & Hostetler LLP for Allowance of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Out-of-Pocket Expenses for the Period September 1, 2002 to July 25, 2006 Filed by Attorney Baker & Hostetler LLP (RE: related document(s)#744 Third Application for Compensation for Baker & Hostetler LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fee: $108,535.50, Expenses: $15,693.22. Filed by Attorney Eric S Golden (Attachments: # 1 Application - Part 2# 2 Application - Part 3# 3 Application - Part 4) (Golden, Eric)). (Golden, Eric)
July 28, 2006 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#745 Third Application of Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession, for Interim Allowance of Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $257,107.00 and Reimbursement of Out-of-Pocket Expenses of $7,518.22 for the Time Period of September 1, 2002 through May 31, 2006). The Deadline for Filing a Response to Said Application is August 23, 2006. Hearing to be held on 8/30/2006 at 10:00 AM in Judge Aug's Courtroom. Should a Response not be Filed to Said Application, the Hearing May be Vacated by the Court (1gb, )
July 27, 2006 Filing 747 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 27, 2006 Filing 746 Notice Filed by Attorney Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP (RE: related document(s)#745 Third Application for Compensation (Interim) for Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $257107.00, Expenses: $7518.22. Filed by Attorney Sharon I Shanley (Attachments: #1 Mail Service List# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
July 27, 2006 Filing 745 Third Application for Compensation (Interim) for Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $257107.00, Expenses: $7518.22. Filed by Attorney Sharon I Shanley (Attachments: #1 Mail Service List#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E) (Shanley, Sharon)
July 26, 2006 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#744 Third Interim Application Filed by Attorney Baker & Hostetler LLP for Allowance of Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $108,535.50 and Reimbursement of Out-of-Pocket Expenses of $15,693.22 for the Time Period of September 1, 2002 through July 25, 2006). The Deadline for Filing a Response to Said Application is August 23, 2006. Hearing to be held on 8/30/2006 at 10:00 AM in Judge Aug's Courtroom. Should a Response Not be Filed to Said Application, then the Hearing May be Vacated by the Court (1gb, )
July 25, 2006 Filing 744 Third Application for Compensation for Baker & Hostetler LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fee: $108,535.50, Expenses: $15,693.22. Filed by Attorney Eric S Golden (Attachments: #1 Application - Part 2#2 Application - Part 3#3 Application - Part 4) (Golden, Eric)
June 22, 2006 Filing 743 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
May 29, 2006 Filing 742 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
April 26, 2006 Filing 741 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 23, 2006 Filing 740 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 23, 2006 Filing 739 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2006 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 6, 2006 Adversary Case 03-1492 Closed (1kw, )
February 6, 2006 Adversary Case 03-1326 Closed (1kw, )
February 6, 2006 Adversary Case 03-1255 Closed (1kw, )
January 31, 2006 Filing 738 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
January 3, 2006 Filing 737 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
December 12, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1488 Closed (1vy, )
November 18, 2005 Filing 736 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
November 14, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1251 Closed (1vy, )
November 3, 2005 Filing 735 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
November 3, 2005 Filing 734 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
September 28, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1251 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
September 27, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 1-03-ap-01326 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
September 27, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1255 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
September 27, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 1-03-ap-01492 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
August 31, 2005 Filing 733 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#731 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 08/31/2005. (Admin.)
August 31, 2005 Filing 732 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
August 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Order On Motion Of The Debtors And Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors For Approval Of Settlement Agreements Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019. (Related Doc #723) (1kw, )
August 4, 2005 Filing 730 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#726 Notice and Order of Failure with ECF Procedure 5, ) Service Date 08/04/2005. (Admin.)
August 3, 2005 Filing 729 Substitute PDF Notice of Filing Settlement Agreements Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#725 Notice,, ). (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement with ACS Consulting#2 Settlement Agreement with Burkel, Inc.#3 Settlement Agreement with Greenwood Utilities#4 Settlement Agreement with Omni Pro Electronics) (Shanley, Sharon)
August 3, 2005 Filing 728 Substitute PDF Notice of Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#724 Notice,, ). (Shanley, Sharon)
August 3, 2005 Filing 727 Substitute PDF Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#723 Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, #726 Notice and Order of Failure with ECF Procedure 5, ). (Shanley, Sharon)
August 2, 2005 Filing 726 Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Procedure 5 and Order Preserving Initial Filing Date upon Timely Compliance or Deeming Document(s) Stricken without Further Notice, Hearing or Separate Order (RE: related document(s)#723 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, #724 Notice, , filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, #725 Notice, , filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). Substitution of PDF due by 8/12/2005. (1kw, )
August 1, 2005 Filing 725 Notice of Filing Settlement Agreements Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#723 Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement with ACS Consulting#2 Settlement Agreement with Brukel, Inc.#3 Settlement Agreement with Greenwood Utilities#4 Settlement Agreement with Omni Pro Electronics) (Shanley, Sharon)
August 1, 2005 Filing 724 Notice of Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#723 Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Shanley, Sharon)). (Shanley, Sharon)
August 1, 2005 Filing 723 Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Shanley, Sharon)
July 21, 2005 Filing 722 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
June 24, 2005 Filing 721 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
May 20, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1441 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1441 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1302 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1287 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1442 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1295 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1298 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1443 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1494 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1444 Closed (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1494 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1444 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
May 20, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1443 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1298 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1307 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1308 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1295 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1278 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1318 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1284 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1259 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1287 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1302 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1307 Closed (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1308 Closed (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1278 Closed (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1318 Closed (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1284 Closed (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1323 Closed (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1323 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
May 19, 2005 Adversary Case 1-03-ap-01259 Closed (1vy, )
May 17, 2005 Filing 720 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
April 27, 2005 Filing 719 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 29, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1311 Closed (1kw, )
March 29, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1280 Closed (1kw, )
March 29, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1293 Closed (1kw, )
March 29, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1281 Closed (1kw, )
March 28, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1281 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
March 28, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1397 Closed (1kw, )
March 28, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1280 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
March 28, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1311 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
March 28, 2005 Second Disposition of Adversary 03-1397 Judgment For Both (1ls, )
March 28, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1293 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
March 23, 2005 Filing 718 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 18, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1253 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
March 18, 2005 Adversary Case 1-03-ap-01253 Closed (1vy, )
March 18, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 1-03-ap-1451 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
March 18, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1452 Closed (1vy, )
March 18, 2005 Adversary Case 1-03-ap-1451 Closed (1vy, )
March 9, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1280 Judgment For Both (1kw, )CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Corrected to show correct disposition for the defendant. Modified on 3/28/2005 (1kw, ).
March 9, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1281 Judgment For Both (1kw, )CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Corrected to show correct Disposition for Defendant. Modified on 3/28/2005 (1kw, ).
March 9, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1293 Judgment For Both (1kw, )CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Corrected to correct disposition for the defendant. Modified on 3/28/2005 (1kw, ).
March 9, 2005 Adversary Case 03-1448 Closed (1kw, )
March 9, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1311 Judgment For Both (1kw, )CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Corrected to show correct disposition for the defendant. Modified on 3/28/2005 (1kw, ).
March 8, 2005 Filing 717 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 8, 2005 To: Sharon Shanley - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: Report is not signed. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#716 Operating Report filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) (1kw, )
March 7, 2005 Filing 716 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
March 2, 2005 Filing 715 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#712 Order on Application to Compromise Controversy). (Shanley, Sharon)
February 28, 2005 Filing 714 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2005 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
February 26, 2005 Filing 713 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#712 Order on Application to Compromise Controversy) Service Date 02/26/2005. (Admin.)
February 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Order Granting Application to Compromise Controversy (Related Doc #708) (1vy, )
February 15, 2005 Filing 711 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Karen L Hendricks. (Schmidt, John)
January 27, 2005 Filing 710 Notice of Filing of Settlement Agreements Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s)#708 Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Creditors Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Bahr's Settlement Agreement#2 Computer Associates Settlement Agreement#3 Edwin Settlement Agreement#4 Gulbransen Settlement Agreement#5 Herman-Miles Settlement Agreement#6 Howell Plywood Settlement Agreement#7 Indiana Dept. of Revenue Settlement Agreement#8 Kodel Settlement Agreement#9 Michelle's Piano Settlement Agreement#10 Music Transport Settlement Agreement#11 Northern Hardwoods Settlement Agreement#12 Rudoph Miles Settlement Agreement#13 Trumann Machine Settlement Agreement) (Shanley, Sharon)
January 27, 2005 Filing 709 Notice of Motion Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s)#708 Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Creditors Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Shanley, Sharon)). (Shanley, Sharon)
January 27, 2005 Filing 708 Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Creditors Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Shanley, Sharon)
January 7, 2005 Filing 707 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Creditor Ayshire Electronics LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Withdrawal) (Kamer, Maurita)
January 7, 2005 Filing 706 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
January 4, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-1397 Judgment For Both (1kw, )
December 29, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1448 Judgment For Both (1kw, )
December 28, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 1-03-ap-01452 Judgment For Both (1kw, )
December 28, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 1-03-ap-01451 Judgment For Both (1kw, )
December 17, 2004 Filing 705 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#704 Order on Application to Compromise Controversy) Service Date 12/17/2004. (Admin.)
December 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Order Granting Motion of the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Approval of Settlement Agreements (Related Doc #700) (1kw, )
December 9, 2004 Filing 703 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
December 7, 2004 Filing 702 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
December 3, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1440 Closed (1vy, )
November 26, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1300 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
November 26, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1300 Closed (1vy, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 701 Notice of Motion Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#700 Fourth Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
November 19, 2004 Filing 700 Fourth Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
October 5, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1440 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Rendering of Judgment Changed from Both to Defendant. Modified on 12/2/2004 (1ls, ).
October 5, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1442 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
September 23, 2004 Filing 699 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
September 16, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1297 Closed (1vy, )
September 16, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1297 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 698 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
August 25, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1456 Closed (1kw, )
August 25, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1279 Closed (1kw, )
August 18, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1254 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
August 18, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1254 Closed (1vy, )
August 18, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1487 Closed (1vy, )
July 29, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1481 Closed (1vy, )
July 29, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1393 Closed (1vy, )
July 22, 2004 Filing 697 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 21, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1487 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
July 15, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1481 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
July 13, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1393 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
July 13, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1456 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
July 13, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1279 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
July 12, 2004 Filing 696 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (Shanley, Sharon)
July 8, 2004 Filing 695 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Service Date 07/08/2004. (Admin.)
July 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc #657) (1kw, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 693 Notice of Substitution of Counsel terminating Raymond J Pikna, adding Brenda K Bowers and Brenda K Bowers for National City Bank and National City Leasing Corporation Filed by Creditors National City Bank, National City Leasing Corporation, National City Bank, National City Leasing Corporation. (Bowers, Brenda)
June 16, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1325 Judgment For Both Parties (1ma, )
May 21, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1484 Closed (1vy, )
May 21, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1285 Closed (1vy, )
May 17, 2004 Filing 692 Financial Reports and Certification of Compliance with Operating Requirements for April 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
May 7, 2004 Filing 691 Notice of Motion Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#690 Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Preference Defendants (Third Omnibus) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
May 7, 2004 Filing 690 Application to Compromise Controversy with Various Preference Defendants (Third Omnibus) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
May 6, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1285 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
May 6, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1484 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
May 6, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1261 Closed (1vy, )
May 6, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1299 Closed (1vy, )
May 6, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1313 Closed (1vy, )
May 6, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1250 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1289 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1286 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1289 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1316 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1304 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1269 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1316 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1263 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1304 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1263 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1264 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1264 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1267 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1267 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1269 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1248 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1262 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1262 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1248 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1257 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1454 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1324 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1454 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1257 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1324 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1258 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1258 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1306 Closed (1vy, )
April 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 3-1306 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1292 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1292 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1272 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1475 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1288 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1475 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1457 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1283 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1457 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1273 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1273 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1288 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1480 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1270 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1283 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1480 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1455 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1270 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1455 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1321 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1315 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1321 Closed (1vy, )
April 23, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1315 Judgment For Plaintiff (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Filing 689 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/22/2004. (Related Doc #687) (Admin.)
April 22, 2004 Filing 688 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/22/2004. (Related Doc #686) (Admin.)
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1482 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1453 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1447 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1495 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1495 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1290 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1290 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1447 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1483 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1249 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1394 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1489 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1446 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1309 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1489 Closed (1vy, )
April 22, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1296 Closed (1vy, )
April 20, 2004 Filing 687 Agreed Order Granting(Recovery From Certain of GECC'S Collateral) Application to Compromise Controversy (Related Doc #672) (1kw, )
April 20, 2004 Filing 686 Agreed Order Granting Approval of Settlement Agreement with GECC: (RE: related document(s)#660 Amended Motion, filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). (1kw, )
April 16, 2004 Filing 685 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
April 13, 2004 Filing 684 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor G E Commercial Distribution Finance Corporation . (1vy, )
April 11, 2004 Filing 683 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/11/2004. (Related Doc #682) (Admin.)
April 8, 2004 Filing 682 Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay For Frederick Nicolai. (Related Doc #670) (1gl, )
April 7, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1261 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Judgment For: Changed from Plaintiff to Defendant Modified on 5/4/2004 (1ls, ).
April 5, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1292 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
April 5, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1272 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
April 5, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1313 Judgment For Both (1kw, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Judgment For: Changed from Plaintiff to Both. Modified on 5/4/2004 (1ls, ).
April 5, 2004 Filing 681 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
April 4, 2004 Filing 680 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/04/2004. (Related Doc #678) (Admin.)
April 4, 2004 Filing 679 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/04/2004. (Related Doc #677) (Admin.)
April 1, 2004 Filing 678 Transmission of Agreed Order to Withdraw Request for Payment of Adminstrative Expense and Waiver of Claims to BNC for Service (1vy, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 677 Agreed Order to Withdraw Request for Payment of Administrative Expense and Waiver of Claims. (Related Doc # 442 ) (1vy, )
March 27, 2004 Filing 676 Notice of Hearing w/BNC Certificate of Mailing Service Date 03/27/2004. (Admin.)
March 25, 2004 Filing 675 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 03/25/2004. (Related Doc #671) (Admin.)
March 25, 2004 Potential Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#670 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Frederick Nicolai). The Deadline for Filing a Response to this Motion is April 9, 2004. If a Response is Filed, the Hearing will be held on 4/20/2004 at 02:50 PM Judge Aug's Courtroom (1gb, )
March 24, 2004 Filing 674 Notice Amended Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s)#672 Joint Application to Compromise Controversy with General Electric Capital Corporation Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List# 3 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)# 4 Exhibit B (Agreed Order)# 5 Exhibit C (Agreed Order)) (Shanley, Sharon), #673 Joint Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s)#672 Joint Application to Compromise Controversy with General Electric Capital Corporation Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List# 3 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)# 4 Exhibit B (Agreed Order)# 5 Exhibit C (Agreed Order)) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
March 24, 2004 Filing 673 Joint Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s)#672 Joint Application to Compromise Controversy with General Electric Capital Corporation Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List# 3 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)# 4 Exhibit B (Agreed Order)# 5 Exhibit C (Agreed Order)) (Shanley, Sharon)). (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List) (Shanley, Sharon)
March 24, 2004 Filing 672 Joint Application to Compromise Controversy with General Electric Capital Corporation Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (Attachments: #1 Electronic Service List#2 Mail Service List#3 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)#4 Exhibit B (Agreed Order)#5 Exhibit C (Agreed Order)) (Shanley, Sharon)
March 24, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1250 Judgment For Both (1kw, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Judgment For: Changed from Plaintiff to Both. Modified on 5/4/2004 (1ls, ).
March 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 671 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc #665) (1kw, )
March 22, 2004 Filing 670 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $150, Filed by Creditor Frederick Nicolai (1kw, )
March 16, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1299 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Judgment For: Changed from Plaintiff to Defendant Modified on 5/4/2004 (1ls, ).
March 4, 2004 Filing 669 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 03/04/2004. (Related Doc #668) (Admin.)
March 4, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1399 Closed (1vy, )
March 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Order Granting an Amended Motion (Related Doc #660) (1kw, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 667 Status Report Filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation . (1kw, )
February 27, 2004 Filing 666 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#665 Joint Motion of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Authority to Limit Service of Notice RE GECC Settlement Motion. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1kw, )). (1kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2004 (1kw, ).
February 27, 2004 Filing 665 Joint Motion of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Authority to Limit Service of Notice RE GECC Settlement Motion. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1kw, )
February 25, 2004 Filing 664 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 1, 2004 Thru January 31, 2004 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1vy, )
February 25, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1493 Closed (1kw, )
February 20, 2004 Filing 663 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 02/20/2004. (Related Doc #662) (Admin.)
February 20, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1449 Closed (1vy, )
February 20, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1276 Closed (1vy, )
February 13, 2004 Filing 662 Agreed Order Amending Scheduling Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#640 Order to File). (1ag, )
February 12, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1399 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
February 6, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1303 Closed (1vy, )
February 6, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1490 Closed (1vy, )
February 4, 2004 Filing 661 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#660 Amended Motion of the Debtors and Official Committe of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements. (related document(s): #657 Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1vy, )). (1vy, )
February 4, 2004 Filing 660 Amended Motion of the Debtors and Official Committe of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements. (related document(s): #657 Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1vy, )
February 4, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1449 Judgment For BOTH (1vy, )
February 2, 2004 Filing 659 Notice of Filing Settlement Agreements Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
February 2, 2004 Filing 658 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s)#657 Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1kw, )). (1kw, )
February 2, 2004 Filing 657 Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Approval of Settlement Agreements. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1kw, )
January 30, 2004 Filing 656 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
January 30, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1276 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
January 22, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1490 Case Dismissed (1vy, )
January 22, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1303 (Case Dismissed) (1vy, )
January 20, 2004 Filing 655 Withdrawal of Claim(s): Filed by Creditor Bureau of Customs and Border Protection fka U S Customs Service . (1vy, )
January 9, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1260 Closed (1vy, )
January 9, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1252 Closed (1vy, )
January 9, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1294 Closed (1vy, )
January 9, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1322 Closed (1vy, )
January 9, 2004 Adversary Case 03-1479 Closed (1vy, )
January 7, 2004 Filing 654 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 01/07/2004. (Related Doc #652) (Admin.)
January 6, 2004 Filing 653 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1vy, )
January 6, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1482 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
January 5, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-1493 Judgment For Plantiff (1kw, )
December 31, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 652 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc # 650 ) (1kw, )
December 17, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1323 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
December 16, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1397 Judgment For Dwight's Piano Company (1ag, )
December 9, 2003 Filing 651 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s) 650 Motion of the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Approval of Settlement Agreements. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1vy, )). (1vy, )
December 9, 2003 Filing 650 Motion of the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Approval of Settlement Agreements. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1vy, )
December 9, 2003 Filing 649 Notice of Filing of Settlement Agreements. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1vy, )
December 5, 2003 Filing 648 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 12/05/2003. (Related Doc #646) (Admin.)
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1301 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1305 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1277 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1271 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1491 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1310 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1275 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1282 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1485 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1486 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1325 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1312 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1317 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1320 Closed (1vy, )
December 4, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1256 Closed (1vy, )
December 3, 2003 Filing 647 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 12/03/2003. (Related Doc #644) (Admin.)
December 3, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1314 Closed (1kw, )
December 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 646 Order Granting Motion of the Debtors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors For Approval of Settlement Agreement (Related Doc # 630 ) (1kw, )
December 2, 2003 Filing 645 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
December 2, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1274 Closed (1ls, )
December 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 644 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc # 637 ) (1kw, )
December 1, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1249 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
December 1, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1314 Judgment For Defendant (1kw, )
November 24, 2003 Filing 643 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eric S Golden Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . (1kw, )
November 24, 2003 Filing 642 Affidavit : Filed by Eric S Golden . (1kw, )
November 20, 2003 Filing 641 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 11/20/2003. (Related Doc #640) (Admin.)
November 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Order to File Status Reports . Responses due by 2/13/2004. (1kw, )
November 14, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1274 Judgment For Both (1vy, )
November 13, 2003 Filing 639 Proceeding Memo Held (1vy, )
November 12, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1296 (1ag, )
November 10, 2003 Filing 638 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s) 637 Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1ag, )). (1ag, )
November 10, 2003 Filing 637 Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1ag, )
November 6, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1396 Closed (1vy, )
November 6, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1395 Closed (1vy, )
November 6, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1445 Closed (1vy, )
November 6, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1398 Closed (1vy, )
November 6, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1450 Closed (1vy, )
November 6, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1400 Closed (1vy, )
October 30, 2003 Corrective Entry Rendering of Judgment Changed from Defendant to Both(RE: related document(s) Disposition of Adversary) (1ls, )
October 24, 2003 Filing 636 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
October 23, 2003 Filing 635 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 10/23/2003. (Related Doc #633) (Admin.)
October 23, 2003 Filing 634 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 10/23/2003. (Related Doc #632) (Admin.)
October 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 633 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc # 623 ) (1kw, )
October 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 632 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc # 626 ) (1kw, )
October 17, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1450 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
October 16, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1445 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
October 16, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1400 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
October 16, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1395 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
October 16, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1398 Judgment For Defendant (1vy, )
October 16, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1396 Judgment For Both (1vy, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Rendering of Judgment Changed from Defendant to BothModified on 10/30/2003 (1ls, ).
October 9, 2003 Filing 631 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s) 630 Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement with Dwight's Piano Company and Official Committe of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1vy, )). (1vy, )
October 9, 2003 Filing 630 Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement with Dwight's Piano Company and Official Committe of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1vy, )
October 4, 2003 Filing 629 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 10/04/2003. (Related Doc #628) (Admin.)
October 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Order Granting Motion of the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Approval of Settlement Agreements. (Related Doc # 613 ) (1vy, )
September 24, 2003 Filing 627 Supplemental Affidavit Re: Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s) 17 Affidavit). (1ag, )
September 23, 2003 Filing 626 Motion To Authorize Certain Filings To Be Unsealed and Served Upon Master Service List Filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation (1kw, )
September 22, 2003 Filing 625 Notice of Filing of Settlement Agreements. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . (1vy, )
September 22, 2003 Filing 624 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s) 623 Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1vy, )). (1vy, )
September 22, 2003 Filing 623 Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019. Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company , Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1vy, )
September 17, 2003 Filing 622 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 1, 2003 Thru August 31, 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1vy, )
September 16, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1266 Closed (1ef, )
September 13, 2003 Filing 621 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 09/13/2003. (Related Doc #619) (Admin.)
September 11, 2003 Filing 620 Reply Memorandum In Support Of (related document(s): 602 Motion for Turnover of Property Regarding Proceeds Of Collateral And Accounting Of Same filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation) Filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation (1gl, )
September 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Order Granting Motion of the Debtor's and Debtor's-in-Possession For Approval of Settlement Agreement (Swords Veneer & Lumber Co.) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 (Related Doc # 593 ) (1nb, )
September 10, 2003 Filing 618 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 09/10/2003. (Related Doc #615) (Admin.)
September 8, 2003 Filing 617 Withdrawal Filed by Creditor International Chemical Workers Union (RE: related document(s) 595 Brief). (1kw, )
September 5, 2003 Filing 616 Notice Of Filing Of Settlement Agreements Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1kw, )
September 5, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Order to Set Hearing (RE: related document(s) 602 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation, 611 Response filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, 612 Response, filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor). Status hearing to be held on 11/13/2003 at 02:00 PM in Judge Aug's Courtroom. (1kw, )
September 5, 2003 Filing 614 Notice (RE: related document(s) 613 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) (1kw, )
September 5, 2003 Filing 613 Motion Of The Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Approval of Settlement Agreements Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1kw, )
September 2, 2003 Filing 612 Response And Objection to (related document(s): 602 Motion for Turnover of Property Regarding Proceeds Of Collateral And Accounting Of Same filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation) Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor - FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO FIRST AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER, DOC. #443. (1gl, )
September 2, 2003 Filing 611 Response to (related document(s): 602 Motion for Turnover of Property Regarding Proceeds Of Collateral And Accounting Of Same filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (1gl, )
August 28, 2003 Filing 610 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 08/28/2003. (Related Doc #607) (Admin.)
August 28, 2003 Filing 609 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 08/28/2003. (Related Doc #606) (Admin.)
August 26, 2003 Filing 608 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 1, 2003 thru July 31, 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company. (1gl, )
August 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Order (RE: related document(s) 596 Motion to Compel Abandonment filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). (1gl, )
August 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Order Granting Motion to Compel Abandonment Of Certain Property In Possession Of Chicago Symphony. (Related Doc # 596 ) (1gl, )
August 13, 2003 Filing 605 Response to (related document(s): 602 Motion for Turnover of Property Regarding Proceeds Of Collateral And Accounting Of Same filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation) Filed by Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation (1gl, )
August 13, 2003 Filing 604 Notice Filed by Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation (RE: related document(s) 602 Motion To Compel Turnover of Property Regarding Proceeds Of Collateral And Accounting Of Same Filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation. (1gl, )). (1gl, )
August 8, 2003 Filing 603 Response to (related document(s): 593 Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) Filed by Creditor Swords Veneer and Lumber Company (1kw, )
August 7, 2003 Filing 602 Motion To Compel Turnover of Property Regarding Proceeds Of Collateral And Accounting Of Same Filed by Creditor GE Capital Corporation. (1gl, )
August 7, 2003 Filing 601 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 08/07/2003. (Related Doc #600) (Admin.)
August 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Order Setting Hearing (Chapter 11) (RE: related document(s) 595 Brief filed by Creditor International Chemical Workers Union, 593 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). Hearing to be held on 9/25/2003 at 02:00 PM Judge Aug's Courtroom for 593 , (1kw, )
August 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11) (RE: related document(s) 595 Brief filed by Creditor International Chemical Workers Union, 593 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company). (1kw, ) Modified on 8/5/2003 (1sd, ). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: No Hearing Date, Time, and Location Set.
July 30, 2003 Filing 598 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 1, 2003 thru June 30, 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1ag, )
July 30, 2003 Filing 597 Notice Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (RE: related document(s) 596 Stipulated Motion to Abandon Certain Property in Possession of Chicago Symphony Orchestra. Receipt Number n/a, Fee Amount $0.00 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1ag, )). (1ag, )
July 30, 2003 Filing 596 Motion to Abandon Certain Property in Possession of Chicago Symphony Orchestra. Receipt Number n/a, Fee Amount $0.00 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1ag, )
July 30, 2003 Filing 595 Memorandum In Opposition Filed by Creditor International Chemical Workers Union (RE: related document(s) 593 Motion). (1ag, )
July 18, 2003 Filing 594 Notice (RE: related document(s) 593 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company) (1kw, )
July 18, 2003 Filing 593 Motion Of The Debtors and Debtors In Possession For Approval of Settlement Agreement (Swords Veneer & Lumber Co) Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company (1kw, )
July 3, 2003 Disposition of Adversary 03-1291 Judgment For Defendant (1ds, )
July 3, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1291 Closed (1ds, )
June 19, 2003 Filing 592 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 1, 2003 thru May 31, 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1gl, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 591 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Valspar Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 590 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Edwin B Stimpson Company Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 589 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against ProPiano Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 588 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against OMNI Pro Electronics Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 587 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against North Hudson Woodcraft Corp . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 586 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Nisbet Property Holdings LTD . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 585 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Mississippi Department of Human Services (CRDU) . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 584 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Les Pianos Andr'e Bolduc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 583 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Mears Quality Products Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 582 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Mapes Piano String Co . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 581 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Manpower Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 580 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Heartland Wood Products Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 579 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Hartford Life Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 578 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Future Electronics Corp . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 577 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Elm City Pattern and Foundry . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 576 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Borden Chemical Inc . Receipt Number 00151913, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 575 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against United Parcel Service Inc . Receipt Number 00151912, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 30, 2003 Filing 574 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Karen L Hendricks . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 29, 2003 Filing 573 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Cadwalader Wickersham and Taft LLP . Receipt Number 00151802, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 572 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Cunningham Lindsey Claims Management Inc , CT Corporation System . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 571 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against SRC Trucking Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 570 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Swords Veneer and Lumber Co . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 569 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Skilco Hardwoods . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 568 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Shamrock Industrial Fastener Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 567 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Keyboard Special Installation Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 566 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Keyboard Carriage Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 565 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against International Business Machines Corporation , CT Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 564 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against GE Purchasing Card Service . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 563 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against The Cincinnati Enquirer . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 562 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Atlanta Constitution . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 561 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Amsco Wire Products Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Filing 560 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against American Freightways Inc , CT Corporation System . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Disposition of Adversary Dismissal with Prejudice 03-1265 (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1265 Closed (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Adversary Case 03-1319 Closed (1ds, )
May 28, 2003 Disposition of Adversary Dismissal with Prejudice 03-1319 (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 558 ) for Leonard Z Eppel, fees awarded: $13453.50, expenses awarded: $25.00 (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Filing 557 Proceeding Memo Not Held (RE: related document(s) 522 Application for Compensation filed by Consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc) (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Filing 556 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Deloitte and Touche LLP . Receipt Number 00151607, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Filing 555 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against TYCO Electronics Corp . Receipt Number 00151608, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Filing 554 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Duke Realty LP Cinti . Receipt Number 00151609, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Filing 553 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company , The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against CIT Systems Leasing . Receipt Number 00151610, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 27, 2003 Filing 552 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors , Dwight's Piano Company against Textron Financial Corp . Receipt Number 00151611, Fee Amount $150 (1ds, )
May 23, 2003 Filing 551 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 05/23/2003. (Related Doc #549) (Admin.)
May 23, 2003 Filing 550 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 1, 2003 Thru April 30, 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1vy, )
May 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Order Granting Application of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Extend Scope of Employment of Strauss and Troy as Counsel for Committee (Related Doc # 531 ) (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 548 Affidavit in Support Re: Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s) 531 Application to Employ Strauss and Troy as Counsel for Unsecured Creditors Committee). (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 547 Response to (related document(s): 538 Objection, filed by Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation) Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 546 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Vision Service Plan . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 545 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Treasurer State of Ohio . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 544 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Spherion Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 543 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against QRS Music Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 542 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Georgia-Pacific Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 541 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Emmis Communications Corporation . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 540 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against Akzo Nobel Coatings Inc . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 14, 2003 Filing 539 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Dwight's Piano Company against ADT Security Systems . Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $0.0 (1ds, )
May 1, 2003 Filing 538 Objection to (related document(s): 531 Application to Employ Strauss and Troy as Counsel for Unsecured Creditors Committee filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor) Filed by Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation (1ds, )
April 25, 2003 Filing 537 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 1, 2003 Thru March 31, 2003 Filed by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company . (1vy, )
April 20, 2003 Filing 536 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/20/2003. (Related Doc #534) (Admin.)
April 19, 2003 Filing 535 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Service Date 04/19/2003. (Related Doc #533) (Admin.)
April 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Order Scheduling Hearing (RE: related document(s) 522 Application for Compensation filed by Consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc). Hearing to be held on 5/27/2003 at 02:30 PM Judge Aug's Courtroom for 522 , (1ds, )
April 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Order Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Requiring The Production of Documentary Evidence (Related Doc # 529 ) (1ds, )
April 14, 2003 Filing 532 Notice Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (RE: related document(s) 531 Application to Extend the Scope of Employment of Strauss and Troy as Counsel for Unsecured Creditors Committee Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1ds, )). (1ds, )
April 14, 2003 Filing 531 Application to Extend the Scope of Employment of Strauss and Troy as Counsel for Unsecured Creditors Committee Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor (1ds, )
April 8, 2003 Filing 530 Objection By Creditor Gibson Musical Instruments, Creditor Gibson Guitar Corporation, Creditor Gibson Piano Ventures To [529-1] Motion For Order Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Requiring the Production of Documentary Evidence by Dwight's Piano Company . [530-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1302) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Patrick Machinery & Tool Corp . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1326) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Greenwood Utilities . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1279) Dwight's Piano Company vs. H & H Woodworking Supplies . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1290) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Marion Plywood Corporation. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1307) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Recoton Auodio Corporation . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1285) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Intricate Technology. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1286) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Kersten Lumber Co Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1325) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Zierick Manufacturing Corporation . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1277) Dwight's Piano Company vs. GMC Hardwoods Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1274) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Gardner Graphics . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1273) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Frederick L Ikenson PC . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1275) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Geeco Sales Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1276) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Gemini Security Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1284) Dwight's Piano Company vs. State of Indiana Department of Revenue. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1291) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Memphis Machinery & Supply Co Inc. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1278) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Gulbransen Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1303) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Pratt-Read Corp Cornwell & Patterson Co . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1310) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Ron Jurgens . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1305) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Pride Manufacturing Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1311) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Rudolph Miles and Sons Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1306) Dwight's Piano Company vs. R D Billhofer Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1289) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Luxury Media Corp . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1295) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Music Transport Inc. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1294) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Milco Marketing Inc. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1288) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Kuchik Photography . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1272) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Frank & Camilles Keyboard . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1308) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Rex Lumber Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1309) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Robert Half . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1293) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Michelle's Piano & Organ Company. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1304) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Precision Sheet Metals Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1287) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Kodel Corporation . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1292) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Metalcraft Inc. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1271) Dwight's Piano Company vs. FISK Alloy Wire Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1316) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Speer Veneers Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1299) Dwight's Piano Company vs. NVF Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1300) Dwight's Piano Company vs. OCSE . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1318) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Trumann Machine Works Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1319) Dwight's Piano Company vs. TTE Casting Technologies Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1298) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Northern Hardwoods . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1315) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Southwest Mechanical Parts Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1312) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Ryder Transportation Services . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1296) Dwight's Piano Company vs. NASDAQ Stock Market . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1313) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Dan Smith Piano Service. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1297) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Norman Colvin . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ma)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1314) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Southland Metals Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1320) Dwight's Piano Company vs. TTI Inc North America . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1317) Dwight's Piano Company vs. David Sumrell . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1266) Dwight's Piano Company vs. DL Boardtech . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1282) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Huntington Electric, Inc. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1321) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Jay Valle . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1283) Dwight's Piano Company vs. ICX Electronics Inc. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1270) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Faultless Caster . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1269) Dwight's Piano Company vs. F A Smith Movers . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1265) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Diversified Products Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1267) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Elam & Sons Moving Company . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1281) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Howell Plywood Corporation. NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . [1-1] (1gl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1322) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Verizon Communications Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1323) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Washington County Assessor . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1264) Dwight's Piano Company vs. The Dilenschneider Group Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1tl)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1324) Dwight's Piano Company vs. WMC-TV a Raycom Media Station . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1nb)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1252) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Addison Distribution Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1253) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Bahrs Die & Stamping Co . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1251) Dwight's Piano Company vs. ACS Consulting . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1254) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Bondy Piano Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1248) Dwight's Piano Company vs. AAA Cooper Transportation . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1255) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Burkel Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1249) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Accountemps . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1250) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Accu-Fab Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1257) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Chamblee Waste and Recycling Co . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1261) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Craighead Electric Corp . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1262) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Cranford Woodcarving Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1260) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Concordia Properties LLC . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1263) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Crown City Plating Co . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1259) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Computer Associates . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . ( ) [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1256) Dwight's Piano Company vs. CET Technology . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
April 7, 2003 Complaint (03-1258) Dwight's Piano Company vs. Charles W House and Sons Inc . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property . () [1-1] (1ds)
March 21, 2003 Filing 529 Motion by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company For Order Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Requiring the Production of Documentary Evidence [529-1] (1ds)
March 21, 2003 Filing 528 Transmittal of Financial Reports and Certification of Compliance with Operating Requirements for the Month Ended February 2003 [528-1] (1ds)
March 6, 2003 Filing 527 Transmittal of Financial Reports and Certification of Compliance with Operating Requirements for the Month Ended January 2003 [527-1] (1ds)
February 21, 2003 Filing 526 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Agreed Order Regarding Motion for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim (Libby Pharo). (1ds)
February 18, 2003 Filing 558 Application for Compensation for Leonard Z Eppel , Financial Advisor, Fee: $13453.50, Expenses: $25.00. Filed by Attorney Leonard Z Eppel Note Document is a Duplicate of Doc No 522 (1ds, )
February 18, 2003 Filing 525 Report Of Operations from December 1, 2002 to December 31, 2002 [525-1] (1yv)
February 18, 2003 Filing 524 Report Of Operations from November 1, 2002 to November 30, 2002 [524-1] (1yv)
February 18, 2003 Filing 523 Agreed Order by [523-1] Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Creditor National City Bank Regarding [509-1] Application To Allow Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (Libby Pharo) by Dwight's Piano Company and [516-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation (1ds)
February 18, 2003 Filing 522 Second Application By Turnaround Consultants Financial Resource Associates Inc for Interim Allowance For Compensation ( Fees: $ 13,453.50, Expenses: $ 25.00) for the Period January 14, 2002 through November 30, 2002. [522-1] (1ds)
February 4, 2003 Filing 521 Transmittal of Financial Reports and Certification of Compliance with Operating Requirements for the Period Ended November 2002 [521-1] (1ds)
January 31, 2003 Filing 520 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Scheduling Order. (1ds)
January 28, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Scheduling Order Setting Hearing RE: [509-1] Application To Allow Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (Libby Pharo) by Dwight's Piano Company Scheduled for 3:00 2/11/03 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [516-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation Scheduled for 3:00 2/11/03 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [519-1] (1ds)
January 21, 2003 Filing 518 Withdrawal of Unliquidated Claim Dated 7/30/02 by Arthur F Dott State of New York Dept of Labor Unemployment Insurance Division [518-1] (1ds)
January 10, 2003 Filing 517 Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Payment Proof of Claim Amount $781.96 Dated 9/27/02 filed by State of Florida Department of Revenue [517-1] (1ds)
December 30, 2002 Filing 516 Limited Objection By Creditor National City Bank and National City Leasing Corporation To [509-1] Application To Allow Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (Libby Pharo) by Dwight's Piano Company . [516-1] (1ds)
December 19, 2002 Filing 515 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Order Granting Second Application of Baker & Hostetler for Fees. (1ds)
December 19, 2002 Filing 514 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Order Granting Second Application of Taft Stettinius & Hollister for Fees. (1ds)
December 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Order Granting [491-1] Application For Interim Compensation of Fees: $ 133,344.50 and Reimbursement of Expenses: $ 16,894.08) by Richard A Robinson payment to Richard A. Robinson of $133344.50 in fees and $16894.08 in expenses [513-1] (1ds)
December 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Order Granting [490-1] Application For Interm Allowance of Compensation ( Fees: $ 157,146.00 and Reimbursement of Expenses: 5898.01) by Timothy J Hurley payment to Timothy J. Hurley of $157146.00 in fees and $5898.01 in expenses [512-1] (1ds)
December 16, 2002 Filing 511 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [490-1] Application For Interm Allowance of Compensation ( Fees: $ 157,146.00 and Reimbursement of Expenses: 5898.01) by Timothy J Hurley, [491-1] Application For Interim Compensation of Fees: $ 133,344.50 and Reimbursement of Expenses: $ 16,894.08) by Richard A Robinson . [511-1] (1ds)
December 11, 2002 Filing 510 Notice by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company Re: [509-1] Application To Allow Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (Libby Pharo) by Dwight's Piano Company [510-1] (1ds)
December 11, 2002 Filing 509 Motion Filed By Debtor Dwight's Piano Company To Allow Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (Libby Pharo) [509-1] (1ds)
December 3, 2002 Filing 508 Report Of Operations from October 1, 2002 to October 31, 2002 [508-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 507 Report Of Operations from September 1, 2002 to September 30, 2002 [507-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 506 Report Of Operations from August 1, 2002 to August 31, 2002 [506-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 505 Report Of Operations from July 1, 2002 to July 31, 2002 [505-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 504 Report Of Operations from June 1, 2002 to June 30, 2002 [504-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 503 Report Of Operations from May 1, 2002 to May 31, 2002 [503-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 502 Report Of Operations from April 1, 2002 to April 30, 2002 [502-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 501 Report Of Operations from March 1, 2002 to March 31, 2002 [501-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 500 Report Of Operations from February 1, 2002 to February 28, 2002 [500-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 499 Report Of Operations from January 1, 2002 to January 31, 2002 [499-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 498 Report Of Operations from December 1, 2001 to December 31, 2001 [498-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 497 Report Of Operations from November 1, 2001 to November 30, 2001 [497-1] (1yv)
December 3, 2002 Filing 496 Report Of Operations from October 1, 2001 to October 31, 2001 [496-1] (1yv)
November 27, 2002 Filing 495 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Notice of Corrected Docket Number for Notice of Hearing on Fee Applications. (1ds)
November 25, 2002 Filing 494 Notice Re: [492-1] Notice of Hearing [494-1] (1ds)
November 23, 2002 Filing 493 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Notice of Hearing. (1ds)
November 20, 2002 Filing 492 Notice of Hearing Re: [490-1] Application For Interm Allowance of Compensation ( Fees: $ 157,146.00 and Reimbursement of Expenses: 5898.01) by Timothy J Hurley Scheduled For 10:00 12/16/02 in Judge Aug's Courtroom, and Re: [491-1] Application For Interim Compensation of Fees: $ 133,344.50 and Reimbursement of Expenses: $ 16,894.08) by Richard A Robinson Scheduled For 10:00 12/16/02 in Judge Aug's Courtroom [492-1] (1gb)
November 19, 2002 Filing 491 Second Application of Baker & Hostetler LLP by Robin E Harvey, Richard A Robinson & Edward L Ripley for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor For Interim Compensation of Fees: $ 133,344.50 and Reimbursement of Expenses: $ 16,894.08) . [491-1] (1ds)
November 19, 2002 Filing 490 Second Application of Taft Stettinius & Hollister By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company For Interm Allowance of Compensation ( Fees: $ 157,146.00 and Reimbursement of Expenses: 5898.01) . [490-1] (1ds)
October 19, 2002 Filing 489 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreements. (1ds)
October 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Order Granting [485-1] Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [488-1] (1sd)
September 23, 2002 Filing 487 Notice of Filing by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Re: Settlement Agreements [487-1] (1sd)
September 20, 2002 Filing 486 Notice by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Re: [485-1] Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [486-1] (1sd)
September 20, 2002 Filing 485 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor For Approval of Settlement Agreements Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 [485-1] (1sd)
September 17, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Order Granting [456-1] Motion For An Order Of Distribution of Proceeds by Multi-Craft Contractors Inc Mooting [464-1] Response by Jeffrey A Marks Vacating [466-1] Set Hearing Order [484-1] (1sd)
September 13, 2002 Filing 481 Withdrawal of [460-1] Response by Timothy J Hurley (Mtoion For An Order Of Distribution of Proceeds) [481-1] (1sd)
September 12, 2002 Filing 483 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: Agreed Amended Order. (1sd)
September 12, 2002 Filing 482 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: First Amended Agreed Order. (1sd)
September 9, 2002 Filing 480 Agreed Amended [367-1] Order On Motion Of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corp and To Obtain The Production of Documents Pursuant To Federal Ruleof Bankruptcy Procedure 2004. Filed by: Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwight's Piano Company [480-1] (1sd)
September 9, 2002 Filing 479 First Amended [443-1] Agreed Order Governing Production . Filed by: Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwight's Piano Company [479-1] (1sd)
August 31, 2002 Filing 478 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: Order For Attorney Fees. (1sd)
August 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Order Granting [465-1] Motion To Reconsider [461-1] Order Denying Application of The Unoffcial Committee of Unsecured Creditors To Employ Strauss and Troy as Special Copunsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Granting [469-1] Motion For An Order Approving Sharing Agreement With Respect To Certain Litigation by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [477-1] (1sd)
August 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Order Granting [454-1] Application To Employ Richard S Wayne As Special Counsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [476-1] (1sd)
August 26, 2002 Filing 475 Revised Exhibit To The Joint Motion of the Debtor Dwight's Piano Company and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors For An Order Approving Sharing Agreeement With Respect To Certain Litigation. [475-1] (1sd)
August 21, 2002 Filing 474 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [465-1] Motion To Reconsider [461-1] Order Denying Application of The Unoffcial Committee of Unsecured Creditors To Employ Strauss and Troy as Special Copunsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [469-1] Motion For An Order Approving Sharing Agreement With Respect To Certain Litigation by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [472-1] Objection by GE Capital Corporation . [474-1] (1sd)
August 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Order to Set Hearing RE: [465-1] Motion To Reconsider [461-1] Order Denying Application of The Unoffcial Committee of Unsecured Creditors To Employ Strauss and Troy as Special Copunsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Scheduled for 2:30 8/21/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [469-1] Motion For An Order Approving Sharing Agreement With Respect To Certain Litigation by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Scheduled for 2:30 8/21/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [472-1] Objection by GE Capital Corporation Scheduled for 2:30 8/21/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [473-1] (1cd)
August 1, 2002 Filing 472 Objection By Creditor GE Capital Corporation To [469-1] Motion For An Order Approving Sharing Agreement With Respect To Certain Litigation by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [472-1] (1cd)
July 13, 2002 Filing 471 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: 468. (1cd)
July 12, 2002 Filing 470 Notice by Richard Boydston for Creditor Keyboard Acceptance Corporation, Creditor Ray Hamilton Companies, Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation, Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company Re: [469-1] Motion For An Order Approving Sharing Agreement With Respect To Certain Litigation by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [470-1] (1cd)
July 12, 2002 Filing 469 Joint Motion by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwight's Piano Company For An Order Approving Sharing Agreement With Respect To Certain Litigation [469-1] (1cd)
July 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Order Vacating [467-1] To File Written Status Report Order To File: Verbal Status Report [468-2] (1sd)
July 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Order to File Status Report ;Response Due on 8/16/02 [467-1] (1sd)
July 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Scheduling Order RE: [456-1] Motion For An Order Of Distribution of Proceeds by Multi-Craft Contractors Inc Scheduled for 10:00 9/24/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [460-1] Response by Timothy J Hurley Scheduled for 10:00 9/24/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [464-1] Response by Jeffrey A Marks Scheduled for 10:00 9/24/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [466-1] (1sd)
July 3, 2002 Filing 465 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Reconsider [461-1] Order Denying Application of The Unoffcial Committee of Unsecured Creditors To Employ Strauss and Troy as Special Copunsel for a Limited Purpose . [465-1] (1sd)
July 1, 2002 Filing 464 Response By Jeffrey A Marks for Attorney Jeffrey A Marks, Creditor GE Capital Corporation, Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation To [462-1] Response To Motion For An Order Of Distribution Of Proceeds by Shannon Reed Himes, Timothy J Hurley . [464-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2002 Filing 463 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: 461. (1cd)
June 28, 2002 Filing 462 Joint Omnibus Response By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Shannon Reed Himes for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [402-1] Order, [457-2] stipulation by National City Leasing Corporation, National City Bank . [462-1] (1cd)
June 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Order Denying [454-1] Application To Employ Richard S Wayne As Special Counsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Richard S Wayne Terminated [461-1] (1cd)
June 24, 2002 Filing 460 Response By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company To [456-1] Motion For An Order Of Distribution of Proceeds by Multi-Craft Contractors Inc . [460-1] (1cd)
June 19, 2002 Filing 459 Objection By Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation To [454-1] Application To Employ Richard S Wayne As Special Counsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [459-1] (1cd)
June 7, 2002 Filing 458 Notice by Angela D Dodd for Creditor Securities and Exchange Commission Re: Change of Address [458-1] (1cd)
June 5, 2002 Filing 457 Stipulation By and Between Creditor National City Bank, Creditor National City Leasing Corporation For [447-1] Motion For Allowance of Administrative Expenses Claims by Deutsche Financial Services Corporation, Keyboard Acceptance Corporation, [449-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Keyboard Corporation To Extend Time To Respond to Application for Administrative Expenses [457-2] (1cd)
June 3, 2002 Filing 456 Motion by Creditor Multi-Craft Contractors Inc For An Order Of Distribution of Proceeds [456-1] (1cd)
May 30, 2002 Filing 454 Application By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Employ Richard S Wayne As Special Counsel for a Limited Purpose . [454-1] (1cd)
May 30, 2002 Complaint (02-1158) Bolero Investment Group Inc vs. Karen L Hendricks . NOS 454 Recover Money/Property , NOS 498 Other Action, Not Related . ( Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 00133251) [1-2] (1cd)
May 18, 2002 Filing 453 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: 450. (1cd)
May 17, 2002 Filing 452 Supplemental Affidavit Filed by Richard A. Robinson In Connection with Employment as Attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors RE: [81-1] Application To Employ Edward L Ripley by Baker & Hostetler LLP, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [452-1] (1cd)
May 15, 2002 Filing 451 Motion By Creditor Textron Financial Corporation For Administrative Expenses [451-1] (1cd)
May 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Order Granting [448-1] Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by William E. Johnson Esq for Keyboard Corporation [450-1] (1cd)
May 13, 2002 Filing 449 Motion By Creditor Keyboard Corporation For Administrative Expenses [449-1] (1cd)
May 13, 2002 Filing 448 Motion By Creditor Keyboard Corporation To Appear Pro Hac Vice [448-1] (1cd)
May 13, 2002 Filing 447 Application By Creditor Keyboard Acceptance Corporation, Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation For Allowance of Administrative Expenses Claims [447-1] (1cd)
May 10, 2002 Filing 446 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: 440. (1cd)
May 9, 2002 Filing 445 Transcript of Hearing Held on May 2, 2002 [445-1] (1cd)
May 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Order Granting [383-1] Motion For Order Modifying Section J.(5) and Related Provisions of the Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief, To Extent Order is Contrary to Agreement and Representations at Hearing by National City Leasing Corporation [444-1] (1cd)
May 9, 2002 Filing 443 Agreed Protective Order by [443-1] Attorney Jeffrey A Marks, Creditor GE Capital Corporation, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwight's Piano Company, Governing Production (1cd)
May 8, 2002 Filing 442 Motion By Creditor Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor For Administrative Expenses [442-1] (1cd)
May 7, 2002 Filing 441 Motion By Creditor Thomas B DeGreve For Administrative Expenses [441-1] (1cd)
May 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Order Granting [379-1] Motion To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [440-1] (1cd)
May 6, 2002 Filing 439 Motion By Creditor Ray Hamilton Companies For Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim [439-1] (1cd)
May 3, 2002 Filing 455 Notice by Shannon Reed Himes for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Re: [454-1] Application To Employ Richard S Wayne As Special Counsel for a Limited Purpose by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [455-1] (1cd)
May 2, 2002 Filing 438 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: Calendar List . [438-1] (1cd)
April 30, 2002 Filing 437 Notice of Withdrawal/Continuation of Counsel Jeffrey A Marks as Attorney. Involvement of attorney Evan M Jones for General Electric Capital Corporation Terminated. [437-1] (1cd)
April 21, 2002 Filing 436 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
April 21, 2002 Filing 435 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
April 19, 2002 Filing 434 Response By Shannon Reed Himes for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [431-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by Jeffrey A Marks . [434-1] (1cd)
April 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Order Denying [428-2] Motion To Find GECC In Contempt by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Denying [429-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [428-1] Motion To Compel General Electric Capital Corp To Produce Documents In Accordance With Suboena Served Pursuant To Court Order by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [428-2] Motion To Find GECC In Contempt by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor ) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [433-1] (1cd)
April 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Order Granting [426-1] Motion To Extend Time For The Production of Discovery Responses by GE Capital Corporation [432-1] (1cd)
April 17, 2002 Filing 431 Brief/Memorandum By Jeffrey A Marks for Attorney Jeffrey A Marks, Creditor GE Capital Corporation In Opposition To [372-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [363-1] Motion For Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Purusant Under Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor ) by Jeffrey A Marks . [431-1] (1cd)
April 17, 2002 Filing 430 Response By Shannon Reed Himes for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [426-1] Motion To Extend Time For The Production of Discovery Responses by GE Capital Corporation . [430-1] (1cd)
April 16, 2002 Filing 429 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [428-1] Motion To Compel General Electric Capital Corp To Produce Documents In Accordance With Suboena Served Pursuant To Court Order by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [428-2] Motion To Find GECC In Contempt by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor ) . [429-1] (1sd)
April 16, 2002 Filing 428 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Compel General Electric Capital Corp To Produce Documents In Accordance With Suboena Served Pursuant To Court Order , To Find GECC In Contempt [428-2] (1sd)
April 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Order Granting [425-1] Motion To Continue Hearing Re: [379-1] Motion To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [398-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation by Dwight's Piano Company Hearing reset To 10:00 5/2/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Hearing reset To 10:00 5/2/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [427-1] (1sd)
April 15, 2002 Filing 426 Motion By Creditor GE Capital Corporation To Extend Time For The Production of Discovery Responses . [426-1] (1sd)
April 10, 2002 Filing 425 Motion By Debtor Dwight's Piano Company To Continue Hearing Re: [379-1] Motion To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [398-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation [425-1] (1sd)
April 4, 2002 Filing 424 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
April 3, 2002 Filing 423 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
April 3, 2002 Filing 422 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
April 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Order Granting [392-1] Application For Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the Peirod June 2001 to January 31, 2002 ( Fees: $ 257,188.00 Expenses: $ 34,463.70) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor payment to Richard A. Robinson of $243,893.00 in fees and $32,879.20 in expenses [421-1] (1cd)
March 29, 2002 Filing 420 Request by Creditor Tim Shields For Notice. [420-1] (1cd)
March 29, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Order Granting [366-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 266,654.50, Expenses: $ 433.00) by Financial Resource Associates Inc payment to Financial Resource Associates of $266,654.50 in fees and $433.00 in expenses [419-1] (1cd)
March 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order Granting [365-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $607,219.00, Expenses: $ 35,737.37) by Timothy J Hurley payment to Timothy J. Hurley of $607,219.00 in fees and $35,737.37 in expenses [418-1] (1cd)
March 27, 2002 Filing 417 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [365-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 607,219.00, Expenses: $ 35,737.37) by Timothy J Hurley, [366-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 266,654.50, Expenses: $ 433.00) by Financial Resource Associates Inc, [392-1] Application For Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the Peirod June 2001 to January 31, 2002 ( Fees: $ 257,188.00 Expenses: $ 34,463.70) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [395-1] Objection by Thomas B DeGreve . [417-1] Orders due in 7 days. (1cd)
March 26, 2002 Filing 415 Request by IOS Capital Inc For Removal From Notice. [415-1] (1cd)
March 25, 2002 Filing 416 Limited Objection By Creditor National City Leasing Corporation To [392-1] Application For Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the Peirod June 2001 to January 31, 2002 ( Fees: $ 257,188.00 Expenses: $ 34,463.70) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [416-1] (1cd)
March 25, 2002 Filing 413 Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Fees in the Amount of 13,295.00 Associated with non-working Travel in Connection with First Interim Application of Baker and Hostetler LLP for Allowance of Attorney's Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the period of June 2001 to January 31, 2002 by Shannon Reed Himes for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Re: [392-1] Application For Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the Peirod June 2001 to January 31, 2002 ( Fees: $ 257,188.00 Expenses: $ 34,463.70) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [413-1] (1cd)
March 22, 2002 Filing 414 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: Order Striking Notice of Last Day to File Proof of Claim. (1cd)
March 22, 2002 Filing 412 Response By Jeffrey A Marks for Attorney Jeffrey A Marks, Creditor GE Capital Corporation To [383-1] Motion For Order Modifying Section J.(5) and Related Provisions of the Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief, To Extent Order is Contrary to Agreement and Representations at Hearing by National City Leasing Corporation . [412-1] (1cd)
March 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Order To Strike Notice Of Last Day To File Proofs Of Claim [408-1] with Mailing Certificate [411-1] (1cd)
March 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Order to Set Hearing RE: [383-1] Motion For Order Modifying Section J.(5) and Related Provisions of the Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief, To Extent Order is Contrary to Agreement and Representations at Hearing by National City Leasing Corporation Scheduled for 10:00 5/2/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [404-1] Opposition Brief/Memorandum by Shannon Reed Himes Scheduled for 10:00 5/2/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [410-1] (1cd)
March 19, 2002 Filing 409 Response By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company To [397-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Ryder Truck Rental Inc and Bondy Piano [409-1] (1cd)
March 18, 2002 Filing 406 Joinder By Richard Boydston for Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation In Support Of [405-1] Response by Richard Boydston . [406-1] (1cd)
March 18, 2002 Filing 405 Response By Richard Boydston for Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation To [383-1] Motion For Order Modifying Section J.(5) and Related Provisions of the Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief, To Extent Order is Contrary to Agreement and Representations at Hearing by National City Leasing Corporation . [405-1] (1cd)
March 16, 2002 Filing 408 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice Fixing Bar Date. (1cd)
March 16, 2002 Filing 407 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: Doc. 407 Order Fixing Bar Date. (1cd)
March 14, 2002 Filing 404 Brief/Memorandum By Shannon Reed Himes for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor In Opposition To [383-1] Motion For Order Modifying Section J.(5) and Related Provisions of the Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief, To Extent Order is Contrary to Agreement and Representations at Hearing by National City Leasing Corporation . [404-1] (1cd)
March 14, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Order Fixing Proof of Claims Bar Date. Deadline to File is 4:00 5/15/02 [403-1] FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIM DEADLINE ONLY. (1cd)
March 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Order Granting [381-1] Motion For Order Setting Administrative Bar Date and Establishing Notice Procedures by Dwight's Piano Company [402-1] (1cd)
March 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Scheduling Order to Set Hearing RE: [379-1] Motion To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Scheduled for 10:00 4/23/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [398-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation Scheduled for 10:00 4/23/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [401-1] (1cd)
March 13, 2002 Filing 400 Notice by Steven V Miller for Creditor Metronome Music Re: [399-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Metronome Music [400-1] (1cd)
March 13, 2002 Filing 399 Motion By Creditor Metronome Music For Administrative Expenses [399-1] (1cd)
March 11, 2002 Filing 398 Objection By Creditor National City Leasing Corporation To [379-1] Motion To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [398-1] (1cd)
March 8, 2002 Filing 397 Motion By Creditor Ryder Truck Rental Inc For Administrative Expenses [397-1] (1cd)
March 7, 2002 Filing 396 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwight's Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwight's Piano Company, [352-1] Response by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, [357-1] Amended Motion by Timothy J Hurley, [390-1] Response by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [396-1] Matter Continued to 4/23/02 10:00. (1cd)
March 4, 2002 Filing 395 Objection By Creditor Thomas B DeGreve To [365-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 607,219.00, Expenses: $ 35,737.37) by Timothy J Hurley, [366-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 266,654.50, Expenses: $ 433.00) by Financial Resource Associates Inc . [395-1] (1cd)
March 3, 2002 Filing 394 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
March 1, 2002 Filing 393 Notice of Hearing Re: [392-1] Application For Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the Peirod June 2001 to January 31, 2002 ( Fees: $ 257,188.00 Expenses: $ 34,463.70) by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Scheduled For 10:00 3/27/02 in Judge Aug's Courtroom [393-1] (1gb)
March 1, 2002 Filing 392 First Interim Application of Baker and Hostetler LLP for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor For Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses for the Peirod June 2001 to January 31, 2002 ( Fees: $ 257,188.00 Expenses: $ 34,463.70) . [392-1] (1cd)
February 27, 2002 Filing 391 Response By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company To [373-1] Motion Motion to Stay the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examiniation of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 by GE Capital Corporation . [391-1] (1cd)
February 27, 2002 Filing 390 Response By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [357-1] Amended Motion by Timothy J Hurley . [390-1] (1cd)
February 27, 2002 Filing 389 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Order Denying [370-1] Motion Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004; Request for Hearing by GE Capital Corporation [388-1] (1cd)
February 25, 2002 Filing 387 Objection By Creditor Everstrong Inc To [365-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 607,219.00, Expenses: $ 35,737.37) by Timothy J Hurley, [366-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 266,654.50, Expenses: $ 433.00) by Financial Resource Associates Inc . [387-1] (1cd)
February 25, 2002 Filing 386 Response By Jeffrey A Marks for Attorney Jeffrey A Marks, Creditor GE Capital Corporation To [377-1] Objection by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor. [386-1] (1cd)
February 25, 2002 Filing 385 Motion By Creditor Ryder Truck Rental Inc For Administrative Expenses [385-1] (1cd)
February 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Order Denying [359-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof of Claim on behalf of Korean American Musical Instrument Corp and Samick Musical Instrument Corporation by Samick Musical Intruments Co Ltd, Korean American Musical Instrument Corp [384-1] (1cd)
February 25, 2002 Labels Printed. (1cd)
February 21, 2002 Filing 383 Motion by Creditor National City Leasing Corporation For Order Modifying Section J.(5) and Related Provisions of the Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief, To Extent Order is Contrary to Agreement and Representations at Hearing [383-1] (1cd)
February 20, 2002 Filing 382 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company Re: [381-1] Motion For Order Setting Administrative Bar Date and Establishing Notice Procedures by Dwight's Piano Company [382-1] (1cd)
February 20, 2002 Filing 381 Motion by Debtor Dwight's Piano Company For Order Setting Administrative Bar Date and Establishing Notice Procedures [381-1] (1cd)
February 20, 2002 Filing 380 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwight's Piano Company Re: [379-1] Motion To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration by Dwight's Piano Company, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [380-1] (1cd)
February 20, 2002 Filing 379 Joint Motion by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwight's Piano Company To Modify The Terms of Employment and Retention of Professionals of the Debtors and the Committee, Approve the Terms of Compensation of the Debtors' Designated Person, and Secure Costs of Administration [379-1] (1cd)
February 19, 2002 Filing 377 Objection By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [370-1] Motion Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004; Request for Hearing by GE Capital Corporation . [377-1] (1cd)
February 14, 2002 Filing 378 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
February 13, 2002 Filing 376 Protective Order Staying [367-1] Order Granting [373-1] Motion to Stay the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examiniation of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 by GE Capital Corporation [376-1] (1cd)
February 12, 2002 Filing 374 Notice of Hearing Re: [365-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 607,219.00, Expenses: $ 35,737.37) by Timothy J Hurley Scheduled For 2:00 3/27/02 in Judge Aug's Courtroom and Re: [366-1] Application For Compensation ( Fees: $ 266,654.50, Expenses: $ 433.00) by Financial Resource Associates Inc Scheduled For 2:00 3/27/02 in Judge Aug's Courtroom [374-1] (1gb)
February 11, 2002 Filing 375 Response By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [373-1] Motion Motion to Stay the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examiniation of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 by GE Capital Corporation . [375-1] (1cd)
February 11, 2002 Filing 373 Motion by Creditor GE Capital Corporation Motion to Stay the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examiniation of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 [373-1] (1cd)
February 11, 2002 Filing 372 Motion By Jeffrey A Marks for Attorney Jeffrey A Marks, Creditor GE Capital Corporation To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [363-1] Motion For Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Purusant Under Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor ) . [372-1] (1cd)
February 7, 2002 Filing 371 Response and Objection By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [359-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof of Claim on behalf of Korean American Musical Instrument Corp and Samick Musical Instrument Corporation by Samick Musical Intruments Co Ltd, Korean American Musical Instrument Corp . [371-1] (1cd)
February 4, 2002 Filing 370 Motion by Creditor GE Capital Corporation Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Approving the Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004; Request for Hearing [370-1] (1cd)
February 4, 2002 Filing 369 Stipulation and Agreed Entry by [369-1] Creditor Gibson Piano Ventures, Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwights Piano Company, Set Hearing RE: [357-1] Amended Motion by Timothy J Hurley For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale Their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363(b) and (f) Hearing reset to 2:00 3/7/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom (1cd)
February 4, 2002 Last day for Objections to [357-1] Amended Motion by Timothy J Hurley Due: 4:00 2/27/02 (1cd)
January 30, 2002 Filing 368 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
January 25, 2002 Labels Printed. (1cd)
January 24, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Order Granting [363-1] Motion For Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Purusant Under Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [367-1] (1cd)
January 23, 2002 Filing 366 Application By Financial Resource Associates Inc for consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc For Compensation ( Fees: $ 266,654.50, Expenses: $ 433.00) . [366-1] (1cd)
January 23, 2002 Filing 365 Application By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwights Piano Company For Compensation ( Fees: $ 607,219.00, Expenses: $ 35,737.37) . [365-1] (1cd)
January 23, 2002 Filing 364 Proceeding Memo Hearing (NOT HELD). [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company . Hearing Not Held or Rescheduled., [352-1] Response by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation [364-1] Parties Want to Continue to a Later Date. (1cd)
January 18, 2002 Filing 363 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor For Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and to Obtain the Production of Documents Purusant Under Rule 2004 . [363-1] (1cd)
January 17, 2002 Filing 361 Notice by Daniel A Austin for Creditor Korean American Musical Instrument Corp Re: [359-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof of Claim on behalf of Korean American Musical Instrument Corp and Samick Musical Instrument Corporation by Samick Musical Intruments Co Ltd, Korean American Musical Instrument Corp [361-1] (1cd)
January 17, 2002 Filing 360 Brief/Memorandum By Daniel A Austin for Creditor Korean American Musical Instrument Corp In Support Of [359-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof of Claim on behalf of Korean American Musical Instrument Corp and Samick Musical Instrument Corporation by Samick Musical Intruments Co Ltd, Korean American Musical Instrument Corp . [360-1] (1cd)
January 17, 2002 Filing 359 Motion By Creditor Korean American Musical Instrument Corp, Creditor Samick Musical Intruments Co Ltd To Extend Time To File Proof of Claim on behalf of Korean American Musical Instrument Corp and Samick Musical Instrument Corporation . [359-1] (1cd)
January 16, 2002 Filing 362 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
January 14, 2002 Filing 358 Amended Schedules Amendment to List of Creditors And Certificate of Service. ( Filing Fee $ 20.00 Receipt # 00126144) [358-1] (1cd)
January 14, 2002 Filing 357 Amended Motion by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwights Piano Company RE: [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company [357-1] (1cd)
January 11, 2002 Labels Printed. (1sd)
January 10, 2002 Filing 356 Agreed Order and Stipulation by [356-1] Creditor Mississippi Workers' Commission, Debtor Dwights Piano Company Temporarily Granting [334-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00125073) by Mississippi Workers' Commission (1sd)
January 10, 2002 Filing 355 Proceeding Memo Hearing (NOT HELD). [332-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by State of Michigan, [334-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00125073) by Mississippi Workers' Commission, [346-1] Response by Timothy J Hurley [355-1] (1sd)
January 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Stipulation and Order To Continue Hearing Re: [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company Hearing reset to 2:00 1/23/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [354-2] (1cd)
January 8, 2002 Filing 353 Proceeding Memo Hearing (NOT HELD). [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company . Hearing Not Held. [353-1] Agreed Entry continuing hearing due in 10 days. (1cd)
January 7, 2002 Adversary Case (01-1338) Closed. (1cd)
January 7, 2002 Disposition of Adversary (01-1338) Dismissing [1-1] Complaint NOS 435 Validity/Priority/Extent Lien (1cd)
January 4, 2002 Filing 352 Response By Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation for Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation To [337-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company ) by Ronald E Gold, Timothy J Hurley . [352-1] (1cd)
January 4, 2002 Filing 351 Response By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwights Piano Company To [332-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by State of Michigan . [351-1] (1cd)
January 3, 2002 Filing 350 Limited Objection By Creditor National City Leasing Corporation To [332-1] Request For Administrative Expenses by State of Michigan . [350-1] (1cd)
January 2, 2002 Filing 349 Motion By Creditor Department of Revenue For Administrative Expenses [349-1] (1cd)
January 2, 2002 Filing 348 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
January 2, 2002 Filing 347 Court's Certificate of Mailing. (1cd)
January 2, 2002 Filing 346 Response By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwights Piano Company To [334-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00125073) by Mississippi Workers' Commission . [346-1] (1cd)
December 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Order To Continue Hearing Re: [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company Hearing reset to 2:00 1/8/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [345-2] (1sd)
December 28, 2001 Filing 344 Stipulation and Agreed Order by [344-1] Creditor Gibson Piano Ventures, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Debtor Dwights Piano Company, Declaring Gibson Piano Ventures Inc The Legal Representative of the Debtos' Interest In Certain Wholly Owned Subsidiaries and (B) ThatGibson Piano Ventures Inc Shall Have Standing To Appear In Mexican Judicial and Administrative Proceedings And Negotiate With Parties In Interest On Behalf Of the Debtors' Interest In Such Wholly Owned Subsidiaries (1sd)
December 28, 2001 Last day for Objections/Responses to [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company Due: 1/4/02 (1sd)
December 27, 2001 Filing 343 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company . [343-1] (1sd)
December 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Order to Set Final Hearing RE: [334-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00125073) by Mississippi Workers' Commission Scheduled for 10:15 1/10/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [340-1] (fe)
December 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Scheduling Order RE: [332-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by State of Michigan Hearing Scheduled for 10:15 1/10/02 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [339-1] (fe)
December 26, 2001 Labels Printed. (fe)
December 26, 2001 Last day for Objections/Responses to [334-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00125073) by Mississippi Workers' Commission Due: 1/3/02 1/3/02 (fe)
December 21, 2001 Filing 342 Clerk's Notice with Certificate of Mailing Regarding [335-1] Assignment of Claim. [342-1] (1sd)
December 21, 2001 Filing 341 Report to Court Re: Sale. Filed By Debtor Dwights Piano Company [341-1] (1ef)
December 21, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Order Granting [337-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company ) by Ronald E Gold, Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 2:00 12/27/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [338-1] (1cd)
December 21, 2001 Filing 337 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Dwights Piano Company, Ronald E Gold for Creditor Gibson Piano Ventures, Creditor Gibson Guitar Corporation To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [336-1] Motion For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). by Dwights Piano Company, Gibson Piano Ventures, Dwights Piano Company ) . [337-1] (1cd)
December 21, 2001 Filing 336 Joint Emergency Motion by Debtor Dwights Piano Company Creditor Gibson Piano Ventures Inc, Debtor Dwights Piano Company For Order Approving Stock Transfer Agreement and Authorizing Debtors to Transfer by Private Sale their Ownership Interests in Certain Subsidiaries to Gibson Pianos Ventures, Inc and HJKP Acquisition Corp Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant ot U.S.C. 363(b) and (f). [336-1] (1cd)
December 20, 2001 Filing 335 Assignment of Claim by Creditor Music Trades Claim Assigned to Creditor Amroc Investments LLC. [335-1] (1cd)
December 17, 2001 Filing 334 Motion By Creditor Mississippi Workers' Commission For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00125073) Last Day for Objections 1/6/02 [334-1] (1cd)
December 11, 2001 Filing 333 Clerk's Notice with Certificate of Mailing Regarding [329-1] Assignment of Claim. [333-1] (1cd)
December 10, 2001 Filing 330 Notice by Creditor Jenean A Swindle Re: [329-1] Claims Assignment Claim Assigned to Creditor Jenean A Swindle. by Manpower Inc [330-1] (1cd)
December 10, 2001 Filing 329 Assignment of Claim by Creditor Manpower Inc Claim Assigned to Creditor Jenean A Swindle. [329-1] (1cd)
December 3, 2001 Filing 328 Request by Creditor CenturyTel of Northwest Arkansas LLC For Notice. [328-1] (1cd)
November 30, 2001 Labels Printed. (1cd)
November 29, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Order Granting [315-1] Motion To Fix Time for Accepting or Rejecting Executory Contract by Southland Marketing Inc [327-1] (1cd)
November 19, 2001 Filing 326 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: Asignement of Claim. (1cd)
November 19, 2001 Filing 325 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: Asignment of Claim. (1cd)
November 19, 2001 Filing 324 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: Assignment of Claim. (1cd)
November 19, 2001 Filing 323 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: Assignment of Claim. (1cd)
November 19, 2001 Filing 322 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: Asignment of Claim. (1cd)
November 18, 2001 Filing 319 Assignment of Claim by Creditor ETV Endownment Claim Assigned to Creditor Amroc Investments LLC. [319-1] (1cd)
November 16, 2001 Filing 331 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Peggy A Housner for Creditor State of Michigan. [331-1] (1cd)
November 16, 2001 Filing 321 Assignment of Claim by Creditor Imports of High Point Inc Claim Assigned to Creditor Amroc Investments LLC. [321-1] (1cd)
November 16, 2001 Filing 320 Assignment of Claim by Creditor Sparkes Tarzian Inc Claim Assigned to Creditor Amroc Investments LLC. [320-1] (1cd)
November 16, 2001 Filing 318 Assignment of Claim by Creditor Amroc Investments LLC Claim Assigned to . [318-1] (1cd)
November 16, 2001 Filing 317 Assignment of Claim by Creditor Brainerd Industries Claim Assigned to Creditor Amroc Investments LLC. [317-1] (1cd)
November 13, 2001 Filing 332 Motion By Creditor State of Michigan For Administrative Expenses [332-1] (1cd)
November 8, 2001 Filing 316 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding The Sale Of Substantially All Property Of The Debtors and Debtors-In- Possession Outside The Ordinary Course Of Business [316-1] Order [310-1] (1cd)
November 7, 2001 Filing 315 Renewed Motion by Creditor Southland Marketing Inc To Fix Time for Accepting or Rejecting Executory Contract [315-1] (1cd)
November 2, 2001 Filing 314 Certificate Of Service By Raymond J Pikna for Creditor National City Leasing Corporation, Creditor National City Bank Of [312-1] Document by National City Bank, National City Leasing Corporation . [314-1] (1cd)
November 1, 2001 Filing 313 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By David G Aelvoet for Creditor City of El Paso. [313-1] (1cd)
November 1, 2001 Filing 312 Creditor National City Leasing Corporation, Creditor National City Bank Verified Statement Pursuant To Rule 2019 of the Bankruptcy Code [312-1] (1cd)
October 31, 2001 Filing 311 Brief/Memorandum By Raymond J Pikna for Creditor National City Leasing Corporation, Creditor National City Bank In Opposition To [263-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Frank R Pepper, [252-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Andrew T Tershak, [224-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Department of the Treasury, [220-1] Motion For Chapter 11 Administrative Expenses by Crocker Realty Trust LP . [311-1] (1cd)
October 31, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors-In Possession Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief Re: [195-1] Motion Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction for Substantially all of Debtors' Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [310-1] (1cd)
October 25, 2001 Filing 309 Transcript of Hearing Held on Monday, October 15, 2001 [309-1] (1cd)
October 24, 2001 Filing 308 Debtors' Opposition To Requests For Payment of Administrative Expneses By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company In Opposition To [263-1] Motion For Administrative Expenses by Frank R Pepper . [308-1] (1cd)
October 24, 2001 Filing 307 Report Of Operations to September 2001 [307-1] (1cd)
October 23, 2001 Filing 306 Memorandum Order Accepting Filing of Proof of Claim and Providing 20 Day Objection Period [306-2] (1cd)
October 22, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Order Granting [260-1] Motion To Extend Time To Elect To Assume Or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [305-1] (1cd)
October 17, 2001 Filing 304 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert W Lowrey for Creditor International Chemical Workers Union, Creditor Bargaining Unit Member Employees. [304-1] (1cd)
October 16, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Order Modifying [303-1] Order Granting Motion of Debtor and Debtor In Possession Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtor's Real Property (Cobb County Georgia) by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate. [172-1] (1cd)
October 15, 2001 Filing 302 Objection By Creditor Malouf-Carr LP To [260-1] Motion To Extend Time To Elect To Assume Or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [302-1] (1cd)
October 15, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Order Granting [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [301-1] (1cd)
October 15, 2001 Filing 300 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [195-3] Motion Approving the Manner of Notice of the Auction and the Hearing on Approval of the Auction Sale by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [238-1] Order . [300-1] (1cd)
October 12, 2001 Filing 299 Notice by Evan M Jones for Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation Re: The Sale of Substantially all of the Assets of the Debtors. [299-1] (1cd)
October 11, 2001 Filing 298 Notice by Richard Boydston for Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation, Deutsche Financial Services, Division of Deutsche Bank Canada and Keyboard Acceptance Corporation Re: Interests [298-1] (1cd)
October 11, 2001 Filing 297 Notice by Raymond J Pikna for Creditor National City Leasing Corporation, Creditor National City Bank Re: Interests [297-1] (1cd)
October 11, 2001 Complaint (01-1338) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor vs. General Electric Capital Corporation . NOS 435 Validity/Priority/Extent Lien . ( Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 00121855) [1-1] (1cd)
October 10, 2001 Filing 296 Stipulation By and Between Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Amend Schedules [296-2] (1cd)
October 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Order Granting [275-1] Motion To Enter Into An Exclusive Auction Agreement For The Sale Of The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility Outside The Ordinary Course Of Business and Free and Clear Of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than The Estate And by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [275-2] Motion To Conduct Liquidation Sales And To Sell The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [295-1] (1cd)
October 10, 2001 Filing 294 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [275-1] Motion To Enter Into An Exclusive Auction Agreement For The Sale Of The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility Outside The Ordinary Course Of Business and Free and Clear Of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than The Estate And by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [275-2] Motion To Conduct Liquidation Sales And To Sell The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [290-1] Objection by Ayshire Electronics LLC . [294-1] (1cd)
October 10, 2001 Filing 291 Limited Objection By General Electric Capital Corporation To [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [291-1] (1cd)
October 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Order Granting [249-1] Motion For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [293-1] (1cd)
October 9, 2001 Filing 292 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By W Thomas Halbleib for Creditor Ayshire Electronics LLC . [292-1] (1cd)
October 9, 2001 Filing 290 Objection By Creditor Ayshire Electronics LLC To [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [290-1] (1cd)
October 9, 2001 Filing 289 Response By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [268-1] Motion To Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and To Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [289-1] (1cd)
October 9, 2001 Filing 288 Response By Evan M Jones for Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation To [268-1] Motion To Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and To Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [288-1] (1cd)
October 5, 2001 Filing 287 Notice of Hearing Re: [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10:00 10/10/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [287-1] (1cd)
October 5, 2001 Filing 286 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [284-1]Re: Edpedited Hearing Notice . [286-1] (1cd)
October 5, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order Granting [283-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 10:00 10/10/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [285-1] (1cd)
October 4, 2001 Filing 284 Notice of Hearing Re: [283-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Scheduled for 10:00 10/10/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [284-1] (1cd)
October 4, 2001 Filing 283 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [282-1] Motion To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [283-1] (1cd)
October 4, 2001 Filing 282 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Authority Pursuant To Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code To Sell The Debtors' Remianing Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property By Private Sale Outside The Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate . [282-1] (1cd)
October 4, 2001 Filing 281 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [280-1] Order Granting Expedited Hearing. [281-1] (1cd)
October 4, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Order Granting [276-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [275-1] Motion To Enter Into An Exclusive Auction Agreement For The Sale Of The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility Outside The Ordinary Course Of Business and Free and Clear Of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than The Estate And by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [275-2] Motion To Conduct Liquidation Sales And To Sell The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Preliminary Hearing Reset for 10:00 10/10/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Preliminary Hearing Reset for 10:00 10/10/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [280-1] (1cd)
October 3, 2001 Filing 279 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [249-1] Motion For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [264-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation . [279-1] (1cd)
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part [268-1] Motion To Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and To Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [278-1] (1cd)
October 3, 2001 Filing 276 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [275-1] Motion To Enter Into An Exclusive Auction Agreement For The Sale Of The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility Outside The Ordinary Course Of Business and Free and Clear Of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than The Estate And by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [275-2] Motion To Conduct Liquidation Sales And To Sell The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [276-1] (1cd)
October 3, 2001 Filing 275 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Authority, Pursuant To Sections 327 and 363 Of The Bankruptcy Code, To Enter Into An Exclusive Auction Agreement For The Sale Of The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility Outside The Ordinary Course Of Business and Free and Clear Of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than The Estate And , To Conduct Liquidation Sales And To Sell The Assets At Baldwin's Greenwood, Mississippi Facility [275-2] (1cd)
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part [266-1] Motion To Modify Paragraph 15 of the Final Order (A) Authorizing Post Petition Financing by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor and Denying as Moot the [267-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [266-1] Motion To Modify Paragraph 15 of the Final Order (A) Authorizing Post Petition Financing by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor and Extending the Deadline for Filing Actions Challenging the Release and Lien Validation Granted to GECC from October 4, 2001 to October 12, 2001 . [274-2] (1gb)
October 3, 2001 Filing 273 Memorandum By Attorney Jeffrey A Marks on Behalf of Creditor GE Capital Corporation In Opposition To [266-1] Motion To Modify Paragraph 15 of the Final Order (A) Authorizing Post Petition Financing by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor. [273-1] (1gb)
October 2, 2001 Filing 277 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [251-1] Order Granting Expexited Hearing. [277-1] (1cd)
October 2, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Order Granting [270-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Individual Proof of Claims by Bargaining Unit Member Employees until October 31, 2001 [271-1] (1cd)
October 2, 2001 Filing 269 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Expedite Consideration Re: ( [268-1] Motion To Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and To Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Rule 2004 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor ) [269-1] (1cd)
October 2, 2001 Filing 268 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Conduct Examination of General Electric Capital Corporation and To Obtain the Production of Documents Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Rule 2004 [268-1] (1cd)
October 2, 2001 Filing 267 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Expedite Consideration Re: ( [266-1] Motion To Modify Paragraph 15 of the Final Order (A) Authorizing Post Petition Financing by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [266-2] Motion Granting Super Administrative Priority Expense Claim Status or in the Alternative for Standing to Commence Certain Actions Against GECC by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor ) [267-1] (1cd)
October 2, 2001 Filing 266 Motion By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To Modify Paragraph 15 of the Final Order (A) Authorizing Post Petition Financing and, Granting Super Administrative Priority Expense Claim Status or in the Alternative for Standing to Commence Certain Actions Against GECC [266-2] (1cd)
October 1, 2001 Filing 272 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [249-1] Motion For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [264-1] Objection by National City Leasing Corporation . [272-1] (1cd)
October 1, 2001 Filing 270 Motion By Creditor Bargaining Unit Member Employees To Extend Time To Individual Proof of Claims [270-1] (1cd)
September 28, 2001 Filing 265 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Stephen Tsai for Creditor Banger International Co Ltd. [265-1] (1cd)
September 28, 2001 Filing 264 Objection By Creditor National City Leasing Corporation To [249-1] Motion For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [264-1] (1cd)
September 28, 2001 Filing 263 Request for Payment By Creditor Frank R Pepper For Administrative Expenses [263-1] (1cd)
September 28, 2001 Filing 262 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Clifford J Henry for Creditor Conway Corporation, Creditor Earl Rogers. [262-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 261 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [260-1] Motion To Extend Time To Elect To Assume Or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [261-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 260 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Extend Time To Elect To Assume Or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property . [260-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 259 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [251-1] Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing. [259-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 258 Request by Creditor Chrysler Financial Company LLC For Notice. [258-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 257 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Mark N Hardig for Creditor Duane D Kimble. [257-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 256 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Clifford J Henry for Creditor Earl Rogers. [256-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Filing 255 Memorandum Order Holding In Abeyance [208-1] by Southland Marketing Inc Motion To Fix Time for Accepting or Rejecting Executory Contract, Holding In Abeyance [247-1] by Timothy J Hurley Opposition Brief/Memorandum [255-1] (1cd)
September 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Order Granting [205-1] Motion To Extend Time To File a Chapter 11 Plan and to Solicit Votes Thereon by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company; Chapter 11 Plan Due: 12/31/01 ; Ballots Due: 3/1/02 [254-1] (1cd)
September 26, 2001 Filing 253 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Phyllis M McKenzie for Creditor Adams Face Veneer Company Inc. [253-1] (1cd)
September 26, 2001 Filing 252 Motion By Creditor Andrew T Tershak For Administrative Expenses [252-1] (1cd)
September 25, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Order Granting [250-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [249-1] Motion For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 2:00 10/1/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [251-1] (1cd)
September 25, 2001 Filing 250 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [249-1] Motion For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [250-1] (1cd)
September 25, 2001 Filing 249 Motion by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Authority To Implement An Employee Service Plan [249-1] (1cd)
September 25, 2001 Filing 248 Report Of Operations to August 2001 [248-1] (1cd)
September 24, 2001 Filing 247 Brief/Memorandum By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company In Opposition To [208-1] Motion To Fix Time for Accepting or Rejecting Executory Contract by Southland Marketing Inc . [247-1] (1cd)
September 24, 2001 Filing 246 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [239-1] Memorandum Order, [240-1] Order Authorizing and Approving Certain Procedures for the Auction Sale of Substantially all Assets. [246-1] (1cd)
September 24, 2001 Filing 245 Notice of Auction of Substantially All Property of the Debtors and Debtors In Possession Notice of Hearing Re: [228-1], Immediately Following the Auction, Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10/15/01, Immediately Following the Auction, at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10/15/01, Immediately Following the Auction, at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10/15/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [245-1] (1cd)
September 24, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order Granting [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [244-1] (1cd)
September 21, 2001 Filing 243 Limited Objection By Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation To [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [243-1] (1cd)
September 21, 2001 Filing 242 Limited Objection By Creditor Gibson Guitar Corporation To [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [242-1] (1cd)
September 21, 2001 Filing 241 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [184-1] Objection by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [236-1] Response by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor . [241-1] (1cd)
September 21, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Order Authorizing and Approving Certain Procedures for the Auction Sale of Substantially All of the Assets of the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession RE: [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company; RE: [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company and RE: [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [240-1] (1gb)
September 21, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company; Granting in Part, Denying in Part [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company; Granting in Part, Denying in Part [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company; Granting in Part, Denying in Part [236-1] Response Thereto by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors; Granting in Part, Denying in Part [Document # Yet to be Assigned] Response Thereto by Deutsche Financial Services; Granting in Part, Denying in Part [Document # Yet to be Assigned] Response Thereto by the Gibson Guitar Corporation [239-1] (1gb)
September 20, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order Granting [195-1] Motion Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction for Substantially all of Debtors' Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [195-2] Motion Scheduling a Hearing on Approval of Sale at the Public Auction; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [195-3] Motion Approving the Manner of Notice of the Auction and the Hearing on Approval of the Auction Sale by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [238-1] (1cd)
September 20, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Order Granting [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [219-1] Amended Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Timothy J Hurley [237-1] (1cd)
September 20, 2001 Filing 236 Response By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [236-1] (1cd)
September 19, 2001 Filing 235 Amended Certificate of Service [232-1] Hearing Notice of . Filed by: Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [235-1] (1ma)
September 19, 2001 Filing 234 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [231-1] Order . [234-1] (1ma)
September 18, 2001 Filing 233 Response By Richard A Robinson for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [195-1] Motion Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction for Substantially all of Debtors' Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [195-2] Motion Scheduling a Hearing on Approval of Sale at the Public Auction; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [195-3] Motion Approving the Manner of Notice of the Auction and the Hearing on Approval of the Auction Sale by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [233-1] (1cd)
September 18, 2001 Filing 232 Notice of Expedited Hearing Re: [231-1] Order Scheduled for 10:30 9/21/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [232-1] (1cd)
September 18, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Order Granting [229-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 10:30 9/21/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Hearing reset To 10:30 9/21/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Hearing reset To 10:30 9/21/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [231-1] (1cd)
September 17, 2001 Filing 230 341 Meeting Held and Examination of Debtor. (1cd)
September 17, 2001 Filing 229 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [228-1] Motion Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-2] Motion Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [228-3] Motion Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [229-1] (1cd)
September 17, 2001 Filing 228 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company and Debtors-In-Possession Pursuant To Sections 105,363, and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code for Order Approving Procedures for the Submission of Competing Offers for the Sale of Substantially All Assets , Approving Certain Other Bidding Procedures , Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of the Auction and Sale Procedures Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 [228-3] (1cd)
September 17, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Order Granting in Part, Denying in Part [131-1] Motion To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [227-1] (1cd)
September 17, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order Granting [130-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to ll U.S.C. 365 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [226-1] (1cd)
September 14, 2001 Filing 225 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [223-2] Agreed Order by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [225-1] (1cd)
September 13, 2001 Filing 224 Request By Creditor Department of the Treasury For Administrative Expenses [224-1] (1cd)
September 13, 2001 Filing 223 Stipulation and Agreed Entry by [223-1] Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, To Continue Hearing Re: [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Hearing reset to 10:30 9/21/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [184-1] Objection by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor to Motion Hearing reset to 10:30 9/21/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom (1cd)
September 12, 2001 Filing 222 Agreed Entry by [222-1] Creditor Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Settling [131-1] Motion To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company (1cd)
September 12, 2001 Filing 221 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [130-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to ll U.S.C. 365 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [131-1] Motion To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [184-1] Objection by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor, [185-1] Objection by Crocker Realty Trust LP, [187-1] Objection by Nisbet Property Holdings Ltd, [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [219-1] Amended Document by Timothy J Hurley . [221-1] (1cd)
September 11, 2001 Filing 220 Motion For Payment By Creditor Crocker Realty Trust LP For Chapter 11 Administrative Expenses [220-1] (1cd)
September 7, 2001 Filing 219 Amended [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker . Filed by: Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [219-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 218 Report Of Operations for Baldwin Trading Company to July 2001 [218-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 217 Report Of Operations for The Wurlitzer Company to July 2001 [217-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 216 Amended [197-1] Operations Report for the period ending July 2001. Filed by: Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [216-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 215 Report Of Operations for Baldwin Trading Company to June 2001 [215-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 214 Report Of Operations for The Wurlitzer Company to June 2001 [214-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 213 Amended [196-1] Operations Report for the period ending June 2001. Filed by: Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [213-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 212 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [210-1] Order Granting Expedited Hearing on Application of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession to Employ and Retain Berwind Financial LP . [212-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Filing 211 Notice of Hearing Re: [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [211-1] (1cd)
September 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Order Granting [204-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Preliminary Hearing Reset for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [210-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 209 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert A Goering for Creditor Southland Marketing Inc. [209-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 208 Motion by Creditor Southland Marketing Inc To Fix Time for Accepting or Rejecting Executory Contract [208-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 207 Transcript of Hearing Held on August 22, 2001 [207-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 206 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [205-1] Motion To Extend Time To File a Chapter 11 Plan and to Solicit Votes Thereon by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [206-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 205 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Extend Time To File a Chapter 11 Plan and to Solicit Votes Thereon . [205-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 204 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [204-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 203 Affidavit Filed by Investment Banker Berwind Financial LP RE: [202-1] Application To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [203-1] (1cd)
September 5, 2001 Filing 202 Application By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Employ Berwind Financial L.P. as Investment Banker . Affidavit Filed. [202-1] (1cd)
August 30, 2001 Filing 201 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [194-1] Order To Employ and Retain The Nickle-Hill Group Inc As Real Estate Broker (Fayetteville Arkansas). [201-1] (1sd)
August 30, 2001 Filing 200 Amended [198-1] Notice of . Filed by: Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [200-1] (1sd)
August 29, 2001 Filing 199 Amended Certificate Of Service By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [195-1] Motion Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction for Substantially all of Debtors' Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [195-2] Motion Scheduling a Hearing on Approval of Sale at the Public Auction; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [195-3] Motion Approving the Manner of Notice of the Auction and the Hearing on Approval of the Auction Sale by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [199-1] (1sd)
August 29, 2001 Filing 198 Notice by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [195-1] Motion Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction for Substantially all of Debtors' Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [195-2] Motion Scheduling a Hearing on Approval of Sale at the Public Auction; by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [195-3] Motion Approving the Manner of Notice of the Auction and the Hearing on Approval of the Auction Sale by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [198-1] (1sd)
August 28, 2001 Filing 197 Report Of Operations for Period Ended July 2001 [197-1] (fe)
August 28, 2001 Filing 196 Report Of Operations for Period Ended June 2001 [196-1] (fe)
August 27, 2001 Filing 195 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction for Substantially all of Debtors' Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; Scheduling a Hearing on Approval of Sale at the Public Auction; , Approving the Manner of Notice of the Auction and the Hearing on Approval of the Auction Sale [195-3] (fe)
August 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Order Granting [144-1] Application To Employ Robert A. Nickle, Realtor by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [194-1] (fe)
August 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Order Approving First Amendment To Adequate Protection and Debtor-In-Possession Credit Agreement [193-2] (1sd)
August 22, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Scheduling Order to Set Hearing RE: [130-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to U.S.C. 365 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [131-1] Motion To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [184-1] Objection by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [185-1] Objection by Crocker Realty Trust LP Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [187-1] Objection by Nisbet Property Holdings Ltd Scheduled for 10:00 9/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [192-1] (1cd)
August 22, 2001 Filing 191 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [191-1] (1cd)
August 22, 2001 Filing 190 Objection By Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation To [188-2] Order to Amended DIP Financing. [190-1] (1cd)
August 21, 2001 Filing 189 Amended Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Steven T Halperin for Creditor Bondy Piano Inc, Interested Party Steven T Halperin. [189-1] (1cd)
August 20, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order Granting [57-2] Motion To Provide for Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting Super Administrative Priority Expense Claim Status [188-2] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 187 Objection By Creditor Nisbet Property Holdings Ltd To [130-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to ll U.S.C. 365 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [187-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 186 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Paul M Baisier for Creditor Crocker Realty Trust LP . [186-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 185 Objection By Creditor Crocker Realty Trust LP To [131-1] Motion To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [185-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 184 Limited Objection By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor To [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [184-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 183 Transcript of Hearing Held on 07/30/01 [183-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 182 Transcript of Hearing Held on 06/29/01 [182-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 181 Transcript of Hearing Held on 06/25/01 [181-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 180 Transcript of Hearing Held on 06/22/01 [180-1] (1cd)
August 17, 2001 Filing 177 Memorandum Order Denying [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO, Granting [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership Granting [149-1] Motion For Immediate Adequate Protection Payment or in the Alternative, Authorization to Terminate Service and Request to Shorten Notice period to Ten Days by Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor Granting [161-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00118798) by National City Leasing Corporation [177-1] (1cd)
August 16, 2001 Filing 179 Notice of Hearing On First Amendment to Adequate Protection and Debtor-In Possession Credit Agreement Between and Among Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession and General Electric Capital Corporation Re: Amended Agreement On DIP Financing. [179-1] (1cd)
August 16, 2001 Filing 178 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Steven T Halperin for Interested Party Steven T Halperin. [178-1] (1cd)
August 15, 2001 Filing 176 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Thomas J Geygan for Creditor Multi-Craft Contractors Inc . [176-1] (1cd)
August 15, 2001 Filing 175 Response By Creditor Multi-Craft Contractors Inc To [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [175-1] (1cd)
August 14, 2001 Filing 174 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO, [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership, [149-1] Motion For Immediate Adequate Protection Payment or in the Alternative, Authorization to Terminate Service and Request to Shorten Notice period to Ten Days by Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor, [158-1] Application To Employ Deloitte & Touche LLP Auditors and Tax Advisors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [169-1] Response by General Electric Capital Corporation . [174-1] (1cd)
August 14, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order Granting [158-1] Application To Employ Deloitte & Touche LLP Auditors and Tax Advisors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [173-1] (1cd)
August 14, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order Granting [86-1] Motion For Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtor's Real Property (Cobb County, Georgia) By Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [172-1] (1cd)
August 13, 2001 Filing 171 Request by Creditor Polytronix Inc For Notice. [171-1] (1cd)
August 13, 2001 Filing 170 Certificate Of Service By Raymond J Pikna for Creditor National City Leasing Corporation, Creditor National City Bank Of [163-2] Order Approving Motion of National City Leasing Corporation To Reduce Notice Period To Three Days Re: Relief From The Automatic Stay and an Order Requiring the Debtor to Make Lease Payments. [170-1] (1cd)
August 13, 2001 Filing 169 Limited Response By Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation To [149-1] Motion For Immediate Adequate Protection Payment or in the Alternative, Authorization to Terminate Service and Request to Shorten Notice period to Ten Days by Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor, [150-1] Motion To Reduce Notice Period on Motion For Adequate Protection, or Alternatively, To Terminate Service to Ten Days by Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor . [169-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 168 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [160-1] Order Granting Expedited Hearing on Application to Employ and Retain Deloitte & Touche LLP. [168-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 167 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [159-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [158-1] Application To Employ Deloitte & Touche LLP Auditors and Tax Advisors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley [167-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 166 Request by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America For Notice. [166-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 165 Certificate Of Service By Thomas W Coffey for Creditor Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor Of [154-1] Order Granting Motion To Reduce Notice Period. [165-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 164 Certificate Of Service By Creditor AFCO Of [148-1] Set Hearing Order . [164-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Order Granting [162-1] Motion To Shorten Time To Reduce Notice Period To Three Days for Relief From the Automatic Stay and an Order Requiring the Debtor to make Lease Payments by National City Leasing Corporation Hearing Set RE: [161-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00118798) by National City Leasing Corporation and for an Order Requiring Debtor to make Lease Payments, Hearing set for 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [163-2] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 162 Motion By Creditor National City Leasing Corporation To Shorten Time To Reduce Notice Period To Three Days for Relief From the Automatic Stay and an Order Requiring the Debtor to make Lease Payments . [162-1] (1cd)
August 10, 2001 Filing 161 Motion by Creditor National City Leasing Corporation For an Order requiring Debtor To Make Lease Payments [161-1] (1cd)
August 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order Granting [159-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [158-1] Application To Employ Deloitte & Touche LLP Auditors and Tax Advisors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [160-1] (1cd)
August 9, 2001 Filing 159 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [158-1] Application To Employ Deloitte & Touche LLP Auditors and Tax Advisors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [159-1] (1cd)
August 9, 2001 Filing 158 Application By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Employ Deloitte & Touche LLP Auditors and Tax Advisors . Affidavit Filed. [158-1] (1cd)
August 9, 2001 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert F Brown for Interested Party Robert F Brown. [157-1] (1cd)
August 6, 2001 Filing 156 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By E Jane Taylor for Creditor Bombardier Capital Inc. [156-1] (1cd)
August 6, 2001 Filing 155 Original Motion By Frederick S Coombs for Creditor AFCO To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO ) . [155-1] Document Number 152 is a Duplicate of this document. (1cd)
August 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order to Set Hearing RE: [149-1] Motion For Immediate Adequate Protection Payment or in the Alternative, Authorization to Terminate Service and Request to Shorten Notice period to Ten Days by Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor Scheduled for 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [154-1] (1cd)
August 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order Granting [152-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO ) by Frederick S Coombs III Hearing reset To 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [153-1] (1cd)
August 3, 2001 Filing 152 Motion By Frederick S Coombs for Creditor AFCO Credit Corporation To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO ) . [152-1] This document 152, is a duplicate of document 155. (1gb)
August 1, 2001 Filing 151 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Thomas W Coffey for Creditor Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor . [151-1] (1cd)
August 1, 2001 Filing 150 Motion By Creditor Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Cor To Reduce Notice Period on Motion For Adequate Protection, or Alternatively, To Terminate Service to Ten Days . [150-1] (1cd)
August 1, 2001 Filing 149 Emergency Motion By Creditor Craighead Rural Electric Cooperative Corporation For Immediate Adequate Protection Payment or in the Alternative, Authorization to Terminate Service and Request to Shorten Notice period to Ten Days [149-1] (1cd)
July 31, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Scheduling Order to Set Final Hearing RE: [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership Scheduled for 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [126-2] Motion An Order Requiring the Debtor To Make Certain Lease Payments by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership Scheduled for 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [127-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership, [126-2] Motion An Order Requiring the Debtor To Make Certain Lease Payments by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership ) by Louis F Solimine Scheduled for 10:00 8/14/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom With Certificate of Mailing [148-1] (1cd)
July 31, 2001 Filing 147 Memorandum Order Approving the DIP Financing with GECC and Resolving [134-1] Limited Objection to DIP Financing by Deutsche Financial Services Corporation Granting in Part, Denying in Part [133-1] Limited Objection by Baker & Hostetler LLP on Behalf of the Unsecured Creditors Committee and Granting in Part, Denying in Part [146-1] Reply Thereto by GE Capital Corporation [147-1] (1gb)
July 31, 2001 Filing 146 Response By GE Capital Corporation for Creditor GE Capital Corporation To [133-1] Objection by Baker & Hostetler LLP . [146-1] This is the original document of Document 141. (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 145 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [144-1] Application To Employ Robert A. Nickle, Realtor by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [145-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 144 Application By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Employ Robert A. Nickle, Realtor . Affidavit Filed. [144-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 143 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [142-1] Motion To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [143-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 142 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company and Debtors-In-Possession for Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Fayetteville, Arkansas Real Property by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held by Parties Other than the Estate [142-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 141 Response By Creditor GE Capital Corporation To [133-1] Objection by Baker & Hostetler LLP . [141-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 140 Certificate Of Service By Louis F Solimine for Creditor Duke Realty Limited Partnership Of [129-1] Scheduling Order . [140-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 139 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [136-1] Schedules, [137-1] Financial Affairs Statement . [139-1] (1cd)
July 30, 2001 Filing 138 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [127-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership, [126-2] Motion An Order Requiring the Debtor To Make Certain Lease Payments by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership ) by Louis F Solimine, [133-1] Objection by Baker & Hostetler LLP, [134-1] Objection by Deutsche Financial Services Corporation . [138-1] (1cd)
July 27, 2001 Filing 137 Statement of Financial Affairs. [137-1] (1cd)
July 27, 2001 Filing 136 Schedules Filed. Deadline for Missing Documents Satisfied. [136-1] (1cd)
July 26, 2001 Filing 134 Limited Objection By Creditor Deutsche Financial Services Corporation, Deutsche Financial Services and Keyboard Acceptance Corporation To Debtor's Motion Regarding GECC DIP Financing. [134-1] (1cd)
July 26, 2001 Filing 133 Limited Objection By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Committee by Attorney Baker & Hostetler LLP To Entry of a Final Order With Respect to Interim Order Authorizing Post Peition Financing and Granting Super Administrative Priority Expense Claim Status. [133-1] (1cd)
July 25, 2001 Filing 135 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert J Sidman for Interested Party Robert J Sidman. [135-1] (1cd)
July 25, 2001 Filing 132 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [130-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to ll U.S.C. 365 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [131-1] Motion To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [132-1] (1cd)
July 25, 2001 Filing 131 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Extend Time In Which The Debtors Must Elect To Assume or reject Unexprired Leases Of Non-Residential Real Property . [131-1] (1cd)
July 25, 2001 Filing 130 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to ll U.S.C. 365 . [130-1] (1cd)
July 25, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Scheduling Order Granting [127-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, [126-2] Motion An Order Requiring the Debtor To Make Certain Lease Payments by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, by Louis F Solimine Preliminary Hearing set for 2:00 7/30/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Preliminary Hearing set for 2:00 7/30/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [129-1] (1cd)
July 23, 2001 Filing 127 Motion By Louis F Solimine for Creditor Duke Realty Limited Partnership To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [126-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership, [126-2] Motion An Order Requiring the Debtor To Make Certain Lease Payments by Duke Realty Limited Partnership, Duke Realty Limited Partnership ) . [127-1] (1cd)
July 23, 2001 Filing 126 Motion By Creditor Duke Realty Limited Partnership Creditor Duke Realty Limited Partnership For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00117772) , An Order Requiring the Debtor To Make Certain Lease Payments [126-2] (1cd)
July 23, 2001 Filing 125 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Louis F Solimine for Creditor Duke Realty Limited Partnership. [125-1] (1cd)
July 20, 2001 Filing 128 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Daniel D Etzkorn for Creditor Arkansas Dept of Environmental Quality. [128-1] (1cd)
July 19, 2001 Filing 124 Request by Creditor EMI Pallets Inc For Notice. [124-1] (1cd)
July 16, 2001 Filing 123 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Jerome Reisman for Creditor Westgate Properties. [123-1] (1cd)
July 16, 2001 Filing 122 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Sheryl L Moreau for Creditor Missouri Department of Revenue. [122-1] (1cd)
July 16, 2001 Filing 121 Request by Creditor GE Capital Corporation For Notice. [121-1] (1cd)
July 16, 2001 Filing 120 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [116-1] Order Authorizing Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession To Reject Certain Unexpired Non-Residential Real Estate Leases Pursuant to 11 USC. [120-1] (1cd)
July 13, 2001 Filing 119 Request by Creditor IOS Capital Inc For Notice. [119-1] (1cd)
July 12, 2001 Filing 117 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [114-1] Agreed Order by Biasco Music Instrument Company, Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc, Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [117-1] (1sd)
July 12, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order Granting [105-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases With Westgate Properties and Seasac Inc. by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [116-1] (1sd)
July 12, 2001 Filing 115 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [105-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases With Westgate Properties and Seasac Inc. by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [115-1] (1sd)
July 12, 2001 Filing 114 Agreed Order by [114-1] Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, Creditor Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc, Creditor Biasco Music Instrument Company Granting [87-1] Motion For Authorization to Assume Certain Executory Contracts with Biasco Music Instrument Company and Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc with Certain Modifications by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company (1sd)
July 11, 2001 Filing 118 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Cheryl A Kelly for Creditor QRS Music Technology. [118-1] (1sd)
July 11, 2001 Filing 113 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Angela D Dodd for Creditor Securities and Exchange Commission. [113-1] (1sd)
July 10, 2001 Filing 112 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Kevin K Malof for Creditor Samick Musical Intruments Co Ltd. [112-1] (1sd)
July 9, 2001 Filing 111 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [109-1] Order of Expedited Hearing On Motion of Debtor For Authorization To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases With Westgate Properties and Seasac Inc. [111-1] (1sd)
July 9, 2001 Filing 110 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Edward J Leen for Creditor Lend Lease Real Estate Investments Inc. [110-1] (1sd)
July 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order Granting [106-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [105-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases With Westgate Properties and Seasac Inc. by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Hearing set To 2:00 7/12/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [109-1] (1sd)
July 6, 2001 Filing 108 Agreed Order by [108-1] Creditor AFCO, Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Settling [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO (1sd)
July 6, 2001 Filing 107 Court's Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Rescheduled Hearing. (1sd)
July 6, 2001 Filing 106 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [105-1] Motion To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases With Westgate Properties and Seasac Inc. by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [106-1] (1sd)
July 6, 2001 Filing 105 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases With Westgate Properties and Seasac Inc. . [105-1] (1sd)
July 3, 2001 Filing 104 Final Order Granting [57-1] Motion For Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtors: To Use Cash Collateral by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [57-2] Motion To Provide for Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [104-1] (1sd)
July 2, 2001 Filing 103 First Meeting Continued until 10:00 7/31/01 At U.S. Trustee's Ofc, Cinc [103-1] (1cd)
July 2, 2001 Filing 102 Proceeding Memo Hearing (NOT HELD). [80-1] Order Motion to Approve DFS Credit Agreement [102-1] (1cd)
June 29, 2001 Filing 101 First Meeting Continued until 10:00 7/31/01 At U.S. Trustee's Ofc, Cinc [101-1] (1cd)
June 29, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Granting [93-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [92-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements Pursuant to Rule 1007 of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley [100-1] on 6/29/02 at 10:00. (1cd)
June 29, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Granting [92-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements Pursuant to Rule 1007 of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ; Disclosure Statement Due: 7/27/01 ; Chapter 11 Plan Due: 7/27/01 [99-1] (1cd)
June 29, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order Granting [81-1] Application To Employ Edward L Ripley by Baker & Hostetler LLP, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor [98-1] (1cd)
June 29, 2001 Filing 97 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO, [86-1] Motion For Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtor's Real Property (Cobb County, Georgia) By Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than the Estate by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [87-1] Motion For Authorization to Assume Certain Executory Contracts with Biasco Music Instrument Company and Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc with Certain Modifications by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [92-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements Pursuant to Rule 1007 of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [97-1] (1cd)
June 29, 2001 Filing 95 Certificate Of Service By Frederick S Coombs for Creditor AFCO Of [55-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO ) by Frederick S Coombs III . [95-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2001 Filing 96 Notice of Hearing Re: [89-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Real Property (Cobb County, Georgia) by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course off Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other Than the Estate () by Timothy J Hurley [96-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2001 Filing 94 Notice of Hearing Re: [93-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [92-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements Pursuant to Rule 1007 of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Scheduled for 10:00 6/29/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [94-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2001 Filing 93 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [92-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements Pursuant to Rule 1007 of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [93-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2001 Filing 92 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements Pursuant to Rule 1007 of the Federal Rules ofBankruptcy Procedure . [92-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order Granting [89-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Real Property (Cobb County, Georgia) by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course off Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other Than the Estate () by Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 10:00 6/29/01 at U.S. Trustee's Ofc, Cinc [91-1] (1cd)
June 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order Granting [85-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: Motion of Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession for Authorization to Assume Certain Executory Contracts with Biasco Music Instrument Company and Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc with Certain Modifications () by Timothy J Hurley Hearing set To 10:00 6/29/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [90-1] (1cd)
June 27, 2001 Filing 89 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtors' Real Property (Cobb County, Georgia) by Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course off Business and Free and Clear of all Interests Held by Parties Other Than the Estate () . [89-1] (1cd)
June 27, 2001 Filing 88 Notice of Hearing Re: [87-1] Motion For Authorization to Assume Certain Executory Contracts with Biasco Music Instrument Company and Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc with Certain Modifications by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 10:00 6/29/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [88-1] (1cd)
June 27, 2001 Filing 87 Motion by Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession For Authorization to Assume Certain Executory Contracts with Biasco Music Instrument Company and Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc with Certain Modifications [87-1] (1cd)
June 27, 2001 Filing 86 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Authority, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, To Sell Certain of the Debtor's Real Property (Cobb County, Georgia) By Private Sale Outside the Ordinary Course of Business and Free and Clear of All Interests Held By Parties Other Than the Estate [86-1] (1cd)
June 27, 2001 Filing 85 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: Motion of Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession for Authorization to Assume Certain Executory Contracts with Biasco Music Instrument Company and Biasco Piano Acquisition Inc with Certain Modifications () . [85-1] (1cd)
June 27, 2001 Filing 84 Hearing Re: [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled For 2:00 7/30/01 in Judge Aug's Courtroom, [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled For 2:00 7/30/01 in Judge Aug's Courtroom, [58-1] Motion For Permission To Use Cash Collateral by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled For 2:00 7/30/01 in Judge Aug's Courtroom [84-1] (1cd)
June 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order Granting [74-1] Application To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marlene Reich [83-1] (1cd)
June 26, 2001 Filing 82 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [80-2] Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Approve DFS Credit Agreement. [82-1] (1cd)
June 25, 2001 Filing 81 Application By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Attorney Baker & Hostetler LLP To Employ Edward L Ripley . Affidavit Filed. [81-1] (1cd)
June 25, 2001 Filing 80 Interim Order Granting Motion to Approve DFS Credit Agreement [80-2] (1cd)
June 25, 2001 Filing 78 Notice of Hearing Re: [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 11:00 6/25/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 11:00 6/25/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [78-1] (1cd)
June 22, 2001 Filing 79 Request by Creditor Textron Financial Corporation For Notice. [79-1] (1cd)
June 22, 2001 Filing 77 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [75-1] Exphedited Hearing on Approval of Cash Advance. [77-1] (1cd)
June 22, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order Granting [55-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO ) by Frederick S Coombs III Hearing reset To 10:00 6/29/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [76-1] (1cd)
June 21, 2001 Filing 75 Notice of Hearing Re: [30-1] Motion For Permission To Use Cash Collateral by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 1:00 6/22/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [30-2] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 1:00 6/22/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [30-3] Motion Set Hearing RE: [30-1] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Scheduled for 1:00 6/22/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [75-1] (1cd)
June 21, 2001 Filing 74 Application Filed By Marlene Reich for Creditor Clearwater Crossing LP To Appear Pro Hac Vice [74-1] (1cd)
June 21, 2001 Filing 73 Request by Creditor Clearwater Crossing LP For Notice. [73-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 72 Report to Court Filed By Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor Designating Robert Kleinman , Esq., Ross & Hardies, Suite 2500, 150 North Michigan Avenue, Chicago, IL 60601, Chairperson of the Committee [72-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Richard A Robinson for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor. [71-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Sherri B Lazear for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor. [70-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Amy L Garrard for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor. [69-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Edward L Ripley for Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditor. [68-1] (1ef)
June 20, 2001 Filing 67 Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee. [67-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Richard D Nelson for Creditor Brent Baird. [66-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 65 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [30-3] Motion Set Hearing RE: [30-1] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-1] Motion For Permission To Use Cash Collateral by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [65-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Randy T Slovin for Creditor Swords Veneer and Lumber Company. [64-1] (1cd)
June 20, 2001 Filing 63 Subpoena. [63-1] (1cd)
June 19, 2001 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Raymond J Pikna for Creditor National City Bank, National City Leasing Corporation and National City. [62-1] (1cd)
June 18, 2001 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation for Creditor Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. [61-1] (1cd)
June 15, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Granting [58-1] Motion To Continue Expedite Hearing Re: ( [58-1] Motion by Timothy J Hurley, [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley Hearing reset To 10:00 6/20/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Hearing reset To 10:00 6/20/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, Hearing reset To 10:00 6/20/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [60-1] (1cd)
June 15, 2001 Filing 59 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [58-1] Motion To Continue Expedite Hearing Re: ( [58-1] Motion by Timothy J Hurley, [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley, [58-1] Motion For Permission To Use Cash Collateral by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [59-1] (1cd)
June 15, 2001 Filing 58 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Continue Expedite Hearing Re: ( [58-1] Motion by Timothy J Hurley, [58-2] Motion To Incur Postpetition Debt by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [58-3] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) . [58-1] (1cd)
June 15, 2001 Filing 57 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtors: To Use Cash Collateral , To Provide for Adequate Protection [57-2] (1cd)
June 13, 2001 Filing 56 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [30-2] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company. Hearing Continued till 6/20/01 10:00 in Judge Aug's Courtroom [56-1] (1cd)
June 13, 2001 Filing 55 Motion By Frederick S Coombs for Creditor AFCO To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [53-1] Motion For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) by AFCO ) . [55-1] (1cd)
June 13, 2001 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Frederick S Coombs for Creditor AFCO . [54-1] (1cd)
June 13, 2001 Filing 53 Motion By Creditor AFCO For Relief From Stay ( STAY #: 362) ( Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 00115847) Last Day for Objections 7/11/01 [53-1] (1cd)
June 11, 2001 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Michael B Willey for Creditor Commissioner of Revenue for the State of Tennessee. [52-1] (1cd)
June 11, 2001 Filing 51 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: Order for Setting Times for filing Proof of Claims, Plan, Disclosure Statement and Monthly Financial Reports. (1cd)
June 11, 2001 Filing 50 Court's Certificate of Mailing RE: 341 Notice. (1cd)
June 11, 2001 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Evan M Jones for Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation. [47-1] (1cd)
June 8, 2001 Filing 49 Agreed Entry by [49-1] Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation, Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, For Permission To Use Cash Collateral Providing for Interim Financing and Granting General Electric Capital Corporation a First Lien and Super-Priority Administrative Expense Claim (1cd)
June 8, 2001 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Stephen D Lerner for Creditor General Electric Capital Corporation. [48-1] (1cd)
June 8, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting [32-1] Application To Employ Leonard Z Eppel by Financial Resource Associates Inc, J. Vincent Aug Jr. [46-1] (1cd)
June 8, 2001 Filing 44 Notice of Hearing Re: [30-3] Motion Set Hearing RE: [30-1] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/13/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [30-2] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/13/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [44-1] (1cd)
June 7, 2001 Filing 45 Praceipe to the Clerk filed by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [45-1] (1cd)
June 7, 2001 Filing 43 Notice of Withdrawal of [23-1] Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Debt Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business to Essential Trade Creditors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [43-1] (1cd)
June 7, 2001 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Daniel W Honey for Creditor Arkansas Workers' Compensation Comm. [41-1] (1cd)
June 7, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting [20-1] Motion For Determination of Adequate Assurance of Payment For Future Utility Services by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [40-1] (1cd)
June 7, 2001 Filing 39 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [20-1] Motion For Determination of Adequate Assurance of Payment For Future Utility Services by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [23-1] Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Debt Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business to Essential Trade Creditors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-3] Motion Set Hearing RE: [30-1] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] is continued until 6/13/2001 at 10:00 a.m. Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [32-1] Application To Employ Leonard Z Eppel by Financial Resource Associates Inc, J. Vincent Aug Jr. . [39-1] (1cd)
June 6, 2001 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By J Michael Debbeler for Creditor Graydon Head and Ritchie LLP. [42-1] (1cd)
June 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Setting Times for Filing Plan, Disclosure Statement and Monthly Financial Reports. Monthly Reports Due: 20th Day of Each Month. Plan Due: 10/4/01 Disclosure Statement Due: 10/4/01 ;Last Day to File Proof of Claim: 10/1/01 [35-1] (1cd)
June 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order and Notice of 341 Meeting Scheduled For 10:00 7/3/01 At U.S. Trustee's Ofc, Cinc [34-1] (1cd)
June 5, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting [33-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [32-1] Application To Employ Leonard Z Eppel by Financial Resource Associates Inc, J. Vincent Aug Jr. ) by Timothy J Hurley [38-1] (1cd)
June 5, 2001 Filing 37 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [33-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [32-1] Application To Employ Leonard Z Eppel by Financial Resource Associates Inc, J. Vincent Aug Jr. ) by Timothy J Hurley [37-1] (1cd)
June 5, 2001 Filing 36 Certificate Of Service By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Of [12-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: First Day Motions () by Timothy J Hurley . [36-1] (1cd)
June 5, 2001 Filing 33 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [32-1] Application To Employ Leonard Z Eppel by Financial Resource Associates Inc, J. Vincent Aug Jr. ) . [33-1] (1cd)
June 5, 2001 Filing 32 Application By Judge J. Vincent Aug consultant Financial Resource Associates Inc To Employ Leonard Z Eppel . Affidavit Filed. [32-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 31 Notice of Expedited Hearing Re: [20-1] Motion For Determination of Adequate Assurance of Payment For Future Utility Services by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/7/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [23-1] Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Debt Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business to Essential Trade Creditors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/7/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [30-1] Motion For Permission To Use Cash Collateral by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/7/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [30-2] Motion For Adequate Protection by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/7/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom, [30-3] Motion Set Hearing RE: [30-1] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Continued for 10:00 6/7/01 at Judge Aug's Courtroom [31-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 30 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Permission To Use Cash Collateral , For Adequate Protection , Set Hearing RE: [30-1] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [30-2] Motion by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [30-3] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Granting [22-1] Motion Pay all Costs and Expenses Incident to the Foregoing Payments and Contributions by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [22-1] Motion Make Prepetition Contributions and Payment of Benefitis Under Employee Benefit Plans by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [22-1] Motion Make Payments for Which Payroll Deductions were made Prepetition by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [22-1] Motion Reimburse Prepetition Employee Business Expenses by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Granting [22-1] Motion Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries and Related Items by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [29-1] (fe)
June 1, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting [21-1] Motion For Authority To Pay Use and Other Trust Fund Taxes by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [28-1] (fe)
June 1, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Granting [19-1] Motion For An Order Approving Centralized Cash Management Systems and Use Of Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [27-1] (fe)
June 1, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Granting [18-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ;Missing Documents due: 7/1/01 [26-1] (fe)
June 1, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Granting [16-1] Application To Employ and Retain Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [25-1] (fe)
June 1, 2001 Filing 24 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hrg (HELD) RE: All "First Day" Motions [23-1] Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Debt Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business to Essential Trade Creditors by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [22-1] Motion Pay all Costs and Expenses Incident to the Foregoing Payments and Contributions by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [22-1] Motion Make Prepetition Contributions and Payment of Benefitis Under Employee Benefit Plans by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [22-1] Motion Make Payments for Which Payroll Deductions were made Prepetition by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [22-1] Motion Reimburse Prepetition Employee Business Expenses by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [22-1] Motion Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries and Related Items by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [21-1] Motion For Authority To Pay Use and Other Trust Fund Taxes by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [20-1] Motion For Determination of Adequate Assurance of Payment For Future Utility Services by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [19-1] Motion For An Order Approving Centralized Cash Management Systems and Use Of Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [16-1] Application To Employ Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company, [12-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: First Day Motions () by Timothy J Hurley, [8-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [7-1] Motion For Joint Administration of Cases 01-13951, 01-13952 and 01-13953 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley, [7-1] Motion For Joint Administration of Cases 01-13951, 01-13952 and 01-13953 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [24-1] (fe)
June 1, 2001 Filing 23 Motion by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Prepetition Debt Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business to Essential Trade Creditors [23-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 22 Motion by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Pay all Costs and Expenses Incident to the Foregoing Payments and Contributions [22-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 21 Motion by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Authority To Pay Use and Other Trust Fund Taxes [21-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 20 Motion by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For Determination of Adequate Assurance of Payment For Future Utility Services [20-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 19 Motion by Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company For An Order Approving Centralized Cash Management Systems and Use Of Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms [19-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 18 Motion By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statments . [18-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 17 Affidavit Filed by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company RE: [16-1] Application To Employ Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company [17-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 16 Application By Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Employ Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP . Affidavit Filed. [16-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Filing 15 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [12-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: First Day Motions () by Timothy J Hurley [15-1] (1cd)
June 1, 2001 Utility Event.
May 31, 2001 Filing 14 Hearing Re: [12-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: First Day Motions () by Timothy J Hurley Scheduled For 10:00 6/1/01 in Judge Aug's Courtroom [14-1] (1cd)
May 31, 2001 Filing 13 Proceeding Memo Hrg (HELD) RE: [7-1] Motion For Joint Administration of Cases 01-13951, 01-13952 and 01-13953 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company . [13-1] (1cd)
May 31, 2001 Filing 12 Motion By Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company To Expedite Hearing Re: First Day Motions () . [12-1] (1cd)
May 31, 2001 Filing 11 Notice by Timothy J Hurley for Debtor Baldwin Piano and Organ Company Re: [8-1] Motion To Expedite Hearing Re: ( [7-1] Motion For Joint Administration of Cases 01-13951, 01-13952 and 01-13953 by Baldwin Piano and Organ Company ) by Timothy J Hurley [11-1] (1cd)
May 31, 2001