National Century Financial Enterprises, Inc. and NPF VI INC
Debtor: National Century Financial Enterprises, Inc., an Ohio Corporation and NPF VI INC
Not Yet Classified: Great Southeast Community Hospital Corp, Joint Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Ballard Spahr Andrews and Ingersoll LLP, New England Home Therapies Inc, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Asst US Trustee (Col) and Swab Financial, LLC
Case Number: 2:2002bk65235
Filed: November 18, 2002
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John E Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2015 BANKRUPTCY CASE CLOSED: It appearing that the bankruptcy estate has been fully administered, the trustee is therefore discharged, and the case is closed by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of Ohio (2mr)
April 2, 2015 Filing 3995 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3993 Order on Motion for Final Decree) Notice Date 04/02/2015. (Admin.)
March 31, 2015 Filing 3994 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3993 Order on Motion for Final Decree). (Oellermann, Charles)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3993 Order Entering Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief (Related Doc #3991) (2mr)
February 24, 2015 Filing 3992 Notice of Objection Deadline Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3991 Motion for Final Decree Closing Cases and Related Relief Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)). (Oellermann, Charles)
February 24, 2015 Filing 3991 Motion for Final Decree Closing Cases and Related Relief Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Oellermann, Charles)
January 28, 2015 Filing 3990 Notice of Filing of Post-Confirmation Operating Reports for the Quarter Ending December 31, 2014 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
December 25, 2014 Filing 3989 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3987 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time) Notice Date 12/25/2014. (Admin.)
December 23, 2014 Filing 3988 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3987 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time). (Oellermann, Charles)
December 23, 2014 Filing 3987 Fourth Order Extending Duration of Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust and CSFB Claims Trust (Related Doc #3985) (2mr)
November 26, 2014 Filing 3986 Notice of Objection Deadline for Motion Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3985 Fourth Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for the Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plan Excerpts # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)). (Oellermann, Charles)
November 26, 2014 Filing 3985 Fourth Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for the Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan Excerpts #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Oellermann, Charles)
November 3, 2014 Filing 3984 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 3rd Quarter 2014 ending September 30, 2014 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
July 28, 2014 Filing 3983 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2Q 2014 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
June 14, 2014 Filing 3982 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3980 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Notice Date 06/14/2014. (Admin.)
June 12, 2014 Filing 3981 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3979 Order on Generic Motion). (Oellermann, Charles)
June 12, 2014 Filing 3980 Transmission of Order Approving Procedures for Unclaimed Distributions to BNC for Service (2mr)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3979 Order Approving Procedures for Unclaimed Distributions (Related Doc #3977) (2mr)
April 30, 2014 Filing 3978 Notice of Objection Deadline for Motion Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3977 Motion for Order Approving Procedures for Unclaimed Distributions Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)). (Oellermann, Charles)
April 30, 2014 Filing 3977 Motion for Order Approving Procedures for Unclaimed Distributions Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Oellermann, Charles)
April 14, 2014 Filing 3976 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 1Q 2014 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
February 3, 2014 Filing 3975 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Q4 2013 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
November 13, 2013 Adversary Case 2:05-ap-02097 Closed, Disposition of Adversary 2:05-ap-02097 (2mr)
October 21, 2013 Filing 3974 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2013 Q3 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
October 7, 2013 Adversary Case 2:09-ap-2326 Closed, Disposition of Adversary 2:09-ap-2326. See, Unencumbered Assets Trust, et al, v. Tracy Hampton-Stein, Adv. No. 09-2281, Doc. 33, fn 14. (2mr)
October 7, 2013 Adversary Case 2:04-ap-2632 Closed, Disposition of Adversary 2:04-ap-2632 (2mr)
August 20, 2013 Disposition of Adversary 2:04-ap-2630 , Adversary Case 2:04-ap-2630 Closed (2sd)
August 12, 2013 Disposition of Adversary 2:04-ap-2631 , Adversary Case 2:04-ap-2631 Closed (2pr)
August 2, 2013 Filing 3973 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2013 Q2 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
July 19, 2013 Filing 3972 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3971 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 07/19/2013. (Admin.)
July 16, 2013 Claim History for Claim Number 683 Updated. Withdrawal of Donald Ayers' Proof of Claim No. 683 (RE: related document(s)#3971 Order on Generic Motion) (2sd)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3971 Order Granting Joint Motion For Withdrawal of Donald Ayers' Proof of Claim No. 683 (Related Doc #3969) (2sd)
June 12, 2013 Filing 3970 Notice Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3969 Joint Motion to Withdraw Donald Ayers Proof of Claim No. 683 Filed by Creditor Donald Ayers, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (Oellermann, Charles)
June 12, 2013 Filing 3969 Joint Motion to Withdraw Donald Ayers Proof of Claim No. 683 Filed by Creditor Donald Ayers, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Oellermann, Charles)
April 29, 2013 Filing 3968 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2013 Q1 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
April 28, 2013 Filing 3967 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3966 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time) Notice Date 04/28/2013. (Admin.)
April 25, 2013 Filing 3966 Third Order Extending Duration of Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust and CSFB Claims Trust (Related Doc #3964) (2sd)
March 27, 2013 Filing 3965 Notice of Objection Deadline Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3964 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for Third Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust). (Oellermann, Charles)
March 27, 2013 Filing 3964 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for Third Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
February 20, 2013 Adversary Case 2:02-ap-2576 Closed (2sd)
February 20, 2013 Disposition of Adversary 2:02-ap-2576 Judgment For Plaintiff (2sd)
January 28, 2013 Filing 3963 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2012 Q4 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Oellermann, Charles)
December 21, 2012 Filing 3962 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Brian M Gianangeli Filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation. (Gianangeli, Brian)
November 8, 2012 Filing 3961 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2012 Q3 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust# 2 Exhibit B - Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
September 28, 2012 Disposition of Adversary 2:09-ap-2281 Judgment For Both Parties (2sd)
September 28, 2012 Adversary Case 2:09-ap-2281 Closed (2sd)
July 27, 2012 Filing 3960 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2012 Q2 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust# 2 Exhibit B - Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
May 20, 2012 Filing 3959 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3958 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/20/2012. (Admin.)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3958 Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Proofs Of Claim (Related Doc #3956) (2js)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3957 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2012 Q1 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust# 2 Exhibit B - Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
April 18, 2012 Filing 3956 Motion Lance and Barbara Poulsen's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Proofs of Claim Filed by Creditor Barbara Poulsen (Haller, John)
March 11, 2012 Filing 3955 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#3953 Notice and Order Regarding Deficient Filing) Notice Date 03/11/2012. (Admin.)
March 9, 2012 Filing 3954 Substitute PDF [Notice of Withdrawal of Docket No. 3947] Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (RE: related document(s)#3951 Notice, #3953 Notice and Order Regarding Deficient Filing). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
March 9, 2012 Filing 3953 Notice of Deficient Filing and Order Setting Deadline for Compliance Regarding: (RE: related document(s)#3951 Notice filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.). Substitution of PDF Due: 3/23/2012. (2js)
March 8, 2012 Filing 3951 Notice of Withdrawal of Docket No. 3947 Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. (Ballesteros, Sydney) Modified on 3/9/2012 (2js). DART. Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2012 (2pr). Modified on 3/15/2012 - Substituted The PDF Document (2pr).
February 9, 2012 Filing 3950 Notice of Final Distribution to Beneficiaries, and Setting of Record and Distribution Dates Pursuant to Section 4.2(b) of the CSFB Claims Trust Filed by Interested Party Avidity Partners, LLC, as Trustee of the CSFB Claims Trust. (Cookson, Kenneth)
January 31, 2012 Filing 3949 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2011 Q4 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust# 2 Exhibit B Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
November 23, 2011 Filing 3948 Notice Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Claims of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch, and Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Branch Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Lazear, Sherri)
November 2, 2011 Filing 3947 Stipulation with Unencumbered Asset Trust, et al and Credit Suisse First Boston, et al as to Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Credit Suisse Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. (Ballesteros, Sydney) Modified on 11/3/2011 (2js). DART. Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2012 (2pr). Modified on 3/12/2012 - Substituted The PDF Document (2pr).
October 31, 2011 Filing 3946 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2011 Q3 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust#2 Exhibit B Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
August 8, 2011 Filing 3945 Withdrawal Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (RE: related document(s)#3944 Opposition Motion for Protective Order of JPMorgan Chase). (Kessler, Marc)
August 8, 2011 Filing 3944 Opposition Motion for Protective Order of JPMorgan Chase Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Kessler, Marc)
August 1, 2011 Filing 3943 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2011 Q2 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust#2 Exhibit B Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
July 26, 2011 Filing 3942 Submission of Transcript for Court Review. This document is not available for public view. (Atkins, Janet)
May 2, 2011 Filing 3941 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2011 Q1 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust#2 Exhibit B Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Witalec, Joseph)
April 9, 2011 Filing 3940 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3939 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time) Service Date 04/09/2011. (Admin.)
April 6, 2011 Filing 3939 Second Order Extending Duration of Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust and CSFB Claims Trust (Related Doc #3937) (2dro)
March 15, 2011 Disposition of Adversary 2:04-ap-2609 Judgment For Plaintiff, Adversary Case 2:04-ap-2609 Closed (2dro)
March 4, 2011 Filing 3938 Notice of Objection Deadline Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3937 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for Second Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust). (Beck, David)
March 4, 2011 Filing 3937 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time for Second Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
January 28, 2011 Filing 3936 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2010 Q4 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
October 28, 2010 Filing 3935 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2010 Q3 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
August 3, 2010 Filing 3934 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Quarter Ending June 30, 2010 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Operating Report for VI/XII Collateral Trust#2 Exhibit B Operating Report for Unencumbered Assets Trust) (Beck, David)
April 27, 2010 Filing 3933 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2010 Q1 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
January 29, 2010 Filing 3932 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2009 Q4 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
November 4, 2009 Filing 3931 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2009 Q3 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
July 28, 2009 Filing 3930 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2009 Q2 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
July 7, 2009 Filing 3929 Adversary case 2:09-ap-02326. Order of Transfer (2be)
June 23, 2009 Filing 3928 Adversary case 2:09-ap-02281. (72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee of The Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Jones Day, Matthew A. Kairis against Tracey Hampton-Stein. Fee Amount $250 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 5)#2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 5)#3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 5)#4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 5)#5 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 5)#6 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 3)#7 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 3)#8 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 3)#9 Exhibit C#10 Exhibit D#11 Exhibit E#12 Exhibit F (Part 1 of 2)#13 Exhibit F (Part 2 of 2)#14 Exhibit G#15 Exhibit H#16 Exhibit I#17 Exhibit J#18 Exhibit K#19 Exhibit L#20 Exhibit M#21 Exhibit N#22 Exhibit O#23 Exhibit P) (Corcoran, Matthew)
June 11, 2009 Filing 3927 Notice of Reinstatement of Attorney Grady L. Pettigrew, Jr.. (3vy)
May 5, 2009 Filing 3926 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2009 Q1 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
May 2, 2009 Filing 3925 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3924 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 05/02/2009. (Admin.)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3924 Order Extending Duration of Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust and CSFB Claims Trust (Related Doc #3922) (2dd)
March 31, 2009 Filing 3923 Notice of Motion for an Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3922 Motion for an Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust). (Witalec, Joseph)
March 31, 2009 Filing 3922 Motion for an Order Extending Duration of Trusts Filed by Interested Parties CSFB Claims Trust, Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan Excerpts#2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Witalec, Joseph)
March 19, 2009 Filing 3921 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3920 Order (Generic)) Service Date 03/19/2009. (Admin.)
March 13, 2009 Filing 3920 Stipulation and Agreed Order Modifying Automatic Stay Insofar as it Pertains to Amedisys, Inc. and Certain Other Affiliates for Purposes of Responding to Motion for Summary Judgment (RE: related document(s)#1550 Order on Motion to Enforce). (2dd)
February 26, 2009 Filing 3919 Notice Filed by Creditor Rebecca S Parrett (RE: related document(s)#3918 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Request to Stay the Action Filed by Creditors Rebecca Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett). (Zacks, Benjamin)
February 10, 2009 Filing 3918 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Request to Stay the Action Filed by Creditors Rebecca Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett (Zacks, Benjamin)
January 22, 2009 Filing 3917 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2008 Q4 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VI/XII Collateral Trust Operating Report#2 Exhibit B UAT Operating Report) (Beck, David)
October 31, 2008 Filing 3916 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 2008 Q3 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VI/XII Collateral Trust Operating Report#2 Exhibit B UAT Operating Report) (Beck, David)
September 20, 2008 Filing 3915 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3914 Notice Re Pettigrew) Service Date 09/20/2008. (Admin.)
September 18, 2008 Filing 3914 Notice of Suspension of Attorney Grady L. Pettigrew, Jr (2bm, )
August 29, 2008 Filing 3913 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3912 Order (Generic)) Service Date 08/29/2008. (Admin.)
August 27, 2008 To: JONATHON YARGER - Notification of Deficiency: PDF Does Not Match Docket Text. For Future Reference, A Withdrawal of Proof of Claim Should Be Filed Using The Withdrawal of Claim Event From the Claims Actions Menu. (RE: related document(s)#3911 Withdrawal filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA) (2dd, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 3912 District Order Dismissing Rebecca Parrett's Claims (Case No. 05-cv-290) Re: (RE: related document(s)#3693 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (2mr, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 3911 Withdrawal Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (RE: related document(s)#3775 Objection to Claim, ). (Yarger, Jonathon)
August 26, 2008 Filing 3910 Withdrawal Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (RE: related document(s)#3787 Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to the Proof of Claim of Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. Fee Amount $150). (Yarger, Jonathon)
July 31, 2008 Filing 3909 Notice of Filing Post-Confirmation Operating Reports for the Quarter Ending June 30, 2008 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VI/XII Collateral Trust Operating Report#2 Exhibit B - UAT Operating Report) (Witalec, Joseph)
June 24, 2008 Filing 3908 Transcript filed by Creditor ACCI/Allcare Inc (^Atkins, Janet)
June 21, 2008 Filing 3907 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3906 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) Service Date 06/21/2008. (Admin.)
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3906 Order Denying Motion Of Amedisys Inc., ET AL, To Modify The Automatic Stay For The Limited Purposes Of Participating In The Multi-District Litigation With Respect To Certain Non-Debtor Defendants (Related Doc #3892) (2dm, )
June 1, 2008 Filing 3905 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3904 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, ) Service Date 06/01/2008. (Admin.)
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3904 Order Denying Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion of Amedisys Inc., ET AL, to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants (Related Doc #3901) (2dd, )
May 28, 2008 Filing 3903 Reply to (related document(s): #3899 Response,,, filed by Debtor NPF VI INC)Reply Brief in Support of Motion of Amedisys Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (DeMarco, Daniel)
May 25, 2008 Filing 3902 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#3900 Hearing Set (Relief from Stay)) Service Date 05/25/2008. (Admin.)
May 23, 2008 Filing 3901 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3892 Motion for Relief From Stay, ) Unopposed Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion of Amedisys, Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (DeMarco, Daniel)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3900 Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay (RE: related document(s)#3892 Motion for Relief From Stay, filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc.). Hearing scheduled 6/16/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A. (2kv, )
May 19, 2008 Filing 3899 Opposition Response to (related document(s): #3892 Motion for Relief from Stay Motion of Amedisys, Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc) Filed by Debtor NPF VI INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1#3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2#4 Exhibit Exhibit C#5 Exhibit Exhibit D#6 Exhibit Exhibit E#7 Exhibit Exhibit F#8 Exhibit Exhibit G#9 Exhibit Exhibit H#10 Exhibit Exhibit I-1#11 Exhibit I-2#12 Exhibit Exhibit J#13 Exhibit Exhibit K#14 Exhibit Exhibit L#15 Exhibit Exhibit M#16 Exhibit Exhibit N-1#17 Exhibit Exhibit N-2#18 Exhibit Exhibit O#19 Exhibit Exhibit P) (Corcoran, Matthew)
May 19, 2008 To: PAMELA RICE - Notification of Deficiency: Please refer to LBR 2091-1. This document does not contain the signature of Kristopher E Aungst. (RE: related document(s)#3898 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by U.S. Trustee Asst US Trustee (Col)) (2dd, )
May 16, 2008 Filing 3898 Notice of Substitution of Counsel terminating Kristopher E Aungst, Filed by U.S. Trustee Asst US Trustee (Col). (Rice, Pamela)
April 30, 2008 Filing 3897 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Quarter 1 of 2008 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VI/XII Collateral Trust Operating Report#2 Exhibit B UAT Operating Report) (Beck, David)
April 29, 2008 Filing 3896 Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (RE: related document(s)#3894 Notice,,, #3892 Motion for Relief from Stay Motion of Amedisys, Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants). (DeMarco, Daniel)
April 28, 2008 Filing 3895 Withdrawal Filed by Defendant Swab Financial, LLC (RE: related document(s)#3893 Notice of Substitution of Counsel). (Martin, David)
April 28, 2008 Filing 3894 Notice of Motion of Amedisys Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (RE: related document(s)#3892 Motion for Relief from Stay Motion of Amedisys, Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2) (DeMarco, Daniel)). (DeMarco, Daniel)
April 28, 2008 To: DAVID MARTIN - Notification of Deficiency: The PDF Document Appears to be Filed in an Incorrect Case. Please Withdraw the Document and Re-File in the Correct Case or File an Amended Document. (RE: related document(s)#3893 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Defendant Swab Financial, LLC) (2dd, )
April 25, 2008 Filing 3893 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, Filed by Defendant Swab Financial, LLC. (Martin, David)
April 24, 2008 Filing 3892 Motion for Relief from Stay Motion of Amedisys, Inc., et al., to Modify the Automatic Stay for the Limited Purposes of Participating in the Multi-District Litigation with Respect to Certain Causes of Action Against Certain Non-Debtor Defendants. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2) (DeMarco, Daniel)
April 24, 2008 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 9940559,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
March 9, 2008 Filing 3890 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3889 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 03/09/2008. (Admin.)
March 6, 2008 Filing 3889 Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Proofs of Claim Filed by the United States of America (Re: Pleading Nos. 3358 and 3809) filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2ml, )
February 14, 2008 Filing 3886 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Crown Partners LLC . (2ss, )
February 7, 2008 Filing 3887 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Karl Diamond . (2dd, )
January 28, 2008 Filing 3882 Notice of Filing of Post-Confirmation Operating Reports for the Quarter Ending December 31, 2007 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
January 24, 2008 Filing 3884 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Stanford Interior Gardens Inc . (2dd, )
January 23, 2008 Disposition of Adversary 03-2655 (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Adversary Case 02-2526 Closed (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Disposition of Adversary 02-2526 (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Adversary Case 03-2655 Closed (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Disposition of Adversary 04-2391 (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Adversary Case 04-2391 Closed (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Disposition of Adversary 04-2155 (2pr, )
January 23, 2008 Adversary Case 04-2155 Closed (2pr, )
January 22, 2008 Adversary Case 03-2288 Closed (2pr, )
January 22, 2008 Disposition of Adversary 03-2288 (2pr, )
January 19, 2008 Filing 3881 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3876 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 01/19/2008. (Admin.)
January 19, 2008 Filing 3880 Notice of Reassignment of Case w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#3875 Order Transferring Judge) Service Date 01/19/2008. (Admin.)
January 18, 2008 Filing 3879 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3874 Order (Generic)) Service Date 01/18/2008. (Admin.)
January 18, 2008 Filing 3878 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3873 Order (Generic)) Service Date 01/18/2008. (Admin.)
January 18, 2008 Filing 3877 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3872 Order (Generic)) Service Date 01/18/2008. (Admin.)
January 17, 2008 Filing 3876 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service RE: Order Reassigning Jointly Administered Cases (2pr, )
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3875 Order Reassigning Jointly Administered Cases from Donald E Calhoun to John E. Hoffman . (2pr, )
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3874 Order Reassigning Adversary Proceeding. This Is A Copy Of Document #12 From Adversary Case 04-2630. (2kab, )
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3873 Order Reassigning Adversary Proceeding. This Is A Copy Of Document #44 From Adversary Case 04-2632. (2kab, )
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3872 Order Reassigning Adversary Proceeding. This Is A Copy Of Document #8 From Adversary Case 04-2631. (2kab, )
December 26, 2007 Filing 3871 Withdrawal of Claim(s): 852 filed by Creditor State of Georgia Department of Revenue (2pr, )
December 21, 2007 Filing 3870 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3869 Order (Generic), Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 12/21/2007. (Admin.)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3869 Order Classifying State Of Ohio's 2001 Dealer-In-Intangibles Tax Claim As An Unsecured Nonpriority Claim Re: (RE: related document(s)#3863 Brief, filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3856 Brief, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3862 Response, filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation, #3864 Brief, filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation). (2pr, )
December 12, 2007 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held on Pleadings 3856, 3862, 3863 and 3864 on 12/11/07. Appearances by Charles Oellermann, David Beck, Joseph Chapman and Amy Kaufman. Dealer and intangible tax to be paid as general unsecured claim. Charles Oellermann to upload order. (2je, )
November 20, 2007 Adversary Case 04-2617 Closed (2pr, )
November 20, 2007 Disposition of Adversary 04-2617 (2pr, )
November 15, 2007 Filing 3868 Stipulation with Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust And VI/XII Collateral Trust and State of Ohio Department of Taxation as to Stipulation of Facts Regarding State of Ohio's Dealers-in-Intangibles Tax Claim Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Modified Capitalization Of Docket Text. Modified on 11/16/2007 (2kab, ).
November 11, 2007 Filing 3867 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3866 Order to Set Hearing, , , ) Service Date 11/11/2007. (Admin.)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3866 Order Setting Oral Argument to Consider Pleadings Nos. 3856, 3862, 3863, 3864 as Provided in the Stipulation and Agreed Order Dated April 19, 2007, Implementing Partial Settlement of, and Establishing Briefing Schedule for Resolving Remaining Issues Regarding Tax Claims Filed By the State of Ohio (RE: related document(s)#3864 Brief, filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation, #3863 Brief, filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3862 Response, filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation, #3856 Brief, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Hearing to be held on 12/11/2007 at 10:00 AM Courtroom B for #3864 and for #3863 and for #3862 and for #3856, (2sa, )
October 31, 2007 Filing 3865 Notice of Filing of Post-Confirmation Operating Reports for the Quarter Ending September 30, 2007 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
September 30, 2007 Filing 3864 Brief The State of Ohio, Department of Taxation's Sur Reply to Reply Brief of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust in Support of Classification of 2001 Portion of State of Ohio's Dealer-in-Intangibles Tax Claim as Unsecured Nonpriority Claim Filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation (RE: related document(s)#3863 Brief, ). (Chapman, Joseph)
August 31, 2007 Filing 3863 Brief Reply Brief of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust in Support of Classification of 2001 Portion of State of Ohio's Dealer-in-Intangibles Tax Claim as an Unsecured Nonpriority Claim Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3862 Response, ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Beck, David)
August 2, 2007 Filing 3862 Response to (related document(s): #3856 Brief, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M) (Kaufman, Amy)
July 30, 2007 Filing 3861 Notice of Filing of Post-Confirmation Operating Reports for the Quarter Ending June 30, 2007 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
July 24, 2007 Filing 3860 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor FTI Healthcare . (2lg, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 3859 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Interim Protective Order Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3847 Notice Amended Notice of Objection and Motion Filed in Adversary Proceeding No. 04-2617 Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3844 Notice of Objection to Perseus' Motion to Compel Discovery in Adversary Proceeding No. 04-ap-2617, Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3) (Kopf, John)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Kopf, John)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kopf, John)
June 21, 2007 Filing 3858 Notice Concerning Production of Rule 2004 Database Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
June 19, 2007 Filing 3857 Certificate of Service Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3856 Brief, ). (Beck, David)
June 18, 2007 Filing 3856 Brief Opening Brief of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust in Support of Classification of 2001 Portion of State of Ohio's Dealer-in-Intangibles Tax Claim as an Unsecured Nonpriority Claim Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
May 1, 2007 Filing 3855 Notice of Filing of Post-Confirmation Operating Reports for the Quarter Ending March 31, 2007 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
April 22, 2007 Filing 3854 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3853 Order (Generic)) Service Date 04/22/2007. (Admin.)
April 19, 2007 Filing 3853 Stipulation and Agreed Order Implementing Partial Settlement of, and Establishing Briefing Schedule for Resolving Remaining Issues Regarding, Tax Claims Filed by the State of Ohio (Re: Pleadings Nos. #3358 and #3367) (2lg, )
April 18, 2007 Adversary Case 04-2015 Closed (2lg, )
April 18, 2007 Disposition of Adversary 04-2015 Judgment For Plaintiff (2lg, )
March 1, 2007 Filing 3852 Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Address for Susan F. DiCicco Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse, New York Branch, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Lazear, Sherri)
January 26, 2007 Filing 3851 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period For the Quarter Ending December 31, 2006 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
January 26, 2007 Filing 3850 Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation - SC Haynes. (Haynes, Eleanor)
January 26, 2007 Filing 3849 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eleanor Beavers Haynes Filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation - SC Haynes. (Haynes, Eleanor)
January 24, 2007 Disposition of Adversary 04-2390 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
January 24, 2007 Adversary Case 04-2390 Closed (2lg, )
January 16, 2007 To: JOSEPH WITALEC - Notification of Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Should Be Filed Using The Withdrawal of Claim Event From the Claims Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3848 Notice filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust) (2lg, )
January 12, 2007 Filing 3848 Notice of Withdrawl of Proofs of Claim filed by Network Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Witalec, Joseph)
January 11, 2007 Disposition of Adversary 06-2216 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
January 11, 2007 Adversary Case 06-2216 Closed (2lg, )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3885 Order from Circuit Court Re: Appeal on Appellate Case Number: 06-03520; 06-03602 Voluntary Dismissal. (RE: related document(s)#3728 Notice of Appeal filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc.). (2lg, )
January 5, 2007 Filing 3847 Notice Amended Notice of Objection and Motion Filed in Adversary Proceeding No. 04-2617 Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3844 Notice of Objection to Perseus' Motion to Compel Discovery in Adversary Proceeding No. 04-ap-2617, Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3) (Kopf, John)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Kopf, John)
January 5, 2007 Filing 3846 Notice of Objection to Perseus Motion to Compel Discovery and Notice of Motion for an Interim Protective Order Filed in Adversary Proceeding 2:04-ap-2617 Filed by Creditor Bank One NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Objection of Bank One to Motion to Compel#2 Exhibit B Motion of Bank One for Interim Protective Order) (Brown, Kristen)
January 4, 2007 To: JOHN KOPF - Notification of Deficiency: The PDF Document does not Match Docket Text. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3844 Notice filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank) (2lg, )
January 4, 2007 To: KRISTEN BROWN - Notification of Deficiency: The PDF Document does not Match Docket Text. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3845 Notice, filed by Creditor Bank One NA) (2lg, )
January 3, 2007 Filing 3845 Notice of Objection to Perseus Motion to Compel Discovery in Adversary Proceeding No. 04-ap-2617 Filed by Creditor Bank One NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Bank One Agreed Protective Order#2 Exhibit 2 Letter from Friedberg#3 Exhibit 3 Letter to Friedberg) (Brown, Kristen)
January 2, 2007 Filing 3844 Notice of Objection to Perseus' Motion to Compel Discovery in Adversary Proceeding No. 04-ap-2617, Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3) (Kopf, John)
October 30, 2006 Filing 3843 Notice of Filing of Post-Confirmation Operating Report for the Quarter Ending September 30, 2006 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
October 27, 2006 Filing 3842 Notice of Filing of Consent Judgment Regarding Proof of Claim Number 747 Filed by The United States of America Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Witalec, Joseph)
October 6, 2006 Filing 3841 Report to Court: Quarterly Post-Confirmation Operating Reports (Replaces docket #3840) Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
October 6, 2006 Filing 3840 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Second Quarter 2006 Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
September 25, 2006 Filing 3839 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Ending June 30, 2006 Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Beck, David)
September 13, 2006 Adversary Case 04-2352 Closed (2lg, )
September 11, 2006 Disposition of Adversary 04-2352 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
September 1, 2006 Filing 3838 Notice re Distribution to Beneficiaries of CSFB Claims Trust, and Setting of Record and Distribution Dates Pursuant to Section 4.2(b) of the CSFB Claims Trust Agreement Filed by Interested Party Avidity Partners, LLC, as Trustee of the CSFB Claims Trust. (Cookson, Kenneth)
August 18, 2006 Filing 3837 Notice of Assignment of Claim w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#3835 Assignment of Claim) Service Date 08/18/2006. (Admin.)
August 18, 2006 Filing 3836 Notice of Assignment of Claim w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s)#3834 Assignment of Claim) Service Date 08/18/2006. (Admin.)
August 15, 2006 Filing 3835 Assignment of Claim Transferor: Helmsing Leach Herlong Newman and Rouse, (Claim No. 74) To Bank of America (2lg, )
August 15, 2006 Filing 3834 Assignment of Claim Transferor: Gerbig Snell Weisheimber Advertising (Claim No. 59) To Bank of America (2lg, )
August 7, 2006 Disposition of Adversary 03-2650 Judgment For Plaintiff (2lg, )
August 7, 2006 Adversary Case 03-2650 Closed (2lg, )
August 6, 2006 Filing 3833 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3832 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 08/06/2006. (Admin.)
August 3, 2006 Filing 3832 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Claims Asserted By Epstein Becker & Green PC Re: (RE: related document(s)#3366 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3452 Response filed by Creditor Epstein Becker & Green P.C.). (2lg, )
August 2, 2006 Filing 3831 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3830 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 08/02/2006. (Admin.)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3830 Order Granting Motion Of Debt Acquisition Company Of America V, LLC For Order Directing Debtor To Pay Class C-7 Claims (Related Doc #3824) (2kab, )
July 26, 2006 Proceeding Memo: Hearing not Held on 7/26/06 on Motion of Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC for Order Directing Debtor to Pay Class C-7 Claims (3824). No Objections filed, Motion Granted. Order to be Uploaded. (2je)
July 3, 2006 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#3824 Motion of Debt Acquisition Company of America V, LLC for Order Directing Debtor to Pay Class C-7 Claims and Response of Unecumbered Assets Truste to Motion of Debt Acquisition Company of America V, LLC for Order Directing Debtor to Pay Class C-7 Claims filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC) Hearing to be held on 7/26/2006 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #3824, (2lg, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 3829 Notice of Hearing on Motion and Response of Unencumbered Assets Trust to Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3824 Motion of Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC for Order Directing Debtor to Pay Class C-7 Claims Filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Kirby, Dean)). (Beck, David)
June 30, 2006 Filing 3828 Response to (related document(s): #3824 Motion of Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC for Order Directing Debtor to Pay Class C-7 Claims filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC) Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Beck, David)
June 24, 2006 Filing 3827 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3826 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 06/24/2006. (Admin.)
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3826 Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice re: Dean T Kirby Jr (Related Doc #3823) (2lg, )
June 14, 2006 Filing 3825 Certificate of Service for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC (RE: related document(s)#3823 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice). (Kirby, Dean)
June 13, 2006 To: DEAN KIRBY - Notification of Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Motion To Pay Class C-7 Claims Should Be Filed Using The Pay Event From the Motions/Applications Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3824 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC) (2lg, )
June 13, 2006 To: DEAN KIRBY - Notification of Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Should Be Filed Using The Appear Pro Hac Vice Event From the Motions/Applications Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3823 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC) (2lg, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 3824 Motion of Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC for Order Directing Debtor to Pay Class C-7 Claims Filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kirby, Dean)
June 12, 2006 Filing 3823 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditor Debt Acquisition Company of America V LLC (Kirby, Dean)
April 24, 2006 Filing 3822 Withdrawal of Claim(s): 628-658, 284-297, 371-379, 870-878 filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Kopf, John)
April 8, 2006 Filing 3821 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3820 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 04/08/2006. (Admin.)
April 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3820 Order Granting Motion For Leave to Withdraw Proofs of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3006 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and for Certain Relief (Related Doc #3815) (2lg, )
April 6, 2006 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held on 4/6/06 on Joint Motion for Entry of Order Granting Leave to Withdraw Proofs of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3006 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and for Certain Relief (3815). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Jeff Cotner, Bill Wilkinson, Sherrie Lazear and Kathy Lloyd. Court Granted Motion; Order to be Uploaded. (2je)
March 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3819 Order of the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel Regarding BAP Case Number 05-8048. The Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal is Made Moot by Panel's Disposition of the Appeal. Accordingly The Motion for stay is Denied as moot (RE: related document(s)#3724 Order on Motion to Enforce). (2dr, )
March 15, 2006 Filing 3818 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3817 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) Service Date 03/15/2006. (Admin.)
March 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3817 Order (I) Granting Motion Expedite Hearing of Motion for Leave and (II) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof (Related Doc #3816) Hearing to be held on 4/6/2006 at 09:30 AM Courtroom B for #3815, (2lg, )
March 9, 2006 Filing 3816 Joint Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3815 Generic Motion) on Motion for Leave to Withdraw Proofs of Claims Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Kopf, John)
March 9, 2006 Filing 3815 Joint Motion for Leave to Withdraw Proofs of Claims Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kopf, John)
February 23, 2006 Filing 3814 Complaint by VI/XII Collateral Trust ; FTI Consulting, Inc. against Long Term Care Management ; Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc. ; Quality Long Term Care, Inc. #6-2216; Nature of Suit(s): 454 (Recover Money/Property) , Fee Amount 250 Filed by VI/XII Collateral Trust ; FTI Consulting, Inc. . (Kennard, J)
February 21, 2006 Filing 3813 Receipt of Record on Appeal by Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. BAP Case Number 05-8048 (RE: related document(s)#3728 Notice of Appeal, , filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc.) (2dr, )Corrective Entry Re: To Correct File Date. Modified on 2/21/2006 (2dr, ).
February 14, 2006 Disposition of Adversary 04-2610 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
February 14, 2006 Adversary Case 04-2610 Closed (2lg, )
January 27, 2006 To: DAVID KORN - Notification of Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Notice of Withdrawal Should Be Filed Using The Withdrawal Event From the Other Menu and the PDF should contain only the appropriate case number and case name according to the Case it is to be filed in. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3812 Notice, filed by Creditor Donald Ayers) (2lg, )
January 26, 2006 Filing 3812 Notice of Withdrawal of Docket No. 3811 Filed by Creditor Donald Ayers (RE: related document(s)#3811 Motion Motion of Donald H. Ayers to Require the Advancement of Defense Costs Filed by Creditor Donald Ayers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Korn, David)). (Korn, David)
January 26, 2006 To: D Korn - Notification of Deficiency: The Electronic Signature on the PDF Document does not Correspond with the Attorney Login. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3811 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Donald Ayers) (2kab, )
January 26, 2006 To: D Korn - Notification of Deficiency: The Electronic Signature on the PDF Document does not Correspond with the Attorney Login. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3811 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Donald Ayers) (2kab, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Notification of deficiency issued twice due to system error. Modified on 1/26/2006 (2kab, ).
January 26, 2006 To: B Dickerson - Notification of Deficiency: The PDF Document Appears to be Filed in an Incorrect Case. The PDF is captioned for an adversary case. Please Withdraw the Document and Re-File in the Correct Case or File an Amended Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3811 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Donald Ayers) (2kab, )
January 26, 2006 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Notification of deficiency issued twice due to system error. (RE: related document(s) Notification of Deficiency, ) (2kab, )
January 25, 2006 Filing 3811 Motion Motion of Donald H. Ayers to Require the Advancement of Defense Costs Filed by Creditor Donald Ayers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Korn, David)
January 20, 2006 Filing 3810 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3809 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 01/20/2006. (Admin.)
January 18, 2006 Disposition of Adversary 04-2605 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
January 18, 2006 Adversary Case 04-2605 Closed (2lg, )
January 17, 2006 Filing 3809 Stipulation and agreed order regarding certain deadlines relating to proofs of claim filed by the United States of America (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2kab, )
January 12, 2006 Filing 3808 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kristopher E Aungst Filed by U.S. Trustee Asst US Trustee (Col). (Aungst, Kristopher)
January 12, 2006 Filing 3807 Receipt of Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of #3787 Agreed Motion for Withdraw of Reference to District Court. Case Number 06-cv-24. Honorable Judge Smith (2dr, )
January 12, 2006 Filing 3806 Withdrawal Filed by Creditor IOS Capital LLC (RE: related document(s)#3805 Notice of Appearance). (Connolly Lawson, Kimberly)
January 11, 2006 Filing 3805 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kimberly E Connolly Lawson Filed by Creditor IOS Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Connolly Lawson, Kimberly) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: This entry was withdrawn. See document 3806. Modified on 1/13/2006 (2kab, ).
December 30, 2005 Filing 3803 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District Court. Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Docket (RE: related document(s)#3787 (2dr, )
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3804 Order of the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel Regarding BAP Case Number 05-8082. The October 18, 2005 Show Cause Order in Case No. 05-8048 is hereby Withdrawn. Case No. 05-8082 is Dismissed as a duplicative appeal. This dismissal is without prejudice to the appellant's right to pursue their appeal in Case No. 05-8048
December 15, 2005 Filing 3802 Notice of Substitution of Counsel terminating Dean P Wyman, adding Kristopher E Aungst and Kristopher E Aungst for Asst US Trustee (Col) Filed by U.S. Trustees Asst US Trustee (Col), Asst US Trustee (Col). (Aungst, Kristopher)
December 8, 2005 Filing 3801 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to 05-8082. Case Number BAP. (RE: related document(s)#3728 Notice of Appeal, , filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc., #3791 Notice of Appeal, filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management) (2dr, )
November 28, 2005 Filing 3800 Receipt of Notice of Appeal by the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel being BAP Case Number 05-8082 (RE: related document(s)#3791 Notice of Appeal, filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management) (2dr, )
November 22, 2005 To: STEPHANIE CHAMP - Notification of Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Withdrawal of Proof of Claim Should Be Filed Using The Withdrawal of Claim Event From the Claims Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3799 Stipulation filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) (2lg, )
November 21, 2005 Filing 3799 Stipulation with Dell Marketing LP and Dell Receivables LP as to Withdrawal of Proofs of Claim Registry Numbers 49, 81, and 98 Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. (Champ, Stephanie)
November 21, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 04-2613 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
November 21, 2005 Adversary Case 04-2613 Closed (2lg, )
November 14, 2005 Filing 3798 Amended Document Amended Request for Removal from Electronic Notice List to Include Electronic Signature on Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Gulf Insurance Company (RE: related document(s)#3797 Document). (Pettigrew, Grady)
November 14, 2005 Filing 3797 Document Request for Removal from Electronic Notice List Filed by Creditor Gulf Insurance Company. (Pettigrew, Grady)
November 7, 2005 Filing 3796 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal and Statement of Issues Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (RE: related document(s)#3791 Notice of Appeal,, #3728 Notice of Appeal,, ). Appellee designation Due: 11/17/2005. Transmission of Designation Due: 12/7/2005. (Riedel, Timothy)
November 5, 2005 Filing 3795 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3793 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 11/05/2005. (Admin.)
November 3, 2005 Filing 3794 Transmittal Memorandum to BAP of Notice of Appeal (2dr, )
November 3, 2005 Filing 3793 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service of Notice of Appeal of Long Term CareManagement, Inc., Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc. and Quality Long Term Care, Inc. (2dr, )
October 28, 2005 Filing 3792 Withdrawal Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (RE: related document(s)#3790 Motion NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LONG TERM CARE MANAGEMENT, INC., QUALITY LONG TERM CARE MANAGEMENT, INC. AND QUALITY LONG TERM CARE, INC. FROM ORDER ON MOTION TO ENFORCE CONFIRMATION ORDER [DOC. 3724]). (Riedel, Timothy)
October 28, 2005 Filing 3791 Notice of Appeal of Long Term Care Management, Inc., Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc. and Quality Long Term Care, Inc. from Order on Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order [Doc. 3724]. Fee Amount $255.00 Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (RE: related document(s)#3724 Order on Motion to Enforce, #3785 Order (Generic)). Appellant Designation Due: 11/7/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Riedel, Timothy)
October 28, 2005 Filing 3790 Motion NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LONG TERM CARE MANAGEMENT, INC., QUALITY LONG TERM CARE MANAGEMENT, INC. AND QUALITY LONG TERM CARE, INC. FROM ORDER ON MOTION TO ENFORCE CONFIRMATION ORDER [DOC. 3724] Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Riedel, Timothy)
October 28, 2005 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 5088441,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 25, 2005 Filing 3789 Notice of (a) Motion to Stay Proceedings on Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. and (b) Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to the Proof of Clalim of Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (RE: related document(s)#3786 Agreed Motion To Stay (related documents #3775 Objection to Claim, ) Proceedings on Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Appendix 1 to Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit 2 to Appendix 1# 4 Exhibit 3 to Appendix 1) (Yarger, Jonathon), #3787 Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to the Proof of Claim of Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A to Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B to Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit C to Exhibit A) (Yarger, Jonathon)). (Yarger, Jonathon)
October 22, 2005 Filing 3788 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3785 Order (Generic)) Service Date 10/22/2005. (Admin.)
October 20, 2005 Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mwdref] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 5026440,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 20, 2005 To: JONATHON YARGER - Notification of Deficiency: The PDF'S Re: Attachment documents do not Match Docket Text. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3786 Motion To Stay, filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA, #3787 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA) (2lg, )
October 19, 2005 Filing 3787 Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to the Proof of Claim of Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit A to Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B to Exhibit A#4 Exhibit C to Exhibit A) (Yarger, Jonathon)
October 19, 2005 Filing 3786 Agreed Motion To Stay (related documents #3775 Objection to Claim, ) Proceedings on Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A. Filed by Creditor Purcell & Scott Co LPA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Appendix 1 to Exhibit A#3 Exhibit 2 to Appendix 1#4 Exhibit 3 to Appendix 1) (Yarger, Jonathon)
October 18, 2005 Filing 3785 Stipulation and agreed order resolving objection to VI/XII Collateral Trust's statement of fees and expenses. (2kab, )
October 11, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Not Held on 10/11/05 on Affidavit of Matthew A. Kairis in Support of VI/XII Collateral Trust's Statement of Fees and Costs (3740). Agreed Order to be Uploaded Resolving. (2je)
October 9, 2005 Filing 3784 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3783 Order (Generic)) Service Date 10/09/2005. (Admin.)
October 6, 2005 Filing 3783 Agreed Order Extending Deadline for Filing Reply in Support of VI/XII Collateral Trusts Statement of Fees and Expenses Re: (RE: related document(s)#3740 Affidavit, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
September 30, 2005 Filing 3782 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3781 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/30/2005. (Admin.)
September 27, 2005 Filing 3781 Agreed order extending deadline for filing reply in support of VI/XII Collateral Trust's statement of fees and expenses. (RE: related document(s)#3760 Objection, filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc., #3740 Affidavit, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2kab, )
September 27, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 04-2611 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
September 27, 2005 Adversary Case 04-2611 Closed (2lg, )
September 27, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 04-2616 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
September 27, 2005 Adversary Case 04-2616 Closed (2lg, )
September 23, 2005 Filing 3780 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3776 Order to Set Hearing, , ) Service Date 09/23/2005. (Admin.)
September 23, 2005 Filing 3779 Withdrawal of Claim(s): Proof of Claim No. 671 Filed by Creditor Pain Control Consultants Inc. (Stovall, Richard)
September 23, 2005 Filing 3778 Withdrawal of Claim(s): Proof of Claim No. 670 Filed by Creditor Pain Control Consultants Inc. (Stovall, Richard)
September 23, 2005 Filing 3777 Withdrawal of Claim(s): Proof of Claim No. 669 Filed by Creditor Pain Control Consultants Inc. (Stovall, Richard)
September 20, 2005 Filing 3776 Agreed order scheduling continued hearing on affidavit of Matthew A. Kairis in support of VI/XII Collateral Trust's statement of fees and expenses and setting reply deadline (RE: related document(s)#3760 Objection, filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc., #3740 Affidavit, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Hearing to be held on 10/11/2005 at 02:00 PM Courtroom A (2kab, )
September 19, 2005 Filing 3775 Objection to Claim [Objection to Proof of Claims Filed by Purcell & Scott, Co., L.P.A.] Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Ballesteros, Sydney)
September 15, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued from 9/15/05 to be held on 10/11/2005 at 02:00 PM Courtroom A on Affidavit of Matthew A. Kairis in Support of VI/XII Collateral Trust's Statement of Fees and Costs (3740). Agreed Order to be Uploaded. (2je)
August 21, 2005 Filing 3774 Notice of Hearing w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related documents(s) Hearing (Bk Other) Set) Service Date 08/21/2005. (Admin.)
August 19, 2005 Filing 3773 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3767 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 08/19/2005. (Admin.)
August 19, 2005 Filing 3772 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3766 Amended Order) Service Date 08/19/2005. (Admin.)
August 19, 2005 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#3740 Affidavit, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Hearing to be held on 9/15/2005 at 02:00 PM Courtroom A for #3740 (2je)
August 17, 2005 Filing 3771 Transcript of hearing held Tuesday, July 26, 2005. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1#2 Attachment 2#3 Attachment 3#4 Attachment 4) (2kab, )
August 17, 2005 Filing 3770 Transcript for hearing held Wednesday, July 27, 2005. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1#2 Attachment 2#3 Attachment 3#4 Attachment 4#5 Attachment 5) (2kab, )
August 17, 2005 Filing 3769 Transcript of hearing held Wednesday, August 10, 2005. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 2#2 Attachment 3#3 Aattachment 4#4 Attachment 5#5 Attachment 6#6 Attachment 7) (2kab, )
August 16, 2005 Filing 3767 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Deadline to Object to Claims Filed by the State of Ohio (RE: related document(s)#3358 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
August 16, 2005 Filing 3766 Amendment to Agreed Protective Order (the "Protective Order") Entered Into Between Debtors and Kaye Scholer On July 14, 2004. (2lg, )
August 13, 2005 Filing 3765 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3764 Memorandum Opinion, ) Service Date 08/13/2005. (Admin.)
August 11, 2005 Filing 3768 Transcript of Hearing August 3, 2005 at 2:30 pm. (2lg, )
August 10, 2005 Filing 3764 Memorandum Opinion (RE: related document(s)#3729 Motion to Compel, Motion to Enforce, Motion for Sanctions, filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh, #3730 Motion to Compel, Motion to Enforce, Motion for Sanctions, filed by Bruce Yasmeh). (2kab, )
August 9, 2005 To: RICHARD BOUCHER - Notification of Deficiency: The PDF Document does not Match Docket Text. Please Upload Amended Order or Withdrawal of the Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3761 Amended Document, filed by Creditor US Attorney, Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Creditor Kaye Scholer LLP) (2lg, )
August 7, 2005 Filing 3763 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3762 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 08/07/2005. (Admin.)
August 5, 2005 Filing 3762 Stipulation and agreed order resolving claims by and against Silver Moves Inc, Parke Home Health Care Inc and Numed Rehabilitation Inc. (RE: related document(s)#2202 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). (2kab, )
August 5, 2005 Filing 3761 Amended Document To Agreed Protective Order Entered Into Between Debtors and Kaye Scholer on July 14, 2004 Filed by Creditors Kaye Scholer LLP, US Attorney, Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises (RE: related document(s)#3380 Order (Generic)). (Boucher, Richard)
August 4, 2005 Filing 3760 Objection to (related document(s): #3740 Affidavit, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Filed by Other Professionals Long Term Care Management, Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Quality Long Term Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Biehl, Adam)
August 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held on 8/3/05 on Debtors' Omnibus Objections No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on Basis of No Liability (2202). Appearances by Charles Oellermann and David Jennis (by phone). Settled but for three claims 701, 702 and 703 which are resolved by mutual releases, order uploaded. (2je)
August 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held on 8/3/05 on Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of no Liability (3359) re Pain Control Claims 669, 670 and 671 and response (3507). Appearances by Charles Oellermann and Matt Fisher. Mutual releases being negotiated. Claims to be withdrawn when settled. (2je)
August 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held on 8/3/05 on Objection to Claim and Motion to Disallow Claims of Epstein Becker & Green PC (3366). Appearances by Charles Oellermann and Robert Kargen (by phone). DCHC Greater Southeast Bankruptcy case has motion to dismiss pending. If claim remains pending, will have to hear. Parties to report to Court. (2je)
August 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held on 8/3/05 on Motions of Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (3729) and (3730). Appearances by Bruce Yasmeh, John Stumreiter, Charles Oellermann, Leon Friedberg, Barbara Klass and Stacy Raphael. Court read its findings of fact and conclusions of law into the record. Court dismissed motion in entirety with prejudice to Bruce Yasmeh and Shama Enterprises, LLC. Documents filed by Jones Day attached to notice of this hearing are true and correct copies. (2je)
August 3, 2005 Filing 3759 Declaration of Mark H Aprahamian filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh . (2kab, )
August 3, 2005 Filing 3758 Proof of personal service filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh . (2kab, )
August 3, 2005 Filing 3757 Supplemental declaration Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3729 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions, #3730 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions). (2kab, )
August 3, 2005 Filing 3756 Notice of Filing of Affidavit Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#2202 Debtors omnibus objection to claim number 6 and Motion to disallow certain claims on the basis of no liability Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises (2kab, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2004 (2kab, ).). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Assets of Silver Moves et al.) (Witalec, Joseph)
August 2, 2005 Filing 3755 Supplmental Declaration of Bruce Yasmeh Dated August 1, 2005 in Support of the Motion of Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh filed June 10, 2005 to Enforce the February 24, 2004 Court Order Approving Competitive Bdding Etc. (RE: related document(s)#3730 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions). (2lg, )
August 2, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 04-2619 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
August 2, 2005 Adversary Case 04-2619 Closed (2lg, )
August 1, 2005 Filing 3753 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for John J. Stumreiter of Brown, Brown & Klass by Kenneth R. Cookson Filed by Interested Parties Clinica Medica Familiar, Kevin Jorgensen, Barbara J. Klass, Robert Madrid, Medinergy, Montebello Medical Group, Pacific Alliance Medical Group, Primed Medical Corporation, Priority Medical Management Services, Inc.. (Cookson, Kenneth)
July 29, 2005 Filing 3754 Reply of Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh to the Opposition of Barbara J Klass Esq to the Motion of Bruce Yasmeh Filed on June 10, 2005 to Enforce Two Federal Bankruptcy Court Orders with Respect to the Sale of the Assets Located at 1830 S Main Street, 113-115, 129 E Washington, Los Angeles, California "Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumberances, and Interests;" Request that the Law Firm of Brown, Brown, & Klass and Each of its Partners be Cited for Civl Contempt (related document(s): #3750 Objection filed by Interested Party Barbara J. Klass, Interested Party Kevin Jorgensen, Interested Party Primed Medical Corporation, Interested Party Clinica Medica Familiar, Interested Party Robert Madrid, Interested Party Medinergy, Interested Party Montebello Medical Group, Interested Party Priority Medical Management Services, Inc., Interested Party Pacific Alliance Medical Group) Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (2lg, )
July 26, 2005 Filing 3752 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Motion Of Stacy L. Raphael, Esq. For An Order Permitting The Filing Of The Memorandum Of Stacy L. Raphael Esq. In Response To Motion Of Bruce Yasmeh Instanter Filed by Respondent Stacey L. Raphael (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF STACY L. RAPHAEL, ESQ. FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING OF THE MEMORANDUM OF STACY L. RAPHAEL, ESQ. IN RESPONSE TO MOTION OF BRUCE YASMEH INSTANTER) (Friedberg, Leon)
July 26, 2005 Filing 3751 Response to (related document(s): #3730 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh) Memorandum Of Stacy L. Raphael, Esq. In Response To The Motion Of Bruce Yasmeh (Docket No. 3730) Filed by Respondent Stacey L. Raphael (Friedberg, Leon)
July 25, 2005 Filing 3750 Objection to (related document(s): #3729 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh) Filed by Interested Parties Pacific Alliance Medical Group, Priority Medical Management Services, Inc., Montebello Medical Group, Medinergy, Robert Madrid, Clinica Medica Familiar, Primed Medical Corporation, Kevin Jorgensen, Barbara J. Klass (Attachments: #1 Declarations of Barbara J. Klass and John J. Stumreiter#2 Certificate of Service#3 Exhibit 1#4 Exhibit 2#5 Exhibit 2#6 Exhibit 2#7 Exhibit 2#8 Exhibit 2#9 Exhibit 3#10 Exhibit 4#11 Exhibit 5#12 Exhibit 6#13 Exhibit 7#14 Exhibit 8) (Cookson, Kenneth)
July 18, 2005 Filing 3749 Receipt of Notice of Appeal by the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel being BAP Case Number 05-8048 (RE: related document(s)#3728 Notice of Appeal, , filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc.) (2brm, )
July 11, 2005 Filing 3748 Proof of Personnel Service re: Stacy Raphael Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3741 Notice of Hearing on Motions ). (2lg, )
July 11, 2005 Filing 3747 Proof of Personnel Service re: Barbara J Klass Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3741 Notice of Hearing on Motions ). (2lg, )
July 11, 2005 Filing 3746 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to 05-8048. Case Number BAP. (RE: related document(s)#3728 Notice of Appeal, , filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management, Other Professional Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Other Professional Quality Long Term Care, Inc.) (2brm, )
July 1, 2005 Filing 3745 Proof of Personal Service as to Stacy L Raphael Esq Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3730 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions). (2lg, )
July 1, 2005 Filing 3744 Proof of Personal Service as to Barbara J Klass Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3729 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions). (2lg, )
July 1, 2005 Filing 3743 Support Memorandum and Supplemental Declaration of Bruce Yasmeh in Support of the Motion of Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh Filed on June 10, 2005 to Enforce: (1) The February 24, 2004 Court Order Approving Competitive Bidding Procedures with Respect to the Assets Located at 1830 S Main St, 113 - 115, 129 E Washington, Los Angeles, California whereby the Assets were Sold "Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumberances, and Interests;" (2) The July 25, 2004 Court Order Approving the Sale of the Assets; and (3) The Terms and Conditions of the Assets Purchase Agreement Entered into Between the Unencumbered Assets Trust ("Seller") and Shama Enterprises, LLC, As Designee of Mark Arahamian and Karen Kalatian ("Buyer"); Request for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions Against Stacy L Raphael, Esq in the Amount of Three Thousand Dollars ($3,000.00) Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3730 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions). (2lg, )
July 1, 2005 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#3729 Motion to Compel, , , , Motion to Enforce, , , , Motion for Sanctions, , , filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh, #3730 Motion to Compel, , , , Motion to Enforce, , , , Motion for Sanctions, , , filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh) Hearing to be held on 8/3/2005 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3729 and for #3730, (2lg, )
June 30, 2005 Filing 3742 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3741 Notice,,,,,,,, ). (Beck, David)
June 30, 2005 Filing 3741 Notice of (I) Hearing on Motions Filed by Bruce Yasmeh to Enforce Sale Order and (II) Filing of Certain Related Documents Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3729 Motion of Interested Party Brucey Yasmeh to Enforce: (1) The terms and conditions of the Asset Pruchase Agreement Entered into Between the Unencumbered Assets Trust ("Seller") and Shama Enterprises, LLC ("Buyer"/Designee of Mark Aprahamian) and Executed on or about July 31, 2004 with Respect to the Assets Located at 1830 S MAin Street, 113-115, 129 E Washington, Los Angeles California Whereby the Assets were Sold "Free and Clear of Liens, Claims Encumbrances and Interests;" (2) The February 25, 2004 Court Order Approving Competitive Bidding Procedures; and (30 The July 25, 2004 Court Order Approving the Sale; Request for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions Against the Sale; Request for the Imposition Monetary Sanctions Against Barbara J Klass Esq. Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (2lg, ), #3730 Motion of Interested Party Brucey Yasmeh to Enforce: (1) The terms and conditions of the Asset Pruchase Agreement Entered into Between the Unencumbered Assets Trust ("Seller") and Shama Enterprises, LLC ("Buyer"/Designee of Mark Aprahamian) and Executed on or about July 31, 2004 with Respect to the Assets Located at 1830 S MAin Street, 113-115, 129 E Washington, Los Angeles California Whereby the Assets were Sold "Free and Clear of Liens, Claims Encumbrances and Interests;" (2) The February 25, 2004 Court Order Approving Competitive Bidding Procedures; and (30 The July 25, 2004 Court Order Approving the Sale; Request for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions Against the Sale; Request for the Imposition Monetary Sanctions Against Stacy L Raphael Esq Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (2lg, )). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Asset Purchase Agreement#2 Exhibit B Assignment and Assumption Agreement#3 Exhibit C Bill of Sale) (Beck, David)
June 30, 2005 Filing 3740 Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Matthew A. Kairis in Support of VI/XII Collateral Trust's Statement of Fees and Costs Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3724 Order on Motion to Enforce). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kairis, Matthew)
June 30, 2005 Filing 3739 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3738 Notice). (Witalec, Joseph)
June 30, 2005 Filing 3738 Notice Regarding Case Management Hearings Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Witalec, Joseph)
June 28, 2005 Filing 3737 Supplemental memorandum Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (RE: related document(s)#3729 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions, #3730 Motion to CompelMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion to EnforceMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For SanctionsMotion For Sanctions). (2kab, )
June 21, 2005 Filing 3736 Certificate of Service - Amended Certificate of Service of Appellants' Designation of Items to be Included in Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (RE: related document(s)#3735 Appellant Designation,, ). (Riedel, Timothy)
June 20, 2005 Filing 3735 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal And Statement of the Issues Appellants' Designation of Items to be Included in Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues Filed by Long Term Care Management, Inc., Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., and Quality Long Term Care, Inc. Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (RE: related document(s)#3728 Notice of Appeal,, ). Appellee designation due by 6/30/2005. Transmission of Designation Due by 7/20/2005. (Riedel, Timothy)
June 16, 2005 Filing 3734 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3732 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 06/16/2005. (Admin.)
June 14, 2005 Filing 3733 Transmittal Memorandum to BAP of #3728 Notice of Appeal. (2dr, )
June 14, 2005 Filing 3732 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service of Notice of Appeal. Parties Served:Charles E. Slyngstad,Yvette A. Cox,Nick Cavalier,Timothy A. Riedel,Paul E. Harner and Matthew Kairis, (2dr, )
June 14, 2005 Filing 3731 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service of Notice of Appeal. CORRECTIVE ENTRY RE:No Parties Selected. Notice to be Re-issued (2dr, ) Modified on 6/14/2005 (2dr, ).
June 13, 2005 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 00296535,amount$ 255.00. (2sd)
June 10, 2005 Filing 3730 Motion of Interested Party Brucey Yasmeh to Enforce: (1) The terms and conditions of the Asset Pruchase Agreement Entered into Between the Unencumbered Assets Trust ("Seller") and Shama Enterprises , LLC ("Buyer"/Designee of Mark Aprahamian) and Executed on or about July 31, 2004 with Respect to the Assets Located at 1830 S MAin Street, 113-115, 129 E Washington, Los Angeles California Whereby the Assets were Sold "Free and Clear of Liens, Claims Encumbrances and Interests;" (2) The February 25, 2004 Court Order Approving Competitive Bidding Procedures; and (30 The July 25, 2004 Court Order Approving the Sale; Request for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions Against the Sale; Request for the Imposition Monetary Sanctions Against Stacy L Raphael Esq Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (2lg, )
June 10, 2005 Filing 3729 Motion of Interested Party Brucey Yasmeh to Enforce: (1) The terms and conditions of the Asset Pruchase Agreement Entered into Between the Unencumbered Assets Trust ("Seller") and Shama Enterprises , LLC ("Buyer"/Designee of Mark Aprahamian) and Executed on or about July 31, 2004 with Respect to the Assets Located at 1830 S MAin Street, 113-115, 129 E Washington, Los Angeles California Whereby the Assets were Sold "Free and Clear of Liens, Claims Encumbrances and Interests;" (2) The February 25, 2004 Court Order Approving Competitive Bidding Procedures; and (30 The July 25, 2004 Court Order Approving the Sale; Request for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions Against the Sale; Request for the Imposition Monetary Sanctions Against Barbara J Klass Esq. Filed by Interested Party Bruce Yasmeh (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (2lg, )
June 10, 2005 Filing 3728 Notice of Appeal of Long Term Care Management, Inc., Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc. and Quality Long Term Care, Inc. from Order on Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order [Doc. 3724]. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Other Professionals Quality Long Term Care, Inc., Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc., Long Term Care Management (RE: related document(s)#3724 Order on Motion to Enforce). Appellant Designation due by 6/20/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order On Motion To Enforce Confirmation Order)(Riedel, Timothy)
June 9, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued on 6/9/05 on Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of no Liability (3359) re Pain Control Claims 669, 670, and 671. Appearances by Joseph Witalec and Matthew Fisher. Hearing to be held on 8/3/2005 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A (2je)
June 9, 2005 Proceeding Memo: Hearing Continued on 6/9/05 re Debtors' Omnibus Objections No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on basis of no liability (2202). Appearance by Joseph Witalec. Hearing to be held on 8/3/2005 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A (2je)
June 4, 2005 Filing 3727 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3724 Order on Motion to Enforce) Service Date 06/04/2005. (Admin.)
June 2, 2005 Filing 3726 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3723 Order (Generic)) Service Date 06/02/2005. (Admin.)
June 2, 2005 Filing 3725 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3722 Order (Generic)) Service Date 06/02/2005. (Admin.)
June 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3724 Order on motion to enforce confirmation order. (Related Doc #3605) (2kab, )
May 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3723 Order regarding case management hearings. (RE: related document(s)#3500 Order (Generic)). (2kab, )
May 31, 2005 Filing 3722 First amended stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Frank P. Magliochetti. (2kab, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 3721 Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Creditor Lance K Poulsen . (2kab, )
May 21, 2005 Filing 3720 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3716 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 05/21/2005. (Admin.)
May 20, 2005 Filing 3719 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3715 Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11), Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11)) Service Date 05/20/2005. (Admin.)
May 20, 2005 Filing 3718 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3713 Order (Generic)) Service Date 05/20/2005. (Admin.)
May 20, 2005 Filing 3717 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3714 Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11), Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11), Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11)) Service Date 05/20/2005. (Admin.)
May 18, 2005 Filing 3716 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Jon Beacham. (RE: related document(s)#3525 Notice, filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (2kab, )
May 18, 2005 Filing 3712 Notice of Change of Address of Counsel Filed by Creditor Pharos Capital Partners LP. (Murray, Joseph)
May 18, 2005 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Order was not served. (RE: related document(s)#3714 Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11), Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11), Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11)) (2kab, )
May 17, 2005 Filing 3715 Rescheduling order. (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #2202 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #3364 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Status hearing to be held on 6/9/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A (2kab, )
May 17, 2005 Filing 3714 Rescheduling order. (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #2202 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #3364 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Status hearing to be held on 6/9/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A (2kab, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Order was not served. Modified on 5/18/2005 (2kab, ).
May 17, 2005 Filing 3713 Agreed protective order. (2kab, )
May 13, 2005 Filing 3711 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3710 Order (Generic)) Service Date 05/13/2005. (Admin.)
May 10, 2005 Filing 3710 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Allowance of Claim Filed by HCA Inc Re: (RE: related document(s)#3348 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (2lg, )
May 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 5/4/05 on Debtors' Omnibus Objections No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on the Basis of no Liability (2202). Appearances by Joe Witalec and Sherri Lazear. One Outstanding Claim Remains - Silver Moves. In Negotiations to Resolve. Continued to 6/1/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
May 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 5/4/05 on Debtors' Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of no Liability (3359) re Pain Control Claims 669, 670 and 671. Appearances by Joe Witalec and Sherri Lazear. In Discussions re Resolution. Continued to 6/1/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
May 4, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 5/4/05 on Unencumbered Asset Trust's Objection to Claim No. 121 and Motion to Reduce Claims of HCA, Inc. (3364). In Process of Finalizing Settlement. Continued to 6/1/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
April 29, 2005 Filing 3709 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3707 Order (Generic)) Service Date 04/29/2005. (Admin.)
April 29, 2005 Filing 3708 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3706 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 04/29/2005. (Admin.)
April 27, 2005 Filing 3707 Stipulation and agreed order regarding allowance of claim filed by ING Capital Markets LLC. (2kab, )
April 27, 2005 Filing 3706 Agreed scheduling order concerning dispute over form of order disallowing certain proofs of claim filed by Bank One NA and JP Morgan Chase Bank. (RE: related document(s)#3691 Notice, , , filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, #3674 Response, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (2kab, )
April 26, 2005 Adversary Case 2-04-ap-02612 Closed (2lg, )
April 26, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 04-2612 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
April 17, 2005 Filing 3705 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3702 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 04/17/2005. (Admin.)
April 17, 2005 Filing 3704 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3700 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 04/17/2005. (Admin.)
April 17, 2005 Filing 3703 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3701 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 04/17/2005. (Admin.)
April 14, 2005 Filing 3702 First Amended Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations and Time Based Defenses From October 4, 2004 Through May 31, 2005 with Respect to Claims Against Steven M Scott and Affiliates Listed on Addendum "A" (2lg, )
April 14, 2005 Filing 3701 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service RE: related doc #3700 Order to serve additionally to Allan Tippie (2lg, )
April 14, 2005 Filing 3700 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Allowance of Claim Filed by Sulmeyerkupetz APC (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
April 7, 2005 Filing 3699 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3697 Order (Generic)) Service Date 04/07/2005. (Admin.)
April 6, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 4/6/05 on Debtors' Omnibus Objections No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on Basis of No Liability (2202). Appearances by Matt Kairis and Amy Bostic. Silver Moves Remains. Continued to 5/4/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
April 6, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 4/6/05 on Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability (3359) re Pain Control Claims 669, 670, 671 and Response (3507); and Sulmeyer Kupetz Claim 897. Appearances by Matt Kairis and Amy Bostic. Negotiations Ongoing. Continued to 5/4/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
April 6, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 4/6/05 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Med Diversified, Inc. and its Affiliates (2240) and Response (2599). Appearances by Matt Kairis and Amy Bostic. Resolved by the Withdrawal of Claims filed 2/2/05. (2je)
April 6, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 4/6/05 on Unencumbered Asset Trust's Objection to Claim No. 121 and Motion to Reduce Claims of HCA, Inc. (3364). Appearances by Matt Kairis and Amy Bostic. Settlement Reached with HCA, in Process of Getting Signatures. Contined to 5/4/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
April 4, 2005 Filing 3698 Transcript of Hearing 1/31/05 at 3:00 pm (2lg, )
April 4, 2005 Filing 3697 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Allowance of Claim Filed by Amedisys Inc Re: (RE: related document(s)#3133 and #3343). (2lg, )
March 28, 2005 Filing 3696 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference (Claims of Lance Poulsen and Barbara Poulsen). Fee Amount $150 Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
March 28, 2005 Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mwdref] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 3557655,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
March 25, 2005 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Motion to Withdraw Reference #3693 to District. Case Number 05-cv-290. Graham (2brm, ) Modified on 4/7/2005 (2brm, ).
March 24, 2005 Filing 3695 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3692 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) Service Date 03/24/2005. (Admin.)
March 22, 2005 Filing 3694 Notice Withdrawal of Proof of Claim Number 682 Filed by Creditors Rebecca Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett. (Zacks, Benjamin)
March 22, 2005 Filing 3693 Agreed Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D#2 Exhibit E) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
March 22, 2005 Filing 3691 Joint Notice of Objection to the UAT's Proposed Order Regarding Representative Claims Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3674 Response to (related document(s): #3648 Joint Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Certain of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims. Fee Amount $150 filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, Creditor Harold Pote, Creditor Thomas Mendell, Creditor Eric Wilkinson) [REPLY of UAT to the Limited Responses of JP Morgan Chase Bank and Bank One, NA to Objection to Proofs of Claim DE Nos. 3662 and 3663] Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Ballesteros, Sydney)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kopf, John)
March 22, 2005 Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mwdref] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 3526216,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
March 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3692 Order Granting Motion for R Colby Allsbrook To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #3690) (2lg, )
March 18, 2005 To: SHERRI LAZEAR - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The PDF Document Appears to be Filed in an Incorrect Case And should be filed in their respective Adversarial Cases. Please Withdraw the Document and Re-File in the Correct Case or File an Amended Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3690 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch, Creditor Alpine Securitization) (2lg, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 3690 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion for R. Colby Allsbrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors Alpine Securitization, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of) (Lazear, Sherri)
March 12, 2005 Filing 3689 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3687 Order to Set Hearing) Service Date 03/12/2005. (Admin.)
March 12, 2005 Filing 3688 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3686 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 03/12/2005. (Admin.)
March 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3687 Order setting status conference. This is a copy of document number 7 from adversary proceeding 04-2630. (2kab, )
March 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3686 Order setting status conference. (RE: related document(s)#2217 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #2577 Response filed by Creditor Lance Poulsen, #3579 Objection to Claim filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., #2199 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Status hearing to be held on 3/29/2005 at 10:00 AM in Judge Calhoun's Chambers. (2kab, )
March 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3685 Order setting status conference. (RE: related document(s)#2217 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #2577 Response filed by Creditor Lance Poulsen, #3609 Response filed by Creditor Barbara Poulsen, #3579 Objection to Claim filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., #2199 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Status hearing to be held on 3/29/2005 at 10:00 AM in Judge Calhoun's Chambers. (2kab, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Service of order failed order to be reserved. Modified on 3/10/2005 (2kab, ).
March 8, 2005 Filing 3684 434 (Injunctive Relief): Complaint by National Century Financial Enterprises Inc Et Al against Gulf Insurance Company Et Al. Fee Amount $150. Originally filed 6/6/03. (Attachments: #1 Amended Order Severing Case - Originally filed 11/19/04). (2lg, )
March 2, 2005 Filing 3683 Transcript of hearing held Tuesday, February 22, 2005 at 9:30 AM. (2kab, )
March 2, 2005 Filing 3682 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3680 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 03/02/2005. (Admin.)
February 28, 2005 Filing 3681 Joint Response to (related document(s): #3668 Response,, filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) Reply Brief on Motion to Withdraw Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Kopf, John)
February 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3680 Order Granting Motion of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch and Alpine Securitization Corp to recover filing fees. (Related Doc #3679) (2kab, )
February 28, 2005 Re-docketed as document number #3679 using the correct docketing event. All future references/linkage should be to the new document number. (RE: related document(s)#3646 Document, , filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch, Creditor Alpine Securitization) (2kab, )
February 24, 2005 Filing 3678 Withdrawal Filed by Creditor Med Diversified Inc (RE: related document(s)#2323 Notice of Appearance). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hertz, Jennifer)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Rebecca S. Parrett (2214). Appearance by Jeffry Cotner. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Lance K. Poulsen (2217). Appearances by Jeffry Cotner, Lisa Yerrace and Phil Jones. Court to issue pretrial conference order. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Donald H. Ayers (2211). Appearances by Jeffry Cotner and James Vargo. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Barbara L. Poulsen (2199). Appearances by Jeffry Cotner, Lisa Yerrace and Phil Jones. Court to issue pretrial conference order. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 2/22/05 on Debtors' Omnibus Objections No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on Basis of no Liability (2202). Appearance by Matt Kairis. Continued to 4/6/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 2/22/05 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Med Diversified, Inc. and its Affiliates (2240). Appearance by Matt Kairis. Continued to 4/6/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 2/22/05 on Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of no Liability (3359). Appearance by Matt Kairis, Continued to 4/6/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Objection to Claim filed by Barbara Poulsen filed by Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (3579). Appearances by Jeffry Cotner, Lisa Yerrace and Phil Jones. Court to issue pretrial conference order. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Objection to Claims filed by Bank One, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank filed by Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (3577). Appearances by Jeffry Cotner, Chris Meyer and Amy Bostic. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Motion of VI/XII Collateral Trust to Enforce Confirmation Order (3605). Appearances by Matt Kairis, Yvette Cox and Charles Slyngstad. Under Advisement. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 2/22/05 on Unencumbered Asset Trust's Objection to Claim No. 121 and Motion to Reduce Claims of HCA, Inc. (3364). Appearance by Matt Kairis. Continued to 4/6/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
February 23, 2005 Proceeding Memo Status Hearing Held on 2/22/05 on Objection to Claim filed by Rebecca S. Parrett filed by Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (3581). Appearance by Jeff Cotner. (2je)
February 22, 2005 Filing 3677 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3673 Brief). (Byrne, Sean)
February 22, 2005 Filing 3676 Notice of Withdrawal of Proofs of Claim Filed by Med Diversified, Inc., Chartwell Care Givers, Inc., Chartwell Diversified Services, Inc., Chartwell Community Services, Inc., and Resource Pharmacy, Inc. Filed by Creditor Med Diversified Inc. (Hertz, Jennifer)
February 21, 2005 Filing 3675 Report to Court: Status Overview for February 22, 2005 Status Conference Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
February 21, 2005 Filing 3674 Response to (related document(s): #3648 Joint Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Certain of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims. Fee Amount $150 filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, Creditor Harold Pote, Creditor Thomas Mendell, Creditor Eric Wilkinson) [REPLY of UAT to the Limited Responses of JP Morgan Chase Bank and Bank One, NA to Objection to Proofs of Claim DE Nos. 3662 and 3663] Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Ballesteros, Sydney)
February 21, 2005 Filing 3673 Brief Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order (Re: Pleading No. 3605) Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3605 Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order). (Byrne, Sean)
February 18, 2005 Filing 3672 Motion Memorandum in Opposition of Long Term Care Management, Inc., Quality Long Term Care Management, Inc. and Quality Long Term Care, Inc. to Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order VI/XII Collateral Trust (Doc. 3605) Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven Pavlow in Opposition to Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order) (Cox, Yvette)
February 18, 2005 Filing 3671 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion to Admit Charles E. Slyngstad, Pro Hac Vice Filed by Other Professional Long Term Care Management (Cox, Yvette)
February 16, 2005 Filing 3670 Transcript from hearing held Wednesday, October 6, 2004 at 2:30 PM. (2kab, )
February 15, 2005 To: S. Ballesteros - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The Electronic Signature on the PDF Document does not Correspond with the Attorney Login. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3668 Response, , filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) (2kab, )
February 14, 2005 Filing 3669 Notice of Filing of Current General Service List Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
February 14, 2005 Filing 3668 Response to (related document(s): #3648 Joint Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Certain of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims. Fee Amount $150 filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, Creditor Harold Pote, Creditor Thomas Mendell, Creditor Eric Wilkinson) "Response of the Unencumbered Assets Trust to the Joint Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Certain of the UAT's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claim" Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
February 13, 2005 Filing 3667 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3665 Order on Motion to Stay) Service Date 02/13/2005. (Admin.)
February 13, 2005 Filing 3666 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3664 Order on Motion to Vacate, ) Service Date 02/13/2005. (Admin.)
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3665 Order granting the joint motion to stay proceedings on objections to certain proofs of claims. (Related Doc #3650) (2kab, )
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3664 Order Denying, without prejudice to re-filing, the unencumbered assets trust's motion to vacate protective order concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discover, subject to the entry of a single, comprehensive protective order in parallel proceedings pending in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. (Related Doc #3597) (2kab, )
February 9, 2005 Filing 3663 Response to (related document(s): #3577 Objection to Claim filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (See, P)
February 7, 2005 Filing 3662 Response to (related document(s): #3577 Objection to Claim filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Kopf, John)
February 1, 2005 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 1/31/05 on Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion to Vacate Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the United State District Court for the Southern District of Ohio (3597). Appearances by Robert Madden, Alexander C.B. Barnard, Bill Wilkinson, O. Judson Scheaf, III, Amy Bostic, Sherri Lazear, David Bryan, Colby Allsbrook, Tiffany Miller, David Alexander, Philip A. Brown, James Vargo, Christopher Meyers, Robert Trust, and John Shaler. Motion Denied. Bill Wilkinson to Prepare Order and Share it with Robert Madden Before Submission. (2je)
February 1, 2005 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 1/31/05 on Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings on Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims (3650). Appearances by Jeffry Cotner, Robert Trust, Christopher Meyers, Bill Wilkinson, David Alexander, Sherri Lazear and David Bryan. Motion Granted. Order to be Submitted by Bill Wilkinson. (2je)
January 30, 2005 Filing 3661 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3657 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) Service Date 01/30/2005. (Admin.)
January 28, 2005 Filing 3660 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3654 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) Service Date 01/28/2005. (Admin.)
January 28, 2005 Filing 3659 Opposition Response to (related document(s): #3650 Joint Motion To Stay (related documents #3577 Objection to Claim, #3583 Objection to Claim) filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, Creditor Harold Pote, Creditor Thomas Mendell, Creditor Eric Wilkinson) Filed by Other Professional Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
January 28, 2005 Filing 3658 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John A Gleason Filed by Creditor ING Bank NV. (Gleason, John)
January 28, 2005 To: Sherri Lazear - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The PDF Document Appears to be Filed in an Incorrect Case. Please Withdraw the Document and Re-File in the Correct Case or File an Amended Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3656 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch, Creditor Alpine Securitization) (2kab, )
January 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3657 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Alexander C.B Barnard (Related Doc #3655) (2kab, )
January 27, 2005 Filing 3656 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion for David C. Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors Alpine Securitization, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch (Lazear, Sherri)
January 26, 2005 Filing 3655 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Alexander C.B. Barnard Filed by Creditor ING Bank NV (Gleason, John)
January 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3654 Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing of Motion to Stay and Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof re: (Related Doc #3652) Hearing to be held on 1/31/2005 at 03:00 PM Courtroom A for #3650, (2lg, )
January 25, 2005 Filing 3653 Response to (related document(s): #3597 Motion to Vacate , of the UAT, the Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust) Filed by Creditors Donald Ayers, Ayers LLC, E & D Investments LLC (Korn, David)
January 25, 2005 Filing 3652 Joint Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3650 Motion To Stay, ) Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kopf, John)
January 24, 2005 Filing 3651 Notice of Change of Address of Counsel of Record Juny & Yuen LLP Filed by Creditor United National Bank . (2lg, )
January 24, 2005 Filing 3650 Joint Motion To Stay (related documents #3577 Objection to Claim, #3583 Objection to Claim) Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3) (Kopf, John)
January 24, 2005 Filing 3649 Notice Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (RE: related document(s)#3648 Joint Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Certain of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Kopf, John)). (Kopf, John)
January 24, 2005 Filing 3648 Joint Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Certain of the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Kopf, John)
January 24, 2005 Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mwdref] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 3191065,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
January 21, 2005 Filing 3647 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3644 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) Service Date 01/21/2005. (Admin.)
January 20, 2005 Filing 3679 Motion of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch and Alpine Securitization Corp to recover filing fees. Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation , Credit Suisse First Boston LLC , Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch , Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch (2kab, )CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Re-docketed document #3646 using the correct docketing event. Modified on 2/28/2005 (2kab, ).
January 20, 2005 Filing 3646 Document Motion of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston, New York Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch and Alpine Securitization Corp. to Recover Filing Fees Filed by Creditors Alpine Securitization, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch. (Lazear, Sherri) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Re-docketed as document number #3679 using the correct docketing event. All future references/linkage should be to the new document number. Modified on 2/28/2005 (2kab, ).
January 20, 2005 Filing 3645 Withdrawal Filed by Creditors Alpine Securitization, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch (RE: related document(s)#3636 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $150, #3633 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $150). (Lazear, Sherri)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3644 Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing (Related Doc #3637) Hearing to be held on 1/31/2005 at 03:00 PM Courtroom A for #3597, (2lg, )
January 18, 2005 Filing 3643 Support Document Rebecca S. Parrett's Response to the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to Proofs of Claim of Rebecca S. Parrett Filed by Creditors Rebecca Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett (RE: related document(s)#3581 Objection to Claim). (Zacks, Benjamin)
January 18, 2005 Filing 3642 Objection to (related document(s): #3637 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3597 Motion to Vacate,, ) filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) Joinder of Certain Defendants with the Objection of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC to the Unencumbered Assets Trust's Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Vacate Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Disocvery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio (Dk. 3639) Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, Eric Wilkinson (Kopf, John)
January 15, 2005 Filing 3641 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eleanor Beavers Haynes Filed by Creditor Ohio Department of Taxation and Bureau of Workers Compensation. (Haynes, Eleanor)
January 14, 2005 Filing 3640 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3635 Order to Set Hearing, , ) Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.)
January 14, 2005 Filing 3639 Objection to (related document(s): #3637 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3597 Motion to Vacate,, ) filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Lazear, Sherri)
January 13, 2005 To: S. Lazear - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The PDF Document Appears to be Filed in an Incorrect Case. Please Withdraw the Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3636 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch) (2kab, )
January 12, 2005 Filing 3638 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3630 Memorandum Opinion) Service Date 01/12/2005. (Admin.)
January 12, 2005 Filing 3637 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3597 Motion to Vacate,, ) Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
January 12, 2005 Filing 3636 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit A to Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit Cases) (Lazear, Sherri)
January 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3635 Order rescheduling hearing. (RE: related document(s)#3597 Motion to Vacate, , filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust, #2240 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #2214 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #3364 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3605 Motion to Enforce, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A (2kab, )
January 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3634 Order rescheduling hearing. (RE: related document(s)#3597 Motion to Vacate, , filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust, #2240 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #2214 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, #3364 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3605 Motion to Enforce, filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A (2kab, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: SERVICE OF ORDER FAILED. ORDER TO BE REDOCKETED AND RESERVED. Modified on 1/12/2005 (2kab, ).
January 12, 2005 Disposition of Adversary 03-2075 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
January 12, 2005 To: SHERRI LAZEAR - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The PDF Document Appears to be Filed in an Incorrect Case. Please Withdraw the Document and Re-File in the Correct Case or File an Amended Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3633 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch) (2lg, )
January 12, 2005 Adversary Case 03-2075 Closed (2lg, )
January 12, 2005 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: SERVICE OF ORDER FAILED. ORDER TO BE REDOCKETED AND RESERVED. Modified on 1/12/2005 (2kab, ). (RE: related document(s)#3634 Order to Set Hearing, , ) (2kab, )
January 12, 2005 Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mwdref] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 3126443,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
January 11, 2005 Filing 3633 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Fee Amount $150 Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit A to Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit Cases) (Lazear, Sherri)
January 11, 2005 Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference(2:02-bk-65235) [motion,mwdref] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 3117168,amount$ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
January 11, 2005 To: J. Kopf - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The Electronic Signature on the PDF Document does not Correspond with the Attorney Login. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3631 Response, , filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, Creditor Harold Pote, Creditor Thomas Mendell, Creditor Eric Wilkinson, Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP, Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC) (2kab, )
January 10, 2005 Filing 3632 Response to (related document(s): #3597 Motion to Vacate , of the UAT, the Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust) Filed by Creditors KULD Partners LLC, Barbara Poulsen, Lance Poulsen (Haller, John)
January 10, 2005 Filing 3631 Joint Response to (related document(s): #3597 Motion to Vacate , of the UAT, the Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust) Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deloitte & Touche LLP, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Thomas Mendell, Harold Pote, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Eric Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 or 2)#2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2)) (Kopf, John)
January 10, 2005 Filing 3630 Memorandum Opinion for Adversary Case 03-2288 being served to the General Service List. (2lg, )
January 8, 2005 Filing 3629 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3619 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 01/08/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3628 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3618 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3627 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3617 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3626 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3616 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3625 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3615 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3624 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3614 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3623 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3613 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3622 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3612 Order to Set Hearing, ) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3621 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3611 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 01/06/2005. (Admin.)
January 6, 2005 Filing 3620 Withdrawal Filed by Creditors Promise Hospital of East Los Angeles LP , Sun Capital HealthCare Inc (RE: related document(s)#3121 Motion). (2kab, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 3619 Stipulation and agreed order extending deadline for Harold W. Pote, Thomas G. Mendell and Eric R. Wilkinson to respond to objection to claims. (RE: related document(s)#3583 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.). (2kab, )
January 4, 2005 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED HEARING DATE FROM 1/26/2005 TO 2/22/2005. (RE: related document(s)#3615 Order to Set Hearing, ) (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3618 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Lance K Poulsen (RE: related document(s)#2217 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #2217, (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3617 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Obection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Barbara L Poulsen (RE: related document(s)#2199 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #2199, (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3616 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Donald H Ayers. (RE: related document(s)#2211 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #2211, (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3615 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Rebecca S Parrett (RE: related document(s)#2214 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #2214, (2lg, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED HEARING DATE FROM 1/26/2005 TO 2/22/2005. Modified on 1/4/2005 (2lg, ).
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3614 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Claim No. 121 and Motion to Reduce Claim of HCA, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#3364 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Hearing to be held on 1/26/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #3364, (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3613 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Med Diversified, Inc. and its Affiliates (RE: related document(s)#2240 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Hearing to be held on 1/26/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #2240, (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3612 Order Scheduling Continued Hearing of Debtors' Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). Hearing to be held on 1/26/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Filing 3611 Stipulation and Agreed Order Disallowing Claim Filed by Norman Reitman Company Inc. (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
January 3, 2005 Filing 3610 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Objection to Proofs of Claims Filed by Creditors Rebecca Parrett, Rebecca S Parrett (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zacks, Benjamin)
January 3, 2005 Filing 3609 Response to (related document(s): #3579 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.) Filed by Creditor Barbara Poulsen (Lawniczak, James)
January 1, 2005 Filing 3608 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3604 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 01/01/2005. (Admin.)
December 30, 2004 Filing 3607 Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3605 Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order). (Kairis, Matthew)
December 30, 2004 Filing 3606 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3605 Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O) (Kairis, Matthew)). Hearing to be held on 1/26/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A for #3605, (Kairis, Matthew)
December 30, 2004 Filing 3605 Motion to Enforce Confirmation Order Filed by Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O) (Kairis, Matthew)
December 29, 2004 Filing 3604 Second Amended Joint Scheduling Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#3136 Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and its Counsel Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503 (b)(4), , filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank). (2lg, )
December 29, 2004 Filing 3603 Transcript Of Hearing on 12/15/2004 at 2:00 (2lg, )
December 22, 2004 Filing 3602 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3601 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 12/22/2004. (Admin.)
December 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3601 Order application for order authorizing compensation and reimbursment of expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and its counsel (Related Doc #3136) for JP Morgan Chase Bank, (2kab, )
December 17, 2004 Filing 3600 Certificate of Service to Amended Notice of Motion to Vacate Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern Dist. of Ohio Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3599 Notice of Hearing,,,,,,, ). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
December 17, 2004 Filing 3599 Notice of Hearing [AMENDED Notice of Motion to Vacate Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Court for the Southern Dist. of Ohio] Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#2438 Agreed protective Order (RE: related document(s) 1525 Generic Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). (2kab, ), #2725 Agreed Order Protective Order. (2lg, ), #2292 Agreed protective order. (2kab, ), #2595 Agreed Protective Order (RE: related document(s)#2293 Notice filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank). (2kab, ), #3142 Agreed protective order. (2kab, ), #3143 Agreed protective order. (2kab, ), #3380 Agreed Protective Order Re: Unencumbered Assets Trust and Kaye Scholer LLP. (2lg, ), #3406 Agreed Protective Order Re: Unencumbered Assets Trusts and ING. (2lg, ), #2096 Agreed Proctective Order. (2be, ), #3407 Agreed Protective Order Re: Unencumbered Assets Trust and Brickler & Eckler LLP. (2lg, ), #2960 Agreed protective order. (2kab, ), #3585 Agreed Protective Order (2lg, ), #3597 Motion to Vacate , of the UAT, the Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E# 2 Exhibit F-J# 3 Exhibit K-O# 4 Exhibit P-Q# 5 Exhibit R-S) (Ballesteros, Sydney)CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO ADD RELATED DOCUMENTS #2096, #2292,#2438, #2595, #2725, #2960, #3142, #3143,#3380, #3406, #3407, AND #3585 Modified on 12/17/2004 (2be, ).). Hearing to be held on 1/26/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom C for #3597, (Ballesteros, Sydney)
December 17, 2004 Corrective Entry (RE: related document(s)#3598 Notice of Hearing, , , , filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust)CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO ADD RELATED DOCUMENTS #2096, #2292,#2438, #2595, #2725, #2960, #3142, #3143,#3380, #3406, #3407, AND #3585 (2be, )
December 17, 2004 Corrective Entry (RE: related document(s)#3597 Motion to Vacate, , filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO ADD RELATED DOCUMENTS #2096, #2292,#2438, #2595, #2725, #2960, #3142, #3143,#3380, #3406, #3407, AND #3585 (2be, )
December 16, 2004 Filing 3598 Notice of Hearing of the UAT's Motion to Vacate Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3597 Motion to Vacate , of the UAT, the Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E# 2 Exhibit F-J# 3 Exhibit K-O# 4 Exhibit P-Q# 5 Exhibit R-S) (Ballesteros, Sydney)). Hearing to be held on 1/26/2005 at 02:30 PM Courtroom C for #3597, (Ballesteros, Sydney)CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO ADD RELATED DOCUMENTS #2096, #2292,#2438, #2595, #2725, #2960, #3142, #3143,#3380, #3406, #3407, AND #3585Modified on 12/17/2004 (2be, ).
December 16, 2004 Filing 3597 Motion to Vacate , of the UAT, the Protective Orders Concerning UAT Rule 2004 Discovery, Subject to the Entry of a Single, Comprehensive Protective Order in Parallel Proceedings Pending in the U.S. Dist. Ct. for the Southern Dist. of Ohio Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E#2 Exhibit F-J#3 Exhibit K-O#4 Exhibit P-Q#5 Exhibit R-S) (Ballesteros, Sydney)CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO ADD RELATED DOCUMENTS #2096, #2292,#2438, #2595, #2725, #2960, #3142, #3143,#3380, #3406, #3407, AND #3585 Modified on 12/17/2004 (2be, ).
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on December 15, 2004 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Lance K. Poulsen (2217). Appearances by Joseph Witalec, Lisa Yerrace, Jeffry Cotner, Bill Wilkinson and David Stern. Continued to 2/22/05 at 9:30 a.m. with Objections to Claims of Pote, Mendell & Wilkinson; Rebecca Parrett; Barbara Poulsen; Bank One, N.A. and JPMorganChase Bank Noticed by Gibbs & Bruns for 2/22/05 along with Complaints Against Credit Suisse First Boston, Donald Ayers and Lance Poulsen which Need to be Set for the Same Date and Time so Parties can Decide How to Proceed. Order to Come from Joe Witalec. (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on December 15, 2004 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Donald H. Ayers (2211). Appearances by Joseph Witalec, Lisa Yerrace, Jeffry Cotner, Bill Wilkinson and David Stern. Continued to 2/22/05 at 9:30 a.m. with Objections to Claims of Pote, Mendell & Wilkinson; Rebecca Parrett; Barbara Poulsen; Bank One, N.A. and JPMorganChase Bank Noticed by Gibbs & Bruns for 2/22/05 along with Complaints Against Credit Suisse First Boston, Donald Ayers and Lance Poulsen Which Need to be Set for the Same Date and Time so Parties can Decide How to Proceed. Order to Come from Joe Witalec. (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on December 15, 2004 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Barbara L. Poulsen (2199). Appearances by Joseph Witalec, Lisa Yerrace, Jeffry Cotner, Bill Wilkinson and David Stern. Continued to 2/22/05 at 9:30 a.m. with Objections to Claims of Pote, Mendell & Wilkinson; Rebecca Parrett; Barbara Poulsen; Bank One, N.A. and JPMorganChase Bank Noticed by Gibbs & Bruns for 2/22/05 along with Complaints fileds Against Credit Suisse First Boston, Donald Ayers and Lance Poulsen Which Need to be Set for the Same Date and Time so Parties can Decide How to Proceed. Order to Come from Joe Witalec. (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not held on December 15, 2004 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Med Diversified, Inc. and Its Affiliates (2240). Appearance by Joseph Witalec. Continued to 1/26/05 at 9:30. Claim Settled, Subject to Settlement Agreement. Order to Come. (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on December 15, 2004 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Rebecca S. Parrett (2214). Appearances by Joseph Witalec, Lisa Yerrace, Jeffry Cotner, Bill Wilkinson and David Stern, Continued to 2/22/05 at 9:30 a.m. with Objections to Claims of Pote, Mendell & Wilkinson; Rebecca Parrett; Barbara Poulsen; Bank One, N.A. and JPMorganChase Bank Noticed by Gibbs & Bruns for 2/22/05 along with Complaints Against Credit Suisse First Boston, Donald Ayers and Lance Poulsen Which Need to be Set for the Same Date and Time so Parties can Decide How to Proceed. Order to Come from Joe Witalec. (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on December 15, 2004 on Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of no Liability (3359) re Norman Reitman Co. Claim 864; Pain Control Claims 669,670,671 and Response (3507); and Sulmeyer Kupetz Claim 897. Appearance by Josesph Witalec. Continued to 1/26/05 at 9:30 a.m. Order to Come (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on December 15, 2004 on Omnibus Objection No. 8 to and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims (3358). Appearance by Joseph Witalec. State of Ohio Only Claim Left and Will Withdraw Objection and Reserve Trust's Right to Object to Claim. (2je)
December 16, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on December 15, 2004 on Unencumbered Asset Trust's Objetion to Claim No. 121 and Motion to Reduce Claim of HCA, Inc. (3364). Appearance by Joseph Witalec. Parties Agreed to Continue to 1/26/05 at 9:30 a.m. Order to Come. (2je)
December 10, 2004 Filing 3596 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3590 Order (Generic)) Service Date 12/10/2004. (Admin.)
December 10, 2004 Filing 3595 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3589 Order (Generic)) Service Date 12/10/2004. (Admin.)
December 10, 2004 Filing 3594 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3588 Order (Generic)) Service Date 12/10/2004. (Admin.)
December 9, 2004 Filing 3593 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3587 Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11), Order Scheduling Hearing (Chapter 11)) Service Date 12/09/2004. (Admin.)
December 9, 2004 Filing 3592 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3586 Order (Generic)) Service Date 12/09/2004. (Admin.)
December 9, 2004 Filing 3591 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3585 Order (Generic)) Service Date 12/09/2004. (Admin.)
December 8, 2004 Filing 3590 Agreed protective order. (2kab, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 3589 Stipulation and agreed order. (2kab, )
December 8, 2004 Filing 3588 Stipulation and agreed order extending deadline to object to proofs of claim filed by ING Capital Markets LLC. (2kab, )
December 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3587 Scheduling Order for Debtors' Objection to Claims of Silver Moves Inc. Numed Rehabilitation Inc. and Park Home Health Care Inc (RE: related document(s)#2202 Motion filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises). Hearing to be held on 2/22/2005 at 09:30 AM Courtroom A (2lg, )
December 6, 2004 Filing 3586 Stipulation and Agreed Order re: Claim by Purcell & Scott Co. LPA (2lg, )
December 6, 2004 Filing 3585 Agreed Protective Order (2lg, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 3584 Notice of Objection to Claims of Harold Pote, Thomas Mendell, and Eric Wilkinson Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (RE: related document(s)#3583 Objection to Claim of Harold Pote, Thomas Mendell, and Eric Wilkinson Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3583 Objection to Claim of Harold Pote, Thomas Mendell, and Eric Wilkinson Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3582 Notice of Objection to Proofs of Claim filed by Rebecca Parrett Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (RE: related document(s)#3581 Objection to Claim [proofs of claims] filed by.Rebecca Parrett Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3581 Objection to Claim [proofs of claims] filed by.Rebecca Parrett Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3580 Notice of Objection to Proofs of Claim Filed by Barbara Poulsen Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (RE: related document(s)#3579 Objection to Claim Proofs of Claims Filed by Barbara Poulsen Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3579 Objection to Claim Proofs of Claims Filed by Barbara Poulsen Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3578 Notice of Objections to Proofs of Claims Filed by Bank One, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. (RE: related document(s)#3577 Objection to Claim Filed by Bank One, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3577 Objection to Claim Filed by Bank One, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank Filed by Debtor Unencumbered Assets Trust and its Trustee, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd.. Responses due by 1/3/2005. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3576 457 (Subordinate Claim/Interest): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee of The Unencumbered Assets Trust against Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch, JP Morgan Chase Bank, BANK ONE NA. Fee Amount $150 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3575 457 (Subordinate Claim/Interest): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee of The Unencumbered Assets Trust against Donald Ayers. Fee Amount $150 (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 30, 2004 Filing 3574 457 (Subordinate Claim/Interest): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd., Trustee of The Unencumbered Assets Trust against Lance K Poulsen. Fee Amount $150 (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 29, 2004 Filing 3573 Notice of Filing of Complaint of The Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ( Complaint Part 1 of 12)#2 Attachment (Complaint Part 2 of 12)#3 Attachment (Complaint Part 3 of 12)#4 Attachment (Complaint Part 4 of 12)#5 Attachment (Complaint Part 5 of 12)#6 Attachment (Complaint Part 6 of 12)#7 Attachment (Complaint Part 7 of 12)#8 Attachment (Complaint Part 8 of 12)#9 Attachment (Complaint Part 9 of 12)#10 Attachment (Compplaint Part 10 of 12)#11 Attachment (Complaint Part 11 of 12)#12 Attachment (Complaint Part 12 of 12)#13 Exh. A to Complaint Part 1 of 3#14 Exhibit A to Complaint Part 2 of 3#15 Exhibit A to Complaint Part 3 of 3#16 Exhibit B to Complaint Part 1 of 3#17 Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 2 of 3)#18 Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 3 of 3)#19 Exhibit C to Complaint (Part 1 of 3)#20 Exhibit C to Complaint (Part 2 of 3)#21 Exhibit C to Complaint (Part 3 of 3)) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
November 28, 2004 Filing 3572 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3570 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/28/2004. (Admin.)
November 28, 2004 Filing 3571 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3569 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/28/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3570 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Cranford L Scott MD, Cranford L Scott MD Inc, and Community Healthcare Specialists Medical Group Inc, DBA Chrishard Medical (2lg, )
November 24, 2004 Filing 3569 First Amended Joint Scheduling Order Re: Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JP Morgan Chase Bank and its Counsel Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503(b)(4) (RE: related document(s)#3464 Order and #3136 Application for Compensation, , filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank). (2lg, )
November 24, 2004 Filing 3568 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3552 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3567 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3551 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3566 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3550 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3565 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3549 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3564 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3548 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3563 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3547 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3562 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3546 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3561 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3545 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3560 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3544 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3559 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3543 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3558 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3542 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3557 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3541 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3556 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3540 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3555 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3539 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 24, 2004 Filing 3554 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3538 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 11/24/2004. (Admin.)
November 23, 2004 Filing 3553 Notice of Change of Address and Firm Name Filed by Attorney Halperin Battaglia Raicht LLP. (Ganc, Ethan)
November 19, 2004 Filing 3552 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applcable statutes of limitations with respect to claims. (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3551 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims. (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3550 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Brian Weiss. (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3549 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Re: Jack Brown . (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3548 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Jon Beacham. (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3547 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims. re: Thera-Kinetics Inc (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3546 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Roger Faulkenberry . (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3545 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Frank P. Magliochetti. (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3544 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Re: RaLab Inc . (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3543 Stipulation and agreed order tolling applicable statutes of limitations with respect to claims against Millennium Healthplex Inc, Millennium Health Group Inc, Medimanager and Lincoln Hospital Medical Center (2kab, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3542 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Re: TGZ Acquisition Company . (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3541 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Re: Infusion Management Systems Inc . (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3540 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statues of Limitations with Respect to Claims Re: JACE Systems Inc . (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3539 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Resepct to Claims Re: HomeCare Concepts of America Inc . (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3538 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Allowance of Claim Asserted by Comphealth. (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
November 19, 2004 Filing 3537 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3514 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/19/2004. (Admin.)
November 19, 2004 Filing 3536 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Cranford L. Scott, M.D., Cranford L. Scott, M.D., Inc. and Community Healthcare Specialists Medical Group, Inc., d/b/a Chrishard Medical Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3535 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Jack Brown Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3534 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Thera-Kinetics, Inc. Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3533 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Theralab, Inc. Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3532 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against TGZ Acquisition Company, LLC d/b/a Jace Systems Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3531 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Infusion Management Systems Inc. Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3530 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to claims Against Jace Systems, Inc. Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3529 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Homecare Concepts of America, Inc. Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3528 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Craig Porter Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3527 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Home Medical of America, Inc. and Subsidiaries Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3526 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Brian Weiss Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3525 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Jon Beacham Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3524 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Roger Faulkenberry Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 18, 2004 Filing 3523 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Frank P. Magliochetti Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3522 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Quick Solutions, Inc.. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3521 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Perseus, LLC, Bain & Company, Inc., PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3520 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Expert Technical Consultants, Inc.. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3519 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Dell Marketing LP, Dell Receivables LP. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3518 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Data Junction Corp., Ramal Acquisition Corp.. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3517 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Centric Consulting, LLC. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3516 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Autonomy, Inc.. Fee Amount $150 (Friedberg, Leon)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3515 Notice of Filing of Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations with Respect to Claims Against Millennium Healthplex, Inc., Millennium Health Group, Inc., Medimanager and Lincoln Hospital Medical Center Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 17, 2004 Filing 3513 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. against Mitchell J Stein, Tracey Hampton, Emanuel Barling Jr., Healthmed, Inc., Swab Financial, LLC, Park State Equities, Inc., Robany, Inc., Sabra, Inc., Sabra International, The Trammel Trust, Trammel Investors, LLC, ` World Trust Investments, Inc., Trayton Securities, LLC, International R.C. Securities, G.P., Colter Associates, G.P., Wilson Associates, G.P.. Fee Amount $150 (Kairis, Matthew)
November 16, 2004 Filing 3514 Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations and Time Based Defenses From October 4, 2004 Through March 31, 2005, with Respect to Claims Against Steven M Scott and Affiliates Listed on Addendum "A". (2lg, )
November 16, 2004 Filing 3512 Notice of Change of Address of Columbus, Ohio office of Jones Day Filed by Attorney Jones Day. (Beck, David)
November 16, 2004 Filing 3511 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, Erwin I. Katz, Ltd. against Pharos Capital Partners LP. Fee Amount $150 (Kairis, Matthew)
November 12, 2004 Filing 3510 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3505 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/12/2004. (Admin.)
November 12, 2004 Filing 3509 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3504 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/12/2004. (Admin.)
November 12, 2004 Filing 3508 Notice of Filing Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Tolling Applicable Statutes of Limitations and Time Based Defenses from October 4, 2004 through March 31, 2005, with Respect to Claims Against Steven M. Scott and Affiliates Listed on Addendum "A" Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Byrne, Sean)
November 12, 2004 Filing 3507 Response to (related document(s): #3335 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Filed by Creditor Pain Control Consultants Inc (Fisher, Matthew)
November 10, 2004 Filing 3506 Notice of Filing of Affidavit of Service Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises. (Witalec, Joseph)
November 9, 2004 Filing 3505 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Allowance of Claim Asserted by Bellsouth Telecommunications Inc. (2lg, )
November 9, 2004 Filing 3504 Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Allowance of Claim Filed By Regen Capital I Inc. (2lg, )
November 7, 2004 Filing 3503 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3501 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 11/07/2004. (Admin.)
November 7, 2004 Filing 3502 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3500 Order (Generic)) Service Date 11/07/2004. (Admin.)
November 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3501 Order Approving Amended Settlement Agreement With Private Investment BAnnk Limited re: Motion (Related Doc #3483) (2lg, )
November 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3500 Order Regarding Case Managemnet Hearings. (2lg, )
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 11/3/04 on Debtors' Omnibus Objections No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on Basis of No Liability (2202). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic, Sherri LaZear. Scheduling Order to be Submitted. Status Conference 2/22/05 at 9:30 a.m. (2je)
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 11/03/2004 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Med Diversified, Inc. and Its Affiliates (2240). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic and Sherri LaZear. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 11/03/04 on Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability (3359). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic and Sherri LaZear. Bell South Claim 847-Stipulation and Agreed Order to be Submitted; CompHealth Claim 844- Stipulation and Agreed Order to be Submitted; Norman Reitman Co. Claim 864-Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m.; Pain Control Claims 669, 670, 671 Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m.; Regen Capital Claim 37 - Stipulation and Agreed Order to be Submitted; Sulmeyer Kupetz Claim 897-Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m.; and U.S. Dept. of Justice Claim 747 - Response Deadline 12/31/04 No Hearing Date Set. (2je)
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 11/03/04 on Omnibus Objection No. 8 to and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims (3358). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic, Sherri LaZear. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 11/03/04 on Unencumbered Asset Trust's Objection to Claim No. 121 and Motion to Reduce Claim of HCA, Inc. (3364). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic, Sherri LaZear. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 11/03/04 on Omnibus Objection No. 12 and Motion to Disallow Claims Subject to Settlements (3362). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic, Sherri LaZear. Pain Net Inc. Agreed to Withdraw all Claims. (2je)
November 4, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 11/03/04 on Expedited Hearing on Motion of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust for Order Approving Amended Settlement with Private Investment Bank Limited (3483) (3484). Appearances by Charles Oellermann, Fred Neufeld, Amy Bostic and Sherri LaZear. Court Approved Amended Settlement. Order to be Submitted. (2je)
November 2, 2004 Filing 3499 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3487 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, ). (Byrne, Sean)
November 2, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ADDED TEXT TO THE DOCKET (RE: related document(s)#3496 Exhibit List, , filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank) (2lg, )
October 31, 2004 Filing 3498 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3488 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 10/31/2004. (Admin.)
October 31, 2004 Filing 3497 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3487 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, ) Service Date 10/31/2004. (Admin.)
October 29, 2004 Filing 3496 Exhibit List Exhibits to be Offered by JPMorgan Chase Bank in Connection with Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and its Counsel Pursuant to Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503(b)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Kopf, John) All of the Exhibits referenced have been provided to the Court in their entirety on a CD. This CD will be kept in the possession of the Deputy-in-Charge. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ADDED TEXT TO THE DOCKET. Modified on 11/2/2004 (2lg, ).
October 29, 2004 Filing 3495 Witness List Witnesses to be Called by JPMorgan Chase Bank in Connection with Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and its Counsel Pursuant to Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and503(b)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Kopf, John)
October 28, 2004 Filing 3494 Withdrawal of Claim(s)re: Orthopedic Med Group West Inc . (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Filing 3493 Withdrawal of Claim(s)re: ACCI/Allcare of Massachusetts Inc., ACCI/Allcare of Pennsylvania Inc., ACCI/Allcare Inc, Pain Net HC Inc., Pain Net Texas Inc., Pain Net Inc., PNA Pain Net of Arizona Inc., Rivertown Surgery Center LLC, Sportsmed Inc. . (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Filing 3492 Withdrawal of Claim(s) re James R Benjamin MD . (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Filing 3491 Withdrawal of Claim(s)re: Bohm Med Grp and John E Bohm . (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Filing 3490 Withdrawal of Claim(s)re: Groves Northern California Med Grp . (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Filing 3489 Withdrawal of Claim(s)for Texas NPI PA . (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3488 Order Approving Final Application of Ballard Spahr Andrews & Ingersoll LLP for Allowance of Fees and Expenses re: Application For Compensation (Related Doc #3130) for Ballard Spahr Andrews and Ingersoll LLP, fees awarded: $2093763.00, expenses awarded: $159315.65 (2lg, )
October 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3487 Order (I) Scheduling Expedited Hearing on Motion of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust For Order Approving Amended Settlement Agreement With Private Investment Bank Limited and (II) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof re: Motion Expedite Hearing (Related Doc #3484) Hearing to be held on 11/3/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3483, (2lg, )
October 27, 2004 Filing 3486 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to Sixth Circuit. Case Number 04-3365. (2dr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2004 (2dr, ). CORRECTIVE ENTRY TO ADD CORRECT PDF. Modified on 10/27/2004 (2dr, ).
October 22, 2004 Filing 3485 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3483 Motion of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust for Order Approving Amended Settlement Agreement with Private Investment Bank Limited, #3484 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3483 Generic Motion, )). (Byrne, Sean)
October 22, 2004 Filing 3484 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3483 Generic Motion, ) Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises, Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Byrne, Sean)
October 22, 2004 Filing 3483 Motion of Debtors, Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust for Order Approving Amended Settlement Agreement with Private Investment Bank Limited Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D) (Byrne, Sean)
October 18, 2004 Filing 3482 Addendum to Record on Appeal of the Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors in Possession for An Order Enforcing the Automatic Stay Against Amedisys Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (RE: related document(s)#1584 Notice of Appeal,,, ). (DeMarco, Daniel)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3481 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3471 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3480 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3470 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3479 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3469 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3478 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3468 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3477 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3467 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3476 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3466 Order Regarding Claim) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3475 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3465 Order Regarding Claim, ) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3474 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3464 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 14, 2004 Filing 3473 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3463 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 10/14/2004. (Admin.)
October 12, 2004 Filing 3472 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held 10/6/2004. (See Proceeding Memo). (2dr, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3471 Order Disallowing Noteholder Claims (Omnibus Objection No. 11). (RE: related document(s)#3365 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3470 Order Disallowing Claims Subject to Settlement (Omnibus Objection No 12). (RE: related document(s)#3362 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3469 Order Reducing Certain Claims. (Omnibus Objection NO. 13) (RE: related document(s)#3363 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3468 Order Reclassifying Certain Claims (Omnibus Objection No. 10). (RE: related document(s)#3361 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3467 Order Disallowing Claims on the Basis of No Liablity (Omnibuss Objection No 9). (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3466 Order Disallowing Amended and Superseded Claims (Omnibus Objeciton No. 8). (RE: related document(s)#3358 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 3465 Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving the Unencumbered Assets Trust's objection to and Motion to Disallow, Reduce or Reclassify Claims of Holland & Knight LLp and Peabody & Arnold LLP. (RE: related document(s)#3367 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 3464 Joint Scheduling Order Re: Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and Its Counsel Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503(b)(4) (RE: related document(s)#3136 Application for Compensation, , filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank). (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3463 Order Granting Final Application of Brickler & Eckler LLp for Allowance of Fees and Expenses (Related Doc #3108) for Brickler & Eckler, fees awarded: $57135.10, expenses awarded: $4048.51 (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 3462 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Supplemental Record on Appeal to Disctrict. Case Number 04 cv 963. Graham (2brm, )
October 8, 2004 Disposition of Adversary 03-2405 Judgment For Dismissal (2lg, )
October 8, 2004 Adversary Case 03-2405 Closed (2lg, )
October 7, 2004 Filing 3461 Brief Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Reply Brief in Further Support of Appeal From the Order Denying its Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ). (Lazear, Sherri)
October 7, 2004 Filing 3459 Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust. (Ballesteros, Sydney)
October 6, 2004 Filing 3458 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to Disctrict. Case Number 2:04cv963. Graham (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, #3419 Notice of Appeal, filed by Creditor Bank One NA, #3412 Notice of Appeal, filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, #3417 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP, Notice of Appeal, filed by Creditor Pricewaterhous Coopers LLP, #3426) (2brm, )
October 6, 2004 Corrective Entry this is a duplicate entry of #3426 (RE: related document(s)#3424 Notice, , filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP) (2brm, )
October 6, 2004 Corrective Entry this is a duplicate entry of #3427 (RE: related document(s)#3425 Support Document, filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP) (2brm, )
October 6, 2004 To: Miller, Tiffany - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Notice of Appeal Should Be Filed Using The Notice of Appeal Event From the Bankruptcy, Appeal Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3424 Notice, , filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP) (2brm, )
October 6, 2004 To: Miller, Tiffany - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Statement of Election Should Be Filed Using The Statement of Election Event From the Bankruptcy, Appeal Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3425 Support Document, filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP) (2brm, )
October 5, 2004 Filing 3460 Notice of Ominibus Objection No. 10 to and Motion to Reclassify Certain Claims Filed by Creditor Mathias & Associates LLC (RE: related document(s)#3361 Omnibus Objection to Claim No 10 and Motion to Reclassify Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust . Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Claims# 2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3337 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. (2lg, )). (2lg, )
October 2, 2004 Filing 3456 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3449 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 10/02/2004. (Admin.)
October 1, 2004 Filing 3455 Statement of Issues on Appeal and Designation of Items to be Included in Record on Appeal Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3426 Notice of Appeal, ). (Miller, Tiffany)
October 1, 2004 Filing 3454 Joint Application for Scheduling Order Filed by Other Professional VI/XII Conflicts Trustee, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kopf, John)
September 30, 2004 Filing 3457 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District. Case Number c2 04 945. Graham (RE: related document(s)#3298 Notice of Appeal, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, #3296 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank) (2brm, )
September 30, 2004 Filing 3453 Response to (related document(s): #3343 Objection,, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust) Response of Amedisys, Inc. and Certain of Its Affiliates to the Opposition to Request for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Priority Claim of Amedisys, Inc. and Certain of Its Affiliates, Request for Fees and Costs, and Objection to and Motion to Disallow Claims of Amedisys Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (DeMarco, Daniel)
September 30, 2004 Filing 3452 Response to (related document(s): #3366 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Filed by Creditor Epstein Becker & Green P.C. (Pigman, Jack)
September 29, 2004 Filing 3449 Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time to File Responses to (RE: related document(s)#3367 Objection to and Motion to Disallow , Reduce or Reclassify Claims of Holland & Knight LLp and Peabody & Arnold LLP, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust). (2lg, )
September 28, 2004 Filing 3451 Notice of omnibus objectin number 10 and motion to reclassify certain claims. Filed by Mathias & Associates LLC (2kab, )
September 28, 2004 Filing 3450 Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal Filed by (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal). (2brm, )
September 28, 2004 Filing 3448 Brief in Support of Appeal From the Order Denying its Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit#2 Exhibit A) (Lazear, Sherri)
September 28, 2004 Filing 3447 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to 6th Circuit. Case Number 04-3365. (2brm, )
September 27, 2004 Filing 3446 Omnibus Response to (related document(s): #3410 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ) of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC From order Denying CSFB's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC) Debtors' Omnibus Response In Opposition to Movants' Precautionary Motion for Leave to Appeal the Bankrutpcy Court's Order Denying Motions to Quash Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P) (Ballesteros, Sydney)
September 27, 2004 Filing 3445 Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
September 27, 2004 Filing 3444 Addendum to Record on Appeal National Century Financial Enterprises, Inc. et al's Request for Supplementation of Record on Appeal of the Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors in Possession for an Order Enforcing the Automatic Stay Against Amedisys, Inc. and Certain of Its Affiliates Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises (RE: related document(s)#1584 Notice of Appeal,,,, #1585 Notice of Appeal,,, ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proceeding Memo#2 Exhibit Application for Order Authorizing Compensation#3 Exhibit Amedisys Reply)(Kairis, Matthew)
September 27, 2004 Filing 3443 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal From Order Denying Motions to Quash, Statement of Issues on Appeal From Order Denying Motions to Quash Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3419 Notice of Appeal,, #3412 Notice of Appeal, ). Appellee designation due by 10/7/2004. Transmission of Designation Due by 10/27/2004. (Kopf, John)
September 27, 2004 Filing 3442 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal and Statement of Issues Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP (RE: related document(s)#3417 Notice of Appeal). Appellee designation due by 10/7/2004. Transmission of Designation Due by 10/27/2004. (Sidman, Robert)
September 27, 2004 Filing 3441 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal and Statement of Issues Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP (RE: related document(s)#3417 Notice of Appeal). Appellee designation due by 10/7/2004. Transmission of Designation Due by 10/27/2004. (Sidman, Robert)
September 23, 2004 Filing 3440 Certificate of Service Amended Certificate of Service for Precautionary Motion of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for Leave to Appeal From Order Denying PwC's Motion to Quash Subpoena Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3438 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3426 Notice of Appeal, )). (Biehl, Adam)
September 22, 2004 Filing 3439 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3436 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 09/22/2004. (Admin.)
September 22, 2004 Filing 3438 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3426 Notice of Appeal, ) Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F) (Biehl, Adam)
September 22, 2004 Filing 3437 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3428 Motion for Leave to Appeal,, #3423 Motion for Leave to Appeal) Joinder of Deloitte & Touche, LLP to Precautionary Motions for Leave to Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order Entered September 7, 2004 Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F) (Sidman, Robert)
September 20, 2004 Filing 3436 Transmission of Notice of Appeal #3408, #3412, #3417, #3419 and #3426 to BNC for Service (2brm, )
September 19, 2004 Filing 3435 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3415 Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/19/2004. (Admin.)
September 19, 2004 Filing 3434 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3414 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 09/19/2004. (Admin.)
September 18, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 2507676,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3433 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3405 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/17/2004. (Admin.)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3432 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3404 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 09/17/2004. (Admin.)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3431 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3403 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 09/17/2004. (Admin.)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3430 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3407 Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/17/2004. (Admin.)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3429 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3406 Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/17/2004. (Admin.)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3428 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Generic Motion,,, ) Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order#2 Exhibit B - Designation of Matters#3 Exhibit C - Letter#4 Exhibit D - Letter#5 Exhibit E - Comparison Chart) (See, P)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3427 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3426 Notice of Appeal, ). (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Miller, Tiffany)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3426 Notice of Appeal. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Generic Motion,,, ). Appellant Designation due by 9/27/2004. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Miller, Tiffany)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3425 Support Document Statement of Election to Appeal Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3424 Notice,, ). (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Miller, Tiffany) CORRECTIVE ENTRY, DUPLICATE OF #3427Modified on 10/6/2004 (2brm, ).
September 17, 2004 Filing 3424 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3389 Order Denying Motions to Quash the Debtors' Subpoenas Issued Pursuant to the Court's May 4, 2004 Order Granting the Debtors' Motion to Conduct a Third Round of Rule 2004 Discovery re: Denying Motion for Protective Order (Related Doc #3304), Denying Motion (Related Doc #3306), and Denying Motion For Protective Order (Related Doc #3308) (2lg, )). (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Miller, Tiffany) CORRECTIVE ENTRY, DUPLICATE ENTRY OF #3426 Modified on 10/6/2004 (2brm, ).
September 17, 2004 Filing 3423 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3412 Notice of Appeal, ) Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E) (Kopf, John)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3422 Request for Transcript re: Appeal Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ). (Lazear, Sherri)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3421 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (RE: related document(s)#3419 Notice of Appeal, ). (See, P)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3420 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal Designation by Appellant Credit Suisse First Boston LLC of Items to be Included in Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ). Appellee designation due by 9/27/2004. Transmission of Designation Due by 10/18/2004. (Lazear, Sherri)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3419 Notice of Appeal. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (RE: related document(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Generic Motion,,, ). Appellant Designation due by 9/27/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Order)(See, P)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3418 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Statement of Election to Appeal to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP (RE: related document(s)#3417 Notice of Appeal). (Sidman, Robert)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3417 Notice of Appeal. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP (RE: related document(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Generic Motion,,, ). Appellant Designation due by 9/27/2004. (Sidman, Robert)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3416 Amended Motion (related document(s): #3410 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ) of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC From order Denying CSFB's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC) Amended Precautionary Motion for Leave to Appeal of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC from Order Denying CSFB's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit J#12 Exhibit K) (Lazear, Sherri)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3413 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3412 Notice of Appeal, ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopf, John)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3412 Notice of Appeal. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Generic Motion,,, ). Appellant Designation due by 9/27/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopf, John)
September 17, 2004 Filing 3411 Response to (related document(s): #3358 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Memorandum of State of Ohio, Department of Taxation in Opposition to Debtors' Omnibus Objection No. 8 and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims Filed by Creditor Ohio Department Of Taxation (Sutter, Michelle)
September 17, 2004 To: Sherri Lazear - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The PDF Document does not Contain an Electronic Signature in Accordance with ECF Administrative Procedure 8(d). Please file an amended motion for leave to appeal Which Contains An Electronic Signature. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3410 Motion for Leave to Appeal, filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC) (2kab, )
September 17, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 2504336,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
September 17, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 2503869,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
September 17, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 2505734,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
September 16, 2004 Filing 3415 Agreed protective order (2kab, )
September 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3414 Order granting application of Mr. Weiser, LLP, forensic accountants to the AD HOC Committee of NPF XII Bondholders, for allowance of fees and expenses (Related Doc #3124) for MR Weiser, LLP, fees awarded: $56975.00, expenses awarded: $367.00 (2kab, )
September 16, 2004 Filing 3410 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ) of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC From order Denying CSFB's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit J#12 Exhibit K) (Lazear, Sherri)
September 16, 2004 Filing 3409 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Pursuant to Rule 8001(e) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and 28 U.S.C. ? 158(c) Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3408 Notice of Appeal, ). (Lazear, Sherri)
September 16, 2004 Filing 3408 Notice of Appeal of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC From Order Denying CSFB's Motionto Quash or Modify Subpoena. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Generic Motion,,, ). Appellant Designation due by 9/27/2004. (Lazear, Sherri)
September 16, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 2497123,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
September 15, 2004 Filing 3407 Agreed Protective Order Re: Unencumbered Assets Trust and Brickler & Eckler LLP. (2lg, )
September 15, 2004 Filing 3406 Agreed Protective Order Re: Unencumbered Assets Trusts and ING. (2lg, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 3405 Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the Reorganized Debtors and Med Diversified, Inc. Chartwell Diversified, Inc., Chartwell Diversified Services, Inc., Chartwell Care Givers, Inc. and Resources Pharmacy, Inc (The "Med Debtors") Extending The Time in Which the Med Debtors May file Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims. (2lg, )
September 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3404 Order Granting Williams & Prochaska, P.C.'s Third and Final Application For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Attornyes for the Period July 1, 2003 Through April 30, 2004 (Related Doc #3146) for Joseph R Prochaska, fees awarded: $48386.00, expenses awarded: $3841.47 (2lg, )
September 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3403 Order Granting Final Application of American Express Tax and Businesss Services Inc for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expesnse Incurred as Collection Services Consultants to the Debtors for the Period November 18, 2002 through April 30, 2004 (Related Doc #3122) for American Express Tax and Business Services Inc, fees awarded: $2959984.50, expenses awarded: $339286.44 (2lg, )
September 14, 2004 To: JENNIFER HERTZ - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The PDF Document does not Match Docket Text. Please Upload Order or Withdraw of the Document. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3402 Stipulation, filed by Creditor Med Diversified Inc) (2lg, )
September 13, 2004 Filing 3402 Stipulation with Reorganized Debtors and Med Diversified, Inc., Chartwell Diversified Services, Inc., Chartwell Care Givers, Inc. and Resource Pharmacy, Inc. as to the Time in Which the Med Debtors May File Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims Filed by Creditor Med Diversified Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hertz, Jennifer)
September 9, 2004 Filing 3400 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3392 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time) Service Date 09/09/2004. (Admin.)
September 9, 2004 Filing 3399 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3391 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 09/09/2004. (Admin.)
September 9, 2004 Filing 3398 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3389 Order on Motion for Protective Order, , Order on Generic Motion, , , ) Service Date 09/09/2004. (Admin.)
September 9, 2004 Filing 3397 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3388 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) Service Date 09/09/2004. (Admin.)
September 9, 2004 Filing 3394 Request for Transcript re: Appeal Request of Appellees for Transcript to Be Included in the Record on Appeal Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3296 Notice of Appeal, #3298 Notice of Appeal, ). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
September 9, 2004 Filing 3393 Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3298 Notice of Appeal,, #3296 Notice of Appeal). (Ballesteros, Sydney)
September 7, 2004 Filing 3401 Transcript OF Hearing 8/4/2004 at 2:30 p.m. (2lg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 3396 Transcript of hearing 7/7/04 at 2:30 p.m. (2lg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 3395 Transcript of hearing held 9/1/04 at 2:36 p.m. (2lg, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 3387 Request for Transcript re: Appeal From 6th Rule 2004 Discovery Order Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3296 Notice of Appeal, #3298 Notice of Appeal, ). (Kopf, John)
September 7, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ENTERED IN ERROR, THE INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED (RE: related document(s)#3390 Order on Generic Motion) (2lg, )
September 5, 2004 Filing 3386 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3382 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time) Service Date 09/05/2004. (Admin.)
September 5, 2004 Filing 3385 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3381 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/05/2004. (Admin.)
September 5, 2004 Filing 3384 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3380 Order (Generic)) Service Date 09/05/2004. (Admin.)
September 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3392 Order Extending Deadline to Object to Certain Proofs of Claim re: (Related Doc #3322) (2lg, )
September 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3391 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc #3231) (2lg, )
September 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3390 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc #3231) (2lg, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ENTERED IN ERROR, THE INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED Modified on 9/7/2004 (2lg, ).
September 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3389 Order Denying Motions to Quash the Debtors' Subpoenas Issued Pursuant to the Court's May 4, 2004 Order Granting the Debtors' Motion to Conduct a Third Round of Rule 2004 Discovery re: Denying Motion for Protective Order (Related Doc #3304), Denying Motion (Related Doc #3306), and Denying Motion For Protective Order (Related Doc #3308) (2lg, )
September 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3388 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice for Steven G Brody (Related Doc #3360) (2lg, )
September 3, 2004 Filing 3383 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3371 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, ) Service Date 09/03/2004. (Admin.)
September 2, 2004 Filing 3382 Bridge Order Extending Deadline to Object to Certain Proofs of Claim re: Motion to Extend/Shorten Time (Related Doc #3322) (2lg, )
September 2, 2004 Filing 3381 Second Scheduling Order Re: Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and its Counsel Pursuant to Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503(b)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code (RE: related document(s)#3269 Order ). (2lg, )
September 2, 2004 Filing 3380 Agreed Protective Order Re: Unencumbered Assets Trust and Kaye Scholer LLP . (2lg, )
September 2, 2004 Filing 3379 Transcript for hearing on 5/29/2003 at 4:17 pm. (2lg, )
September 2, 2004 Filing 3378 Transcript for hearing on 9/1/04 at 2:36 pm. (2lg, )
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Med Diversified, Inc. and its Affiliates (2240). Continued to 10/6/04 at 2:30 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 on Debtors' Omnibus Objection No. 6 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims filed on Basis of No Liability (2202). Continued to 10/6/04 at 2:30 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Lance K. Poulsen (2217). Appearances by Phillip Jones, Lisa Yerrace, James Lawniczak, Pete Rosato and Matt Kairis. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Donald H. Ayers (2211). Appearance by Matt Kairis. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claim of Barbara L. Poulsen (2199). Appearances by Phillip Jones, Lisa Yerrace, James Lawniczak, Pete Rosato and Matt Kairis. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 on Status Conference on Application for Order Authoriziing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JPMorgan Chase Bank and its Counsel pursuant to Secs. 503(b)(3)(D) and 503(b)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code (3136)and Scheduling Order (3269). Continued to 10/6/04 at 2:30 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 on Debtors' Objection and Motion to Disallow Claims of Rebecca S. Parrett (2214). Appearance by Matt Kairis. Continued to 12/15/04 at 2:00 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on Seventh Motion of the Unencumbered Assets Trust for an Order Directing Rule 2004 Discovery (3231). Appearance by Robert Madden. Approved. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on Motion of Bank One, N.A. to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust (3309). Appearance by David Alexander. Motion Denied. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on the Motion of JPMorgan Chase Bank to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust (3317). Appearance by Bill Wilkinson. Motion Denied. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on Motion of PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP to Quash Rule 2004 Subpoena and Memorandum of Law in Support (3308). Appearances by Dan Cvetanovich and Chris Kiplok. Motion Denied. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on Motion of Unencumbered Assets Trust and VI/XII Collateral Trust to Extend Deadline to Object to Certain Proofs of Claim (3322) Appearances by Matt Kairis and Darcie Beaudin. Motion Approved. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on Credit Suisse First Boston's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena (3306). Appearances by Sherri Lazear and Steven Brody. Motion Denied. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 9/1/04 in the Amedisys Adversary 04-02155: Motion for Oral Hearing on (I) the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants, National Century Financial Enterprises, Inc., et al. and NPF VI, Inc. and Request for Costs and Fees (7), (II) the Motion to Dismiss filed by Provident Bank, on Behalf of itself, and on Behalf of Fifth Third Bank and the Huntington National Bank (6) and (III) Plaintiffs' Oppositions Thereto (20). Continued to 10/6/04 at 2:30 p.m. (2je)
September 2, 2004 Proceeding Memo Expedited Hearing Held on 9/1/04 on Deloitte's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order to Narrow the Unencumbered Asset Trust's Subpoena and Supporting Memorandum of Law (3304). Appearance by Robert J. Sidman. Motion Denied. Order Submitted. (2je)
September 1, 2004 Filing 3377 Certificate of Service Re: Opposition to Request for Allowance of Administrative Expense Priority Claim of Amedisys, Inc. and Certain of its Affiliates, Request for Fees and Costs and Objection to and Motion to Disallow Claims of Amedisys, Inc. Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3343 Objection,, ). (Beck, David)
September 1, 2004 Filing 3376 Certificate of Service Re: Omnibus Objection No. 13 to and Motion to Reduce Certain Claims Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3363 Objection to Claim, ). (Beck, David)
September 1, 2004 Filing 3375 Certificate of Service Re: Omnibus Objection No. 12 to and Motion to Disallow Claims Subject to Settlements Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3362 Objection to Claim,, ). (Beck, David)
September 1, 2004 Filing 3374 Certificate of Service Re: Omnibus Objection No. 10 to and Motion to Reclassify Certain Claims Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3361 Objection to Claim, ). (Beck, David)
September 1, 2004 Filing 3373 Certificate of Service Re: Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3359 Objection to Claim, ). (Beck, David)
September 1, 2004 Filing 3372 Certificate of Service Re: Omnibus Objection No. 8 to and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3358 Objection to Claim, ). (Beck, David)
August 31, 2004 Filing 3370 Support Document Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of CSFB's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3306 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B) (Lazear, Sherri)
August 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3371 Order scheduling expedited hearing on motion of unencumbered assets trust and VI/XII collateral trust to extend deadline to object to certain proofs of claim and approving form and manner of notice thereof. (Related Doc #3323) Hearing to be held on 9/1/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A #3323, (2kab, )
August 30, 2004 Filing 3369 Support Document - Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Quash Rule 2004 Subpoena Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3308 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Rule 2004 Subpoena (and Memorandum of Law in Support)). (Miller, Tiffany)
August 30, 2004 Filing 3368 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal From the Sixth Rule 2004 Discovery Order, Statement of Issues on Appeal From the Sixth Rule 2004 Discovery Order Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3296 Notice of Appeal, #3298 Notice of Appeal, ). Appellee designation due by 9/9/2004. Transmission of Designation Due by 9/29/2004. (Kopf, John)
August 30, 2004 Filing 3360 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion for Admission of Steven G. Brody to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch (Lazear, Sherri)
August 30, 2004 Filing 3357 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Miller, Tiffany)
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3362 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3339 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3361 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3337 Motion to Disallow Claims, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3358 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3333 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 To: DAVID BECK - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: The Attached PDF Document is Unreadable. Please File an Amended Attachments with a legible PDF attached. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3348 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3358 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3335 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3363 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3341 Motion to Disallow Claims, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 Hearing Set on Redockted entries (RE: related document(s)#3358 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3359 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3365 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3366 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3361 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3367 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, #3362 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3363 Objection to Claim, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3364 Objection to Claim, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3358 and for #3359 and for #3365 and for #3366 and for #3361 and for #3367 and for #3362 and for #3363 and for #3364, (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED ALL NOTICE OF HEARINGS RELATING TO RE-DOCKETED OBJECTION TO CLAIMS TO REFLECT THE PROPERLY LINKED DOCUMENTS. (RE: related document(s)#3334 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3340 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3336 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3342 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3353 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3349 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, #3355 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, #3338 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust, #3351 Notice of Hearing, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3366 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3352 Motion to Disallow Claims, filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3367 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3354 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3365 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. (RE: related document(s)#3350 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust, Interested Party VI/XII Collateral Trust) (2lg, )
August 30, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3364 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER (RE: related document(s)#3348 Motion to Disallow Claims, , filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust) (2lg, )
August 28, 2004 Filing 3356 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3321 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) Service Date 08/28/2004. (Admin.)
August 28, 2004 Filing 3355 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3367 Uencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to and Motion to Disallow, Reduce or Reclassify Claims of Holland & Knight, LLP and Peabody & Arnold, LLP Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Benton Declaration# 2 Exhibit B NMC Settlement Agreement# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3367, (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3354 TO DOCUMENT #3367. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3354 Motion to Disallow Claims Uencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to and Motion to Disallow, Reduce or Reclassify Claims of Holland & Knight, LLP and Peabody & Arnold, LLP Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Benton Declaration#2 Exhibit B NMC Settlement Agreement#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3367 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. [33 Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3353 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3366 Objection to and Motion to Disallow Claims of Epstein Becker & Green, P.C. Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3366, (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3352 TO DOCUMENT #3366. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3352 Motion to Disallow Claims Objection to and Motion to Disallow Claims of Epstein Becker & Green, P.C. Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3366 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3351 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3365 Omnibus Objection No. 11 to and Motion to Disallow Noteholder Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Listing of Noteholder Claims# 2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3365, (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3350 TO DOCUMENT #3365. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3350 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 11 to and Motion to Disallow Noteholder Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Listing of Noteholder Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3365 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3349 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3364 Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to and Motion to Reduce Claim of HCA, Inc. Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Jennings Affidavit# 2 Exhibit Annex 1 to Jennings Affidavit# 3 Exhibit Annex 2 to the Jennings Affidavit# 4 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 1# 5 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 2# 6 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 3# 7 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3364, (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3348 TO DOCUMENT #3364. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 28, 2004 Filing 3348 Motion to Disallow Claims Unencumbered Assets Trust's Objection to and Motion to Reduce Claim of HCA, Inc. Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Jennings Affidavit#2 Exhibit Annex 1 to Jennings Affidavit#3 Exhibit Annex 2 to the Jennings Affidavit#4 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 1#5 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 2#6 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 3#7 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) DISCREPANCY: PDF UNREADABLE Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3364 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3367 Unecumbered Assets Trust's Objection to Claim and Motion to Disallow, Reduce or Reclassify Claims of Holland & Knight LLP and Peabody & Arnold LLP Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Benton Declaration#2 Exhibit B NMC Settlement Agreement#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3354 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3366 Objection to Claim and Motion to Disallow Claims of Epstein Becker & Green PC Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3352 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3365 Omnibus Objection to Claim No. 11 to and Motion to Disallow Noteholder Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Noteholder Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3350 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3364 Uncumbered Assets Trust's Objection to Claim No 121 and Motion to Reduce Claim of HCA Inc Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Jennings Affidavit#2 Exhibit Annex 1 to Jennings Affidavit#3 Exhibit Annex 2 to the Jennings Affidavit#4 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 1#5 Exhibit B HCA Claim Part 2#6 Index Exhibit B HCA 3#7 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3348 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3363 Ominbus Objection to Claim No 13 and Motion to Reduce Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust . Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Bentons Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED #3341 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3362 Ominibus Objection to Claim No 12 and Motion to Disallow Claims Subject to Settlements Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Consummated Settled Claims#2 Exhibit B List of Claims Settled in Principle#3 Exhibit C Benton Declaration#4 Exhibit D Proposed Order)(2lg, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT 3339 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3361 Omnibus Objection to Claim No 10 and Motion to Reclassify Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust . Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3337 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3359 Omnibus Objection to Claim No. 9 and Motion Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order)(2lg, ) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. #3335 Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3358 Omnibus Objection to Claim No. 8 and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust , VI/XII Collateral Trust. Responses due by 9/29/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED DOCUMENT #3333 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. (2lg, )
August 27, 2004 Filing 3347 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3319 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 08/27/2004. (Admin.)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3346 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3318 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 08/27/2004. (Admin.)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3345 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3320 Order to Appear and Show Cause, ) Service Date 08/27/2004. (Admin.)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3344 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (RE: related document(s)#3343 Objection to (related document(s): #3133 Application for Administrative Expenses Request for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Prioirty Claim of Amedisys Inc. and Certain of its Affiliates filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc) Opposition to Request for Allowance of Administrative Expense Priority Claim of Amedisys, Inc. and Certain of Its Affiliates, Request for Fees and Costs, and Objection to and Motion to Disallow Claims of Amedisy, Inc. Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Beck, David), #3133 Application for Administrative Expenses Request for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Prioirty Claim of Amedisys Inc. and Certain of its Affiliates Filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc (DeMarco, Daniel)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3133, (Beck, David)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3343 Objection to (related document(s): #3133 Application for Administrative Expenses Request for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Prioirty Claim of Amedisys Inc. and Certain of its Affiliates filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc) Opposition to Request for Allowance of Administrative Expense Priority Claim of Amedisys, Inc. and Certain of Its Affiliates, Request for Fees and Costs, and Objection to and Motion to Disallow Claims of Amedisy, Inc. Filed by Interested Party Unencumbered Assets Trust (Beck, David)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3342 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3363 Omnibus Objection No. 13 to and Motion to Reduce Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Claims# 2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3363, (Beck, David)CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3341 TO DOCUMENT #3363. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3341 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 13 to and Motion to Reduce Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3363 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3340 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3362 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 12 to and Motion to Disallow Claims Subject to Settlements Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Consummated Settled Claims# 2 Exhibit B List of Claims Settled in Principle# 3 Exhibit C Benton Declaration# 4 Exhibit D Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3362, (Beck, David) Modified on 8/30/2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3339 TO DOCUMENT #3362.(2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3339 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 12 to and Motion to Disallow Claims Subject to Settlements Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Consummated Settled Claims#2 Exhibit B List of Claims Settled in Principle#3 Exhibit C Benton Declaration#4 Exhibit D Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3362 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3338 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3361 Omnibus Objection No. 10 to and Motion to Reclassify Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Claims# 2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3361, (Beck, David) Modified on 8/30/2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3337 TO DOCUMENT #3361.(2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3337 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 10 to and Motion to Reclassify Certain Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3361 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3336 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3359 Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Claims# 2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3359, (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3335 TO DOCUMENT #3359. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3335 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 9 to and Motion to Disallow Certain Claims on the Basis of No Liability Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3359 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3334 Notice of Hearing Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (RE: related document(s)#3358 Omnibus Objection No. 8 to and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A List of Claims# 2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration# 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David)). Hearing to be held on 10/6/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3358, (Beck, David) Modified on 8/30/2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY : MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT #3333 TO DOCUMENT #3358. (2lg, ). Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3333 Motion to Disallow Claims Omnibus Objection No. 8 to and Motion to Disallow Amended and Superseded Claims Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Claims#2 Exhibit B Benton Declaration#3 Exhibit C Proposed Order) (Beck, David) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3358 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES/LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/30/2004 (2lg, ).
August 27, 2004 Filing 3332 Response to (related document(s): #3308 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Rule 2004 Subpoena (and Memorandum of Law in Support) filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, #3309 Motion to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust filed by Creditor Bank One NA, #3317 Motion filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, #3304 Motion for Protective Order Deloitte's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order to Narrow the Unencumbered Asset Trust's Subpoena and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP, #3306 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC) Debtors' Consolidated Response in Opposition to Movants' Motions to Quash the Debtors' Rule 2004 Subpoenas Filed by Special Counsel Special Litigation Counsel for Debtors and Unencumbered Assets Trust (Ballesteros, Sydney)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3331 Declaration re: of Jeffrey Benton Regarding Amended Schedule of Disputed Claims Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises (RE: related document(s)#3328 Amended Schedules D,E,F (Fee)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Amended Disputed Claims Schedule) (Beck, David)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3330 Declaration re: of Jeffrey Benton on Schedule Amendments Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises (RE: related document(s)#3329 Amended Schedules D,E,F (Fee)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Amended Schedules) (Beck, David)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3329 Amended Schedules F. Fee Amount $26 Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises. (Beck, David)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3328 Amended Schedules F. Fee Amount $26 Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises. (Beck, David)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3326 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust against DFS Secured Healthcare Receivables Trust, Dynacorp Financial Startegies, Inc.. Fee Amount $150 and Objection to Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B) (Tait, Mary)
August 27, 2004 Filing 3325 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Unencumbered Assets Trust against Network Pharmaceuticals Inc. Fee Amount $150 and Objection to Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D) (Tait, Mary)
August 27, 2004 Receipt of Amended Schedules D,E,F (Fee)(2:02-bk-65235) [misc,amdsch] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 0648B2391494,amount$ 26.00. (U.S. Treasury)
August 27, 2004 Receipt of Amended Schedules D,E,F (Fee)(2:02-bk-65235) [misc,amdsch] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 0648B2391524,amount$ 26.00. (U.S. Treasury)
August 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3327 Order of the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel Regarding BAP Case Number 04-8065. This Appeal is DISMISSED. (RE: related document(s)#1485 Order on Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral). (2lm, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 3324 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Motion for Bridge Order to Extend Time to Object to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Beck, David)
August 26, 2004 Filing 3323 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3322 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, ) Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Beck, David)
August 26, 2004 Filing 3322 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Motion to Extend Time to Object to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by Interested Parties Unencumbered Assets Trust, VI/XII Collateral Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Extension Claims#2 Exhibit B Proposed Order) (Beck, David)
August 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3321 Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing (Related Doc #3314) Hearing to be held on 9/1/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3308 and for #3309 and for #3317 and for #3304 and for #3306, (2lg, )
August 25, 2004 Filing 3319 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service - Notice of Appeal 3298 (2lm, )
August 25, 2004 Filing 3318 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service - Notice of Appeal 3296 (2lm, )
August 25, 2004 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#3309 Generic Motion, filed by Creditor Bank One NA) Hearing to be held on 9/1/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3309, (2lg, )
August 25, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3312 USING CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. (RE: related document(s)#3317 Generic Motion, filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank) (2lg, )
August 25, 2004 CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT # 3312 TO DOCUMENT #3317 (RE: related document(s)#3313 Notice, , filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, #3314 Motion to Expedite Hearing, , filed by Creditor Bank One NA, Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank, Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Creditor Deloitte & Touche, LLP) (2lg, )
August 25, 2004 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#3317 Generic Motion, filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank) Hearing to be held on 9/1/2004 at 02:30 PM Courtroom A for #3317, (2lg, )
August 25, 2004 To: JOHN KOPF - Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency: For Future Reference, A Motion to Quash Should Be Filed Using The Generic Motion Event From the Motion Menu. PLEASE DO NOT REPLY TO THIS EMAIL. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK'S OFFICE (RE: related document(s)#3312 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank) (2lg, )
August 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3320 Order Setting Hearing to Determine Compliance with LBR 5005-4, Requiring Filings, Providing Opportunity to Cancel Hearing Under Certain Conditions and Ordering other Matters. Show Cause hearing to be held on 10/7/2004 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A. (2lg, )
August 24, 2004 Filing 3317 Motion to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and The Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (2lg, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2004 (2lg, ). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT 3312 USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. Modified on 8/25/2004 (2lg, ).
August 24, 2004 Filing 3316 Notice Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (RE: related document(s)#3309 Motion to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rippey Decl# 2 Exhibit B - Designation# 3 Exhibit C - Phillips Ltr# 4 Exhibit D - Madden Ltr# 5 Exhibit E - Comparison Table# 6 Exhibit F - Geribon Aff# 7 Exhibit G - Unreported Ops) (See, P)). (See, P)
August 24, 2004 Filing 3315 Support Document Supplemental Exhibit "G" Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (RE: related document(s)#3308 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Rule 2004 Subpoena (and Memorandum of Law in Support)). (Miller, Tiffany)
August 24, 2004 Filing 3314 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #3308 Motion for Protective Order, #3309 Generic Motion,, #3317 Generic Motion, #3304 Motion for Protective Order,, #3306 Generic Motion, ) Filed by Creditors Bank One NA, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp, Deloitte & Touche, LLP, JP Morgan Chase Bank, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Kopf, John) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT # 3312 TO DOCUMENT #3317 Modified on 8/25/2004 (2lg, ).
August 24, 2004 Filing 3313 Notice of Motion ofJPMorgan Chase Bank to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3317 Generic Motion Motion of JPMorgan Chase Bank to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J) (Kopf, John)). (Kopf, John) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: MODIFIED TO CHANGE THE RELATED DOCUMENT FROM DOCUMENT # 3312 TO DOCUMENT #3317 Modified on 8/25/2004 (2lg, ).
August 24, 2004 Filing 3312 Motion for Protective Order Motion of JPMorgan Chase Bank to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J) (Kopf, John) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: RE-DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT #3317 USING CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT. ALL FUTURE REFERENCES, LINKAGE SHOULD BE TO THE NEW DOCUMENT NUMBER. Modified on 8/25/2004 (2lg, ).
August 24, 2004 Filing 3311 Notice of Motion Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3306 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13) (Lazear, Sherri)). (Lazear, Sherri)
August 24, 2004 Filing 3310 Supplemental Notice Deloitte & Touche, LLP's Federal Rule of Procedure 26(c) Certification Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP (RE: related document(s)#3305 Notice Deloitte & Touche, LLP's Federal Rule of Procedure 26(c) Certification Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP (RE: related document(s)#3304 Motion for Protective Order Deloitte's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order to Narrow the Unencumbered Asset Trust's Subpoena and Supporting Memorandum of Law Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 1-50# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 51-100# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 101-150# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 151-225# 6 Exhibit Exhibits 11-13) (Sidman, Robert)). (Sidman, Robert)). (Sidman, Robert)
August 24, 2004 Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency to: SHERRI LAZEAR. Apparent Deficiency: The PDF document does not match docket text. Please file a Notice. (RE: related document(s)#3307 Generic Motion filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC) (2lg, )
August 24, 2004 Memorandum of Apparent Filing/Docketing Deficiency to: ROBERT SIDMAN. Apparent Deficiency: The PDF Document does not contain an Electronic Signature in Accordance with ECF Administrative Procedure 8 (d). Please file an Amended Notice which contains an Electronic Signature. (RE: related document(s)#3305 Notice, , filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP) (2lg, )
August 23, 2004 Filing 3309 Motion to Quash or Modify the Rule 2004 Subpoena of the Debtors and the Unencumbered Assets Trust Filed by Creditor Bank One NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rippey Decl#2 Exhibit B - Designation#3 Exhibit C - Phillips Ltr#4 Exhibit D - Madden Ltr#5 Exhibit E - Comparison Table#6 Exhibit F - Geribon Aff#7 Exhibit G - Unreported Ops) (See, P)
August 23, 2004 Filing 3308 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Rule 2004 Subpoena (and Memorandum of Law in Support) Filed by Creditor PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to H) (Miller, Tiffany)
August 23, 2004 Filing 3307 Motion Notice of Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Lazear, Sherri)
August 23, 2004 Filing 3306 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13) (Lazear, Sherri)
August 23, 2004 Filing 3305 Notice Deloitte & Touche, LLP's Federal Rule of Procedure 26(c) Certification Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP (RE: related document(s)#3304 Motion for Protective Order Deloitte's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order to Narrow the Unencumbered Asset Trust's Subpoena and Supporting Memorandum of Law Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 1-50# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 51-100# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 101-150# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 151-225# 6 Exhibit Exhibits 11-13) (Sidman, Robert)). (Sidman, Robert)
August 23, 2004 Filing 3304 Motion for Protective Order Deloitte's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order to Narrow the Unencumbered Asset Trust's Subpoena and Supporting Memorandum of Law Filed by Creditor Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9#2 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 1-50#3 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 51-100#4 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 101-150#5 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Pages 151-225#6 Exhibit Exhibits 11-13) (Sidman, Robert)
August 23, 2004 Proceeding Memo Hearing Not Held on 8/23/04 on Order Setting Hearing to Determine Compliance with LBR 5005-4, Requiring Filings, Providing Opportunity to Cancel Hearing Under Certain Conditions and Ordering Other Matters (3189) Directed to Barbara Goodstein and Dennis J. Drebsky. No Appearances or Evidence of Compliance. Court to Issue Order Denying Their Ability to File Matters in this Court. (2je)
August 23, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 00294001,amount$ 255.00. (2sd)
August 22, 2004 Filing 3303 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3302 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service) Service Date 08/22/2004. (Admin.)
August 20, 2004 Filing 3302 Transmission of Noticer of Appeal #3296 and #3298 to BNC for Service (2brm, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 3301 Receipt of Notice of Appeal by the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel being BAP Case Number 04-8065 (RE: related document(s)#3240 Notice of Appeal, filed by Interested Party Liberty National Enterprises) (2brm, )
August 19, 2004 Filing 3300 Motion for Leave to Appeal (related document(s)#3296 Notice of Appeal) JOINT PRECAUTIONARY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, EASTERN DIVISION, UNDER 11 U.S.C. ? 158(a)(3) FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT?S ORDER ENTERED AUGUST 9, 2004 Filed by Creditors Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Order - 3266 re Sixth Rule 2004 Document Targets#2 Exhibit B -- Part 1 of 9 Joint Precautionary Motion for Leave to Appeal#3 Exhibit B -- Part 2 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit A#4 Exhibit B -- Part 3 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit B#5 Exhibit B -- Part 4 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit C#6 Exhibit B -- Part 5 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit D#7 Exhibit B -- Part 6 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit E#8 Exhibit B -- Part 7 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit F#9 Exhibit B -- Part 8 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit G#10 Exhibit B -- Part 9 of 9 Jt Precautionary Mtn Exhibit H#11 Exhibit C -- Transcript 04152004 - Pages 01-56 Part 1 of 4#12 Exhibit C -- Transcript 04152004 - Pages 057-113 Part 2 of 4#13 Exhibit C -- Transcript 04152004 - Pages 114-170 Part 3 of 4#14 Exhibit C -- Transcript 04152004 - Pages 171-225 Part 4 of 4#15 Exhibit D -- Cohen v. Doyaga (unreported)) (Kopf, John)
August 19, 2004 Filing 3299 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3298 Notice of Appeal, ). (Lazear, Sherri)
August 19, 2004 Filing 3298 Notice of Appeal of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC From Order Granting Sixth Motion of Debtors in Possession for Order Directing Rule 2004 Discovery. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (RE: related document(s)#3266 Order on Generic Motion). Appellant Designation due by 8/30/2004. (Lazear, Sherri)
August 19, 2004 Filing 3297 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by the District Court Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3296 Notice of Appeal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopf, John)
August 19, 2004 Filing 3296 Notice of Appeal. Fee Amount $255 Filed by Creditor JP Morgan Chase Bank (RE: related document(s)#3266 Order on Generic Motion). Appellant Designation due by 8/30/2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopf, John)
August 19, 2004 Receipt of Notice of Appeal(2:02-bk-65235) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 0648B2343693,amount$ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury)
August 18, 2004 Filing 3294 Clerk's Certification and Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District. Case Number 04cv758. Graham (RE: related document(s)#3157 Notice of Appeal, filed by Creditor Amedisys Inc) (2brm, )
August 16, 2004 Filing 3293 Notice of monthly fee and expense statement for July 1, 2004 through August 10, 2004 filed by Clifford Chance US LLP . (2kab, )
August 13, 2004 Filing 3292 Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel Filed by Debtor National Century Financial Enterprises. (Fairfield, Joshua)
August 12, 2004 Filing 3291 Transcript from hearing held Wednesday, August 4, 2004 at 2:30 PM. (2kab, )
August 12, 2004 Filing 3290 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3276 Order on Motion To Reconsider) Service Date 08/12/2004. (Admin.)
August 12, 2004 Filing 3289 454 (Recover Money/Property): Complaint by Avidity Partners, LLC, as Trustee of the CSFB Claims Trust against Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston NY Branch, Credit Suisse First Boston, Cayman Islands Branch, Alpine Securitization Corp., Doe No. 1 through Doe No. 10. Fee Amount $150 (Estelle, Stephen)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3288 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3275 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3287 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3274 Order on Application to Employ) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3286 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3273 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3285 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3272 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3284 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3271 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3283 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3270 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3282 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3269 Order (Generic)) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3281 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3268 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3280 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3267 Order on Application for Compensation, , Order on Motion to Amend Application, ) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3279 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3266 Order on Generic Motion) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 11, 2004 Filing 3278 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3265 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) Service Date 08/11/2004. (Admin.)
August 10, 2004 Filing 3277 Objection to (related document(s): #3241 Motion To Stay (related documents #3211 Order on Motion to Compel, ) Pending Appeal filed by Interested Party Liberty National Enterprises) Filed by Creditor Mark Aprahamian (2kab, )
August 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3276 Order Denying Motion To Reconsider (Related Doc #3190) (2kab, )
August 8, 2004 Filing 3264 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3258 Order on Application for Compensation, ) Service Date 08/08/2004. (Admin.)
August 8, 2004 Filing 3263 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3257 Order on Application for Compensation) Service Date 08/08/2004. (Admin.)
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3275 Order Granting Final Application of Kegler Brown Hill & Ritter LPA For Allowance of Fees and Expenses (Related Doc #3036) for Kenneth R Cookson, fees awarded: $12853.75, expenses awarded: $2174.11 (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3274 Order Granting Application to Appointment of Avidity Partners LLC as VI/XII Collateral Trust Conflicts Trustee; and Employment of Klee Tuchin Bogdanoff & Stern LLP as VI/XII Collateral Trust Conflicts Counsel(Related Doc #3227) (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3273 Order Granting Final Application of Clifford Chance US LLP for Interim Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period From January 13, 2003 through April 30, 2004 re:(Related Doc #3153) for Dennis J Drebsky, fees awarded: $1165415.00, expenses awarded: $40599.69 (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3272 Order Granting Fifth Interim and Final Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Expenses Incurred to FTI Consulting Inc, Financial Advisor to the Unsecured Creditors' Committee for the Period from January 14, 2003 through April 30, 2004 re: Application For Compensation (Related Doc #3128) for Leon Friedberg, fees awarded: $443706.45, expenses awarded: $ (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3271 Order Granting Final Application of Milbank Tweed Hadly & Mccloy LLP For Allowance of Fees and Expenses (Related Doc #3116) for Stephen D Estelle, fees awarded: $4678113.25, expenses awarded: $270649.71 (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3270 Order Granting Third and Final Application of Kaye Scholer LLP for Final Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Co-Counsel to the NPV Subcommittee (Related Doc #3145) for Lester M Kirshenbaum, fees awarded: $3605310.16, expenses awarded: $163146.62 (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3269 Scheduling Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#3136 Application for Order Authorizing Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to JP Morgan Chase Bank and its Counsel Pursuant to Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503 (b)(4) (2lg)
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3268 Order Granting Second and Final Application of Klee Tuchin Bogdanoff & Stern LLp for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period October 1, 2003 through April 30, 2004 (Related Doc #3126) for Stephen D Estelle, fees awarded: $677418.50, expenses awarded: $45077.68 (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3267 Order Granting Final Application of Carlile Patchen & Murphy LLP for Allowance Compensation (Related Doc #3080) for Leon Friedberg, fees awarded: $110297.00, expenses awarded: $10651.81, Granting Motion To Amend Application (Related Doc #3254) (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3266 Order Granting Motion (Related Doc #3172) (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3265 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Martin R. Barash (Related Doc #3246) (2lg, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 3262 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related documents(s)#3248 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)) Service Date 08/06/2004. (Admin.)