Johnson v. UNUM Group et al
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson
Defendant: UNUM Group and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 6:2011cv00306
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: McCurtain
Presiding Judge: Frank H Seay
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2013 Filing 38 MANDATE issued letter from Circuit Court (Re: #32 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, #37 USCA Decision ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2013 Filing 37 DECISION from Circuit Court dismissing the Decision of the District Court (awaiting mandate) (Re: #32 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2013 Filing 36 LETTER re: Record Complete. A Transcript Order Form has been filed stating no transcripts are necessary or are already on file. Record Complete Letter transmitted to 10th Circuit Court of Appeals electronically. (Re: #32 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2013 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Transcripts are not necessary or are already on file ) (Re: #32 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ) by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Filing 34 APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 13-7001 (Re: #32 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Filing 33 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Circuit Court with copy of #32 Notice of Appeal and #31 Order. Preliminary Record transmitted to 10th Circuit Court of Appeals electronically. (Re: #32 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (paid $455 appeal fee; receipt number 1086-626806) (Re: #31 Order, Dismissing/Terminating Case ) by Donald Johnson (Renegar, Joan)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay: denying Plaintiff's Request to vacate the decision by UNUM to terminate Plaintiff's benefits; terminating case (trl, Chambers)
June 18, 2012 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF to Defendants' Response (Re: #29 ) to Plaintiff's Brief-in-Chief (Re: #28 ) by Donald Johnson (Renegar, Joan) Modified on 6/19/2012 to create link and amend text (neh, Deputy Clerk).
May 29, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE by UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (With attachments)(Kane, Matthew)
April 26, 2012 Filing 28 Preliminary BRIEF by Donald Johnson (Renegar, Joan)
March 6, 2012 Filing 27 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (dma, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting #25 Amended Joint Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record Under Seal (dma, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2012 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Record by Donald Johnson, UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America Responses due by 3/16/2012(Kane, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay denying #23 Joint Motion to File Administrative Record Under Seal, for the reason that the Motion lacks sufficient detail as to the nature of the alleged confidential and proprietary information(trl, Chambers)
February 28, 2012 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Record by Donald Johnson, UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America Responses due by 3/13/2012(Kane, Matthew)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay: Joint Administrative Record due by 3/6/2012; Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 4/26/2012; Defendants' Response Brief due by 5/28/2012; Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 6/18/2012 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay directing parties to submit a proposed briefing schedule by 2/7/12. (dma, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2012 Filing 20 MINUTES of Proceedings held before Judge Frank H. Seay: Scheduling Conference held on 1/17/2012 (Court Reporter: B. Neil) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2012 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Donald Johnson, UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Kane, Matthew)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Frank H. Seay: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Room 230, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Frank H. Seay.( NOTE: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2012) (trl, Chambers)
November 8, 2011 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Frank H. Seay. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-11-306-FHS. The Scheduling Conference set on 12/9/11 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Status and Scheduling Conference for 12/9/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder (Attachments: #(1) Consent/Reassignment Form) (dma, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2011 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent UNUM Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (With attachments)(Kane, Matthew)
October 17, 2011 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UNUM Group (With attachments)(Kane, Matthew)
October 17, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Kane, Matthew)
October 17, 2011 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew C. Kane on behalf of UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Kane, Matthew)
October 5, 2011 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Donald Johnson - Served on 9/12/2011. by Donald Johnson (Renegar, Joan)
October 3, 2011 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants UNUM Group and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answers are due 10/17/2011 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2011 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America Responses due by 10/14/2011(Whaley, Phillip)
September 30, 2011 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phillip G. Whaley on behalf of UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Whaley, Phillip)
September 2, 2011 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joan A. Renegar on behalf of Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregg R. Renegar on behalf of Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to UNUM Group by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 Filing 3 PRAECIPE issuing two (2) summons by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against UNUM Group, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 ***Remark: Consent form provided to Plaintiff (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2011 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/2/2011 in the amount of $350, receipt number 5600 by Donald Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. UNUM Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson
Represented By: Gregg R. Renegar
Represented By: Joan A. Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Group
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Phillip G. Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Phillip G. Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?