Cone, Jr. v. Pearson et al
Plaintiff: John Eldridge Cone, Jr.
Defendant: Charles Pearson, James Broadrick and DOC Population
Case Number: 6:2014cv00410
Filed: September 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Muskogee
Presiding Judge: Steven P. Shreder
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Denying 47 second Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Granting 24 defendant's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(6). (acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Denying motion for appointment of counsel. (Re: 15 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel ) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Denying 15 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cone, Jr. v. Pearson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eldridge Cone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Broadrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC Population
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?