Haff Poultry, Inc. et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Haff Poultry, Inc, Craig Watts, Nancy Butler, Brad Carr, Myles B. Weaver, Haff Poultry, Inc., Melissa Weaver, Jonathan Walters and Johnny Upchurch
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc, Perdue Farms, Inc., Koch Foods, Inc., Pilgrim Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc. and Perdue Foods, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Matt Purlee, Jonathan Buttram, Vince Edwards, Paul Brown, William Beatty, Triple R Ranch, LLC and Jeremy Souder
In Re: Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation
Case Number: 6:2017cv00033
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Muskogee
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #289 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Kimberly A. Fetsick for Plaintiffs Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, and Myles B. Weaver, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 289 MOTION for Attorney Kimberly A. Fetsick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1343841) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (With attachments) Responses due by 3/9/2020(Lahman, Larry)
February 21, 2020 Filing 288 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pilgrim Pride Corporation, Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Perdue Foods, LLC (Re: #137 Amended Complaint, ) by Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver, Jonathan Walters, Haff Poultry, Inc., Nancy Butler, Johnny Upchurch (Smith, Gary)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #269 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Second Amended Class Action Complaint due no later than 2/21/2020. Additionally, any Motion(s) to Dismiss all or part of the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint shall be filed no later than 3/6/2020. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 286 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion of Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Re: #269 MOTION for Leave to File Document) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Mahan, Carrie)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #284 Motion to Withdraw Counsel and deeming Mark C. Tatum, Robert T. Adams and Michael S. Cargnel withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 284 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Cargnel, Michael) Modified on 2/18/2020 to edit event and text (tls, Deputy Clerk).
February 13, 2020 Filing 283 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristin M. Koger on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Koger, Kristin)
February 12, 2020 Filing 282 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel C. Yates on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Yates, Daniel)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #279 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and deeming Reid E. Robison withdrawn as counsel for defendant Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2020 Filing 280 MINUTE ORDER by United States District Judge Robert J. Shelby referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-17-033-RJS-SPS. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2020 Filing 279 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation Responses due by 2/25/2020(Robison, Reid)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #277 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Kristin M. Koger and Daniel Yates for Defendant, Perdue Farms, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of entry of appearances and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 277 MOTION for Attorney Kristin M. Koger; Daniel C. Yates to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1339648) by Perdue Farms, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 2/24/2020(Stonecipher, Mark) (Main Document 277 replaced on 2/10/2020; NEF regenerated) (tls, Deputy Clerk).
January 30, 2020 Filing 276 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley D. Justus on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Justus, Bradley)
January 30, 2020 Filing 275 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kail J. Jethmalani on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Jethmalani, Kail)
January 30, 2020 Filing 274 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carmel R. Arikat on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Arikat, Carmel)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #270 , #271 and #272 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Carmel R. Arikat, Kail J. Jethmalani and Bradley D. Justus for Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2020 Filing 272 MOTION for Attorney Bradley D. Justus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1336054) by Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation Responses due by 2/11/2020(Burrage, Michael)
January 28, 2020 Filing 271 MOTION for Attorney Kail J. Jethmalani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1336053) by Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation Responses due by 2/11/2020(Burrage, Michael)
January 28, 2020 Filing 270 MOTION for Attorney Carmel R. Arikat to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1336043) by Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation [NOTE: Attorney Michael Burrage added to party Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation(pty:inre)]. Responses due by 2/11/2020(Burrage, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 269 MOTION for Leave to File Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Compliant and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (With attachments) Responses due by 2/10/2020(Smith, Gary)
January 8, 2020 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Motion Hearing held on 1/6/20 before District Judge Robert J. Shelby (Court Reporter: Ken Sidwell) (Pages: 1-100). A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or may view the transcript at the court public terminal. There is no charge to view the transcript at the court public terminal. (Re: #266 Ruling on Motion to Compel, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, Ruling on Motion to Stay, Minutes of Motion Hearing) (kns, Court Reporter) (Main Document 268 replaced on 1/9/2020) (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby: At the Motion Hearing held on 1/06/2020 the Court orally lifted the stay on discovery previously imposed on 9/01/2017. (Re: #266 Minutes, #190 Ruling on Motion to Stay) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 266 MINUTES of Proceedings held before District Judge Robert J. Shelby: At the Motion Hearing held on 1/06/2020, the Court issued oral rulings DENYING #192 Perdue's Motion to Compel Arbitration, to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay AND #193 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Additionally, Court granted Plaintiffs' Oral Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and directed that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to be filed on or before 1/27/2020; Defendant's Response due on or before 2/18/2020. Status Conference/Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1, Room 230, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Robert J. Shelby. Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2020. (Court Reporter: Ken Sidwell) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Telephonic Conference held on 11/20/2019 before District Judge Robert J. Shelby (Court Reporter: Kelly Brown Hicken) (Pages: 21). A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or may view the transcript at the court public terminal. There is no charge to view the transcript at the court public terminal. (Re: 263 Ruling on Motion for Leave to File Document, Ruling on Motion to Lift Stay, Minutes of Telephone Conference) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby: Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1, Room 230, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Robert J. Shelby. (Re: #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay, AND #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 263 MINUTES of Proceedings held before District Judge Robert J. Shelby: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/20/2019. Counsel made appearances. The court issues an oral ruling GRANTING #242 Motion to Provide Supplemental Authority and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #253 Motion to Stay. The court apologizes for the delay in issuing a ruling on the two Motions to Dismiss, #192 and #193 . The court will offer an oral ruling on those Motions at a hearing to be set in December or January. Counsel are directed to discuss the following possible dates for the hearing: 12/10/2019, 1/3/2020, 1/6/2020, and communicate with Ms. Anneliese Booher, career law clerk regarding a workable date. Counsel for Plaintiff: Eric Cramer, Samantha Dirkson, Gary Smith, Erin Sheanim, Dan Walker, Roger Ediger, Melinda Coolidge, Murray Lahman, Dudley Butler; Counsel for Pilgrims Pride: Reed Robinson, Clayton Daley, Corey Mahan; Counsel for Purdue: Lise Jose-Failes, Leonard Gordon; Counsel for Tyson Foods: Rachel Adcof; Counsel for Sanderson Farms: Stacey Pepper; Counsel appearing from Alston & Bird: Anthony Green. (Re: #242 Motion for Leave to File Document; #253 Motion to Lift Stay; #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay, #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support) (Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 262 Subject to Bankruptcy Courts Order Enforcing Confirmation Order, Defendant Pilgrim's Pride Corporation's Notice of Filing Declaration for Purposes of Status Conference (ECF 252) (Re: 252 Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (With attachments)(Bailey, Clayton)
October 29, 2019 Filing 261 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #253 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Perdue and Tyson ) by Perdue Farms, Inc. ;(Stonecipher, Mark)
October 28, 2019 Filing 260 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel J. Adcox on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Adcox, Rachel)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #258 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Rachel J. Adcox for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 258 MOTION for Attorney Rachel Adcox to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1312328) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/8/2019(Burrage, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 257 EXHIBITS A and C (Re: #253 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Perdue and Tyson) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (With attachments)(Smith, Gary)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #255 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Provisionally File Documents under Seal. (Re: #253 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Perdue and Tyson) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 255 Amended MOTION to Provisionally Seal Documents Attached to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Discovery Stay as to Tyson and Perdue by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver Responses due by 10/29/2019(Smith, Gary)
October 15, 2019 Filing 254 MOTION to Seal Document (Re: #253 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Perdue and Tyson) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver Responses due by 10/29/2019(Smith, Gary)
October 15, 2019 Filing 253 MOTION to Lift Stay as to Perdue and Tyson by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (With attachments) Responses due by 10/29/2019(Smith, Gary)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #250 Motion for Status Conference. Judge Robert J. Shelby has set a Telephone Conference for 11/20/2019 at 09:30 AM (MST). As a participant, the conference instructions are as follows: 1. Dial 888-808-6929; 2. Enter Access Code 2900331; 3. To enter as a participant, press # key. If the call has not been activated by the Court, you will be placed on hold. If you have any questions before the hearing begins, please do not hesitate to call chambers at 801-524-6790. If you are having issues during the hearing, please email the case administrator at mary_jane_mcnamee@utd.uscourts.gov (sms, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 251 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #250 MOTION for Status Conference ) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation ; (With attachments)(Bailey, Clayton)
January 4, 2019 Filing 250 MOTION for Status Conference re: amendment to the operative complaint by Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Craig Watts Responses due by 1/18/2019(Cramer, Eric)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINTUE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #248 Motion to Withdraw filed 10/18/18 and deeming Jonathan Max Justl withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 248 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Jonathan Max Justl by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2018(Justl, Jonathan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 247 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick F. Madden by on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Craig Watts (Madden, Patrick)
August 29, 2018 Filing 246 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric L. Cramer by on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Craig Watts (Cramer, Eric)
August 21, 2018 Filing 245 NOTICE of Change of Address by Samantha S. Derksen by on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Derksen, Samantha)
August 15, 2018 Filing 244 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christina M. Black by on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Craig Watts (Black, Christina)
July 2, 2018 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #242 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority ) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver ;(Black, Christina)
June 29, 2018 Filing 242 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority (Re: #234 Brief in Support of Motion, ) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/13/2018(Harkrider, John)
June 21, 2018 Filing 241 Joint NOTICE of JPML Order Denying Transfer by Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation (With attachments)(Harkrider, John)
June 4, 2018 Filing 240 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary M. Gardner on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Gardner, Mary)
June 1, 2018 Filing 239 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support ) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver ;(Smith, Gary)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #237 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Mary M. Gardner for Perdue Farms, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2018 Filing 237 MOTION for Attorney Mary M. Gardner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1180035) by Perdue Farms, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 6/12/2018(Stonecipher, Mark)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby GRANTING #235 Motion to Withdraw filed 5/17/18 and deeming Kevin H. Kim withdrawn as counsel for defendants Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2018 Filing 235 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Kevin H. Kim by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. Responses due by 5/31/2018(Kim, Kevin)
May 10, 2018 Filing 234 CORRECTED Joint BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support ) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. ;(Harkrider, John)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby directing defendants to file a Corrected Supplemental Brief no later than 5/11/18. Said Corrected Supplemental brief shall be filed without the top banner and with an explanation for re-filing in the opening paragraph. Additionally, the Corrected Supplemental brief shall be identical in all other respect and will be treated as filed on 5/2/18. (Re: #232 Brief in Support of Motion) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2018 Filing 232 Joint BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support ) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. ;(Harkrider, John)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #230 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss (tls, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2018 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Perdue Farms, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 5/15/2018(Harkrider, John)
April 26, 2018 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2018 before District Judge Robert J. Shelby (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (Pages: 1-142). A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or may view the transcript at the court public terminal. There is no charge to view the transcript at the court public terminal. (Re: #228 Minutes of Motion Hearing, ) (bpn, Court Reporter)
April 20, 2018 Filing 228 MINUTES of Proceedings held before District Judge Robert J. Shelby: Motion(s) Hearing held on 4/20/2018 (Re: #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay, #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support ) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2018 Filing 227 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Samantha S. Derksen on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Derksen, Samantha)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #225 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Samantha S. Derksen for Plaintiffs: Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, and Myles B. Weaver provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2018 Filing 225 MOTION for Attorney Samantha S. Derksen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1164604) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 4/10/2018(Lahman, Larry)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby DENYING Without Prejudice #222 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision on MDL Transfer. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2018 Filing 223 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #222 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision on MDL Transfer) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments)(Harkrider, John)
March 23, 2018 Filing 222 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision on MDL Transfer by Perdue Farms, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. Responses due by 4/6/2018(Harkrider, John)
March 13, 2018 Filing 221 NOTICE of Enjoining Growers from Proceeding Against Pilgrim's Pride Corporation Based on the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (Re: #137 Amended Complaint) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (With attachments)(Bailey, Clayton)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby setting Motion(s) Hearing for 4/20/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1, Room 230, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Robert J. Shelby. (Re: Perdue's #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay AND Defendants' #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support ) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE that Plaintiffs would like to move forward in this Court with the claims against the remaining Defendants (Re: 217 Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Coolidge, Melinda)
January 30, 2018 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Motions Hearing held on January 19, 2018 before District Judge Robert J. Shelby (Court Reporter: Karla McWhorter) (Pages: 1-136). A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or may view the transcript at the court public terminal. There is no charge to view the transcript at the court public terminal. (Re: #216 Minutes of Motion Hearing, ) (ksm, Court Reporter)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby: For the reasons stated on the record at the Motion hearing held on 01/19/18 (Re: #216 Minutes of Motions Hearing), Defendants' #191 Sanderson Farms' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND Defendants' #194 Kochs' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction are hereby GRANTED and the claims against Defendants Sanderson Farms and Koch are dismissed without prejudice. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2018 Filing 216 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before District Judge Robert J. Shelby: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2018 (Re: #191 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) And Improper Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law In Support, #194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Improper Venue ). (Court Reporter: Karla McWhorter) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2018 Filing 215 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Max Justl on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Justl, Jonathan)
January 18, 2018 Filing 214 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Renley Dennis on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Dennis, J.)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #212 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jonathan Max Justl for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2018 Filing 212 MOTION for Attorney Jonathan Max Justl to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1147317) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 1/31/2018(Burrage, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby: Before the court is the Parties' Joint Motion and Proposed Order to Allocate Oral Argument Time for Pending Motions #210 . The court greatly appreciates the Parties' planning and collaboration in advance of oral argument. But the court is disinclined to allocate time limits on the pending motions. Though the court is grateful for the Parties' efforts to allocate time efficiently, it is the court's typical practice at oral argument to permit discussion as long as needed on the issues before the court, and not adhere to strict time limits. Accordingly, the court DENIES the Parties' Joint Motion. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 12, 2018 Filing 210 Joint MOTION And [Proposed] Order To Allocate Oral Argument Time for Pending Motions by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. Responses due by 1/26/2018(Harkrider, John)
January 3, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles D. Gabriel by on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Gabriel, Charles)
November 22, 2017 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support) by All Defendants (Harkrider, John) Modified on 11/27/2017 to delete filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 22, 2017 Filing 207 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #191 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) And Improper Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law In Support ) by Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) ;(Laytin, Daniel)
November 22, 2017 Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Improper Venue ) by Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. ;(Pedigo, Scott)
November 22, 2017 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay ) by Perdue Farms, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Gordon, Leonard)
November 2, 2017 Filing 204 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carrie C. Mahan by on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Mahan, Carrie)
October 23, 2017 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Motion (Re: #191 MOTION to Dismiss, #192 MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Stay, #193 MOTION to Dismiss and #194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Improper Venue) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver ;(Lahman, Larry) Modified on 10/26/2017 to add links (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 23, 2017 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #191 MOTION to Dismiss, #194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Improper Venue) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Lahman, Larry) Modified on 10/26/2017 to add link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 23, 2017 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay ) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver ;(Lahman, Larry)
October 23, 2017 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support ) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver ;(Lahman, Larry)
October 3, 2017 Filing 199 CORRECTED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristopher E. Koepsel on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Koepsel, Kristopher)
September 27, 2017 Filing 198 RESPONSE (Re: #189 Notice of Related Case(s) ) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (With attachments)(Lahman, Larry)
September 26, 2017 Filing 197 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristopher E. Koepsel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koepsel, Kristopher) Modified on 9/28/2017 to delete filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby setting Motion(s) Hearing for 1/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1, Room 230, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Robert J. Shelby. (Re: #191 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) And Improper Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law In Support; #192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay; #193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support; #194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Improper Venue) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2017 Filing 195 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue) by Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Pedigo, Scott)
September 8, 2017 Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Improper Venue by Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2017(Pedigo, Scott) Modified on 9/8/2017 to edit Response date and regenerate NEF (tls, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2017 Filing 193 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3), and (6) and Memorandum of Law in Support by All Defendants Responses due by 10/23/2017(Murphy, Lawrence) Modified on 9/8/2017 to edit Response date and regenerate NEF (tls, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2017 Filing 192 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Perdue Farms, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2017(Stonecipher, Mark). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 9/8/2017 (tls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/8/2017 to edit Response date and regenerate NEF (tls, Deputy Clerk).
September 8, 2017 Filing 191 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) And Improper Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law In Support by Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2017(Laytin, Daniel) Modified on 9/8/2017 to edit Response date and regenerate NEF (tls, Deputy Clerk).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby GRANTING #144 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2017 Filing 189 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (With attachments)(Bailey, Clayton)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby GRANTING #187 Motion for Leave to File and Incorporated Supplement to Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of their Motions to Dismiss and for Oral Argument. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2017 Filing 187 MOTION for Leave to File and Incorporated Supplement to Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of their Motions to Dismiss and for Oral Argument (Re: #186 Reply to Response to Motion) by All Defendants (With attachments) Responses due by 9/11/2017(Laytin, Daniel)
August 21, 2017 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #144 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Their Motions to Dismiss MOTION for Hearing ) by Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Pilgrim Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Laytin, Daniel)
August 16, 2017 Filing 185 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Vincent J. Esades on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Esades, Vincent)
August 15, 2017 Filing 184 Amended ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer S. Goldstein on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Goldstein, Jennifer)
August 15, 2017 Filing 183 Amended ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary E. Mason on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Mason, Gary)
August 15, 2017 Filing 182 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel J. Walker on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Walker, Daniel)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #179 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Daniel J. Walker for Plaintiffs: Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, and Myles B. Weaver, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2017 Filing 180 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregory L. Davis on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver and Myles B. Weaver (Davis, Gregory) Modified on 8/17/2017 to delete filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 14, 2017 Filing 179 MOTION for Attorney Daniel J. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1109749) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (With attachments) Responses due by 8/28/2017(Lahman, Larry)
August 11, 2017 Filing 178 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David S. Muraskin on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Muraskin, David)
August 11, 2017 Filing 177 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Dudley Butler on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Butler, J.)
August 11, 2017 Filing 176 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caroline Ramsey Taylor on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Taylor, Caroline)
August 11, 2017 Filing 175 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John C. Whitfield on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Whitfield, John)
August 10, 2017 Filing 174 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott E. Cordell on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Cordell, Scott)
August 10, 2017 Filing 173 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger L. Ediger on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Ediger, Roger)
August 10, 2017 Filing 172 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carol H. Lahman on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Lahman, Carol)
August 10, 2017 Filing 171 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott E. Cordell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cordell, Scott)
August 10, 2017 Filing 170 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James J. Pizzirusso on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Pizzirusso, James)
August 10, 2017 Filing 169 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hausfeld on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Hausfeld, Michael)
August 10, 2017 Filing 168 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary I. Smith, Jr on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Smith, Gary)
August 10, 2017 Filing 167 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melinda R. Coolidge on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Coolidge, Melinda)
August 10, 2017 Filing 166 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. David Riggs on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Riggs, M.)
August 10, 2017 Filing 165 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald M. Bingham on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Bingham, Donald)
August 10, 2017 Filing 164 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric L. Cramer on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Cramer, Eric)
August 10, 2017 Filing 163 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick F. Madden on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Madden, Patrick)
August 10, 2017 Filing 162 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christina M. Black on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Black, Christina)
August 10, 2017 Filing 161 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David M. Wilkerson on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Wilkerson, David)
August 10, 2017 Filing 160 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry S. McDevitt on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (McDevitt, Larry)
August 9, 2017 Filing 159 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Harlan Hentges on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters (Hentges, Harlan)
August 9, 2017 Filing 158 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles D. Gabriel on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver and Myles B. Weaver (Gabriel, Charles) Modified on 8/11/2017 to edit filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 8, 2017 Filing 157 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Warren T. Burns on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Burns, Warren)
August 8, 2017 Filing 156 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. Stephen Dampier on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Dampier, M.)
August 8, 2017 Filing 155 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron M. Sheanin on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Sheanin, Aaron)
August 8, 2017 Filing 154 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kellie Lerner on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Lerner, Kellie)
August 8, 2017 Filing 153 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hollis Salzman on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Salzman, Hollis)
August 7, 2017 Filing 152 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Cohen on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Cohen, Daniel)
August 7, 2017 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #144 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Their Motions to Dismiss MOTION for Hearing ) by Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Jonathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver ;(Lahman, Larry)
August 7, 2017 Filing 150 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David S. Muraskin on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Muraskin, David)
August 7, 2017 Filing 149 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Dudley Butler on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Butler, J.)
August 7, 2017 Filing 148 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caroline Ramsey Taylor on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Taylor, Caroline)
August 7, 2017 Filing 147 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John C. Whitfield on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver (Whitfield, John)
August 7, 2017 Filing 146 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer S. Goldstein on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver and Myles B. Weaver (Goldstein, Jennifer) Modified on 8/7/2017 to delete filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 7, 2017 Filing 145 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary E. Mason on behalf of Nancy Butler, Melissa Weaver and Myles B. Weaver (Mason, Gary) Modified on 8/7/2017 to delete filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 24, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Their Motions to Dismiss and MOTION for Oral Argument and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by All Defendants (With attachments) Responses due by 8/7/2017(Laytin, Daniel). Added MOTION for Hearing on 7/25/2017 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 19, 2017 Filing 143 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. Stephen Dampier on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Dampier, M.)
July 12, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address by W. A. Edmondson by on behalf of Nancy Butler, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Melissa Weaver, Myles B. Weaver [NOTE: Attorney W. A. Edmondson added to party Melissa Weaver(pty:conpla), Attorney W. A. Edmondson added to party Myles B. Weaver(pty:conpla)]. (Edmondson, W.)
July 12, 2017 Filing 141 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. A. Edmondson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edmondson, W.)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #136 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney M. Stephen Dampier for Nancy Butler, Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters,Craig Watts, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2017 Filing 139 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kellie Lerner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lerner, Kellie)
July 11, 2017 Filing 138 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hollis Salzman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Salzman, Hollis)
July 10, 2017 Filing 137 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint) by Haff Poultry, Inc., Nancy Butler, Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Myles B. Weaver and Melissa Weaver [NOTE: Attorney Larry D. Lahman added to party Melissa Weaver(pty:plaintiff), Attorney Larry D. Lahman added to party Myles B. Weaver(pty:plaintiff)]. (Lahman, Larry) Modified on 7/25/2017 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2017 Filing 136 MOTION for Attorney Michael Stephen Dampier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1100373) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 7/24/2017(Lahman, Larry)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #133 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Hollis Salzman and Kellie Lerner for Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, and Craig Watts, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2017 Filing 134 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron Sheanin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sheanin, Aaron)
July 6, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION for Attorney Hollis Salzman and Kellie Lerner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1099896) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 7/20/2017(Lahman, Larry)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #131 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Aaron Sheanin for Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, and Craig Watts, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION for Attorney Aaron Sheanin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1098538) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 7/13/2017(Lahman, Larry)
June 16, 2017 Filing 130 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David M. Wilkerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilkerson, David)
June 16, 2017 Filing 129 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry S. McDevitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDevitt, Larry)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #126 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys David M. Wilkerson AND Larry S. McDevitt for Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, and Craig Watts, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JOINT ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING by District Judge Robert J. Shelby directing that the case stay be lifted. At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby consolidated with CIV-17-112-RJS for all purposes. All future pleadings submitted for filing shall be filed in Case No. CIV-17-033-RJS and contain the caption: "In re: Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation". Additionally, Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint is due no later than 7/10/2017. Motions to Dismiss must be filed by 9/8/2017. (Re: #101 Order, ) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2017 Filing 126 MOTION for Attorney David M. Wilkerson and Larry S. McDevitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1093388) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 6/28/2017(Lahman, Larry)
June 14, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patricia Sawyer by on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Sawyer, Patricia)
June 14, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Burrage by on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Burrage, Michael)
June 13, 2017 Filing 123 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Warren T. Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burns, Warren)
June 12, 2017 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Joint Case Management Hearing held on 6/9/17 before District Judge Robert J. Shelby (Court Reporter: Ken Sidwell) (Pages: 32). A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or may view the transcript at the court public terminal. There is no charge to view the transcript at the court public terminal. (Re: #121 Minutes of Scheduling Conference ) (kns, Court Reporter)
June 9, 2017 Filing 121 MINUTES of Proceedings held before District Judge Robert J. Shelby: Joint Case Management Hearing held on 6/9/2017. (Court Reporter: Ken Sidwell) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #119 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Warren T. Burns for All Plaintiffs, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION for Attorney Warren T. Burns to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1091677) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 6/23/2017(Lahman, Larry)
June 9, 2017 Filing 118 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark K. Stonecipher on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
June 2, 2017 Filing 117 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carol H. Lahman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lahman, Carol)
June 1, 2017 Filing 116 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald M. Bingham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bingham, Donald)
May 26, 2017 Filing 115 REPORT - Defendants' Memorandum in Response to Court's Preliminary Case Management Views by Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Pilgrim Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Harkrider, John)
May 26, 2017 Filing 114 Jointly Proposed Agenda for June 9, 2017 Case Management Hearing by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Burrage, Michael)
May 26, 2017 Filing 113 BRIEF - Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Response to the Court's April 25, 2017 Order (Re: #101 Order) by Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Lahman, Larry)
May 23, 2017 Filing 112 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Harold C. Zuckerman on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Zuckerman, Harold)
May 22, 2017 Filing 111 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. David Riggs on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Riggs, M.)
May 5, 2017 Filing 110 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew T. Hernacki on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Hernacki, Andrew)
May 5, 2017 Filing 109 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert P. Davis on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Davis, Robert)
May 5, 2017 Filing 108 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leonard L. Gordon on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Gordon, Leonard)
May 5, 2017 Filing 107 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lisa Jose Fales on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Fales, Lisa)
May 5, 2017 Filing 106 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Douglas Baldridge on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Baldridge, J.)
May 4, 2017 Filing 105 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Reid E. Robison on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Robison, Reid)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby granting #103 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Andrew T. Hernacki for Perdue Farms, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2017 Filing 103 MOTION for Attorney Andrew T. Hernacki to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1080927) by Perdue Farms, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 5/12/2017(Donelson, Kevin)
April 28, 2017 Filing 102 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin J. Arquit on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Arquit, Kevin)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JOINT ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby, setting a Joint Case Management Hearing for 6/9/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1, Room 230, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before District Judge Robert J. Shelby and ORDERS case stayed pending the 6/9/2017 Joint Case Management Hearing and setting other associated deadlines. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby GRANTING #95 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys J. Douglas Baldridge, Lisa Jose Fales, Leonard Gordon, and Robert P. Davis for Perdue Farms, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby GRANTING #86 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Kevin J. Arquit for Pilgrim Pride Corporation, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2017 Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge James H. Payne and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to United States District Judge Robert J. Shelby of the District of Utah, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-17-33-RJS. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2017 Filing 97 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott E. Cordell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cordell, Scott)
March 17, 2017 Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to District Judge James H. Payne. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-17-33-JHP.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Attorney J. Douglas Baldridge, Lisa Jose Fales, Leonard Gordon, Robert P. Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1067614) by Perdue Farms, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/24/2017(Donelson, Kevin)
March 10, 2017 Filing 94 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin R. Donelson on behalf of Perdue Farms, Inc. (Donelson, Kevin)
March 3, 2017 Filing 93 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael S. Cargnel on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Cargnel, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 92 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin H. Kim on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Kim, Kevin)
March 3, 2017 Filing 91 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert T. Adams on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Adams, Robert)
March 3, 2017 Filing 90 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Keeley on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Keeley, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 89 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John D. Harkrider on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Harkrider, John)
March 2, 2017 Filing 88 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark C. Tatum on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Tatum, Mark)
March 1, 2017 Filing 87 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christa C. Cottrell on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) (Cottrell, Christa)
March 1, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Attorney Kevin J. Arquit to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064994) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (With attachments) Responses due by 3/15/2017(Leach, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 85 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Laytin on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) (Laytin, Daniel)
March 1, 2017 Filing 84 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carrie C. Mahan on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Mahan, Carrie)
March 1, 2017 Filing 83 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Martin L. Roth on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) (Roth, Martin)
March 1, 2017 Filing 82 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Murphy, Lawrence)
March 1, 2017 Filing 81 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stacy Pepper on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) (Pepper, Stacy)
February 28, 2017 Filing 80 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patricia Sawyer on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Sawyer, Patricia)
February 28, 2017 Filing 79 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hausfeld on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Hausfeld, Michael)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #72 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Mark C. Tatum for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #71 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Michael Steven Cargnel for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Robert T. Adams for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Kevin H. Kim for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2017 Filing 74 MINUTE ORDERby Judge Ronald A. White granting #68 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Michael L. Keeley for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney John D. Harkrider for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc.,Tyson Foods, Inc., and Tyson Poultry, Inc., provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for Attorney Mark C. Tatum to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064155) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2017(Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Attorney Michael S. Cargnel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064154) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2017(Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Attorney Robert T. Adams to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064153) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2017(Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney Kevin H. Kim to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064152) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2017(Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for Attorney Michael L. Keeley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064151) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2017(Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION for Attorney John D. Harkrider to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1064148) by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2017(Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Burrage, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2017 to term motion as document was filed in error as a motion (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2017 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Tyson Foods, Inc. (Burrage, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2017 to term motion as document was filed in error as a motion (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2017 Filing 64 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (Burrage, Michael)
February 27, 2017 Filing 63 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Calender on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Calender, John)
February 27, 2017 Filing 62 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cable M. Frost on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Frost, Cable)
February 27, 2017 Filing 61 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott W. Pedigo on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Pedigo, Scott)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time ( #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) extending the deadline for defendants to respond to the Complaint until 4/28/2017 (lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2017 Filing 59 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Clayton E. Bailey on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Bailey, Clayton)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White GRANTING #44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Carrie C. Mahan for Pilgrim Pride Corporation, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White GRANTING #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Clayton E. Bailey for Pilgrim Pride Corporation, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White GRANTING #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Christa C. Cottrell, Daniel E. Laytin, Stacy Pepper, and Martin L. Roth for Sanderson Farms, Inc.,Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), and Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2017 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying Corporate Parent JBS Wisconsin Properties, LLC and Corporate Parent JBS, S.A., a Brazilian Corporation) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Leach, William) Modified on 2/28/2017 to add corporate parents (nsb, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2017 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Koch Foods, Inc. for Koch Meat Co., Inc.) by Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Woodard, John)
February 27, 2017 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Koch Foods, Inc. (Woodard, John)
February 24, 2017 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sanderson Farms, Inc. for Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.) by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division) (Bryant, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division) (Bryant, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Defendants; Responses due by 3/10/2017(Bryant, David) Modified on 3/2/2017 to edit filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 24, 2017 Filing 49 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James J. Pizzirusso on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Pizzirusso, James)
February 24, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney Daniel E. Laytin P.C., Stacy Pepper, Martin L. Roth, Christa C. Cottrell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1063725) by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division) (With attachments) Responses due by 3/10/2017(Bryant, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 47 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David L. Bryant on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division) (Bryant, David)
February 24, 2017 Filing 46 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Wesley Pebsworth on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division) (Pebsworth, J.)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Motion for Admission filed 2/23/17 ( #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice ) of attorneys John Calender, Scott W. Pedigo and Cable M. Frost for Koch Foods, Inc. and Koch Meat Co., Inc. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney Carrie C. Mahan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1063319) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (With attachments) Responses due by 3/10/2017(Leach, William)
February 24, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Attorney Clayton E. Bailey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1063309) by Pilgrim Pride Corporation (With attachments) Responses due by 3/10/2017(Leach, William)
February 24, 2017 Filing 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William S. Leach on behalf of Pilgrim Pride Corporation (Leach, William)
February 23, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney John Calendar, Scott W. Pedigo, Cable M. Frost to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1063126) by Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 3/9/2017(Woodard, John)
February 23, 2017 Filing 40 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert P. Coffey, Jr on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Coffey, Robert)
February 23, 2017 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John R. Woodard, III on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (Woodard, John)
February 21, 2017 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melinda R. Coolidge on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Coolidge, Melinda)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney James J. Pizzirusso and Michael D. Hausfeld for Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters and Craig Watts, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2017 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gary I Smith on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Smith, Gary)
February 17, 2017 Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Vincent J. Esades on behalf of Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (Esades, Vincent)
February 17, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney Michael D. Hausfeld and James J. Pizzirusso to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1061862) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 3/3/2017(Lahman, Larry)
February 15, 2017 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregory L. Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davis, Gregory)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Motion for Admission filed 2/13/17 ( #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice ) of attorneys Melinda R. Coolidge and Gary I Smith for Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters and Craig Watts. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Motion for Admission filed 2/9/17 ( #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) of attorney Vincent J. Esades for Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters and Craig Watts. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2017 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric L. Cramer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cramer, Eric)
February 13, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney Melinda R. Coolidge & Gary I. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1060858) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 2/27/2017(Lahman, Larry)
February 13, 2017 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick F. Madden on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Madden, Patrick)
February 13, 2017 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christina M. Black on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Black, Christina)
February 10, 2017 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-17-33-RAW. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Vincent J. Esades to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1059944) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 2/23/2017(Lahman, Larry)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Gregory L. Davis for plaintiffs Haff Poultry, Inc., Craig Watts, Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, and Brad Carr provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Gregory Davis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1059416) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 2/22/2017(Lahman, Larry)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Christina M. Black, Eric L. Cramer, and Patrick F. Madden for all plaintiffs, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2017 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles D. Gabriel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gabriel, Charles)
February 6, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Christina M. Black, Eric L. Cramer, and Patrick F. Madden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1058220) by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/21/2017(Lahman, Larry)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Charles D. Gabriel for All Plaintiff's, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Charles D. Gabriel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1057020) by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/15/2017(Lahman, Larry)
January 31, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Food Division) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sanderson Farms, Inc.(Processing Division) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sanderson Farms, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Koch Meat Co., Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Koch Foods, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Perdue Farms, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Pilgrim Pride Corporation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tyson Poultry, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tyson Breeders, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tyson Chicken, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tyson Foods, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haff Poultry, Inc. (Ediger, Roger)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger L. Ediger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ediger, Roger)
January 27, 2017 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Lahman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lahman, Larry)
January 27, 2017 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/27/2017 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1055437 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Haff Poultry, Inc. [NOTE: Attorney Larry D. Lahman added to party Haff Poultry, Inc.(pty:pla)]. (Lahman, Larry)
January 27, 2017 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 2/3/2017)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Johnathan Walters, Haff Poultry, Inc., Craig Watts, Brad Carr, Johnny Upchurch (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2017 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brad Carr, Haff Poultry, Inc., Johnny Upchurch, Johnathan Walters, Craig Watts (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haff Poultry, Inc. et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haff Poultry, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Watts
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Butler
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Samantha S. Derksen
Represented By: Gregory L. Davis
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Represented By: Kimberly A. Fetsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Carr
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myles B. Weaver
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: Samantha S. Derksen
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Gregory L. Davis
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Kimberly A. Fetsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haff Poultry, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: Samantha S. Derksen
Represented By: Gregory L. Davis
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Represented By: Kimberly A. Fetsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Weaver
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: Samantha S. Derksen
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Gregory L. Davis
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Kimberly A. Fetsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Walters
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: Samantha S. Derksen
Represented By: Gregory L. Davis
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Represented By: Kimberly A. Fetsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Upchurch
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Kellie Lerner
Represented By: Samantha S. Derksen
Represented By: Gregory L. Davis
Represented By: M. Stephen Dampier
Represented By: Melinda R. Coolidge
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Represented By: Patrick F. Madden
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Represented By: Michael D. Hausfeld
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Charles D. Gabriel
Represented By: Hollis Salzman
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Carol H. Lahman
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: M. David Riggs
Represented By: Daniel J. Walker
Represented By: Kristopher E. Koepsel
Represented By: Larry S. McDevitt
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Gary I. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Donald M. Bingham
Represented By: Roger L. Ediger
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Larry D. Lahman
Represented By: Scott E. Cordell
Represented By: Christina M. Black
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Represented By: Kimberly A. Fetsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard L. Gordon
Represented By: J. Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Andrew T. Hernacki
Represented By: Mary M. Gardner
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Kevin R. Donelson
Represented By: Robert P. Davis
Represented By: Mark K. Stonecipher
Represented By: Kristin M. Koger
Represented By: Daniel C. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Foods, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Woodard, III
Represented By: John G. Calender
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Represented By: Cable M. Frost
Represented By: Robert P. Coffey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilgrim Pride Corporation
Represented By: William S. Leach
Represented By: Clayton E. Bailey
Represented By: Benjamin L. Stewart
Represented By: Carrie C. Mahan
Represented By: Reid E. Robison
Represented By: Kevin J. Arquit
Represented By: Harold C. Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy Pepper
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: J. Wesley Pebsworth
Represented By: Christa C. Cottrell
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: David L. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Poultry, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Kevin H. Kim
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Represented By: Mark C. Tatum
Represented By: John D. Harkrider
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Represented By: Jonathan Max Justl
Represented By: Michael S. Cargnel
Represented By: Patrica Sawyer
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Carmel R. Arikat
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Meat Co., Inc.
Represented By: John R. Woodard, III
Represented By: John G. Calender
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Represented By: Cable M. Frost
Represented By: Robert P. Coffey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Breeders, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Kevin H. Kim
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Represented By: Mark C. Tatum
Represented By: John D. Harkrider
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Represented By: Jonathan Max Justl
Represented By: Michael S. Cargnel
Represented By: Patrica Sawyer
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Carmel R. Arikat
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Kevin H. Kim
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Represented By: Mark C. Tatum
Represented By: John D. Harkrider
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Represented By: Jonathan Max Justl
Represented By: Michael S. Cargnel
Represented By: Patrica Sawyer
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Carmel R. Arikat
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Chicken, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Kevin H. Kim
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Represented By: Mark C. Tatum
Represented By: John D. Harkrider
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Represented By: Jonathan Max Justl
Represented By: Michael S. Cargnel
Represented By: Patrica Sawyer
Represented By: J. Renley Dennis
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Carmel R. Arikat
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Patricia A. Sawyer
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matt Purlee
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonathan Buttram
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vince Edwards
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Paul Brown
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William Beatty
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Triple R Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeremy Souder
Represented By: Jennifer S. Goldstein
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Harlan Hentges
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Represented By: J. Dudley Butler
Represented By: Daniel M. Cohen
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?