Gentry v. DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benny Wayne Gentry
Defendant: DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC and Patriot Rail Company, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv00224
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: McCurtain
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 10/1/2018(lal, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Erwin Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Michael)
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent SteelRiver Infrastructure Fund North America LP for Patriot Rail Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Tennessee Southern Railroad Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Patriot Rail Transportation Company LLC, Corporate Parent SteelRiver Infrastructure Fund North America LP for DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC) by DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John) Modified on 8/14/2018: correcting corp parents (nm, Deputy Clerk).
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John P. Lord on behalf of DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC (Lord, John)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by T. Wesley Shumate on behalf of Benny Wayne Gentry (Shumate, T.)
August 1, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Gaarder on behalf of Benny Wayne Gentry (Gaarder, Timothy)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Timothy Crowe Gaarder and #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney T. Wesley Shumate for Benny Wayne Gentry, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Travis Wesley Shumate to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1193834) by Benny Wayne Gentry (With attachments) Responses due by 8/6/2018(Jones, Logan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Timothy Crowe Gaarder to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1193821) by Benny Wayne Gentry (With attachments) Responses due by 8/6/2018(Jones, Logan)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patriot Rail Company, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/17/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1192399 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Benny Wayne Gentry (sms, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 7/24/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC, Patriot Rail Company, LLC by Benny Wayne Gentry (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Benny Wayne Gentry (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeQueen & Eastern Railroad, LLC
Represented By: Michael Erwin Smith
Represented By: John P. Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Rail Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Erwin Smith
Represented By: John P. Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Wayne Gentry
Represented By: Logan Jones
Represented By: T. Wesley Shumate
Represented By: Timothy Gaarder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?