Rafiq v. B Baker, Warden
Petitioner: Muhammed Rafiq
Respondent: Moore Detention Center, US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Attorney General and B Baker
Case Number: 6:2018cv00241
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Okmulgee
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL Return Receipt Received - U.S. Immigration & Customs (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED - U.S. Attorney General(lal, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL Return Receipt Received - U.S. Attorney (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: directing Respondent to respond to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 within sixty (60) days of service of this Order (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/8/2018 in the amount of $5, receipt number 15607 (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241) by Muhammed Rafiq (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Muhammed Rafiq Responses due by 8/13/2018(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne. Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the petitioner has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $5.00 filing fee. The petitioner is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification of Statement of Institutional Accounts and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 20 days or by August 20, 2018. The Clerk is directed to provide the petitioner with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet (Filing Fee due by 8/20/2018) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 by Muhammed Rafiq (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafiq v. B Baker, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Muhammed Rafiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Moore Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?