Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. v. Gamble
Appellee: Othel H. Gamble, Jr.
Appellant: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00255
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
County: Muskogee
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Othel H. Gamble, Jr (Burrage, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Julia C. Rieman on behalf of Othel H. Gamble, Jr (Rieman, Julia)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines filed 9/11/18 (8] Motion to Extend Deadline(s)) as follows: Appellant Brief due by 10/15/2018 ; Appellee Brief due by 10/29/2018; and Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/12/2018. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. Responses due by 9/25/2018(Richer, John)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven W. Soule' on behalf of Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Soule', Steven)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John T. Richer on behalf of Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (Richer, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Record on Appeal (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court )(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, setting bankruptcy appeal briefing deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 9/20/2018, Appellee Brief due by 10/4/2018, Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/18/2018. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Certification of RECORD ON APPEAL and of Transmission of Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court ) (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to the US District Court (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/10/2018 to correct docket text(sms, Deputy Clerk).
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. v. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Othel H. Gamble, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Brunson
Represented By: Julia C. Rieman
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Richer
Represented By: Steven W. Soule'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?