Hensley v. Atlas Roofing Corporation

Plaintiff: Kinchata Hensley
Defendant: Atlas Roofing Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv00273
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
0 Judge: James H Payne
1 Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court and due to related Case Nos. CIV-18-272-SPS and CIV-18-274-SPS, this case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-273-SPS. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Woodrow K. Glass on behalf of Kinchata Hensley (Glass, Woodrow)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barrett T. Bowers on behalf of Kinchata Hensley (Bowers, Barrett)
August 21, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/21/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1200239 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Kinchata Hensley (sms, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 8/27/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Atlas Roofing Corporation by Kinchata Hensley (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kinchata Hensley (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Atlas Roofing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinchata Hensley
Represented By: Jonathan M. Irwin
Represented By: Woodrow K. Glass
Represented By: Barrett T. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Roofing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?