Sheward v. Henryetta, City of et al
Plaintiff: Howard Sheward, Jr.
Defendant: Fountain View Manor, Inc., Jennifer Clason and Henryetta, City of
Case Number: 6:2018cv00295
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by Jennifer Clason(in her individual capacity), Jennifer Clason(in her official capacity), Henryetta, City of ;(Crapster, Clark)
October 26, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by Fountain View Manor, Inc. ;(Powers, Barrett)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Defendants are to file an expedited response to #19 Plaintiff's Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion no later than 10/31/2018 as to their objection to the requested relief. Plaintiff's response deadline to the motions to dismiss is stayed pending resolution of the pending motion for extension of time. (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Dismiss) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Howard Sheward, Jr Responses due by 11/8/2018(Mortensen, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiff, if he so desires, to file an amended complaint by 10/18/2018, providing additional factual averments which may vitiate Defendants claims of insufficiency.(tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties exchange and file their disclosures and joint status report no later than 11/9/2018(lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean M. McKelvey on behalf of Jennifer Clason(in her official capacity), Henryetta, City of (McKelvey, Sean)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Clark W. Crapster on behalf of Jennifer Clason(in her individual capacity), Jennifer Clason(in her official capacity), Henryetta, City of (Crapster, Clark)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Jennifer Clason(in her individual capacity), Jennifer Clason(in her official capacity), Henryetta, City of Responses due by 10/19/2018(Crapster, Clark)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-295-RAW. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barrett L. Powers on behalf of Fountain View Manor, Inc. (Powers, Barrett)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fountain View Manor, Inc. (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Fountain View Manor, Inc. Responses due by 10/18/2018(Wohlgemuth, Joel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel L. Wohlgemuth on behalf of Fountain View Manor, Inc. (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Fountain View Manor, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jennifer Clason (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Henryetta (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James D. Sicking on behalf of Howard Sheward, Jr (Sicking, James)
August 31, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/31/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1202733 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Howard Sheward, Jr (Mortensen, Thomas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Mortensen on behalf of Howard Sheward, Jr (Mortensen, Thomas)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 9/7/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jennifer Clason (in her individual capacity), Jennifer Clason (in her official capacity), Fountain View Manor, Inc., Henryetta, City of by Howard Sheward, Jr (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Howard Sheward, Jr (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheward v. Henryetta, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Sheward, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Mortensen
Represented By: James D. Sicking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fountain View Manor, Inc.
Represented By: Barrett L. Powers
Represented By: Joel L. Wohlgemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clason
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Sean M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henryetta, City of
Represented By: Clark W. Crapster
Represented By: Sean M. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?