Smith v. Love County Sheriff Department
Plaintiff: Shaynise Lanee Smith
Defendant: Love County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 6:2018cv00315
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-315-RAW. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern
September 14, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 14 15:29:20 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]
September 14, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 14 15:20:20 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/14/2018) (axm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/14/2018) (axm). [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Love County Sheriff Department filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Love County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaynise Lanee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?