Randolph v. Carter County Board of County Commissioners et al

Plaintiff: John Randolph, IV
Defendant: Carter County Board of County Commissioners and Chris Bryant
Case Number: 6:2018cv00319
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/17/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Bryant (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Carter County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/19/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1207982 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John Randolph, IV (Gibson, Loren)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/26/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chris Bryant(Sheriff, in his official capacity), Chris Bryant(individual capacity), Carter County Board of County Commissioners by John Randolph, IV (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Randolph, IV (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. Carter County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Randolph, IV
Represented By: Loren Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?