Smith v. Winstar World Casino
Plaintiff: Shaynise Lanee Smith
Defendant: Winstar World Casino
Case Number: 6:2018cv00331
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder directing plaintiff supplement the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) no later than 10/31/2018. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern
October 4, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Oct 4 14:23:15 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/4/2018) (epm) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 OBJECTION/Appeal Form re: #6 Order filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (sss) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 11, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 11 14:23:29 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The subject matter of this action, as reflected in the complaint, concerns events that occurred at Winstar World Casino, which the Court notes is located in Thackerville, Oklahoma, in Love County, Oklahoma, within the Eastern District of Oklahoma. See 28 U.S.C. 116(b). This action will be transferred under the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6 to the Eastern District of Oklahoma on October 2, 2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Scholer within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. See FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/11/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 10, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Sep 10 15:10:53 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Winstar World Casino filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Winstar World Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winstar World Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaynise Lanee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?